Pearson et al v. Kemp et al
Plaintiff: Brian Jay Van Gundy, Coreco Jaqan Pearson, Cathleen Alston Latham, Carolyn Hall Fisher, James Kenneth Carroll, Vikki Townsend Consiglio and Gloria Kay Godwin
Defendant: Anh Le, Matthew Mashburn, Brad Raffensperger, Rebecca N. Sullivan, David J. Worley and Brian Kemp
Intervenor Defendant: DCCC, DSCC and Democratic Party of Georgia, Inc.
Intervenor: Alice O'Lenick, Stephen Day, Ben Satterfield, Wandy Taylor and John Mangano
Case Number: 1:2020cv04809
Filed: November 25, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: Timothy C Batten
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Voting
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 20, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 20, 2021 Filing 83 USCA Clerk's Entry of Dismissal of Voluntary Dismissal: Pursuant to Appellants James Kenneth Carroll, Vikki Townsend Consiglio, Carolyn Hall Fisher, Gloria Kay Godwin, Brian Jay Van Gundy, Cathleen Alston Latham and Coreco Ja'Qan Pearson's motion for voluntary dismissal, FRAP Rule 42 and 11th Cir. R. 42-1(a), #76 Notice of Appeal, was duly entered dismissed on this date. Case Appealed to USCA- 11th Circuit. Case Number 20-14579-CC. (pjm)
January 6, 2021 Filing 82 TRANSCRIPT ORDER FORM (All necessary transcript(s) on file) re: #76 Notice of Appeal. (MacDougald, Harry) Modified on 1/6/2021 to update text (pjm).
January 6, 2021 Set Deadline re: #76 Notice of Appeal: Fed.R.App.P. 11 Certification due on 1/20/2021. (pjm)
January 6, 2021 Pursuant to F.R.A.P.11(c), the Clerk certifies that the record is complete for purposes of this appeal, #76 Notice of Appeal. Case Appealed to USCA- 11th Circuit. Case Number 20-14579-CC. The record on appeal is available electronically with the exception of: (One (1) flash drive w/DE#65 ). (pjm)
January 4, 2021 Filing 81 Certified copy of MANDATE of USCA DISMISSING #46 Notice of Cross Appeal, filed by Rebecca N. Sullivan, David J. Worley, Brian Kemp, Anh Le, Matthew Mashburn, Brad Raffensperger and #32 Notice of Appeal, filed by Cathleen Alston Latham, James Kenneth Carroll, Carolyn Hall Fisher, Coreco Jaqan Pearson, Brian Jay Van Gundy, Gloria Kay Godwin and Vikki Townsend Consiglio Case Appealed to USCA- 11th Circuit. Case Number 20-14480. (pjm)
December 8, 2020 Filing 80 USCA Acknowledgment of #76 Notice of Appeal, filed by Cathleen Alston Latham, James Kenneth Carroll, Carolyn Hall Fisher, Coreco Jaqan Pearson, Brian Jay Van Gundy, Gloria Kay Godwin and Vikki Townsend Consiglio. Case Appealed to USCA- 11th Circuit. Case Number 20-14579-C. (pjm)
December 8, 2020 Filing 79 TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on 12/7/2020, before Judge Timothy C. Batten, Sr.. Court Reporter/Transcriber Lori Burgess. A full directory of court reporters and their contact information can be found at www.gand.uscourts.gov/directory-court-reporters. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 12/29/2020. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 1/8/2021. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 3/8/2021. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Filing Transcript) (llb)
December 8, 2020 Filing 78 Transmission of Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal, USCA Appeal Fees, Judgment, Minute Entry/Order and Docket Sheet to US Court of Appeals re: #76 Notice of Appeal. (pjm)
December 8, 2020 Filing 77 NOTICE Of Filing NOA Transmittal Letter re: #76 Notice of Appeal. (pjm)
December 7, 2020 Filing 76 NOTICE OF APPEAL as to #75 Clerk's Judgment, #74 Order on Motion to Dismiss,,,, Motion Hearing, by James Kenneth Carroll, Vikki Townsend Consiglio, Carolyn Hall Fisher, Gloria Kay Godwin, Cathleen Alston Latham, Coreco Jaqan Pearson, Brian Jay Van Gundy. Filing fee $ 505, receipt number AGANDC-10458354. Transcript Order Form due on 12/21/2020 (MacDougald, Harry)
December 7, 2020 Filing 75 CLERK'S JUDGMENT (dmb)--Please refer to http://www.ca11.uscourts.gov to obtain an appeals jurisdiction checklist--
December 7, 2020 Filing 74 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Timothy C. Batten, Sr.: Motion Hearing held on 12/7/2020 granting #43 Motion to Dismiss and #63 Motion to Dismiss. TRO is DISSOLVED. Case is DISMISSED. Clerk shall close the case. (Court Reporter Lori Burgess)(dmb)
December 7, 2020 APPROVAL by Clerks Office re: #71 APPLICATION for Admission of Sidney Powell Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-10452641).. Attorney Sidney Powell added appearing on behalf of James Kenneth Carroll, Vikki Townsend Consiglio, Carolyn Hall Fisher, Gloria Kay Godwin, Cathleen Alston Latham, Coreco Jaqan Pearson, Brian Jay Van Gundy (nmb)
December 7, 2020 MINUTE ORDER granting Sidney Powell's #71 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice. Entered by CRD at the direction of Judge Timothy C. Batten, Sr. If the applicant does not have CM/ECF access in the Northern District of Georgia already, they must request access at http://pacer.gov. If they have electronically filed in this district in a previous case, please omit this step.(usw)
December 7, 2020 Civil Case Terminated. (dmb)
December 6, 2020 Filing 72 NOTICE Of Filing by Brian Kemp, Anh Le, Matthew Mashburn, Brad Raffensperger, Rebecca N. Sullivan, David J. Worley (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Frances Watson, #2 Affidavit of Juan Gilbert)(McGowan, Charlene)
December 6, 2020 Filing 71 APPLICATION for Admission of Sidney Powell Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-10452641).by James Kenneth Carroll, Vikki Townsend Consiglio, Carolyn Hall Fisher, Gloria Kay Godwin, Cathleen Alston Latham, Coreco Jaqan Pearson, Brian Jay Van Gundy. (MacDougald, Harry) Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse.
