Highpoint Medical Center, LLC v. Wieck Construction, LLC
Plaintiff: Highpoint Medical Center, LLC
Defendant: Wieck Construction, LLC
Case Number: 1:2020cv04430
Filed: October 29, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: J P Boulee
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 21, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 21, 2020 Filing 5 JOINT PRELIMINARY REPORT AND DISCOVERY PLAN filed by Highpoint Medical Center, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Scheduling Order)(Dean, Jason)
December 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 NINTH AMENDMENT TO GENERAL ORDER 20-01 RE: COURT OPERATIONS UNDER THE EXIGENT CIRCUMSTANCES CREATED BY COVID-19 AND RELATED CORONAVIRUS. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 12/08/2020. (adg) (ADI)
November 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 EIGHTH AMENDMENT TO GENERAL ORDER 20-01 RE: COURT OPERATIONS UNDER THE EXIGENT CIRCUMSTANCES CREATED BY COVID-19 AND RELATED CORONA VIRUS. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 9/28/20. (eop)
October 29, 2020 Filing 2 ANSWER to #1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL with Jury Demand by Wieck Construction, LLC. Discovery ends on 3/29/2021. (Filed in State Court and included with Notice of Removal)(eop) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov to obtain Pretrial Instructions.
October 29, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL with COMPLAINT filed by Wieck Construction, LLC. (Filing fee $ 400.00 receipt number AGANDC-10321091) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit -A -Complaint, #2 Exhibit -B -Defendant's Answer, #3 Exhibit -C -Corporate Registration, #4 Exhibit -D -Plaintiff's Demand, #5 Exhibit -E -Notice of Filing, #6 Civil Cover Sheet)(eop) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Highpoint Medical Center, LLC v. Wieck Construction, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Highpoint Medical Center, LLC
Represented By: Jason A. Dean
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wieck Construction, LLC
Represented By: Andrew D. Horowitz
Represented By: Taylor Thomas Hanks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?