MarketSource, Inc. v. American Global Logistics LLC
Plaintiff: MarketSource, Inc.
Defendant: American Global Logistics LLC
Case Number: 1:2020cv04585
Filed: November 9, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: William M Ray
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 21, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting Petitioner Michael Barnett's #9 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Judge William M. Ray, II on 12/21/2020. If the applicant does not have CM/ECF access in the Northern District of Georgia already, they must request access at http://pacer.gov. If they have electronically filed in this district in a previous case, please omit this step.(ah)
December 11, 2020 APPROVAL by Clerks Office re: #9 APPLICATION for Admission of Michael Barnett Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-10470175). Attorney Michael Barnett added appearing on behalf of MarketSource, Inc. (cdg)
December 9, 2020 Filing 9 APPLICATION for Admission of Michael Barnett Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-10470175). with Brief In Support by MarketSource, Inc.. (Gieser, Caroline) Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse.
December 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 NINTH AMENDMENT TO GENERAL ORDER 20-01 RE: COURT OPERATIONS UNDER THE EXIGENT CIRCUMSTANCES CREATED BY COVID-19 AND RELATED CORONAVIRUS. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 12/08/2020. (adg) (ADI)
December 1, 2020 Filing 7 Letter from Clerk re: LR 83.1 Pro Hac Vice requirements sent to Michael Barnett. Clerk to follow-up by 12/11/2020. (nmb)
November 30, 2020 Filing 6 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons, Complaint, Civil Coversheet, and Corporate Disclosure Statement Served on 11/18/2020, as to Linda Banks on Behalf of American Global Logistics LLC. (Gieser, Caroline)
November 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Standing Order Regarding Civil Litigation. Signed by Judge William M. Ray, II on 11/10/2020. (ah)
November 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 EIGHTH AMENDMENT TO GENERAL ORDER 20-01 RE: COURT OPERATIONS UNDER THE EXIGENT CIRCUMSTANCES CREATED BY COVID-19 AND RELATED CORONA VIRUS. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 9/28/20. (eop)
November 10, 2020 Filing 3 Electronic Summons Issued as to American Global Logistics LLC. (eop)
November 9, 2020 Filing 2 Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement by MarketSource, Inc. identifying Other Affiliates: Allegis Group, Inc., MarketSource Holdings LLC, and Allegis Group Holdings, Inc. for MarketSource, Inc.. (eop)
November 9, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand filed by MarketSource, Inc.. (Filing fee $400.00, receipt number BGANDC-10356395) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit -1 -Master Services, #2 Exhibit -2 -Statement of Work, #3 Exhibit -3 -Invoices, #4 Civil Cover Sheet)(eop) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: MarketSource, Inc. v. American Global Logistics LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: American Global Logistics LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MarketSource, Inc.
Represented By: Caroline Gieser
Represented By: Joshua Luke Becker
Represented By: Michael Barnett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?