Otoh v. Barr et al
Appellee: William Barr, Claire McCusker Murray, Nancy J. Gargula, Clifford J. White, III and Mary Ida Townson
Appellant: Peter Otoh
Case Number: 1:2020cv04544
Filed: November 6, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: Timothy C Batten
Nature of Suit: Bankruptcy Appeal (801)
Cause of Action: 28:0158
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 31, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 31, 2020 Filing 12 BANKRUPTCY RECORD RECEIVED (Attachments: #1 From case 20-61779 doc1, #2 doc3, #3 doc4, #4 doc5, #5 doc6, #6 doc7, #7 doc8, #8 doc9, #9 doc10, #10 doc14, #11 doc16, #12 doc17, #13 doc18, #14 doc20, #15 doc21, #16 doc22, #17 doc23, #18 doc24, #19 doc28, #20 doc29, #21 doc31, #22 doc32, #23 doc33, #24 doc34, #25 doc35, #26 doc36, #27 doc37, #28 doc39, #29 doc40, #30 doc41, #31 doc42, #32 doc44, #33 doc46, #34 doc48, #35 doc49, #36 doc50, #37 doc51, #38 doc52, #39 doc53, #40 doc54, #41 doc56, #42 doc57, #43 doc58, #44 doc59, #45 doc61, #46 doc62, #47 doc63, #48 doc66, #49 doc68, #50 doc69, #51 doc71, #52 doc72, #53 doc73, #54 doc74, #55 doc75, #56 doc77, #57 doc79, #58 doc80, #59 doc81, #60 doc82, #61 doc83, #62 doc84, #63 doc85, #64 doc86, #65 doc87, #66 doc88, #67 doc89, #68 doc92, #69 doc93, #70 doc95, #71 doc97, #72 doc99)(Lugo, Yahaira)
December 31, 2020 Filing 11 BANKRUPTCY RECORD RECEIVED (Attachments: #1 From case 20-6101 doc1, #2 doc2, #3 doc3, #4 doc5, #5 doc6, #6 doc7, #7 doc8, #8 doc9, #9 doc10, #10 doc11, #11 doc12, #12 doc13, #13 doc15, #14 doc16, #15 doc17, #16 doc18, #17 doc19, #18 doc20, #19 doc21, #20 doc22, #21 doc23, #22 doc25, #23 doc26, #24 doc27, #25 doc28, #26 doc29, #27 doc30, #28 doc31, #29 doc32, #30 doc34, #31 doc35, #32 doc36, #33 doc40, #34 doc41, #35 doc42, #36 doc43, #37 doc44, #38 doc45, #39 doc46, #40 doc47, #41 doc48, #42 doc49, #43 doc50, #44 doc51, #45 doc52, #46 doc53, #47 doc54, #48 doc55, #49 doc56, #50 doc57, #51 doc66, #52 doc67, #53 doc71, #54 doc72, #55 doc73, #56 doc74, #57 doc75, #58 doc76, #59 doc77, #60 doc78, #61 doc79, #62 doc80, #63 doc81, #64 doc82, #65 doc83, #66 doc84, #67 doc93, #68 docket sheet)(Lugo, Yahaira)
December 10, 2020 Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Peter Otoh re #10 Order (rsh)
December 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER GRANTING leave to appeal and appeal In Forma Pauperis. These motions were embedded as attachments in #8 and #9 , docket entries noting receipt of the bankruptcy record. Otoh is directed to file his brief within thirty days. Appellees will have thirty days to file their response brief, and Otoh will then have fourteen days to respond. Otoh is instructed that his appeal is limited to the order identified as appealed [1-2] in this action dismissing the Government Defendants. Signed by Judge Timothy C. Batten, Sr. on 12/9/20. (rsh)
November 30, 2020 Filing 9 BANKRUPTCY RECORD RECEIVED (Attachments: #1 Doc 78 - IFP)(Lugo, Yahaira)
November 30, 2020 Filing 8 BANKRUPTCY RECORD RECEIVED (Attachments: #1 Doc 81 - Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to Appeal, #2 Doc 82 - Affidavit of Plaintiff's in Support of Motion for Leave to Appeal for Order, #3 Doc 84 - Refiled Notice of Appeal to District Court) (Lugo, Yahaira)
November 23, 2020 Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Peter Otoh re #4 Clerk's Judgment, Notification of Docket Correction. (rsh)
November 23, 2020 Notification of Docket Correction re #4 Clerk's Judgment. Language of Judgment Changed to reflect that case was dismissed, without affirmation of USBC Order. (rsh)
November 18, 2020 Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Peter Otoh re #7 Order ruling on IFP. (rsh)
