Transformative Justice Coalition et al v. Raffensperger
Plaintiff: Transformative Justice Coalition, Black Voter's Matter Fund, The Rainbow Push Coalition, Black Voters Matter Fund and Southwest Voter Education Project
Defendant: Brad Raffensperger
Intervenor Defendant: Georgia Republican Party and Republican National Committee
Case Number: 1:2020cv04869
Filed: December 2, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: Steve C Jones
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Voting
Cause of Action: 52 U.S.C. ยง 20501
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 28, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 76 TENTH AMENDMENT TO GENERAL ORDER 20-01 RE: COURT OPERATIONS UNDER THE EXIGENT CIRCUMSTANCES CREATED BY COVID-19 AND RELATED CORONAVIRUS. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 01/27/2021. (adg) (ADI)
January 28, 2021 Submission of #70 MOTION to Defer Ruling to District Judge Steve C. Jones. (rjs)
January 26, 2021 Submission of #66 MOTION for Reconsideration re #63 Order, #67 MOTION for Leave to File Plaintiffs' Proposed Second Amended Complaint and #71 MOTION to Expedite Plaintiffs' Emergency Motion to Reconsider the Court's Order to District Judge Steve C. Jones. (rjs)
January 25, 2021 Filing 75 REPLY BRIEF re #66 MOTION for Reconsideration re #63 Order, #67 MOTION for Leave to File Plaintiffs' Proposed Second Amended Complaint, #71 MOTION to Expedite Plaintiffs' Emergency Motion to Reconsider the Court's Order Denying Emergency Consideration of Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to File an Amended Complaint and Reconsideration and for the Court to Order Counting of Prov filed by Black Voters Matter Fund, Southwest Voter Education Project, The Rainbow Push Coalition, Transformative Justice Coalition. (Mirer, Jeanne) Modified on 1/26/2021 (rjs).
January 13, 2021 Filing 74 RESPONSE in Opposition re #70 MOTION to Defer Ruling re: #28 MOTION to Dismiss , #35 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Brad Raffensperger. (Tyson, Bryan)
January 11, 2021 Filing 73 RESPONSE in Opposition re #66 MOTION for Reconsideration re #63 Order, #67 MOTION for Leave to File Plaintiffs' Proposed Second Amended Complaint filed by Georgia Republican Party, Republican National Committee. (Norris, Cameron)
January 11, 2021 Filing 72 RESPONSE in Opposition re #66 MOTION for Reconsideration re #63 Order, #67 MOTION for Leave to File Plaintiffs' Proposed Second Amended Complaint filed by Brad Raffensperger. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Second Dec. of Chris Harvey, #2 Exhibit B - L. Brown Tweet, #3 Exhibit C - Arwine Tweet, #4 Exhibit D - L. Brown Tweet, #5 Exhibit E - G. Palast Tweet, #6 Exhibit F - Screenshots from Video)(Tyson, Bryan)
January 5, 2021 Filing 71 MOTION to Expedite Plaintiffs' Emergency Motion to Reconsider the Court's Order Denying Emergency Consideration of Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to File an Amended Complaint and Reconsideration and for the Court to Order Counting of Provisional Ballots of Those on the Plaintiffs' Expert's List of Purged Voters with Brief In Support by Black Voters Matter Fund, Southwest Voter Education Project, The Rainbow Push Coalition, Transformative Justice Coalition. (Attachments: #1 Brief Memorandum of Law in Support of Plaintiffs' Emergency Motion to Reconsider the Court's Order Denying Emergency Consideration of Plaintiffs' Motion for Leave to File an Amended Complaint and Reconsideration and for the Court to Order Counting of Provisional Ballots of Those on the Plaintiffs' Expert's List of Purged Voters, #2 Exhibit 1 Complaint in Majority Forward et al v Ben Hill County Board of Elections et al, #3 Exhibit 2 Injunctive Order in in Majority Forward et al v Ben Hill County Board of Elections et al)(Mirer, Jeanne)
December 30, 2020 Filing 70 MOTION to Defer Ruling re: #28 MOTION to Dismiss , #35 MOTION to by Black Voters Matter Fund, Southwest Voter Education Project, The Rainbow Push Coalition, Transformative Justice Coalition. (Mirer, Jeanne) Modified on 12/30/2020 (rjs).
