Boadi v. JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.
Plaintiff: Joana Boadi
Defendant: JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.
Case Number: 1:2020cv04771
Filed: November 23, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: John K Larkins
Referring Judge: William M Ray
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15:1681
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 20, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 20, 2021 Submission of #10 MOTION to Compel and MOTION for Order, to Magistrate Judge John K. Larkins. (ah)
January 13, 2021 Filing 16 NOTICE by JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A. / Defendant JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A's Notice of Rule 26(f) Early Planning Conference (Valladares, Richard)
January 12, 2021 Filing 15 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM with Brief In Support by JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.. (Attachments: #1 Brief, #2 Exhibit 1)(Valladares, Richard)
January 5, 2021 Filing 14 NOTICE Of Filing of Exhibit in support of its Opposition to Plaintiff Joana Boadi's Notice of Pending Missed Statutory Deadlines by JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A. re #12 Response (Non-Motion) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Valladares, Richard)
January 5, 2021 Filing 13 NOTICE Of Filing of Exhibit in support of its Opposition to Plaintiff Joana Boadi's Motion to Compel Defendants to Participate in Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(f) Conference and Joint Status Report, and Motion to Order a Date for F26 Conference and Joint Status Report by JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A. re #11 Response in Opposition to Motion (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Valladares, Richard)
January 5, 2021 Filing 12 RESPONSE re #9 Notice (Other) / Defendant's Response in Opposition to Plaintiff Joana Boadis Notice of Pending Missed Statutory Deadlines filed by JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.. (Valladares, Richard)
January 5, 2021 Filing 11 RESPONSE in Opposition re #10 MOTION to CompelMOTION for Order filed by JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.. (Valladares, Richard)
December 22, 2020 Filing 10 MOTION to Compel Defendants to Participate In Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(F) Conference and Joint Status Report, and MOTION to Order a Date for F26 Conference and Joint Status Report by Joana Boadi. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(jed)
December 22, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE of Pending Missed Statutory Deadlines by Joana Boadi. (jed)
December 17, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Andrew Zachery Ryan Smith on behalf of JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A. (Smith, Andrew)
December 17, 2020 Opinion or Order ORDER by docket entry only granting #6 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A. shall have through and including January 12, 2021 to answer or otherwise respond to the complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge John K. Larkins, III on 12/17/20. (JKL)
December 10, 2020 Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Joana Boadi re #7 Notice (Other). (ah)
December 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 NINTH AMENDMENT TO GENERAL ORDER 20-01 RE: COURT OPERATIONS UNDER THE EXIGENT CIRCUMSTANCES CREATED BY COVID-19 AND RELATED CORONAVIRUS. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 12/08/2020. (adg) (ADI)
December 7, 2020 Filing 6 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, by JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Valladares, Richard)
December 7, 2020 Filing 5 Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement by JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A. identifying Corporate Parent JPMorgan Chase & Co. for JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.. (Valladares, Richard)
December 4, 2020 Filing 4 Return of Service Executed by Joana Boadi. JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A. served on 12/1/2020, answer due 12/22/2020. (rjs)
November 24, 2020 Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Joana Boadi re #3 Order. (eop)
November 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 EIGHTH AMENDMENT TO GENERAL ORDER 20-01 RE: COURT OPERATIONS UNDER THE EXIGENT CIRCUMSTANCES CREATED BY COVID-19 AND RELATED CORONA VIRUS. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 9/28/20. (eop)
November 23, 2020 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.. (eop)
November 23, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Joana Boadi. (Filing fee $400.00, receipt number GAN100125731) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet -1, #2 Civil Cover Sheet -2)(eop) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form. Modified text on 11/24/2020 (eop).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Boadi v. JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.
Represented By: Richard J. Valladares
Represented By: Andrew Zachery Ryan Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joana Boadi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?