December 6, 2020 Filing 70 NOTICE Of Filing by James Kenneth Carroll, Vikki Townsend Consiglio, Carolyn Hall Fisher, Gloria Kay Godwin, Cathleen Alston Latham, Coreco Jaqan Pearson, Brian Jay Van Gundy (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Supplemental Report of Russell Ramsland)(MacDougald, Harry)
December 6, 2020 Filing 69 NOTICE Of Filing by James Kenneth Carroll, Vikki Townsend Consiglio, Carolyn Hall Fisher, Gloria Kay Godwin, Cathleen Alston Latham, Coreco Jaqan Pearson, Brian Jay Van Gundy (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Affidavit of Garland Favorito, #2 Affidavit ffidavit of Scott Hall, #3 Affidavit Affidavit of Affiant A)(MacDougald, Harry)
December 6, 2020 Filing 68 RESPONSE in Opposition re #63 MOTION to Dismiss , #43 MOTION to Dismiss, #6 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order IMMEDIATE HEARING REQUESTED MOTION for Preliminary Injunction Plaintiffs Consolidated Response to the Motions to Dismiss and Reply in Support of Emergency Motion for Injunctive Relief filed by James Kenneth Carroll, Vikki Townsend Consiglio, Carolyn Hall Fisher, Gloria Kay Godwin, Cathleen Alston Latham, Coreco Jaqan Pearson, Brian Jay Van Gundy. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Wisconsin Order from Election Case)(MacDougald, Harry)
December 6, 2020 Filing 67 NOTICE Of Filing by James Kenneth Carroll, Vikki Townsend Consiglio, Carolyn Hall Fisher, Gloria Kay Godwin, Cathleen Alston Latham, Coreco Jaqan Pearson, Brian Jay Van Gundy (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Supplemental Declaration of Quinnell and Young, #2 Affidavit Declaration of S. Maturza, #3 Affidavit Declaration of Wilburn J. Winter)(MacDougald, Harry)
December 6, 2020 Filing 66 NOTICE Of Filing by James Kenneth Carroll, Vikki Townsend Consiglio, Carolyn Hall Fisher, Gloria Kay Godwin, Cathleen Alston Latham, Coreco Jaqan Pearson, Brian Jay Van Gundy (Attachments: #1 Appendix Appendix Vol. 4 from Appeal)(MacDougald, Harry)
December 6, 2020 Filing 65 NOTICE Of Filing by James Kenneth Carroll, Vikki Townsend Consiglio, Carolyn Hall Fisher, Gloria Kay Godwin, Cathleen Alston Latham, Coreco Jaqan Pearson, Brian Jay Van Gundy of Electronic Media (MacDougald, Harry) Modified on 12/7/2020, One (1) flash drive received by clerk and placed in civil action file(tcc).
December 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 64 ORDER ALLOWING ATTORNEY CELLPHONES and LAPTOPS IN THE COURTROOM on 12/07/2020 at 10:00 a.m. Signed by Judge Timothy C. Batten, Sr. on 12/06/2020. (usw) (Main Document 64 replaced on 12/7/2020) (rvb).
