Invictus Globe, LLC v. CJ Logistics Holdings America Corporation
Plaintiff: Invictus Globe, LLC
Defendant: CJ Logistics Holdings America Corporation and CJ Logistics U.S.A. Corporation
Case Number: 1:2020cv04412
Filed: October 28, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: Timothy C Batten
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 18, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER granting #22 Motion for Extension of Time to file the Joint Preliminary Report and Discovery Plan and Initial Disclosures. The Parties shall have through and including 12/30/2020. Defendant shall have through 12/30/2020 to file its answer or other response to Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint. Signed by Judge Timothy C. Batten, Sr. on 12/18/2020. (dmb)
December 17, 2020 Filing 22 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time File Preliminary Report, Initial Disclosures, and Answer First Amended Complaint re: #17 Amended Complaint, by Invictus Globe, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Stancil, Andrew)
December 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 21 NINTH AMENDMENT TO GENERAL ORDER 20-01 RE: COURT OPERATIONS UNDER THE EXIGENT CIRCUMSTANCES CREATED BY COVID-19 AND RELATED CORONAVIRUS. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 12/08/2020. (adg) (ADI)
December 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER granting #19 Motion for Leave to File Matters Under Seal. The Agreement attached as Exhibit 3 to Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint be filed under seal with the Clerk of Court. Signed by Judge Timothy C. Batten, Sr. on 12/8/2020. (dmb)
December 8, 2020 Filing 19 Consent MOTION for Leave to File Matters Under Seal re: #18 Notice of Filing Exhibit 3 to First Amended Complaint by Invictus Globe, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Stancil, Andrew)
December 8, 2020 Filing 18 SEALED NOTICE Of Filing Exhibit 3 to First Amended Complaint by Invictus Globe, LLC re #17 Amended Complaint, (Stancil, Andrew) Modified on 12/8/2020 (dmb).
December 8, 2020 Filing 17 First AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants with Jury Demand filed by Invictus Globe, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1 to First Amended Complaint, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 2 to First Amended Complaint)(Stancil, Andrew) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form.
December 3, 2020 MINUTE ORDER granting Nolan Walter's #14 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice. Entered by CRD at the direction of Judge Timothy C. Batten, Sr. If the applicant does not have CM/ECF access in the Northern District of Georgia already, they must request access at http://pacer.gov. If they have electronically filed in this district in a previous case, please omit this step.(usw)
December 3, 2020 0APPROVAL by Clerks Office re: #14 APPLICATION for Admission of Nolan Walter Pro Hac Vice.. Attorney Nolan Walter added appearing on behalf of CJ Logistics Holdings America Corporation (nmb)
November 30, 2020 Clerks Notation re #15 Certificate of Interested Persons. Reviewed and approved by Judge Timothy C. Batten, Sr. (usw)
November 30, 2020 MINUTE ORDER approving Fred Puglisi and Jay Ramsey's #11 Application for Admission Pro and #12 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice. Entered by CRD at the direction of Judge Timothy C. Batten, Sr. (usw)
November 30, 2020 Filing 16 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Invictus Globe, LLC. (Stancil, Andrew)
November 30, 2020 Filing 15 Certificate of Interested Persons by Invictus Globe, LLC. (Stancil, Andrew)
November 25, 2020 APPROVAL by Clerks Office re: #12 APPLICATION for Admission of Jay Ramsey Pro Hac Vice.. Attorney Jay T. Ramsey added appearing on behalf of CJ Logistics Holdings America Corporation (nmb)
November 25, 2020 Filing 14 APPLICATION for Admission of Nolan Walter Pro Hac Vice.by CJ Logistics Holdings America Corporation. (Huynh, Daniel) Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse.
November 24, 2020 RETURN of #13 APPLICATION for Admission of Nolan Walter Pro Hac Vice. to attorney for correction regarding courts (no highest state court or federal court listed). (nmb)
November 24, 2020 APPROVAL by Clerks Office re: #11 APPLICATION for Admission of Fred Puglisi Pro Hac Vice.. Attorney Fred Puglisi added appearing on behalf of CJ Logistics Holdings America Corporation (nmb)
November 20, 2020 Filing 13 APPLICATION for Admission of Nolan Walter Pro Hac Vice.by CJ Logistics Holdings America Corporation. (Huynh, Daniel) Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse.
November 20, 2020 Filing 12 APPLICATION for Admission of Jay Ramsey Pro Hac Vice.by CJ Logistics Holdings America Corporation. (Huynh, Daniel) Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse.
November 20, 2020 Filing 11 APPLICATION for Admission of Fred Puglisi Pro Hac Vice.by CJ Logistics Holdings America Corporation. (Huynh, Daniel) Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse.
November 20, 2020 RETURN of #9 APPLICATION for Admission of Nolan Walter Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-10385437). to attorney for correction regarding local counsel's address and courts. (nmb)
November 20, 2020 RETURN of #8 APPLICATION for Admission of Jay Ramsey Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-10385347). to attorney for correction regarding local counsel's address. (nmb)
November 20, 2020 RETURN of #7 APPLICATION for Admission of Fred Puglisi Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-10385305). to attorney for correction regarding local counsel's address. (nmb)
November 18, 2020 Filing 10 ANSWER to #1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by CJ Logistics Holdings America Corporation. Discovery ends on 4/19/2021.(Huynh, Daniel) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov to obtain Pretrial Instructions.
November 17, 2020 Filing 9 APPLICATION for Admission of Nolan Walter Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-10385437).by CJ Logistics Holdings America Corporation. (Huynh, Daniel) Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse.
November 17, 2020 Filing 8 APPLICATION for Admission of Jay Ramsey Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-10385347).by CJ Logistics Holdings America Corporation. (Huynh, Daniel) Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse.
November 17, 2020 Filing 7 APPLICATION for Admission of Fred Puglisi Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-10385305).by CJ Logistics Holdings America Corporation. (Huynh, Daniel) Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse.
November 6, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE by CJ Logistics Holdings America Corporation re #1 Notice of Removal, (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A (Notice to State Court of Removal))(Vaughn, Stephen)
November 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER granting #4 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer, CJ Logistics Holdings America Corporation. Answer due 11/18/2020. Signed by Judge Timothy C. Batten, Sr. on 11/2/2020. (dmb)
October 30, 2020 Filing 4 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Notice of Removal, by CJ Logistics Holdings America Corporation. (Vaughn, Stephen)
October 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 EIGHTH AMENDMENT TO GENERAL ORDER 20-01 RE: COURT OPERATIONS UNDER THE EXIGENT CIRCUMSTANCES CREATED BY COVID19 AND RELATED CORONA VIRUS. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 09/28/2020. (ddm)
October 28, 2020 Filing 2 Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement by CJ Logistics Holdings America Corporation identifying Corporate Parent CJ Logistics Corporation for CJ Logistics Holdings America Corporation. (ddm)
October 28, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL, with COMPLAINT, filed by CJ Logistics Holdings America Corporation. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number AGANDC-10315907) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(ddm) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Invictus Globe, LLC v. CJ Logistics Holdings America Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CJ Logistics Holdings America Corporation
Represented By: Daniel Huynh
Represented By: Stephen Manning Vaughn
Represented By: Fred Puglisi
Represented By: Nolan Walter
Represented By: Jay T. Ramsey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CJ Logistics U.S.A. Corporation
Represented By: Daniel Huynh
Represented By: Stephen Manning Vaughn
Represented By: Fred Puglisi
Represented By: Nolan Walter
Represented By: Jay T. Ramsey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Invictus Globe, LLC
Represented By: Andrew Dorsey Stancil
Represented By: Brian Tanner Easley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?