December 30, 2020 Submission of #35 MOTION to Dismiss and #28 MOTION to Dismiss to District Judge Steve C. Jones. (rjs)
December 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 69 ORDER denying #68 Motion to Expedite Plaintiffs' Motion for Emergency Consideration of Plaintiffs' Motions Filed on December 28, 2020 Doc. Nos. #66 and #67 . Plaintiffs' substantive motions (Doc. Nos. #66 and #67 ) shall proceed with a normal briefing schedule. Signed by Judge Steve C. Jones on 12/29/2020. (bdb)
December 29, 2020 Filing 68 MOTION to Expedite Emergency Consideration of Plaintiffs' Motions Filed on December 28, 2020 by Black Voters Matter Fund, Southwest Voter Education Project, The Rainbow Push Coalition, Transformative Justice Coalition. (Mirer, Jeanne)
December 28, 2020 Filing 67 MOTION for Leave to File Plaintiffs' Proposed Second Amended Complaint with Brief In Support by Black Voters Matter Fund, Southwest Voter Education Project, The Rainbow Push Coalition, Transformative Justice Coalition. (Attachments: #1 Brief Memorandum of Law in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for Leave to File Second Amended Complaint, #2 Exhibit Plaintiffs' Proposed Second Amended Complaint)(Mirer, Jeanne)
December 28, 2020 Filing 66 MOTION for Reconsideration re #63 Order on Motion for Preliminary Injunction, with Brief In Support by Black Voters Matter Fund, Southwest Voter Education Project, The Rainbow Push Coalition, Transformative Justice Coalition. (Attachments: #1 Brief Memorandum of Law in Support of Plaintiffs Motion for Reconsideration)(Mirer, Jeanne)
December 18, 2020 Filing 65 TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on 12/10/20 (Videoconf), before Judge Steve C. Jones. Court Reporter/Transcriber David A. Ritchie. A full directory of court reporters and their contact information can be found at www.gand.uscourts.gov/directory-court-reporters. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 1/8/2021. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 1/19/2021. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 3/18/2021. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Filing Transcript) (pjm) (Additional attachment(s) added on 12/22/2020: #2 Verification of Financial Arrangements) (pjm).
December 16, 2020 Filing 64 ANSWER to #27 Amended Complaint by Georgia Republican Party, Republican National Committee. Discovery ends on 5/17/2021.(Norris, Cameron) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov to obtain Pretrial Instructions.
December 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 63 ORDER: The Court DENIES Plaintiffs' #6 Motion for Preliminary Injunction. However, the Court acknowledges that there may be discrepancies in the NCOA information provided by Plaintiffs' experts and the records Georgia used to cancel voter registrations in December of 2019. It therefore strongly encourages the Parties to meet and determine the explanation, if any, for the alleged inaccuracies. Signed by Judge Steve C. Jones on 12/16/2020. (rjs)
December 16, 2020 Filing 62 NOTICE of Letter from Court to Counsel. (rjs)
December 16, 2020 Filing 61 NOTICE of Letter to Court from Counsel. (rjs)
December 16, 2020 Filing 60 RESPONSE re #58 Response (Non-Motion) filed by Black Voters Matter Fund, Southwest Voter Education Project, The Rainbow Push Coalition, Transformative Justice Coalition. (Mirer, Jeanne)
December 16, 2020 Filing 59 RESPONSE to Plaintiffs' Letter Brief re #57 Response in Support of Motion filed by Georgia Republican Party, Republican National Committee. (Norris, Cameron) Modified on 12/16/2020 (rjs).