December 5, 2020 Filing 63 MOTION to Dismiss with Brief In Support by Brian Kemp, Anh Le, Matthew Mashburn, Brad Raffensperger, Rebecca N. Sullivan, David J. Worley. (Attachments: #1 Brief)(McGowan, Charlene)
December 5, 2020 Filing 62 AFFIDAVIT re #60 MOTION to Exclude TESTIMONY OF SHIVA AYYADURAI, RUSSELL JAMES RAMSLAND, JR., MATTHEW BRAYNARD, WILLIAM M. BRIGGS, RONALD WATKINS, BENJAMIN A. OVERHOLT, ERIC QUINNELL, S. STANLEY YOUNG, AND SPYDER, #58 Response in Opposition to Motion, Attorney Declaration of Amanda R. Callais by DCCC, DSCC, Democratic Party of Georgia, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Ex. 1 - Ansolabehere Report (Braynard), #2 Ex. 2 - Ansolabehere Report (Briggs), #3 Ex. 3 - Rodden Report, #4 Ex. 4 - Mayer Report, #5 Ex. 5 - Rodden and Marble Report)(Sparks, Adam)
December 5, 2020 Filing 61 RESPONSE in Opposition re #6 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order IMMEDIATE HEARING REQUESTED MOTION for Preliminary Injunction and Consolidated Brief in Support of Motion to Dismiss filed by Brian Kemp, Anh Le, Matthew Mashburn, Brad Raffensperger, Rebecca N. Sullivan, David J. Worley. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Affidavit, #5 Exhibit)(McGowan, Charlene)
December 5, 2020 Filing 60 MOTION to Exclude TESTIMONY OF SHIVA AYYADURAI, RUSSELL JAMES RAMSLAND, JR., MATTHEW BRAYNARD, WILLIAM M. BRIGGS, RONALD WATKINS, BENJAMIN A. OVERHOLT, ERIC QUINNELL, S. STANLEY YOUNG, AND SPYDER with Brief In Support by DCCC, DSCC, Democratic Party of Georgia, Inc.. (Sparks, Adam)
December 5, 2020 Filing 59 NOTICE Of Filing by DCCC, DSCC, Democratic Party of Georgia, Inc. re #58 Response in Opposition to Motion, Affidavits in Support of Intervenor-Defendants' Resp. in Opp. to Pls.' Emergency Mot. (Attachments: #1 Ex. 1. - Aff. of S. Valies, #2 Ex. 2 - Aff. of A. Thomas, #3 Ex. 3 - Aff. of K. Brandon, #4 Ex. 4 - Aff. of D. Sumner, #5 Ex. 5 - Aff. of R. Laurie, #6 Ex. 6 - Aff. of O. Alston, #7 Ex. 7 - Aff. of R. Cason, #8 Ex. 8 - Aff. of S. Young, #9 Ex. 9 - Aff. of B. Graham, #10 Ex. 10 - Aff. of R. Short, #11 Ex. 11 - Aff. of S. Ghazal, #12 Ex. 12 - Aff. of S. Zydney, #13 Ex. 13 - Aff. of K. Patel)(Sparks, Adam)
December 5, 2020 Filing 58 RESPONSE in Opposition re #6 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order IMMEDIATE HEARING REQUESTED MOTION for Preliminary Injunction Intervenor-Defendants' Response in Opposition to Plaintiffs' Emergency Motion filed by DCCC, DSCC, Democratic Party of Georgia, Inc.. (Sparks, Adam)
December 4, 2020 Filing 73 USCA Opinion received DISMISSING re: #46 Notice of Cross Appeal, filed by Rebecca N. Sullivan, David J. Worley, Brian Kemp, Anh Le, Matthew Mashburn, and Brad Raffensperger and #32 Notice of Appeal, filed by Cathleen Alston Latham, James Kenneth Carroll, Carolyn Hall Fisher, Coreco Jaqan Pearson, Brian Jay Van Gundy, Gloria Kay Godwin and Vikki Townsend Consiglio. In accordance with FRAP 41(b), the USCA mandate will issue at a later date. Case Appealed to USCA- 11th Circuit. Case Number 20-14480-RR. (pjm)
December 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 57 ORDER granting #5 Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to File Matters Under Seal. Affidavits are to be filed under seal until further order of the Court, and Plaintiffs are permitted to file these affidavits with the identifying information redacted in the public docket. Signed by Judge Timothy C. Batten, Sr. on 12/4/20. (rsh)
December 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 56 AMENDED SCHEDULING ORDER: Plaintiffs' complaint shall come before the Court for hearing on Monday, December 7, at 10:00 a.m., EST, in the ceremonial courtroom on the 23rd floor. Defendants' brief in opposition to the claims in Plaintiffs' complaint will be due on Saturday, December 5, by 9:00 p.m. EST. Any reply brief will be due on Sunday, December 6, by 6:00 p.m. EST. Plaintiffs are also directed to file their response brief to the pending motion #43 to dismiss by Sunday, December 6, at 6:00 p.m. EST. In light of the upcoming hearing, Defendants' emergency motion #52 to dissolve or alter the November 29 temporary restraining order is denied. This renders moot the Gwinnett County Board of Registrations and Electors members' pending emergency motion #55 to intervene. Therefore, that motion is denied. Signed by Judge Timothy C. Batten, Sr. on 12/4/20. (rsh)
December 4, 2020 Filing 55 Emergency MOTION to Intervene with Brief In Support by John Mangano, Alice O'Lenick, Ben Satterfield, Wandy Taylor, Stephen Day. (Tyson, Bryan)
