Froehlich et al v. Stout Kaiser, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Ryan Froehlich and FS Comm, LLC
Defendant: Stout Kaiser, LLC, Andrew C. Matteson and Stout Kaiser Matteson Peake & Hendrick, LLC
Case Number: 1:2020cv05274
Filed: December 30, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: Eleanor L Ross
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Arbitration
Cause of Action: 09 U.S.C. ยง 09
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 11, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 11, 2021 Filing 12 STIPULATION of Dismissal with Prejudice by FS Comm, LLC, Ryan Froehlich. (Fuchs, Dean)
February 11, 2021 Clerk's Entry of Dismissal APPROVING #12 Stipulation of Dismissal With Prejudice pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P.41(a)(1)(A)(ii) (jpk)
February 11, 2021 Civil Case Terminated. (jpk)
January 29, 2021 Submission of #1 Petition to Confirm Arbitration Award and for Entry of Judgment to District Judge Eleanor L. Ross. (jpk)
January 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 TENTH AMENDMENT TO GENERAL ORDER 20-01 RE: COURT OPERATIONS UNDER THE EXIGENT CIRCUMSTANCES CREATED BY COVID-19 AND RELATED CORONAVIRUS. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 01/27/2021. (adg) (ADI)
January 27, 2021 Filing 10 Certificate of Interested Persons by Stout Kaiser, LLC. (Whitlock, Kathryn)
January 27, 2021 Filing 9 ANSWER to Petition for Arbitration by Stout Kaiser, LLC.(Whitlock, Kathryn) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov to obtain Pretrial Instructions.
January 27, 2021 Clerks Notation re #10 Certificate of Interested Persons/Corporate Disclosures of Stout Kaiser, LLC.. Read and approved by District Judge Eleanor L. Ross. (mlb)
January 19, 2021 Filing 8 NOTICE FROM THE COURT: INSTRUCTIONS FOR CIVIL CASES ASSIGNED TO THE HONORABLE ELEANOR L. ROSS. (mlb)
January 11, 2021 Notification of Docket Correction re #6 Return of Service Executed by Ryan Froehlich, FS Comm, LLC. Andrew C. Matteson served on 1/6/2021, answer due 1/27/2021. (Fuchs, Dean) Modified on 1/11/2021 to edit date served and answer due date (jpk). (jpk)
January 11, 2021 Clerks Notation re #7 Certificate of Interested Persons/Corporate Disclosures of FS Comm, LLC and Ryan Froehlich. Read and approved by District Judge Eleanor L. Ross. (mlb)
January 11, 2021 Notification of Docket Correction re #5 Return of Service Executed by Ryan Froehlich, FS Comm, LLC. Stout Kaiser, LLC served on 1/6/2021, answer due 1/27/2021. (Fuchs, Dean) Modified on 1/11/2021 to edit date served and answer due date (jpk). (jpk)
January 8, 2021 Filing 7 Certificate of Interested Persons by FS Comm, LLC, Ryan Froehlich. (Fuchs, Dean)
January 8, 2021 Filing 6 Return of Service Executed by Ryan Froehlich, FS Comm, LLC. Andrew C. Matteson served on 1/6/2021, answer due 1/27/2021. (Fuchs, Dean) Modified on 1/11/2021 to edit date served and answer due date (jpk).
January 8, 2021 Filing 5 Return of Service Executed by Ryan Froehlich, FS Comm, LLC. Stout Kaiser, LLC served on 1/6/2021, answer due 1/27/2021. (Fuchs, Dean) Modified on 1/11/2021 to edit date served and answer due date (jpk).
December 31, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 NINTH AMENDMENT TO GENERAL ORDER 20-01 RE: COURT OPERATIONS UNDER THE EXIGENT CIRCUMSTANCES CREATED BY COVID-19 AND RELATED CORONA VIRUS. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 12/8/20. (eop)
December 30, 2020 Filing 3 Electronic Summons Issued as to Andrew C. Matteson. (eop)
December 30, 2020 Filing 2 Electronic Summons Issued as to Stout Kaiser, LLC. (eop)
December 30, 2020 Filing 1 PETITION to Confirm Arbitration Award and for Entry of Judgment filed by Ryan Froehlich and FS Comm, LLC. (Filing fee $402.00, receipt number AGANDC-10547419) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(eop) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Froehlich et al v. Stout Kaiser, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stout Kaiser, LLC
Represented By: Kathryn S. Whitlock
Represented By: Stephen William Rothring
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrew C. Matteson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stout Kaiser Matteson Peake & Hendrick, LLC
Represented By: Kathryn S. Whitlock
Represented By: Stephen William Rothring
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ryan Froehlich
Represented By: Dean R. Fuchs
Represented By: David Lawrence Turner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: FS Comm, LLC
Represented By: Dean R. Fuchs
Represented By: David Lawrence Turner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?