December 16, 2020 Filing 58 RESPONSE to Plaintiffs' Letter Brief re #57 Response in Support of Motion filed by Brad Raffensperger. (Tyson, Bryan) Modified on 12/16/2020 (rjs).
December 15, 2020 Filing 57 RESPONSE in Support re #6 First MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Black Voters Matter Fund, Southwest Voter Education Project, The Rainbow Push Coalition, Transformative Justice Coalition. (Mirer, Jeanne)
December 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 56 ORDER: As Plaintiffs have already been provided with the opportunity for a full and fair hearing on their emergency injunctive relief request, as well as an opportunity for post-hearing supplemental briefing, the pending #55 motion for additional briefing is DENIED. The proposed brief at Doc. No. [55-1] will not be considered by the Court. Signed by Judge Steve C. Jones on 12/13/2020. (rjs)
December 11, 2020 Filing 55 MOTION for Leave to File Proposed Reply to Defendant's Response to Plaintiff's Corrected Supplemental Memorandum of Law on the Issue of NVRA Notice with Brief In Support by Black Voters Matter Fund, Southwest Voter Education Project, The Rainbow Push Coalition, Transformative Justice Coalition. (Attachments: #1 Brief Plaintiff's Proposed Reply to Defendant's Response to Plaintiff's Corrected Supplemental Memeorandum of Law on the Issue of NVRA Notice, #2 Exhibit A: December 11, 2020 Letter to Defense Counsel)(Mirer, Jeanne)
December 11, 2020 Filing 54 REPLY re #52 Corrected Supplemental Brief on the Issue of NVRA Notice filed by Brad Raffensperger. (Tyson, Bryan) Modified on 12/14/2020 (rjs).
December 11, 2020 RETURN of #38 APPLICATION for Admission of Jonathan Savage Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-10472297). to attorney for correction re: Courts to which admitted. (cdg)
December 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 53 ORDER: The Court will exercise its discretion to permit Defendant and Intervenor-Defendants to file written responses to Plaintiffs' #52 Corrected Supplemental Brief on the Issue of NVRA Notice. Said responses shall be filed by 5 P.M., FRIDAY, DECEMBER 11, 2020. Signed by Judge Steve C. Jones on 12/10/2020. (rjs)
December 10, 2020 Filing 52 Corrected Supplemental Brief on the Issue of NVRA Notice re #49 Response to Motion filed by Black Voters Matter Fund, Southwest Voter Education Project, The Rainbow Push Coalition, Transformative Justice Coalition. (Mirer, Jeanne) Modified on 12/11/2020 (rjs).
December 10, 2020 Filing 51 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Steve C. Jones: Preliminary Injunction hearing held via Zoom. Oral argument heard.Plaintiffs' witnesses Latosha Brown, Barbara Arwine, John Lenser, Greg Palast, Robert Patillo, and Lydia Camarillo sworn and testified. Plaintiffs' exhibits 1-10 and 12-15 admitted. Defendant's witness Chris Harvey sworn and testified. Court's ruling to follow in due course. #6 Motion for Preliminary Injunction TAKEN UNDER ADVISEMENT. (Court Reporter David Ritchie)(rjs)
