Vero Software Inc. v. U.S. Cabinetworks LLC et al
Plaintiff: Vero Software Inc.
Defendant: U.S. Cabinetworks LLC, John Does 1-10, Barry Bertoldi, Mitch Zeitner and Christopher Barnett
Case Number: 1:2020cv04456
Filed: October 30, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: J P Boulee
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 28:1338
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 17, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 17, 2020 Clerks Entry of Default as to Christopher Barnett. (ddm)
December 16, 2020 Filing 19 MOTION for Clerks Entry of Default Against Defendant Christopher Barnett with Brief In Support by Vero Software Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Caleb A. Hatch in Support of Motion)(Hatch, Caleb)
December 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 18 NINTH AMENDMENT TO GENERAL ORDER 20-01 RE: COURT OPERATIONS UNDER THE EXIGENT CIRCUMSTANCES CREATED BY COVID-19 AND RELATED CORONAVIRUS. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 12/08/2020. (adg) (ADI)
December 4, 2020 Clerks Entry of Default as to Mitch Zeitner. (ddm)
December 3, 2020 Filing 17 MOTION for Clerks Entry of Default Against Defendant Mitch Zeitner with Brief In Support by Vero Software Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Caleb A. Hatch in support of Motion)(Hatch, Caleb)
December 3, 2020 Filing 16 Return of Service Unexecuted by Vero Software Inc. as to Barry Bertoldi. (Hatch, Caleb)
December 3, 2020 Filing 15 Return of Service Executed by Vero Software Inc.. Mitch Zeitner served on 11/11/2020, answer due 12/2/2020. (Hatch, Caleb)
December 3, 2020 Filing 14 Return of Service Executed by Vero Software Inc.. Christopher Barnett served on 11/17/2020, answer due 12/8/2020. (Hatch, Caleb)
December 3, 2020 Filing 13 Return of Service Executed by Vero Software Inc.. U.S. Cabinetworks LLC served on 11/11/2020, answer due 12/2/2020. (Hatch, Caleb)
December 1, 2020 Filing 12 Defendant ANSWER to #1 COMPLAINT by U.S. Cabinetworks LLC. Discovery ends on 4/30/2021. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B, #3 Supplement General Order 20-01)(Elkhalil, Hassan) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov to obtain Pretrial Instructions.
December 1, 2020 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Hassan Elkhalil on behalf of U.S. Cabinetworks LLC (Elkhalil, Hassan)
November 30, 2020 Opinion or Order ORDER granting #10 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Judge J. P. Boulee on 11/30/20. If the applicant does not have CM/ECF access in the Northern District of Georgia already, they must request access at http://pacer.gov. If they have electronically filed in this district in a previous case, please omit this step.(bnw)
November 25, 2020 APPROVAL by Clerks Office re: #10 APPLICATION for Admission of Caleb A. Hatch Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-10400327).. Attorney Caleb A. Hatch added appearing on behalf of Vero Software Inc. (nmb)
November 20, 2020 Filing 10 APPLICATION for Admission of Caleb A. Hatch Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-10400327).by Vero Software Inc.. (Strickland, Andrew) Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse.
November 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 STANDING ORDER REGARDING CIVIL LITIGATION. Signed by Judge J. P. Boulee on 11/6/20. (bnw)
November 3, 2020 NEF regenerated for #1 Complaint. (aaq)
November 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 EIGHTH AMENDMENT TO GENERAL ORDER 20-01 RE: COURT OPERATIONS UNDER THE EXIGENT CIRCUMSTANCES CREATED BY COVID-19 AND RELATED CORONA VIRUS. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 9/28/20. (eop)
November 2, 2020 Filing 7 Electronic Summons Issued as to Barry Bertoldi. (eop)
November 2, 2020 Filing 6 Electronic Summons Issued as to Christopher Barnett. (eop)
November 2, 2020 Filing 5 Electronic Summons Issued as to Mitch Zeitner. (eop)
November 2, 2020 Filing 4 Electronic Summons Issued as to U.S. Cabinetworks LLC. (eop)
October 30, 2020 Filing 3 Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement by Vero Software Inc. identifying Other Affiliates: Hexagon Holdings Inc., Hexagon Metrology AB, and Hexagon AB for Vero Software Inc.. (eop)
October 30, 2020 Filing 2 AO Form 121 forwarded to Registrar. (eop)
October 30, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Vero Software Inc.. (Filing fee $400.00, receipt number AGANDC-10326335) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(eop) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form. (Additional attachment(s) added on 11/3/2020: #2 -CORRECT PDF -MAIN DOCUMENT -COMPLAINT-) (eop).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Vero Software Inc. v. U.S. Cabinetworks LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Cabinetworks LLC
Represented By: Hassan Elkhalil
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Does 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Barry Bertoldi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mitch Zeitner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Christopher Barnett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Vero Software Inc.
Represented By: Andrew Garrett Strickland
Represented By: Caleb A. Hatch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?