StarStone National Insurance Company v. Waldrop Condominum Association, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: StarStone National Insurance Company
Defendant: Waldrop Condominum Association, Inc., Jessica Gilstrap, Curtis Gilstrap and Ardent Residential LLC
Intervenor Plaintiff: Arch Specalty Insurance Company
Case Number: 1:2020cv04398
Filed: October 28, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: J P Boulee
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:2201
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 21, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 21, 2020 Filing 10 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Petition for Declaration Judgment , as to Waldrop Condominium Association. (Jackson, Kim)
December 14, 2020 Filing 9 MOTION to Intervene with Brief In Support by Arch Specalty Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Brief Memo of Law ISO Motion to Intervene, #2 Exhibit A to MOL ISO Motion to Intervene, #3 Exhibit B to MOL ISO Motion to Intervene, #4 Exhibit C to MOL ISO Motion to Intervene, #5 Exhibit D to MOL ISO Motion to Intervene, #6 Text of Proposed Order)(Wingfield, Thomas)
December 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 NINTH AMENDMENT TO GENERAL ORDER 20-01 RE: COURT OPERATIONS UNDER THE EXIGENT CIRCUMSTANCES CREATED BY COVID-19 AND RELATED CORONAVIRUS. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 12/08/2020. (adg) (ADI)
November 16, 2020 Filing 7 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Petition for Declaration Judgment , as to Ardent Residential. (Jackson, Kim)
October 30, 2020 Filing 6 Electronic Summons Issued as to Curtis Gilstrap, Jessica Gilstrap. (ddm)
October 29, 2020 Filing 5 PROPOSED SUMMONS filed by StarStone National Insurance Company (Attachments: #1 Summons)(Jackson, Kim)
October 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 EIGHTH AMENDMENT TO GENERAL ORDER 20-01 RE: COURT OPERATIONS UNDER THE EXIGENT CIRCUMSTANCES CREATED BY COVID-19 AND RELATED CORONA VIRUS. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 9/28/20. (eop)
October 28, 2020 Filing 3 Electronic Summons Issued as to Ardent Residential LLC. (eop)
October 28, 2020 Filing 2 Electronic Summons Issued as to Waldrop Condominum Association, Inc.. (eop)
October 28, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by StarStone National Insurance Company. (Filing fee $400.00, receipt number AGANDC-10313658) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit -A -Underlying Complaint, #2 Exhibit -B -ROR Letter from Arch, #3 Exhibit -C -ROR Letter from StarStone, #4 Exhibit -D -Arch Policy, #5 Exhibit -E -StarStone Policy, #6 Civil Cover Sheet, #7 Incomplete Proposed Summons -2)(eop) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: StarStone National Insurance Company v. Waldrop Condominum Association, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: StarStone National Insurance Company
Represented By: Joseph Jackson Harris
Represented By: Kim M. Jackson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Waldrop Condominum Association, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jessica Gilstrap
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Curtis Gilstrap
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ardent Residential LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor plaintiff: Arch Specalty Insurance Company
Represented By: Thomas Kearney Wingfield
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?