December 10, 2020 Filing 50 EXHIBITS admitted during the Video Preliminary Injunction Motion Hearing held on 12/10/2020 before the Honorable Judge Steve C. Jones. Filed by Black Voters Matter Fund, Southwest Voter Education Project, The Rainbow Push Coalition, Transformative Justice Coalition. Any objection to the validity of these exhibits must be filed by the next business day following the upload of exhibits. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 2 Notice of Secretary of State on Cleaning Voter Rolls, #2 Exhibit 3 List of full-service USPS Licensees, #3 Exhibit 4 List of limited-service USPS Licensees, #4 Exhibit 5 Bill from Total Data Technologies, #5 Exhibit 6 Bills connected to the mailing for BVMF, #6 Exhibit 7 September 1, 2020 Report of the Palast Investigative Fund released by the ACLU of Georgia, #7 Exhibit 8 September 22, 2020 email form Jeanne Mirer to Mr. Raffensperger transmitting letter of September 22, 2020, #8 Exhibit 9 September 22, 2020 letter to Secretary of State Raffensperger from Jeanne Mirer, #9 Exhibit 10 October 19, 2020 email from Jeanne Mirer to Mr. Raffensperger transmitting letter of October 19, 2020, #10 Exhibit 11 October 19, 2020 letter to Secretary of State Raffensperger from Jeanne Mirer, #11 Exhibit 12 Report of Anchor Computer on NCOA data, #12 Exhibit 13 Report of InfoUSA-Infogroup on NCOA data, #13 Exhibit 14 Report from Merkle to Computech November 2019, #14 Exhibit 15 Report from Merkle to Computech August 2020)(Mirer, Jeanne)
December 10, 2020 Filing 49 RESPONSE re #6 First MOTION for Preliminary Injunction Supplemental Brief on Issue of Notice Under NVRA filed by Black Voters Matter Fund, Southwest Voter Education Project, The Rainbow Push Coalition, Transformative Justice Coalition. (Mirer, Jeanne)
December 10, 2020 Filing 48 DOCUMENT FILED CORRECTLY AT DOC #50 RESPONSE re #4 Order,,, Set Deadlines/Hearings,, Supplemental Exhibits List filed by Black Voters Matter Fund, Southwest Voter Education Project, The Rainbow Push Coalition, Transformative Justice Coalition. (Mirer, Jeanne) Modified on 12/10/2020 (rjs).
December 10, 2020 Filing 47 NOTICE Of Filing Declaration of Robert Patillo by Black Voters Matter Fund, Southwest Voter Education Project, The Rainbow Push Coalition, Transformative Justice Coalition re #6 First MOTION for Preliminary Injunction (Mirer, Jeanne) Modified on 12/10/2020 (rjs).
December 10, 2020 Filing 46 NOTICE Of Filing Declaration of Mark Swedlund by Black Voters Matter Fund, Southwest Voter Education Project, The Rainbow Push Coalition, Transformative Justice Coalition re #6 First MOTION for Preliminary Injunction (Mirer, Jeanne) Modified on 12/10/2020 (rjs).
December 10, 2020 Filing 45 NOTICE Of Filing Declaration of Lydia Camarillo by Black Voters Matter Fund, Southwest Voter Education Project, The Rainbow Push Coalition, Transformative Justice Coalition re #6 First MOTION for Preliminary Injunction (Mirer, Jeanne) Modified on 12/10/2020 (rjs).
December 10, 2020 Filing 44 NOTICE Of Filing Declaration of Latosha Brown by Black Voters Matter Fund, Southwest Voter Education Project, The Rainbow Push Coalition, Transformative Justice Coalition re #6 First MOTION for Preliminary Injunction (Mirer, Jeanne) Modified on 12/10/2020 (rjs).
December 10, 2020 Filing 43 NOTICE Of Filing Declaration of Barbara Arnwine by Southwest Voter Education Project, The Rainbow Push Coalition, Transformative Justice Coalition re #6 First MOTION for Preliminary Injunction (Mirer, Jeanne) Modified on 12/10/2020 (rjs).
