Reeves v. Office Depot, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Barbara Reeves
Defendant: Office Depot, Inc., OfficeMax North America, Inc., John Does (1-3), OfficeMax Incorporated, XYZ Company, ABC Company and Office Depot, LLC
Case Number: 1:2020cv05098
Filed: December 16, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: J P Boulee
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 12, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 12, 2021 Filing 13 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Office Depot, Inc., Office Depot, LLC, OfficeMax Incorporated, OfficeMax North America, Inc..(Wedge, Robert)
February 2, 2021 Filing 12 Consent MOTION Consent Motion to Drop OfficeMax Incorporated and OfficeMax North America, Inc. as Party Defendants with Brief In Support by Office Depot, Inc., Office Depot, LLC, OfficeMax Incorporated, OfficeMax North America, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Brief Brief in Support of Consent Motion to Drop OfficeMax Incorporated and OfficeMax North America, Inc. as Party Defendants, #2 Text of Proposed Order Order Dropping OfficeMax Incorporated and OfficeMax North America, Inc. as Party Defendants)(Wedge, Robert)
January 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 TENTH AMENDMENT TO GENERAL ORDER 20-01 RE: COURT OPERATIONS UNDER THE EXIGENT CIRCUMSTANCES CREATED BY COVID-19 AND RELATED CORONAVIRUS. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 01/27/2021. (adg) (ADI)
January 21, 2021 Filing 10 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Office Depot, Inc., Office Depot, LLC, OfficeMax Incorporated, OfficeMax North America, Inc..(Wedge, Robert)
January 15, 2021 Filing 9 Certificate of Interested Persons by Barbara Reeves. (Coker, Robert)
January 15, 2021 Filing 8 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Initial Disclosures by Barbara Reeves.(Coker, Robert)
January 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 SCHEDULING ORDER approving the parties' #6 Joint Preliminary Report and Discovery Plan. Per the request of the parties, this case is assigned to an eight-month discovery tract. Discovery shall open on January 15, 2021, and close on September 15, 2021. Dispositive motions shall be filed no later than October 15, 2021. Signed by Judge J. P. Boulee on 1/11/2021. (ddm)
January 11, 2021 Filing 6 JOINT PRELIMINARY REPORT AND DISCOVERY PLAN filed by Barbara Reeves. (Coker, Robert)
December 21, 2020 Clerks Notation re #4 Certificate of Interested Persons APPROVED by JPB. (bnw)
December 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 STANDING ORDER REGARDING CIVIL LITIGATION. Signed by Judge J. P. Boulee on 12/18/20. (bnw)
December 17, 2020 Filing 4 Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement by Office Depot, Inc., Office Depot, LLC, OfficeMax Incorporated, OfficeMax North America, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent ODP Investment, LLC, Corporate Parent ODP Corporation for Office Depot, LLC; Corporate Parent Mapleby Holdings Merger Corporation for OfficeMax Incorporated; Corporate Parent OfficeMax Incorporated for OfficeMax North America, Inc.. (Brunette, Elizabeth)
December 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 NINTH AMENDMENT TO GENERAL ORDER 20-01 RE: COURT OPERATIONS UNDER THE EXIGENT CIRCUMSTANCES CREATED BY COVID-19 AND RELATED CORONA VIRUS. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 12/8/20. (eop)
December 16, 2020 Filing 2 ANSWER to #1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL with Jury Demand by Office Depot, Inc., Office Depot, LLC, OfficeMax Incorporated and OfficeMax North America, Inc.. Discovery ends on 5/17/2021. (Filed in State Court and included with Notice of Removal)(eop) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov to obtain Pretrial Instructions.
December 16, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL with COMPLAINT filed by Office Depot, Inc., Office Depot, LLC, OfficeMax North America, Inc. and OfficeMax Incorporated. (Filing fee $ 402.00 receipt number AGANDC-10498340) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit -A -Complaint, #2 Exhibit -B -Summons -Office Depot, LLC, #3 Exhibit -C -Summons -Office Depot, Inc., #4 Exhibit -D -Summons -OfficeMax Incorp., #5 Exhibit -E -Summons -OfficeMax North America, #6 Exhibit -F -Civil Cover Sheet, #7 Exhibit -G -Discovery, #8 Exhibit -H -Sheriff's Service -Office Depot, LLC, #9 Exhibit -I -Sheriff's Service -Office Depot, Inc., #10 Exhibit -J -Sheriff's Service -Office Max Incorp., #11 Exhibit -K -Sheriff's Srvice -OfficeMax North America, #12 Exhibit -L -Defendants Answer, #13 Exhibit -M -Notice of Removal (State Court), #14 Civil Cover Sheet)(eop) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Reeves v. Office Depot, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Barbara Reeves
Represented By: Emily Verhine
Represented By: Robert Michael Coker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Office Depot, Inc.
Represented By: Elizabeth Googe Brunette
Represented By: Robert Bruce Wedge
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: OfficeMax North America, Inc.
Represented By: Elizabeth Googe Brunette
Represented By: Robert Bruce Wedge
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Does (1-3)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: OfficeMax Incorporated
Represented By: Elizabeth Googe Brunette
Represented By: Robert Bruce Wedge
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: XYZ Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ABC Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Office Depot, LLC
Represented By: Elizabeth Googe Brunette
Represented By: Robert Bruce Wedge
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?