27th Investments LLC v. Splendid Global Entertainment, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: 27th Investments LLC
Defendant: PRRIA Haider Productions Corp., Priya Rehan, Splendid Global Entertainment, Inc. and Mohamad Mehboob Haider
Case Number: 1:2020cv04449
Filed: October 30, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: Charles A Pannell
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 24, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 24, 2020 Filing 12 Return of Service Executed by 27th Investments LLC. PRRIA Haider Productions Corp. served on 12/15/2020, answer due 1/5/2021. (Caplan, Kana Anne)
December 24, 2020 Filing 11 Return of Service Executed by 27th Investments LLC. Splendid Global Entertainment, Inc. served on 12/15/2020, answer due 1/5/2021.(Caplan, Kana Anne)
December 24, 2020 Filing 10 Return of Service Executed by 27th Investments LLC. Priya Rehan served on 12/15/2020, answer due 1/5/2021. (Caplan, Kana Anne)
December 24, 2020 Filing 9 Return of Service Executed by 27th Investments LLC. Mohamad Mehboob Haider served on 12/15/2020, answer due 1/5/2021. (Caplan, Kana Anne)
December 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 NINTH AMENDMENT TO GENERAL ORDER 20-01 RE: COURT OPERATIONS UNDER THE EXIGENT CIRCUMSTANCES CREATED BY COVID-19 AND RELATED CORONAVIRUS. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 12/08/2020. (adg) (ADI)
November 6, 2020 Filing 7 Certificate of Interested Persons by 27th Investments LLC. (Caplan, Kana Anne)
November 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 EIGHTH AMENDMENT TO GENERAL ORDER 20-01 RE: COURT OPERATIONS UNDER THE EXIGENT CIRCUMSTANCES CREATED BY COVID-19 AND RELATED CORONA VIRUS. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 9/28/20. (eop)
November 2, 2020 Filing 5 Electronic Summons Issued as to Priya Rehan. (eop)
November 2, 2020 Filing 4 Electronic Summons Issued as to Mohamad Mehboob Haider. (eop)
November 2, 2020 Filing 3 Electronic Summons Issued as to PRRIA Haider Productions Corp.. (eop)
November 2, 2020 Filing 2 Electronic Summons Issued as to Splendid Global Entertainment, Inc.. (eop)
October 30, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by 27th Investments LLC. (Filing fee $400.00, receipt number AGANDC-10325876) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit -A -September Note, #2 Exhibit -B -PRRIA Sept. Guaranty, #3 Exhibit -C -Haider Sept. Guaranty & Pledge, #4 Exhibit -D -Rehan Sept. Guaranty & Pledge, #5 Exhibit -E -November Note, #6 Exhibit -F -PRRIA Nov. Guaranty, #7 Exhibit -G -Haider Nov. Guaranty & Pledge, #8 Exhibit -H -Rehan Nov. Guaranty & Pledge, #9 Civil Cover Sheet)(eop) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form. Modified on 11/3/2020 to correct date filed (eop).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: 27th Investments LLC v. Splendid Global Entertainment, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PRRIA Haider Productions Corp.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Priya Rehan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Splendid Global Entertainment, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mohamad Mehboob Haider
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: 27th Investments LLC
Represented By: Kana Anne Ellis Caplan
Represented By: Christopher E. Adams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?