December 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 42 Expanded ORDER granting #14 Emergency Motion to Intervene. Signed by Judge Steve C. Jones on 12/09/2020. (pdw)
December 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 41 ORDER re December 10, 2020 evidentiary hearing on Plaintiffs' #6 Motion for Preliminary Injunction: Plaintiffs are collectively allotted one hour to present evidence and argument. Defendants and Intervenor-Defendants are collectively allotted one hour to present evidence and argument. Counsel may agree amongst themselves as to how to divide the one hour (per side) of allotted time. Signed by Judge Steve C. Jones on 12/9/2020. (rjs)
December 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 40 ORDER granting #19 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Fred David Gray. Signed by Judge Steve C. Jones on 12/9/2020. If the applicant does not have CM/ECF access in the Northern District of Georgia already, they must request access at http://pacer.gov. If they have electronically filed in this district in a previous case, please omit this step.(rjs)
December 9, 2020 Filing 39 RESPONSE in Opposition re #6 First MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Georgia Republican Party, Republican National Committee. (Norris, Cameron)
December 9, 2020 Filing 38 APPLICATION for Admission of Jonathan Savage Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-10472297).by Black Voter's Matter Fund, Black Voters Matter Fund, Southwest Voter Education Project, The Rainbow Push Coalition, Transformative Justice Coalition. (Griggs, Gerald) Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse.
December 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER: Having granted intervenor status to Intervenor-Defendants Republican National Committee and Georgia Republican Party, in the exercise of the Court's discretion and pursuant to Local Rule 65.2, NDGa, the Court waives normal time requirements and ORDERS the intervenor-defendants to file a response brief to the pending #6 motion for preliminary injunction by 5 P.M., TODAY, DECEMBER 9, 2020. Signed by Judge Steve C. Jones on 12/9/2020. (rjs)
December 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER granting #14 Motion to Intervene. The Clerk is DIRECTED to amend the case-style to list the Republican National Committee and Georgia Republican Party as Intervenor-Defendants. Signed by Judge Steve C. Jones on 12/9/2020. (rjs)
December 9, 2020 Filing 35 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' First Amended Complaint with Brief In Support by Brad Raffensperger. (Attachments: #1 Brief)(Tyson, Bryan)
December 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 34 NINTH AMENDMENT TO GENERAL ORDER 20-01 RE: COURT OPERATIONS UNDER THE EXIGENT CIRCUMSTANCES CREATED BY COVID-19 AND RELATED CORONAVIRUS. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 12/08/2020. (adg) (ADI)
December 9, 2020 Filing 33 REPLY to Response to Motion re #14 Emergency MOTION to Intervene filed by Georgia Republican Party, Republican National Committee. (Norris, Cameron)
December 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER: The Court waives normal time requirements and ORDERS the proposed intervenor-defendants to file a reply brief by 3:00 P.M. TODAY, DECEMBER 9, 2020. Signed by Judge Steve C. Jones on 12/9/2020. (rjs)
December 9, 2020 NOTICE OF VIDEO PROCEEDING re: #6 First MOTION for Preliminary Injunction . Motion Hearing set for 12/10/2020 at 10:00 AM via Zoom before Judge Steve C. Jones. Connection Instructions: Please click the link below to join the webinar: https://ganduscourts.zoomgov.com/j/1611572241 Passcode: 808340 Or iPhone one-tap : US: +16692545252,,1611572241#,,,,,,0#,,808340# or +16468287666,,1611572241#,,,,,,0#,,808340# Or Telephone: Dial(for higher quality, dial a number based on your current location): US: +1 669 254 5252 or +1 646 828 7666 Webinar ID: 161 157 2241 Passcode: 808340 International numbers available: https://ganduscourts.zoomgov.com/u/acFm6AX8wj Or an H.323/SIP room system: H.323: 161.199.138.10 (US West) or 161.199.136.10 (US East) Meeting ID: 161 157 2241 Passcode: 808340 SIP: 1611572241@sip.zoomgov.com Passcode: 808340 You must follow the instructions of the Court for remote proceedings available #here. The procedure for filing documentary exhibits admitted during the proceeding is available #here. Photographing, recording, or broadcasting of any judicial proceedings, including proceedings held by video teleconferencing or telephone conferencing, is strictly and absolutely prohibited. (pdw)
December 9, 2020 APPROVAL by Clerks Office re: #19 APPLICATION for Admission of FRED GRAY Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-10455978).. Attorney Fred David Gray added appearing on behalf of Black Voters Matter Fund, Southwest Voter Education Project, The Rainbow Push Coalition, Transformative Justice Coalition (nmb)
December 9, 2020 Clerk's Certificate of Mailing to Fred Gray re #40 Order on Application for Admission PHV,. (rjs)
December 8, 2020 Filing 31 RESPONSE in Opposition re #6 First MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Brad Raffensperger. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Dec. of Chris Harvey)(Tyson, Bryan)
December 8, 2020 Filing 30 RESPONSE in Opposition re #14 Emergency MOTION to Intervene filed by Black Voter's Matter Fund, The Rainbow Push Coalition, Transformative Justice Coalition. (Mirer, Jeanne)
December 8, 2020 Filing 29 DOCUMENT FILED CORRECTLY AT DOC #50 RESPONSE re #4 Order,,, Set Deadlines/Hearings,, Exhibits for Plaintiffs filed by Black Voter's Matter Fund, The Rainbow Push Coalition, Transformative Justice Coalition. (Mirer, Jeanne) Modified on 12/10/2020 (rjs).