December 4, 2020 Filing 54 USCA Order: Appellees Emergency Motion to Expedite Cross-Appeal and Consolidate Briefing is GRANTED re: #46 Notice of Cross Appeal, filed by Rebecca N. Sullivan, David J. Worley, Brian Kemp, Anh Le, Matthew Mashburn and Brad Raffensperger and #32 Notice of Appeal, filed by Cathleen Alston Latham, James Kenneth Carroll, Carolyn Hall Fisher, Coreco Jaqan Pearson, Brian Jay Van Gundy, Gloria Kay Godwin and Vikki Townsend Consiglio. Case Appealed to USCA- 11th Circuit. Case Number 20-14480-RR. (pjm)
December 3, 2020 Filing 53 USCA Acknowledgment of #46 Notice of Cross Appeal, filed by Rebecca N. Sullivan, David J. Worley, Brian Kemp, Anh Le, Matthew Mashburn and Brad Raffensperger. Case Appealed to USCA- 11th Circuit. Case Number 20-14480-RR. (pjm)
December 3, 2020 Filing 52 Emergency MOTION Defendants' Emergency Motion for Relief from TRO #14 Order with Brief In Support by Brian Kemp, Anh Le, Matthew Mashburn, Brad Raffensperger, Rebecca N. Sullivan, David J. Worley. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Barnes Declaration, #2 Exhibit Royston Declaration, #3 Exhibit Eveler Declaration)(Miller, Carey)
December 3, 2020 Filing 51 NOTICE of Appearance by Melanie Leigh Johnson on behalf of Brian Kemp, Anh Le, Matthew Mashburn, Brad Raffensperger, Rebecca N. Sullivan, David J. Worley (Johnson, Melanie)
December 3, 2020 Filing 50 NOTICE of Appearance by Joshua Barrett Belinfante on behalf of Brian Kemp, Matthew Mashburn, Brad Raffensperger, Rebecca N. Sullivan, David J. Worley (Belinfante, Joshua)
December 3, 2020 Filing 49 NOTICE of Appearance by Carey Allen Miller on behalf of Brian Kemp, Anh Le, Matthew Mashburn, Brad Raffensperger, Rebecca N. Sullivan, David J. Worley (Miller, Carey)
December 3, 2020 Filing 48 Transmission of Certified Copy of Notice of Cross Appeal, USCA Appeal Fees, Order and Docket Sheet to US Court of Appeals re: #46 Notice of Cross Appeal. (pjm)
December 3, 2020 Filing 47 NOTICE Of Filing NOA Transmittal Letter re: #46 Notice of Cross Appeal. (pjm)
December 3, 2020 Filing 46 NOTICE OF CROSS APPEAL as to #14 Order by Brian Kemp, Anh Le, Matthew Mashburn, Brad Raffensperger, Rebecca N. Sullivan, David J. Worley. Filing fee $ 505, receipt number AGANDC-10445305. Transcript Order Form due on 12/14/2020 (McGowan, Charlene)
December 3, 2020 Filing 45 NOTICE Of Filing Evidence by James Kenneth Carroll, Vikki Townsend Consiglio, Carolyn Hall Fisher, Gloria Kay Godwin, Cathleen Alston Latham, Coreco Jaqan Pearson (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Expert Report of Matthew Braynard, #2 Affidavit Declaration of Eric Quinnell, Ph.D. and S. Stanley Young, Ph.D., #3 Affidavit Affidavit of Benjamin O. Overholt, Ph.D.)(MacDougald, Harry)
December 3, 2020 Filing 44 ANSWER to COMPLAINT by DCCC, DSCC, Democratic Party of Georgia, Inc. Discovery ends on 5/3/2021.(rsh) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov to obtain Pretrial Instructions.
December 3, 2020 Filing 43 MOTION to Dismiss by DCCC, DSCC, Democratic Party of Georgia, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Brief in Support)(rsh)
December 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 42 ORDER granting #20 Motion to Intervene; #41 Emergency Motion to Intervene by The Democratic Party of Georgia, the DSCC and the DCCC. The Clerk is directed to add these entities as parties and to docket their proposed motion to dismiss [20-1], brief in support of motion to dismiss [20-2], and answer [20-3]. Signed by Judge Timothy C. Batten, Sr. on 12/3/20. (rsh)
December 3, 2020 MINUTE ORDER granting Amanda J. Beane {26], Amanda R. Callais #27 , Kevin J. Hamilton #28 , Mark E. Elias #29 , and Matthew Mertens's #30 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice. Entered by CRD at the direction of Judge Timothy C. Batten, Sr. If the applicant does not have CM/ECF access in the Northern District of Georgia already, they must request access at http://pacer.gov. If they have electronically filed in this district in a previous case, please omit this step.(usw)
December 2, 2020 Filing 41 Emergency MOTION to Intervene by DCCC, DSCC, Democratic Party of Georgia, Inc.. (Callais, Amanda)
December 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 40 ORDER POSTPONING this Court's December 4th hearing, until further order of the Court. Signed by Judge Timothy C. Batten, Sr. on 12/02/2020. (usw)
December 2, 2020 Filing 39 USCA Order: Appellants' "Emergency Motion for expedited briefing schedule and Review" filed by Appellants Coreco Ja'Qan Pearson, Vikki Townsend Consiglio, Gloria Kay Godwin, James Kenneth Carroll, Carolyn Hall Fisher, Cathleen Alston Latham and Brian Jay Van Gundy is GRANTED re: #32 Notice of Appeal, filed by Cathleen Alston Latham, James Kenneth Carroll, Carolyn Hall Fisher, Coreco Jaqan Pearson, Brian Jay Van Gundy, Gloria Kay Godwin and Vikki Townsend Consiglio. Case Appealed to USCA- 11th Circuit. Case Number 20-14480-RR. (pjm)
