Franklin v. Carrington Mortgage Services, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Ricky R. Franklin
Defendant: Carrington Mortgage Services, LLC, Wilmington Savings Fund Society, FSB and John Doe Corporation 1 through 5
Case Number: 1:2020cv04661
Filed: November 16, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: Steven D Grimberg
Referring Judge: Walter E Johnson
Nature of Suit: Torts to Land
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 13, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 13, 2021 Filing 15 REPLY to Response to Motion re #6 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Carrington Mortgage Services, LLC, Wilmington Savings Fund Society, FSB. (Schnell, Grant)
January 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER denying #7 Plaintiff's Motion to Remand to State Court. Signed by Magistrate Judge Walter E. Johnson on 1/13/21. (klb)
January 13, 2021 Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Ricky R. Franklin re #14 Order. (klb)
January 12, 2021 Filing 13 RESPONSE in Opposition re #7 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by Carrington Mortgage Services, LLC, Wilmington Savings Fund Society, FSB. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit Exhibit F)(Schnell, Grant)
January 11, 2021 Submission of #7 MOTION to Remand to State Court to Magistrate Judge Walter E. Johnson. (jed)
January 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER granting #11 Defendants' Motion for Extension of Time to file reply regarding #6 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM . Defendants Carrington Mortgage Services, LLC and Wilmington Savings Fund Society, FSB as Trustee of Stanwich Mortgage Loan Trust H SHALL file their Reply to Plaintiff's Opposition to Motion to Dismiss on or before January 20, 2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Walter E. Johnson on 1/7/21. (klb)
January 7, 2021 Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Ricky R. Franklin re #12 Order. (klb)
January 6, 2021 Submission of #7 MOTION to Remand to State Court to District Judge Steven D. Grimberg. (jed)
January 5, 2021 Filing 11 MOTION for Extension of Time re: #10 Response in Opposition to Motion by Carrington Mortgage Services, LLC, Wilmington Savings Fund Society, FSB. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Schnell, Grant)
January 5, 2021 Submission of #6 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM to Magistrate Judge Walter E. Johnson. (jed)
December 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting #8 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Carrington Mortgage Services, LLC Answer due 1/18/2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Walter E. Johnson on 12/23/20. (klb)
December 23, 2020 Filing 8 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Notice of Removal,, Complaint with Brief In Support by Carrington Mortgage Services, LLC, Wilmington Savings Fund Society, FSB. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Schnell, Grant)
December 23, 2020 Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Ricky R. Franklin re #9 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. (klb)
December 22, 2020 Filing 10 RESPONSE in Opposition re #6 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Ricky R. Franklin. (jed)
December 18, 2020 Filing 7 MOTION to Remand to State Court by Ricky R. Franklin. (Attachments: #1 Brief in Support of Motion to Remand) (jed)
December 14, 2020 Filing 6 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM with Brief In Support by Carrington Mortgage Services, LLC, Wilmington Savings Fund Society, FSB. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5)(Schnell, Grant)
December 11, 2020 Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Ricky R. Franklin re #5 Notice (Other). (jed)
December 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 NINTH AMENDMENT TO GENERAL ORDER 20-01 RE: COURT OPERATIONS UNDER THE EXIGENT CIRCUMSTANCES CREATED BY COVID-19 AND RELATED CORONAVIRUS. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 12/08/2020. (adg) (ADI)
November 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER granting #3 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Carrington Mortgage Services, LLC Answer and Wilmington Savings Fund Society, FSB Answer due 12/14/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Walter E. Johnson on 11/23/20. (klb)
November 23, 2020 Filing 3 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Notice of Removal,, Complaint by Carrington Mortgage Services, LLC, Wilmington Savings Fund Society, FSB. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Schnell, Grant)
November 23, 2020 Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Ricky R. Franklin re #4 Order. (klb)
November 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2 EIGHTH AMENDMENT TO GENERAL ORDER 20-01 RE: COURT OPERATIONS UNDER THE EXIGENT CIRCUMSTANCES CREATED BY COVID-19 AND RELATED CORONA VIRUS. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 9/28/20. (eop)
November 17, 2020 Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Ricky R. Franklin re #2 Order. (eop) Modified text on 11/17/2020 (eop).
November 16, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL with COMPLAINT filed by Wilmington Savings Fund Society, FSB and, Carrington Mortgage Services, LLC. (Filing fee $ 400.00 receipt number AGANDC-10379097) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit -1 -Complaint, #2 Exhibit -2 -Affidavit of Service -Carrington, #3 Exhibit -3 -Affidavit of Service -Wilmington, #4 Civil Cover Sheet)(eop) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form.
November 16, 2020 CASE REFERRED to Magistrate Judge Walter E. Johnson. (eop)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Franklin v. Carrington Mortgage Services, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carrington Mortgage Services, LLC
Represented By: Grant Edward Schnell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wilmington Savings Fund Society, FSB
Represented By: Grant Edward Schnell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe Corporation 1 through 5
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ricky R. Franklin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?