December 8, 2020 Filing 28 MOTION to Dismiss with Brief In Support by Brad Raffensperger. (Attachments: #1 Brief)(Tyson, Bryan)
December 8, 2020 Filing 27 First AMENDED COMPLAINT against Brad Raffensperger filed by Black Voters Matter Fund, Transformative Justice Coalition, The Rainbow Push Coalition, Southwest Voter Education Project.(Mirer, Jeanne) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form. Modified on 12/9/2020 to correct filer information (rjs).
December 8, 2020 Filing 26 NOTICE of Appearance by Loree Anne Paradise on behalf of Brad Raffensperger (Paradise, Loree Anne)
December 8, 2020 Filing 25 NOTICE of Appearance by Maria Olabosipo Banjo on behalf of Black Voter's Matter Fund, The Rainbow Push Coalition, Transformative Justice Coalition (Banjo, Maria)
December 7, 2020 Filing 24 NOTICE of Appearance by Cameron T. Norris on behalf of Georgia Republican Party, Republican National Committee (Norris, Cameron)
December 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER granting #17 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Zachary M. Wallen. Signed by Judge Steve C. Jones on 12/7/2020. If the applicant does not have CM/ECF access in the Northern District of Georgia already, they must request access at http://pacer.gov. If they have electronically filed in this district in a previous case, please omit this step.(rjs)
December 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER granting #16 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Cameron T. Norris. Signed by Judge Steve C. Jones on 12/7/2020. If the applicant does not have CM/ECF access in the Northern District of Georgia already, they must request access at http://pacer.gov. If they have electronically filed in this district in a previous case, please omit this step.(rjs)
December 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER granting #15 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Tyler R. Green. Signed by Judge Steve C. Jones on 12/7/2020. If the applicant does not have CM/ECF access in the Northern District of Georgia already, they must request access at http://pacer.gov. If they have electronically filed in this district in a previous case, please omit this step.(rjs)
December 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER granting #9 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Jeanne Mirer. Signed by Judge Steve C. Jones on 12/7/2020. If the applicant does not have CM/ECF access in the Northern District of Georgia already, they must request access at http://pacer.gov. If they have electronically filed in this district in a previous case, please omit this step.(rjs)
December 7, 2020 Filing 19 APPLICATION for Admission of FRED GRAY Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-10455978).by Black Voter's Matter Fund, The Rainbow Push Coalition, Transformative Justice Coalition. (Hoffler, Tricia) Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse.