December 2, 2020 Filing 38 RESPONSE in Opposition re #20 MOTION to Intervene filed by James Kenneth Carroll, Vikki Townsend Consiglio, Carolyn Hall Fisher, Gloria Kay Godwin, Cathleen Alston Latham, Coreco Jaqan Pearson, Brian Jay Van Gundy. (MacDougald, Harry)
December 2, 2020 APPROVAL by Clerks Office re: #26 APPLICATION for Admission of Amanda J. Beane Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-10432164).. Attorney Amanda J. Beane added appearing on behalf of DCCC, DSCC, Democratic Party of Georgia, Inc. (nmb)
December 2, 2020 MINUTE ORDER granting Julia Z. Haller's #24 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice. Entered by CRD at the direction of Judge Timothy C. Batten, Sr. If the applicant does not have CM/ECF access in the Northern District of Georgia already, they must request access at http://pacer.gov. If they have electronically filed in this district in a previous case, please omit this step.(usw)
December 2, 2020 APPROVAL by Clerks Office re: #27 APPLICATION for Admission of Amanda R. Callais Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-10432211).. Attorney Amanda R. Callais added appearing on behalf of DCCC, DSCC, Democratic Party of Georgia, Inc. (nmb)
December 2, 2020 APPROVAL by Clerks Office re: #28 APPLICATION for Admission of Kevin J. Hamilton Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-10432219).. Attorney Kevin J. Hamilton added appearing on behalf of DCCC, DSCC, Democratic Party of Georgia, Inc. (nmb)
December 2, 2020 APPROVAL by Clerks Office re: #29 APPLICATION for Admission of Marc E. Elias Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-10432230).. Attorney Marc E. Elias added appearing on behalf of DCCC, DSCC, Democratic Party of Georgia, Inc. (nmb)
December 2, 2020 APPROVAL by Clerks Office re: #30 APPLICATION for Admission of Matthew Mertens Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-10432239).. Attorney Matthew Joseph Mertens added appearing on behalf of DCCC, DSCC, Democratic Party of Georgia, Inc. (nmb)
December 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER STAYING #17 Order Setting Hearing on Motion. Signed by Judge Timothy C. Batten, Sr. on 12/01/2020. (usw)
December 1, 2020 Filing 36 USCA Acknowledgment of #32 Notice of Appeal, filed by Cathleen Alston Latham, James Kenneth Carroll, Carolyn Hall Fisher, Coreco Jaqan Pearson, Brian Jay Van Gundy, Gloria Kay Godwin and Vikki Townsend Consiglio. Case Appealed to USCA- 11th Circuit. Case Number 20-14480-RR. (pjm)
December 1, 2020 Filing 35 AMENDED ANSWER to Complaint (Proposed) of Proposed Intervenor-Defendants by DCCC, DSCC, Democratic Party of Georgia, Inc.. (Sparks, Adam)
December 1, 2020 Filing 34 Transmission of Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal, USCA Appeal Fees, Order and Docket Sheet to US Court of Appeals re: #32 Notice of Appeal. (pjm)
December 1, 2020 Filing 33 NOTICE Of Filing NOA Transmittal Letter re: #32 Notice of Appeal. (pjm)
December 1, 2020 Filing 32 NOTICE OF APPEAL as to #14 Order by James Kenneth Carroll, Vikki Townsend Consiglio, Carolyn Hall Fisher, Gloria Kay Godwin, Cathleen Alston Latham, Coreco Jaqan Pearson, Brian Jay Van Gundy. Filing fee $ 505, receipt number AGANDC-10432999. Transcript Order Form due on 12/15/2020 (MacDougald, Harry) Modified on 12/2/2020 to correct filing fee amount (pjm).
December 1, 2020 Filing 31 NOTICE Of Filing by James Kenneth Carroll, Vikki Townsend Consiglio, Carolyn Hall Fisher, Gloria Kay Godwin, Cathleen Alston Latham, Coreco Jaqan Pearson, Brian Jay Van Gundy (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Declaration of Ronald Watkins)(MacDougald, Harry)
December 1, 2020 Filing 30 APPLICATION for Admission of Matthew Mertens Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-10432239).by DCCC, DSCC, Democratic Party of Georgia, Inc.. (Sparks, Adam) Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse.
December 1, 2020 Filing 29 APPLICATION for Admission of Marc E. Elias Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-10432230).by DCCC, DSCC, Democratic Party of Georgia, Inc.. (Sparks, Adam) Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse.
December 1, 2020 Filing 28 APPLICATION for Admission of Kevin J. Hamilton Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-10432219).by DCCC, DSCC, Democratic Party of Georgia, Inc.. (Sparks, Adam) Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse.
December 1, 2020 Filing 27 APPLICATION for Admission of Amanda R. Callais Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-10432211).by DCCC, DSCC, Democratic Party of Georgia, Inc.. (Sparks, Adam) Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse.
December 1, 2020 Filing 26 APPLICATION for Admission of Amanda J. Beane Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-10432164).by DCCC, DSCC, Democratic Party of Georgia, Inc.. (Sparks, Adam) Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse.
