Otoh v. Barr et al
Appellee: William Barr, Claire McCusker Murray, Nancy J. Gargula, Clifford J. White, III and Mary Ida Townson
Appellant: Peter Otoh
Debtor: Peter Ibe Otoh
Case Number: 1:2020cv04547
Filed: November 6, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: Timothy C Batten
Nature of Suit: Bankruptcy Appeal (801)
Cause of Action: 28:0158
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 31, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 31, 2020 Filing 12 BANKRUPTCY RECORD RECEIVED (Attachments: #1 From case 20-61779 doc1, #2 doc3, #3 doc4, #4 doc5, #5 doc6, #6 doc7, #7 doc8, #8 doc9, #9 doc10, #10 doc14, #11 doc16, #12 doc17, #13 doc18, #14 doc20, #15 doc21, #16 doc22, #17 doc23, #18 doc24, #19 doc28, #20 doc29, #21 doc31, #22 doc32, #23 doc33, #24 doc34, #25 doc35, #26 doc36, #27 doc37, #28 doc39, #29 doc40, #30 doc41, #31 doc42, #32 doc44, #33 doc46, #34 doc48, #35 doc49, #36 doc50, #37 doc51, #38 doc52, #39 doc53, #40 doc54, #41 doc56, #42 doc57, #43 doc58, #44 doc59, #45 doc61, #46 doc62, #47 doc63, #48 doc66, #49 doc68, #50 doc69, #51 doc71, #52 doc72, #53 doc73, #54 doc74, #55 doc75, #56 doc77, #57 doc79, #58 doc80, #59 doc81, #60 doc82, #61 doc83, #62 doc84, #63 doc85, #64 doc86, #65 doc87, #66 doc88, #67 doc89, #68 doc92, #69 doc93, #70 doc95, #71 doc97, #72 doc99) (Lugo, Yahaira)
December 31, 2020 Filing 11 BANKRUPTCY RECORD RECEIVED - PART I (Attachments: #1 From case 20-6101 doc1, #2 doc2, #3 doc3, #4 doc5, #5 doc6, #6 doc7, #7 doc8, #8 doc9, #9 doc10, #10 doc11, #11 doc12, #12 doc13, #13 doc15, #14 doc16, #15 doc17, #16 doc18, #17 doc19, #18 doc20, #19 doc21, #20 doc22, #21 doc23, #22 doc25, #23 doc26, #24 doc27, #25 doc28, #26 doc29, #27 doc30, #28 doc31, #29 doc32, #30 doc34, #31 doc35, #32 doc36, #33 doc40, #34 doc41, #35 doc42, #36 doc43, #37 doc44, #38 doc45, #39 doc46, #40 doc47, #41 doc48, #42 doc49, #43 doc50, #44 doc51, #45 doc52, #46 doc53, #47 doc54, #48 doc55, #49 doc56, #50 doc57, #51 doc66, #52 doc67, #53 doc71, #54 doc72, #55 doc73, #56 doc74, #57 doc75, #58 doc76, #59 doc77, #60 doc78, #61 doc 79, #62 doc80, #63 doc81, #64 doc82, #65 doc83, #66 doc84, #67 doc93, #68 docket sheet)(Lugo, Yahaira)
December 10, 2020 Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Peter Ibe Otoh, Peter Otoh re #9 Notice (Other). (dmb)
December 9, 2020 Filing 10 BANKRUPTCY RECORD RECEIVED (Attachments: #1 doc 15, #2 doc48, #3 docket sheet)(Lugo, Yahaira)
December 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 NINTH AMENDMENT TO GENERAL ORDER 20-01 RE: COURT OPERATIONS UNDER THE EXIGENT CIRCUMSTANCES CREATED BY COVID-19 AND RELATED CORONAVIRUS. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 12/08/2020. (adg) (ADI)
December 8, 2020 Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Peter Ibe Otoh re #8 Order (rsh)
December 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting Otohs application #3 for leave to proceed in forma pauperis on appeal and his motion #6 for leave to appeal. Otoh is directed to file his brief within thirty days. Appellee will have thirty days to file her response brief, and Otoh will then have fourteen days to respond. Otoh is instructed that his appeal is limited to the order identified as appealed [1-2] in this action dismissing Mary Townsend. Signed by Judge Timothy C. Batten, Sr. on 12/8/20. (rsh)
December 8, 2020 Submission of #6 MOTION for Leave to Appeal Order (Doc. 35), #5 Order to Show Cause to District Judge Timothy C. Batten Sr. (dmb)
November 24, 2020 Filing 7 AFFIDAVIT in Support of #6 MOTION for Leave to Appeal Order (Doc. 35) by Peter Otoh. (jpk)
November 24, 2020 Filing 6 MOTION for Leave to Appeal Order (Doc. 35) by Peter Otoh. (jpk) (Additional attachment(s) added on 11/25/2020: #1 Corrected Main Document, #2 Exhibits) (jpk).
November 19, 2020 Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Peter Ibe Otoh, Peter Otoh re #5 Order to Show Cause. (dmb)
November 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE within 14 days as to why this appeal should not be dismissed for lack of jurisdiction. Signed by Judge Timothy C. Batten, Sr. on 11/18/2020. (dmb)
November 17, 2020 Submission of #3 APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis, to District Judge Timothy C. Batten Sr. (ddm)
November 16, 2020 Filing 4 Statement of Issue filed by Peter Otoh. (Attachments: #1 Brief in Support of Statement of Issue, #2 Affidavit in Support of Brief)(ddm)
November 16, 2020 Filing 3 APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Peter Otoh. (ddm)
November 10, 2020 Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Peter Ibe Otoh re #2 Order. (dmb)
November 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2 EIGHTH AMENDMENT TO GENERAL ORDER 20-01 RE: COURT OPERATIONS UNDER THE EXIGENT CIRCUMSTANCES CREATED BY COVID-19 AND RELATED CORONA VIRUS. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 9/28/2020. (dmb)
November 9, 2020 Submission of #1 Bankruptcy Notice of Appeal for IFP determination to District Judge Timothy C. Batten Sr. (dmb)
November 6, 2020 Filing 1 Bankruptcy Notice of Appeal, USBC Case#: 20-61779-BEM, ADV case#: 20-6101. Notice of Appeal filed 11/4/2020 from Order entered 10/22/2020 by Appellant Peter Otoh. Fee Paid: No. filed by Peter Otoh. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Appeal doc 47, #2 Appealed Order doc 35, #3 Docket Sheet)(dmb) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Otoh v. Barr et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: William Barr
Represented By: Andres H. Sandoval
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Claire McCusker Murray
Represented By: Andres H. Sandoval
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Nancy J. Gargula
Represented By: Andres H. Sandoval
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Clifford J. White, III
Represented By: Andres H. Sandoval
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Mary Ida Townson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Peter Otoh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Debtor: Peter Ibe Otoh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?