December 7, 2020 APPROVAL by Clerks Office re: #15 APPLICATION for Admission of Tyler R. Green Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-10452444).. Attorney Tyler R. Green added appearing on behalf of Georgia Republican Party, Republican National Committee (nmb)
December 7, 2020 APPROVAL by Clerks Office re: #16 APPLICATION for Admission of Cameron T. Norris Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-10452449).. Attorney Cameron T. Norris added appearing on behalf of Georgia Republican Party, Republican National Committee (nmb)
December 7, 2020 APPROVAL by Clerks Office re: #17 APPLICATION for Admission of Zachary M. Wallen Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-10452451).. Attorney Zachary M. Wallen added appearing on behalf of Georgia Republican Party, Republican National Committee (nmb)
December 7, 2020 Clerk's Certificate of Mailing to Zachary M. Wallen re #23 Order on Application for Admission PHV. (rjs)
December 7, 2020 Clerk's Certificate of Mailing to Cameron T. Norris re #22 Order on Application for Admission PHV. (rjs)
December 7, 2020 Clerk's Certificate of Mailing to Tyler R. Green re #21 Order on Application for Admission PHV,. (rjs)
December 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER: The Court waives normal time requirements and ORDERS Plaintiffs to file a response to #14 Proposed Intervenor-Defendants' Emergency Motion to Intervene by 4:00 P.M., TUESDAY, DECEMBER 8, 2020. Signed by Judge Steve C. Jones on 12/6/2020. (rjs)
December 6, 2020 Filing 17 APPLICATION for Admission of Zachary M. Wallen Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-10452451).by Georgia Republican Party, Republican National Committee. (Chalmers, Douglas) Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse.
December 6, 2020 Filing 16 APPLICATION for Admission of Cameron T. Norris Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-10452449).by Georgia Republican Party, Republican National Committee. (Chalmers, Douglas) Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse.
December 6, 2020 Filing 15 APPLICATION for Admission of Tyler R. Green Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-10452444).by Georgia Republican Party, Republican National Committee. (Chalmers, Douglas) Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse.
December 5, 2020 Filing 14 Emergency MOTION to Intervene by Republican National Committee, Georgia Republican Party. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in support, #2 Proposed Answer, #3 Certificate of Interested Persons)(Chalmers, Douglas)
December 5, 2020 Filing 13 DOCUMENT FILED CORRECTLY AT DOC #14 Emergency MOTION to Intervene by Brad Raffensperger. (Attachments: #1 Memo in Support, #2 Proposed Answer, #3 Certificate of Interested Persons)(Chalmers, Douglas) Modified on 12/7/2020 (rjs).
December 4, 2020 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Bryan Francis Jacoutot on behalf of Brad Raffensperger (Jacoutot, Bryan)
December 4, 2020 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Bryan P. Tyson on behalf of Brad Raffensperger (Tyson, Bryan)
December 4, 2020 APPROVAL by Clerks Office re: #9 APPLICATION for Admission of Jeanne Mirer Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-10443413).. Attorney Jeanne Ellen Mirer added appearing on behalf of Black Voter's Matter Fund, The Rainbow Push Coalition, Transformative Justice Coalition (nmb)
December 3, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Tricia P. Hoffler on behalf of Black Voter's Matter Fund, The Rainbow Push Coalition, Transformative Justice Coalition (Hoffler, Tricia)
December 3, 2020 Filing 9 APPLICATION for Admission of Jeanne Mirer Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-10443413). with Brief In Support by Black Voter's Matter Fund, The Rainbow Push Coalition, Transformative Justice Coalition. (Griggs, Gerald) Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse.
December 3, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE Of Filing Declaration of Greg Palast by Black Voter's Matter Fund, The Rainbow Push Coalition, Transformative Justice Coalition re #6 First MOTION for Preliminary Injunction (Attachments: #1 Exhibit September 22nd letter to Raffensperger, #2 Exhibit October 19th Letter to Raffensperger)(Griggs, Gerald) Modified on 12/3/2020 (rjs).
December 3, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE Of Filing Declaration of John Lenser by Black Voter's Matter Fund, The Rainbow Push Coalition, Transformative Justice Coalition re #6 First MOTION for Preliminary Injunction (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Secretary of State Announcement, #2 Exhibit NCOA licensees list, #3 Exhibit USPS limited licensees list)(Griggs, Gerald) Modified on 12/3/2020 (rjs).