December 1, 2020 Filing 25 Certificate of Interested Persons by DCCC, DSCC, Democratic Party of Georgia, Inc.. (Sparks, Adam)
December 1, 2020 Clerks Notation re #25 Certificate of Interested Persons. Reviewed and approved by Judge Timothy C. Batten, Sr. (usw)
December 1, 2020 APPROVAL by Clerks Office re: #24 APPLICATION for Admission of Julia Z. Haller Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-10429766).. Attorney Julia Z. Haller added appearing on behalf of James Kenneth Carroll, Vikki Townsend Consiglio, Carolyn Hall Fisher, Gloria Kay Godwin, Cathleen Alston Latham, Coreco Jaqan Pearson, Brian Jay Van Gundy (nmb)
November 30, 2020 Filing 24 APPLICATION for Admission of Julia Z. Haller Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-10429766).by James Kenneth Carroll, Vikki Townsend Consiglio, Carolyn Hall Fisher, Gloria Kay Godwin, Cathleen Alston Latham, Coreco Jaqan Pearson, Brian Jay Van Gundy. (MacDougald, Harry) Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse.
November 30, 2020 Filing 23 TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on 11/29/2020, before Judge Timothy C. Batten, Sr.. Court Reporter/Transcriber Lori Burgess. A full directory of court reporters and their contact information can be found at www.gand.uscourts.gov/directory-court-reporters. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 12/21/2020. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 12/31/2020. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 3/1/2021. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Filing Transcript) (llb)
November 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 22 AMENDED 1292(b) ORDER - Please see order for specifics and details. Signed by Judge Timothy C. Batten, Sr. on 11/30/2020. (dmb)
November 30, 2020 Filing 21 NOTICE of Appearance by Russell D. Willard on behalf of Brian Kemp, Anh Le, Matthew Mashburn, Brad Raffensperger, Rebecca N. Sullivan, David J. Worley (Willard, Russell)
November 30, 2020 Filing 20 MOTION to Intervene with Brief In Support by Democratic Party of Georgia, Inc., DSCC, DCCC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A: Proposed Intervenors' Proposed Motion to Dismiss, #2 Exhibit B: Proposed Intervenors' Brief in Support of Proposed Motion to Dismiss, #3 Exhibit C: Proposed Intervenors' Proposed Answer to Complaint)(Sparks, Adam)
November 30, 2020 Filing 19 APPLICATION for Admission of Howard Kleinhendler Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-10426686).by James Kenneth Carroll, Vikki Townsend Consiglio, Carolyn Hall Fisher, Gloria Kay Godwin, Cathleen Alston Latham, Coreco Jaqan Pearson, Brian Jay Van Gundy. (MacDougald, Harry) Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse.
November 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER Setting Hearing on Motion #6 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order IMMEDIATE HEARING REQUESTED and MOTION for Preliminary Injunction : Motion Hearing set for 12/4/2020 at 10:00 AM in ATLA Courtroom 2106 before Judge Timothy C. Batten Sr. The Court sets the following schedule: Defendants' brief in opposition to the claims in Plaintiffs' complaint will be due on 12/2/2020, by 5:00 p.m. EST. Any reply brief will be due 12/3/2020 by 5:00 p.m. EST. Signed by Judge Timothy C. Batten, Sr. on 11/30/2020. (dmb)
November 30, 2020 Filing 16 NOTICE of Appearance by Charlene S McGowan on behalf of Brian Kemp, Anh Le, Matthew Mashburn, Brad Raffensperger, Rebecca N. Sullivan, David J. Worley (McGowan, Charlene)
November 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 15 1292(b) ORDER - Please see order for specifics and details. Signed by Judge Timothy C. Batten, Sr. on 11/30/2020. (usw)
November 30, 2020 APPROVAL by Clerks Office re: #19 APPLICATION for Admission of Howard Kleinhendler Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-10426686).. Attorney Howard Kleinhendler added appearing on behalf of James Kenneth Carroll, Vikki Townsend Consiglio, Carolyn Hall Fisher, Gloria Kay Godwin, Cathleen Alston Latham, Coreco Jaqan Pearson, Brian Jay Van Gundy (nmb)
November 30, 2020 MINUTE ORDER granting Howard Kleinhendler's #19 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice. Entered by CRD at the direction of Judge Timothy C. Batten, Sr. If the applicant does not have CM/ECF access in the Northern District of Georgia already, they must request access at http://pacer.gov. If they have electronically filed in this district in a previous case, please omit this step.(usw)
November 30, 2020 Clerks Notation re #4 Certificate of Interested Persons. Reviewed and approved by Judge Timothy C. Batten, Sr. (usw)
November 29, 2020 Filing 18 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Timothy C. Batten, Sr.: Telephone Conference via ZOOM held on 11/29/2020 re briefing, scheduling, and Plaintiff's request to forensically inspect county voting machines. (Court Reporter Lori Burgess)(dmb)
November 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER. Please see Order for further specifics and details. Signed by Judge Timothy C. Batten, Sr. on 11/29/2020. (usw)
