Walker v. Commissioner of The Social Security Administration
Plaintiff: Angela Walker
Defendant: Andrew M. Saul
Case Number: 1:2020cv05221
Filed: December 27, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: John K Larkins
Referring Judge: William M Ray
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XVI
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 16, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 16, 2021 Filing 7 Return of Service Executed by Angela Walker. Andrew M. Saul served on 1/4/2021, answer due 4/14/2021. (Attachments: #1 Supplement Certified Return Receipts)(Jackson, Forrest) Modified on 2/17/2021 to edit text. (cmd)
January 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 TENTH AMENDMENT TO GENERAL ORDER 20-01 RE: COURT OPERATIONS UNDER THE EXIGENT CIRCUMSTANCES CREATED BY COVID-19 AND RELATED CORONAVIRUS. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 01/27/2021. (adg) (ADI)
December 28, 2020 Filing 5 COMPLAINT filed by Angela Walker. (Attachments: #1 ASSIGNMENT OF EAJA FEE, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(bdb) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form.
December 28, 2020 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Andrew M. Saul, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. (Attachments: #1 Summons U. S. Attorney, #2 Summons U. S. Attorney General)(bdb)
December 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER granting pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915(a) #1 Application for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis as it appears that she is without sufficient funds to pay the fees and costs of this action and still provide for the necessities of life. Plaintiff shall be allowed to proceed without payment of filing fees, service costs, or any costs of court. Plaintiff is DIRECTED to serve the appropriate parties. Signed by Magistrate Judge John K. Larkins, III on 12/28/2020. (bdb)
December 28, 2020 Submission of #1 APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis, to Magistrate Judge John K. Larkins. (bdb)
December 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2 NINTH AMENDMENT TO GENERAL ORDER 20-01 RE: COURT OPERATIONS UNDER THE EXIGENT CIRCUMSTANCES CREATED BY COVID-19 AND RELATED CORONA VIRUS. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 12/8/2020. (bdb)
December 27, 2020 Filing 1 APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Angela Walker. (Attachments: #1 IFP Application, #2 Complaint, #3 Assignment of EAJA Fees, #4 Civil Cover Sheet, #5 Summons SSA, #6 Summons US Atty General, #7 Summons US Atty)(bdb)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Walker v. Commissioner of The Social Security Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Angela Walker
Represented By: Forrest Earl Jackson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrew M. Saul
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?