Assurant U.S. Insurance Company, Inc. et al v. Sherman et al
Plaintiff: American Bankers Insurance Company of Florida and Assurant U.S. Insurance Company, Inc.
Defendant: Michael C. Turner, Yakeisha Perry Sherman, Victor Elijah Sherman and Stacy Sherman, Jr.
Case Number: 1:2020cv05273
Filed: December 30, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: Mark H Cohen
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:2201
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 23, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 23, 2021 Filing 10 ANSWER to #1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand by Stacy Sherman, Jr, Victor Elijah Sherman, Yakeisha Perry Sherman. Discovery ends on 7/23/2021.(Douglas, Chaka) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov to obtain Pretrial Instructions.
February 23, 2021 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Chaka Michael Douglas on behalf of Stacy Sherman, Jr, Victor Elijah Sherman, Yakeisha Perry Sherman (Douglas, Chaka)
January 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 TENTH AMENDMENT TO GENERAL ORDER 20-01 RE: COURT OPERATIONS UNDER THE EXIGENT CIRCUMSTANCES CREATED BY COVID-19 AND RELATED CORONAVIRUS. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 01/27/2021. (adg) (ADI)
January 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 STANDING ORDER regarding civil litigation. Signed by Judge Mark H. Cohen on 1/6/21. (jpa)
December 31, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 NINTH AMENDMENT TO GENERAL ORDER 20-01 RE: COURT OPERATIONS UNDER THE EXIGENT CIRCUMSTANCES CREATED BY COVID-19 AND RELATED CORONA VIRUS. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 12/8/20. (eop)
December 30, 2020 Filing 5 Electronic Summons Issued as to Michael C. Turner. (eop)
December 30, 2020 Filing 4 Electronic Summons Issued as to Stacy Sherman, Jr.. (eop)
December 30, 2020 Filing 3 Electronic Summons Issued as to Yakeisha Perry Sherman. (eop)
December 30, 2020 Filing 2 Electronic Summons Issued as to Victor Elijah Sherman. (eop)
December 30, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT FOR DECLARATORY JUDGMENT with Jury Demand filed by Assurant U.S. Insurance Company, Inc. and American Bankers Insurance Company of Florida. (Filing fee $402.00, receipt number AGANDC-10547295) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit -A, #2 Exhibit -B, #3 Exhibit -C, #4 Civil Cover Sheet)(eop) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Assurant U.S. Insurance Company, Inc. et al v. Sherman et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: American Bankers Insurance Company of Florida
Represented By: Burke Anthony Noble
Represented By: Michael L. Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Assurant U.S. Insurance Company, Inc.
Represented By: Burke Anthony Noble
Represented By: Michael L. Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael C. Turner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Yakeisha Perry Sherman
Represented By: Harold L. Johnson
Represented By: Chaka Michael Douglas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Victor Elijah Sherman
Represented By: Harold L. Johnson
Represented By: Chaka Michael Douglas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stacy Sherman, Jr.
Represented By: Harold L. Johnson
Represented By: Chaka Michael Douglas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?