November 29, 2020 Filing 13 Electronic Summons Issued as to Anh Le. (rsh)
November 29, 2020 Filing 12 Electronic Summons Issued as to Brad Raffensperger. (rsh)
November 29, 2020 Filing 11 Electronic Summons Issued as to Brian Kemp. (rsh)
November 29, 2020 Filing 10 Electronic Summons Issued as to David J. Worley. (rsh)
November 29, 2020 Filing 9 Electronic Summons Issued as to Matthew Mashburn. (rsh)
November 29, 2020 Filing 8 Electronic Summons Issued as to Rebecca N. Sullivan. (rsh)
November 29, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE Of Filing Emergency Injunctive Relief by James Kenneth Carroll, Vikki Townsend Consiglio, Carolyn Hall Fisher, Gloria Kay Godwin, Cathleen Alston Latham, Coreco Jaqan Pearson, Brian Jay Van Gundy re #6 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order IMMEDIATE HEARING REQUESTED MOTION for Preliminary Injunction (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Redacted Declaration)(MacDougald, Harry)
November 27, 2020 Filing 6 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order IMMEDIATE HEARING REQUESTED, MOTION for Preliminary Injunction with Brief In Support by James Kenneth Carroll, Vikki Townsend Consiglio, Carolyn Hall Fisher, Gloria Kay Godwin, Cathleen Alston Latham, Coreco Jaqan Pearson, Brian Jay Van Gundy. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Declaration of Dr. Shiva Ayyadurai, #2 Exhibit Joint CyberSecurity Advisory Exhibit, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(MacDougald, Harry)
November 27, 2020 Filing 5 MOTION for Leave to File Matters Under Seal re: #1 Complaint,,,,,,,, with Brief In Support by James Kenneth Carroll, Vikki Townsend Consiglio, Carolyn Hall Fisher, Gloria Kay Godwin, Cathleen Alston Latham, Coreco Jaqan Pearson, Brian Jay Van Gundy. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Redacted Exh. 2 from Complaint, #2 Exhibit Redacted Exh.8 from the Complaint, #3 Exhibit Exh. A, Joint Cybersecurity Advisory Iranian Advanced Persistent Threat Actor Identified Obtaining Voter Registration Data, #4 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(MacDougald, Harry)
November 27, 2020 Filing 4 Certificate of Interested Persons by James Kenneth Carroll, Vikki Townsend Consiglio, Carolyn Hall Fisher, Gloria Kay Godwin, Cathleen Alston Latham, Coreco Jaqan Pearson, Brian Jay Van Gundy. (MacDougald, Harry)
November 27, 2020 Filing 3 PROPOSED SUMMONS filed by James Kenneth Carroll, Vikki Townsend Consiglio, Carolyn Hall Fisher, Gloria Kay Godwin, Cathleen Alston Latham, Coreco Jaqan Pearson, Brian Jay Van Gundy (Attachments: #1 Summons Proposed Summons for Anh Le, #2 Summons Proposed Summons for Matthew Mashburn, #3 Summons Proposed Summons for Brad Raffensberger, #4 Summons Proposed Summons for Rebecca N. Sullivan, #5 Summons Proposed Summons for David J. Worley, #6 Summons Proposed Summons for Brian Kemp)(MacDougald, Harry)
November 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2 EIGHTH AMENDMENT TO GENERAL ORDER 20-01 RE: COURT OPERATIONS UNDER THE EXIGENT CIRCUMSTANCES CREATED BY COVID-19 AND RELATED CORONAVIRUS. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 09/28/2020. (rvb)
November 27, 2020 Submission of #1 Complaint, to District Judge Timothy C. Batten Sr. (rvb)
November 25, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Declaratory, Emergency, and Permanent Injunctive Relief, filed by Gloria Kay Godwin, Vikki Townsend Consiglio, Coreco Jaqan Pearson, James Kenneth Carroll, Carolyn Hall Fisher, Cathleen Alston Latham, Brian Jay Van Gundy. (Filing fee $400, receipt number AGANDC-10418604) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Affidavit Exh. 1, Report of William Briggs, #2 Exhibit Affidavit Redacted Affidavit, #3 Exhibit Affidavit of Anna Mercedes Diaz Cardozo, #4 Exhibit Affidavit Declaration of Harri Hursti, #5 Exhibit Affidavit Embedded Declaration of Harri Hursti, #6 Exhibit Exhibit SoS Certification of Dominion Voting Systems Democracy Suite 5.5-A, #7 Exhibit Exhibit Pro V&V Test Report, #8 Exhibit Exhibit Study "Ballot-Marking Devices (BMDs) Cannot Assure the Will of the, #9 Exhibit Affidavit Redacted Affidavit of Cyber-Security Expert, #10 Exhibit Affidavit Affidavit of Russell Ramsland, #11 Exhibit Affidavit of Mayra Romera, #12 Exhibit Affidavit of Maria Diedrich, #13 Exhibit Affidavit of Maria Diedrich, #14 Exhibit Affidavit of Ursula Wolf, #15 Exhibit Affidavit of Nicholas J. Zeher, #16 Exhibit Affidavit of Susan Voyles, #17 Exhibit Affidavit of Ibrahim Reyes, #18 Exhibit Affidavit of Consetta Johnson, #19 Exhibit Affidavit of Carlos Silva, #20 Exhibit Affidavit of Andrea O'Neal, #21 Exhibit Affidavit of Deborah Fisher, #22 Exhibit Affidavit of Kevin Peterford, #23 Exhibit Report of Texas Secretary of State Rejecting Dominion Voting Systems, #24 Exhibit Letter of Rep. Maloney to Smarmatic, #25 Exhibit Affidavit of Juan Carlos Cobucci, #26 Exhibit Senator Warren et al letter re: Dominion Voting Systems, #27 Exhibit Affidavit of of Eric Quinnell, #28 Exhibit Affidavit of Mitchell Harrison, #29 Exhibit Affidavit of Michelle Branton, #30 Civil Cover Sheet)(rvb) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form. Modified on 11/27/2020 to add relief text (rvb).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Pearson et al v. Kemp et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anh Le
