United States of America et al v. Home Depot, U.S.A., Inc.
Plaintiff: The Commonwealth of Massachusetts Executive Office of Workforce Development, The State of Rhode Island, Department of Labor Standards, The State of Utah and United States of America
Defendant: Home Depot, U.S.A., Inc.
Case Number: 1:2020cv05112
Filed: December 17, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: Mark H Cohen
Nature of Suit: Environmental Matters
Cause of Action: 15:2616
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 28, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 TENTH AMENDMENT TO GENERAL ORDER 20-01 RE: COURT OPERATIONS UNDER THE EXIGENT CIRCUMSTANCES CREATED BY COVID-19 AND RELATED CORONAVIRUS. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 01/27/2021. (adg) (ADI)
January 8, 2021 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Adam G. Sowatzka on behalf of Home Depot, U.S.A., Inc. (Sowatzka, Adam)
January 7, 2021 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting #6 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Michael Doheny; and granting #7 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Marina V. Thomas by CRD at the direction of the Court. Approvedby Judge Mark H. Cohen on January 7, 2021. If the applicant does not have CM/ECF access in the Northern District of Georgia already, they must request access at http://pacer.gov. If they have electronically filed in this district in a previous case, please omit this step.(lwb)
January 7, 2021 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting #8 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Alison B. Hoffman by CRD at the direction of the Court. Approved by Judge Mark H. Cohen on January 7, 2021. If the applicant does not have CM/ECF access in the Northern District of Georgia already, they must request access at http://pacer.gov. If they have electronically filed in this district in a previous case, please omit this step.(lwb)
January 6, 2021 APPROVAL by Clerks Office re: #8 APPLICATION for Admission of Alison B Hoffman Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-10560992).. Attorney Alison B. Hoffman added appearing on behalf of The State of Rhode Island (nmb)
January 4, 2021 Filing 8 APPLICATION for Admission of Alison B Hoffman Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-10560992).by The State of Rhode Island. (Durbin, Joan) Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse.
December 29, 2020 APPROVAL by Clerks Office re: #7 APPLICATION for Admission of Marina V Thomas Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-10526047).. Attorney Marina V. Thomas added appearing on behalf of The State of Utah (nmb)
December 29, 2020 APPROVAL by Clerks Office re: #6 APPLICATION for Admission of Michael Doheny Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-10525388).. Attorney Michael Doheny added appearing on behalf of Department of Labor Standards, The Commonwealth of Massachusetts Executive Office of Workforce Development (nmb)
December 23, 2020 Filing 7 APPLICATION for Admission of Marina V Thomas Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-10526047).by The State of Utah. (Durbin, Joan) Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse.
December 23, 2020 Filing 6 APPLICATION for Admission of Michael Doheny Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-10525388).by Department of Labor Standards, The Commonwealth of Massachusetts Executive Office of Workforce Development. (Durbin, Joan) Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse.
December 18, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Joan Redleaf Durbin on behalf of The Commonwealth of Massachusetts Executive Office of Workforce Development, The State of Rhode Island, The State of Utah (Durbin, Joan)
December 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 STANDING ORDER REGARDING CIVIL LITIGATION. Signed by Judge Mark H. Cohen on 12/18/2020. (rjs)
December 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 NINTH AMENDMENT TO GENERAL ORDER 20-01 RE: COURT OPERATIONS UNDER THE EXIGENT CIRCUMSTANCES CREATED BY COVID-19 AND RELATED CORONAVIRUS. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 12/08/2020. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 12/08/2020. (rvb)
December 17, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE Of Lodging Proposed Consent Decree by United States of America (Attachments: #1 Proposed Consent Decree)(rvb)
December 17, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by The State of Rhode Island, United States of America, The State of Utah, The Commonwealth of Massachusetts Executive Office of Workforce Development, Department of Labor Standards. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(rvb) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America et al v. Home Depot, U.S.A., Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: The Commonwealth of Massachusetts Executive Office of Workforce Development
Represented By: James D. Freeman
Represented By: Joan Redleaf Durbin
Represented By: Lori M. Beranek
Represented By: Michael Doheny
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: The State of Rhode Island
Represented By: James D. Freeman
Represented By: Joan Redleaf Durbin
Represented By: Lori M. Beranek
Represented By: Alison B. Hoffman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Department of Labor Standards
Represented By: James D. Freeman
Represented By: Lori M. Beranek
Represented By: Joan Redleaf Durbin
Represented By: Michael Doheny
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: The State of Utah
Represented By: James D. Freeman
Represented By: Joan Redleaf Durbin
Represented By: Lori M. Beranek
Represented By: Marina V. Thomas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Lori M. Beranek
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Home Depot, U.S.A., Inc.
Represented By: Adam G. Sowatzka
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?