Otoh v. Barr et al
Appellee: William Barr, Claire McCusker Murray, Nancy J. Gargula, Clifford J. White, III and Mary Ida Townson
Appellant: Peter Otoh
Debtor: Peter Ibe Otoh
Case Number: 1:2020cv04550
Filed: November 6, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: Timothy C Batten
Nature of Suit: Bankruptcy Appeal (801)
Cause of Action: 28:0158
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 10, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 10, 2020 Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Peter Otoh re #14 Order (rsh)
December 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER denying motion for leave to appeal, embedded in #11 docket notation that Bankruptcy Record Received. Otoh's renewed appeal is dismissed. Signed by Judge Timothy C. Batten, Sr. on 12/9/20. (rsh)
November 30, 2020 Filing 13 BANKRUPTCY RECORD RECEIVED (Attachments: #1 Doc 73 - IFP)(Lugo, Yahaira)
November 30, 2020 Filing 12 BANKRUPTCY RECORD RECEIVED - Correct Submission sheet of Doc #11 - Correcting related appeal case numbers. (Lugo, Yahaira)
November 30, 2020 Filing 11 BANKRUPTCY RECORD RECEIVED (Attachments: #1 Doc 76 - Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to Appeal, #2 Doc 77 - Affidavit of Plaintiff's in Support of Motion for Leave to Appeal, #3 Doc 83 - Refiled Notice of Appeal to District Court.) (Lugo, Yahaira)
November 19, 2020 Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Peter Otoh, Peter Ibe Otoh re #10 Order on Motion for Leave to Appeal. (dmb)
November 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER denying as moot #9 Motion for Leave to Appeal. Signed by Judge Timothy C. Batten, Sr. on 11/18/2020. (dmb)
November 18, 2020 Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Peter Otoh re #8 Order ruling on IFP. (rsh)
November 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER DENYING In Forma Pauperis. Signed by Judge Timothy C. Batten, Sr. on 11/17/20. (rsh)
November 17, 2020 Submission of #6 APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis, to District Judge Timothy C. Batten Sr. (ddm)
November 16, 2020 Filing 9 MOTION for Leave to Appeal re: #4 Order filed by Peter Otoh. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit in Support)(ddm)
November 16, 2020 Filing 7 Statement of Issue filed by Peter Otoh. (Attachments: #1 Brief in Support of Statement of Issue, #2 Affidavit in Support of Brief)(ddm)
November 16, 2020 Filing 6 APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Peter Otoh. (ddm)
November 16, 2020 Civil Case Terminated. (rsh)
November 16, 2020 Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Peter Otoh re #5 Clerk's Judgment, #4 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief,. (rsh)
November 16, 2020 Filing 5 CLERK'S JUDGMENT AFFIRMING Order of the Bankruptcy Court and DISMISSING appeal. (rsh)--Please refer to http://www.ca11.uscourts.gov to obtain an appeals jurisdiction checklist--
November 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER denying as moot Otoh's #2 Motion for leave to file appeal. Court dismisses Otohs appeal #1 , as he has neither paid the requisite appellate filing fee nor filed an application to proceed in forma pauperis on appeal, despite clear warnings to do so.. Signed by Judge Timothy C. Batten, Sr. on 11/13/20. (rsh)
November 10, 2020 Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Peter Ibe Otoh re #3 Order. (dmb)
November 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 EIGHTH AMENDMENT TO GENERAL ORDER 20-01 RE: COURT OPERATIONS UNDER THE EXIGENT CIRCUMSTANCES CREATED BY COVID-19 AND RELATED CORONA VIRUS. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 9/28/2020. (dmb)
November 9, 2020 Submission of #1 Bankruptcy Notice of Appeal for IFP determination to District Judge Timothy C. Batten Sr. (dmb)
November 6, 2020 Filing 2 MOTION For Leave to Appeal Order (doc 34) by Peter Otoh. Filed in USBC on 11/4/2020. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit in Support)(dmb)
November 6, 2020 Filing 1 Bankruptcy Notice of Appeal, USBC Case#: 20-61779-BEM, ADV case#: 20-6101. Notice of Appeal filed 11/4/2020 from Order entered 10/21/2020 by Appellant Peter Otoh. Fee Paid: No. filed by Peter Otoh. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Appeal doc 43, #2 Appealed Order doc 34, #3 Docket Sheet, #4 Motion for Leave to Appeal, #5 Affidavit in support of Motion for Leave to Appeal)(dmb) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Otoh v. Barr et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: William Barr
Represented By: Andres H. Sandoval
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Claire McCusker Murray
Represented By: Andres H. Sandoval
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Nancy J. Gargula
Represented By: Andres H. Sandoval
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Clifford J. White, III
Represented By: Andres H. Sandoval
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Mary Ida Townson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Peter Otoh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Debtor: Peter Ibe Otoh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?