November 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER DENYING In Forma Pauperis. Signed by Judge Timothy C. Batten, Sr. on 11/17/20. (rsh)
November 17, 2020 Submission of #5 APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis, to District Judge Timothy C. Batten Sr. (ddm)
November 16, 2020 Filing 6 Statement of Issue filed by Peter Otoh. (Attachments: #1 Brief in Support of Statement of Issue, #2 Affidavit in Support of Brief)(ddm)
November 16, 2020 Filing 5 APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Peter Otoh. (ddm)
November 16, 2020 Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Peter Otoh re #4 Clerk's Judgment, #3 Order on Decision of Bankruptcy. (rsh)
November 16, 2020 Notification of Docket Correction re #4 Clerk's Judgment. Wrong PDF attached. See [4-1] for correct document (Judgment) (rsh)
November 16, 2020 Notification of Docket Correction re #3 Order on Decision of Bankruptcy Court. See [3-1] for correct PDF (Order). (rsh)
November 16, 2020 Civil Case Terminated. (rsh)
November 16, 2020 Filing 4 WRONG PDF ATTACHED - CORRECT DOCUMENT FILED AT [4-1] CLERK'S JUDGMENT AFFIRMING Order of the Bankruptcy Court and DISMISSING appeal. (rsh)--Please refer to http://www.ca11.uscourts.gov to obtain an appeals jurisdiction checklist-- (Additional attachment(s) added on 11/16/2020: #1 Correct PDF (Judgment)) (rsh). (Additional attachment(s) added on 11/23/2020: #2 Corrected Judgment Dismissing Action) (rsh).
November 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 WRONG PDF ATTACHED - CORRECT DOCUMENT FILED AT [3-1] ORDER DISMISSING case, as Otoh's appeal is subject to dismissal, as he has neither paid the requisite appellate filing fee nor filed an application to proceed in forma pauperis on appeal, despite clear warnings to do so. For this reason, the Court dismisses Otoh's appeal #1 . The Clerk is directed to close this case. Signed by Judge Timothy C. Batten, Sr. on 11/13/20. (rsh) (Additional attachment(s) added on 11/16/2020: #1 Order (correct PDF) on Bankruptcy Appeal) (rsh). Modified on 11/16/2020 (rsh). Modified on 11/23/2020, correcting text (rsh).
November 9, 2020 Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Peter Otoh re #2 Order. (eop)
November 9, 2020 Submission of #1 Bankruptcy Notice of Appeal for Fee determination, to District Judge Timothy C. Batten Sr.. (eop)
November 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2 EIGHTH AMENDMENT TO GENERAL ORDER 20-01 RE: COURT OPERATIONS UNDER THE EXIGENT CIRCUMSTANCES CREATED BY COVID-19 AND RELATED CORONA VIRUS. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 9/28/20. (eop)
November 6, 2020 Filing 1 Bankruptcy Notice of Appeal, USBC Case#: 20-61779-BEM, ADV case#: 20-6101 filed by Peter Otoh. Notice of Appeal filed 11/4/20 from Order entered 10/22/20 by Appellant Peter Otoh. Fee Paid: No. (Attachments: #1 Doc. 41 - NOA, #2 Doc. 36 - Order, #3 Docket Sheet)(eop) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Otoh v. Barr et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: William Barr
Represented By: Andres H. Sandoval
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Claire McCusker Murray
Represented By: Andres H. Sandoval
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Nancy J. Gargula
Represented By: Andres H. Sandoval
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Clifford J. White, III
Represented By: Andres H. Sandoval
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Mary Ida Townson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Peter Otoh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?