Represented By: Charlene S McGowan
Represented By: Russell D. Willard
Represented By: Carey Allen Miller
Represented By: Melanie Leigh Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Matthew Mashburn
Represented By: Charlene S McGowan
Represented By: Russell D. Willard
Represented By: Carey Allen Miller
Represented By: Melanie Leigh Johnson
Represented By: Joshua Barrett Belinfante
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brad Raffensperger
Represented By: Charlene S McGowan
Represented By: Russell D. Willard
Represented By: Carey Allen Miller
Represented By: Melanie Leigh Johnson
Represented By: Joshua Barrett Belinfante
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rebecca N. Sullivan
Represented By: Charlene S McGowan
Represented By: Russell D. Willard
Represented By: Carey Allen Miller
Represented By: Melanie Leigh Johnson
Represented By: Joshua Barrett Belinfante
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David J. Worley
Represented By: Charlene S McGowan
Represented By: Russell D. Willard
Represented By: Carey Allen Miller
Represented By: Melanie Leigh Johnson
Represented By: Joshua Barrett Belinfante
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brian Kemp
Represented By: Charlene S McGowan
Represented By: Russell D. Willard
Represented By: Carey Allen Miller
Represented By: Melanie Leigh Johnson
Represented By: Joshua Barrett Belinfante
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brian Jay Van Gundy
Represented By: L. Lin Wood, Jr.
Represented By: Harry W. MacDougald
Represented By: Howard Kleinhendler
Represented By: Julia Z. Haller
Represented By: Sidney Powell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Coreco Jaqan Pearson
Represented By: L. Lin Wood, Jr.
Represented By: Harry W. MacDougald
Represented By: Howard Kleinhendler
Represented By: Julia Z. Haller
Represented By: Sidney Powell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cathleen Alston Latham
Represented By: L. Lin Wood, Jr.
Represented By: Harry W. MacDougald
Represented By: Howard Kleinhendler
Represented By: Julia Z. Haller
Represented By: Sidney Powell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carolyn Hall Fisher
Represented By: L. Lin Wood, Jr.
Represented By: Harry W. MacDougald
Represented By: Howard Kleinhendler
Represented By: Julia Z. Haller
Represented By: Sidney Powell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Kenneth Carroll
Represented By: L. Lin Wood, Jr.
Represented By: Harry W. MacDougald
Represented By: Howard Kleinhendler
Represented By: Julia Z. Haller
Represented By: Sidney Powell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Vikki Townsend Consiglio
Represented By: L. Lin Wood, Jr.
Represented By: Harry W. MacDougald
Represented By: Howard Kleinhendler
Represented By: Julia Z. Haller
Represented By: Sidney Powell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gloria Kay Godwin
Represented By: L. Lin Wood, Jr.
Represented By: Harry W. MacDougald
Represented By: Howard Kleinhendler
Represented By: Julia Z. Haller
Represented By: Sidney Powell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor defendant: DCCC
Represented By: Adam Martin Sparks
Represented By: Amanda J. Beane
Represented By: Joyce Gist Lewis
Represented By: Marc E. Elias
Represented By: Amanda R. Callais
Represented By: Kevin J. Hamilton
Represented By: Matthew Joseph Mertens
Represented By: Halsey G. Knapp, Jr
Represented By: Susan Coppedge
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor defendant: DSCC
Represented By: Adam Martin Sparks
Represented By: Amanda J. Beane
Represented By: Joyce Gist Lewis
Represented By: Marc E. Elias
Represented By: Amanda R. Callais
Represented By: Kevin J. Hamilton
Represented By: Matthew Joseph Mertens
Represented By: Halsey G. Knapp, Jr
Represented By: Susan Coppedge
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor defendant: Democratic Party of Georgia, Inc.
Represented By: Adam Martin Sparks
Represented By: Amanda J. Beane
Represented By: Joyce Gist Lewis
Represented By: Marc E. Elias
Represented By: Amanda R. Callais
Represented By: Kevin J. Hamilton
Represented By: Matthew Joseph Mertens
Represented By: Halsey G. Knapp, Jr
Represented By: Susan Coppedge
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor: Alice O'Lenick
Represented By: Bryan P. Tyson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor: Stephen Day
Represented By: Bryan P. Tyson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor: Ben Satterfield
Represented By: Bryan P. Tyson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor: Wandy Taylor
Represented By: Bryan P. Tyson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor: John Mangano
Represented By: Bryan P. Tyson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?