Cheshire v. RRE Buckhead Holdings LLC et al
Plaintiff: Mary Cheshire
Defendant: Greystar Management Services, L.P., Rachel Sliger, GREP Southeast, LLC, Greystar RS SE, LLC and RRE Buckhead Holdings LLC doing business as Uptown Buckhead
Case Number: 1:2020cv05085
Filed: December 15, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: Michael L Brown
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 20, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 20, 2021 Clerk's Certificate of Mailing to State Court of Gwinnett County, Georgia certified copy re #11 Order on Motion to Remand to State Court, #12 Notice (Other). (jta)
January 20, 2021 Civil Case Terminated. (jta)
January 20, 2021 Filing 12 NOTICE of Remand to State Court of Gwinnett County, Georgia re #11 Order on Motion to Remand to State Court. (jta)
January 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting #10 Motion to Remand to State Court of Gwinnett County, Georgia. Signed by Judge Michael L. Brown on 1/20/2021. (jta)
January 20, 2021 NOTICE OF CANCELLATION OF HEARING (by docket entry only): The Status Conference set for 1/20/2021 at 2:00 PM via Zoom before Judge Michael L. Brown is CANCELED. (bgt)
January 19, 2021 Filing 10 Consent MOTION to Remand to State Court by GREP Southeast, LLC, Greystar Management Services, L.P., Greystar RS SE, LLC, RRE Buckhead Holdings LLC, Rachel Sliger. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Exhibit A to Consent Motion to Remand)(Klingler, Elenore)
January 19, 2021 NOTICE OF VIDEO PROCEEDING (by docket entry only): A Status Conference is set for 1/20/2021 at 2:00 PM before Judge Michael L. Brown. Connection Instructions: Web link: https://ganduscourts.zoomgov.com/j/1607557364. Meeting ID: 160 755 7364. Passcode: 787015. Call-in number: 1-646-828-7666. You must follow the instructions of the Court for remote proceedings available #here. The procedure for filing documentary exhibits admitted during the proceeding is available #here. Photographing, recording, or broadcasting of any judicial proceedings, including proceedings held by video teleconferencing or telephone conferencing, is strictly and absolutely prohibited. (bgt)
January 14, 2021 Filing 9 Certificate of Interested Persons by Mary Cheshire. (Bennett, Lawrence)
January 14, 2021 Filing 8 Initial Disclosures by Mary Cheshire.(Bennett, Lawrence)
January 14, 2021 Filing 7 Certificate of Interested Persons by GREP Southeast, LLC, Greystar Management Services, L.P., Greystar RS SE, LLC, RRE Buckhead Holdings LLC, Rachel Sliger. (Klingler, Elenore)
January 14, 2021 Filing 6 Initial Disclosures by GREP Southeast, LLC, Greystar Management Services, L.P., Greystar RS SE, LLC, RRE Buckhead Holdings LLC, Rachel Sliger.(Klingler, Elenore)
January 14, 2021 Filing 5 JOINT PRELIMINARY REPORT AND DISCOVERY PLAN filed by GREP Southeast, LLC, Greystar Management Services, L.P., Greystar RS SE, LLC, RRE Buckhead Holdings LLC, Rachel Sliger. (Klingler, Elenore)
December 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 STANDING ORDER regarding civil litigation. Signed by Judge Michael L. Brown on 7/24/2020. (bgt)
December 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 NINTH AMENDMENT TO GENERAL ORDER 20-01 RE: COURT OPERATIONS UNDER THE EXIGENT CIRCUMSTANCES CREATED BY COVID-19 AND RELATED CORONA VIRUS. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 12/8/20. (eop)
December 15, 2020 Filing 2 ANSWER to #1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL with Jury Demand by GREP Southeast, LLC, Greystar Management Services, L.P., Greystar RS SE, LLC, RRE Buckhead Holdings LLC and Rachel Sliger. Discovery ends on 5/14/2021.(eop) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov to obtain Pretrial Instructions.
December 15, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL with COMPLAINT filed by Rachel Sliger, Greystar RS SE, LLC, Greystar Management Services, L.P., GREP Southeast, LLC and RRE Buckhead Holdings LLC. (Filing fee $ 402.00 receipt number AGANDC-10495183) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit -A -Pleadings & Discovery, #2 Exhibit -B -Affidavit of Rachel Sliger, #3 Exhibit -C -Notice of Filing, #4 Civil Cover Sheet)(eop) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cheshire v. RRE Buckhead Holdings LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Greystar Management Services, L.P.
Represented By: Kevin Patrick Branch
Represented By: Elenore Cotter Klingler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rachel Sliger
Represented By: Kevin Patrick Branch
Represented By: Elenore Cotter Klingler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GREP Southeast, LLC
Represented By: Kevin Patrick Branch
Represented By: Elenore Cotter Klingler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Greystar RS SE, LLC
Represented By: Kevin Patrick Branch
Represented By: Elenore Cotter Klingler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RRE Buckhead Holdings LLC doing business as Uptown Buckhead
Represented By: Kevin Patrick Branch
Represented By: Elenore Cotter Klingler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mary Cheshire
Represented By: Lawrence Lee Bennett, Jr.
Represented By: Jonathan A. Parrish
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?