Brady v. Sentinel Insurance Company et al
Plaintiff: Pamela K. Brady, DDS
Defendant: The Hartford Insurance Company and Sentinel Insurance Company
Case Number: 1:2020cv04450
Filed: October 30, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: Leigh Martin May
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:2201
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 28, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 28, 2020 Submission of #7 MOTION to Dismiss , to District Judge Leigh Martin May. (tmf)
December 14, 2020 Clerks Notation re #9 Certificate of Interested Persons. Read and approved by LMM. (bnp)
December 11, 2020 Filing 9 Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement by Sentinel Insurance Company identifying Corporate Parent The Hartford Financial Services Group, Inc. for Sentinel Insurance Company. (Perry, John)
December 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 NINTH AMENDMENT TO GENERAL ORDER 20-01 RE: COURT OPERATIONS UNDER THE EXIGENT CIRCUMSTANCES CREATED BY COVID-19 AND RELATED CORONAVIRUS. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 12/08/2020. (adg) (ADI)
December 7, 2020 Filing 7 MOTION to Dismiss with Brief In Support by Sentinel Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Brief, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C)(Perry, John)
November 11, 2020 Filing 6 Electronic Summons Issued as to Sentinel Insurance Company. (tmf)
November 10, 2020 Filing 5 PROPOSED SUMMONS filed by Pamela K. Brady, DDS (Douglas, Chaka)
November 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 STANDING ORDER REGARDING CIVIL LITIGATION Signed by Judge Leigh Martin May on 11/3/2020. (tmf)
November 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 EIGHTH AMENDMENT TO GENERAL ORDER 20-01 RE: COURT OPERATIONS UNDER THE EXIGENT CIRCUMSTANCES CREATED BY COVID-19 AND RELATED CORONA VIRUS. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 9/28/20. (eop)
November 2, 2020 Filing 2 Electronic Summons Issued as to The Hartford Insurance Company. (eop)
October 30, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand filed by Pamela K. Brady, DDS. (Filing fee $400.00, receipt number AGANDC-10326134) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(eop) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Brady v. Sentinel Insurance Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Pamela K. Brady, DDS
Represented By: Harold L. Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Hartford Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sentinel Insurance Company
Represented By: John Gregory Perry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?