M & M Interior Solutions, Inc. v. ASM Modular Systems, Inc.
Plaintiff: M & M Interior Solutions, Inc.
Defendant: ASM Modular Systems, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2020cv04442
Filed: October 30, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: Eleanor L Ross
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 28, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 28, 2020 Civil Case Terminated. (jpk)
December 28, 2020 Clerk's Entry of Dismissal APPROVING #14 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal Without Prejudice pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P.41(a)(1)(A)(i) (jpk)
December 23, 2020 Filing 14 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal filed by M & M Interior Solutions, Inc. (Mikkelsen, Matthew)
December 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER LIFTING STAY: The Court LIFTS the previously imposed stay in this case. Signed by Judge Eleanor L. Ross on 12/9/2020. (jpk)
December 9, 2020 Filing 12 MOTION to Dismiss with Brief In Support by ASM Modular Systems, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Brief Memorandum of Law in Support of Defendant's Motion to Dismiss, #2 Affidavit Declaration of Andreas Miarka)(Vaughn, Stephen)
December 9, 2020 Filing 11 NOTICE Related to Order to Stay Proceedings by ASM Modular Systems, Inc. re #8 Order on Motion to Stay (Vaughn, Stephen) Modified on 12/10/2020 to edit text (jpk).
December 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 NINTH AMENDMENT TO GENERAL ORDER 20-01 RE: COURT OPERATIONS UNDER THE EXIGENT CIRCUMSTANCES CREATED BY COVID-19 AND RELATED CORONAVIRUS. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 12/08/2020. (adg) (ADI)
December 7, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE by M & M Interior Solutions, Inc. re #8 Order on Motion to Stay (Merbaum, David)
November 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting in part and denying in part #7 Motion to Stay. The Court STAYS all proceedings and deadlines in this matter for thirty (30) days from the date of this order. The Court ORDERS the Parties to file a notice into the docket within the thirty (30)-day period indicating whether they have resolved this matter or, if not, how they intend to proceed. The Court DIRECTS the Clerk to submit this matter to the undersigned after the thirty (30)-day period expires. Signed by Judge Eleanor L. Ross on 11/9/2020. (jpk)
November 9, 2020 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER (by docket entry only) GRANTING #5 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice by Peter G. Callaghan and GRANTING #6 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice by Nicholas A. Dube. Approved by District Judge Eleanor L. Ross on 11/9/20. If the applicant does not have CM/ECF access in the Northern District of Georgia already, they must request access at http://pacer.gov. If they have electronically filed in this district in a previous case, please omit this step.(mlb)
November 6, 2020 APPROVAL by Clerks Office re: #6 APPLICATION for Admission of Nicholas A. Dube Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-10340499).. Attorney Nicholas A. Dube added appearing on behalf of ASM Modular Systems, Inc. (nmb)
November 6, 2020 APPROVAL by Clerks Office re: #5 APPLICATION for Admission of Peter G. Callaghan Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-10340475).. Attorney Peter G. Callaghan added appearing on behalf of ASM Modular Systems, Inc. (nmb)
November 5, 2020 Filing 7 Joint MOTION to Stay Proceedings by ASM Modular Systems, Inc.. (Vaughn, Stephen)
November 5, 2020 Clerks Notation re #4 Certificate of Interested Persons/Corporate Disclosure Statement by ASM Modular Systems, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Kingspan Holdings US, Inc., Other Affiliate Kingspan Group plc, Other Affiliate Kingspan Investments Ltd., Other Affiliate Kingspan Group Limited, Other Affiliate Kingspan Holdings Netherlands BV, Other Affiliate Kingspan Europe, Other Affiliate Kingspan Holdings (Overseas) Limited, Other Affiliate Kingspan Holdings Ltd. for ASM Modular Systems, Inc.. Read and approved by District Judge Eleanor L. Ross. (mlb)
November 4, 2020 Filing 6 APPLICATION for Admission of Nicholas A. Dube Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-10340499).by ASM Modular Systems, Inc.. (Vaughn, Stephen) Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse.
November 4, 2020 Filing 5 APPLICATION for Admission of Peter G. Callaghan Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-10340475).by ASM Modular Systems, Inc.. (Vaughn, Stephen) Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse.
November 4, 2020 Filing 4 Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement by ASM Modular Systems, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Kingspan Holdings US, Inc., Other Affiliate Kingspan Group plc, Other Affiliate Kingspan Investments Ltd., Other Affiliate Kingspan Group Limited, Other Affiliate Kingspan Holdings Netherlands BV, Other Affiliate Kingspan Europe, Other Affiliate Kingspan Holdings (Overseas) Limited, Other Affiliate Kingspan Holdings Ltd. for ASM Modular Systems, Inc.. (Vaughn, Stephen)
November 3, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE FROM THE COURT: INSTRUCTIONS FOR CIVIL CASES ASSIGNED TO THE HONORABLE ELEANOR L. ROSS. (mlb)
November 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Eighth Amendment to General Order 20-01 re: COURT OPERATIONS UNDER THE EXIGENT CIRCUMSTANCES CREATED BY COVID-19 AND RELATED CORONA VIRUS. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 9/28/2020. (jpk)
October 30, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL with COMPLAINT filed by ASM Modular Systems, Inc. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number AGANDC-10325078) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (jpk) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: M & M Interior Solutions, Inc. v. ASM Modular Systems, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: M & M Interior Solutions, Inc.
Represented By: David Jason Merbaum
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ASM Modular Systems, Inc.
Represented By: Stephen Manning Vaughn
Represented By: Peter G. Callaghan
Represented By: Nicholas A. Dube
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?