December 3, 2020 Filing 6 First MOTION for Preliminary Injunction with Brief In Support by Black Voter's Matter Fund, The Rainbow Push Coalition, Transformative Justice Coalition. (Attachments: #1 Brief Brief)(Griggs, Gerald)
December 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 (DUPLICATE OF DOC. #4 ) ORDER - Plaintiffs' Complaint seeks emergency injunctive relief and requests an immediate hearing (Doc. No. #1 ). The Court will hold a hearing on Plaintiffs' request via Zoom on THURSDAY, DECEMBER 10, 2020, at 10:00AM. Defendant is hereby ORDERED to file any brief in opposition by TUESDAY, DECEMBER 8, 2020, at 5:00PM. Signed by Judge Steve C. Jones on 12/2/2020. (tcc) Modified on 12/3/2020 (tcc).
December 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER: The Court will hold a hearing on Plaintiffs' request via Zoom on THURSDAY, DECEMBER 10, 2020, at 10:00 AM. Instructions for accessing the hearing will be posted via notice entry to the docket. Defendant is ORDERED to file any brief in opposition by TUESDAY, DECEMBER 8, 2020, at 5:00PM. If any Party wishes to introduce exhibits during the December 10 Zoom hearing, those exhibits must also be posted to the docket by Tuesday, December 8, 2020 at 5:00PM. Signed by Judge Steve C. Jones on 12/2/2020. (rjs)
December 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 EIGHTH AMENDMENT TO GENERAL ORDER 20-01 RE: COURT OPERATIONS UNDER THE EXIGENT CIRCUMSTANCES CREATED BY COVID-19 AND RELATED CORONAVIRUS. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 9/28/2020. (rjs)
December 2, 2020 Filing 2 Electronic Summons Issued as to Brad Raffensperger. (rjs)
December 2, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with INJ and TRO request for immediate hearing (Filing fee $402, receipt number AGANDC-10438029) filed by Black Voter's Matter Fund, Transformative Justice Coalition, The Rainbow Push Coalition. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(rjs) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Transformative Justice Coalition et al v. Raffensperger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brad Raffensperger
Represented By: Bryan Francis Jacoutot
Represented By: Bryan P. Tyson
Represented By: Loree Anne Paradise
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Transformative Justice Coalition
Represented By: Gerald A. Griggs
Represented By: Maria Olabosipo Banjo
Represented By: Jeanne Ellen Mirer
Represented By: Fred David Gray
Represented By: Tricia P. Hoffler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Black Voter's Matter Fund
Represented By: Gerald A. Griggs
Represented By: Maria Olabosipo Banjo
Represented By: Jeanne Ellen Mirer
Represented By: Tricia P. Hoffler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: The Rainbow Push Coalition
Represented By: Gerald A. Griggs
Represented By: Maria Olabosipo Banjo
Represented By: Jeanne Ellen Mirer
Represented By: Fred David Gray
Represented By: Tricia P. Hoffler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Black Voters Matter Fund
Represented By: Gerald A. Griggs
Represented By: Maria Olabosipo Banjo
Represented By: Jeanne Ellen Mirer
Represented By: Fred David Gray
Represented By: Tricia P. Hoffler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Southwest Voter Education Project
Represented By: Gerald A. Griggs
Represented By: Maria Olabosipo Banjo
Represented By: Jeanne Ellen Mirer
Represented By: Fred David Gray
Represented By: Tricia P. Hoffler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor defendant: Georgia Republican Party
Represented By: Cameron T. Norris
Represented By: Douglas A. S. Chalmers, Jr.
Represented By: Tyler R. Green
Represented By: Zachary M. Wallen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor defendant: Republican National Committee
Represented By: Cameron T. Norris
Represented By: Douglas A. S. Chalmers, Jr.
Represented By: Tyler R. Green
Represented By: Zachary M. Wallen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?