Plaintiff v. Defendant
Plaintiff: Plaintiff
Defendant: Defendant
Case Number: 1:2020mi99999
Filed: December 27, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Georgia
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 25, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 25, 2020 Filing 3004 Case Initiating Documents-Complaint Carol Rinderknecht vs. Ethicon, Inc.. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number AGANDC-10186925. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Kinsman, Robert)
September 25, 2020 Filing 3003 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:20-CV-3974. NO E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Notice of Removal, Akiko Bannister Marsh vs. Penske Logistics, LLC. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number AGANDC-10186670. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-Complaint filed 4.29.2020, #2 Exhibit B-First Amended Complaint filed 6.4.2020, #3 Exhibit C-Penske Answer to First Amended Complaint filed 7.8.2020, #4 Exhibit D-Consent Motion to Substitute filed 8.18.2020, #5 Exhibit E-Order Granting Motion to Substitute filed 8.27.2020, #6 Exhibit F-Second Amended Complaint filed 8.31.2020, #7 Exhibit G-Demand 9-25-2020, #8 Exhibit H-Penske Answer to Second Amended Complaint filed 9.24.2020, #9 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet)(Bennett, Quinn)(smw).
September 25, 2020 Filing 3002 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:20-CV-3973. NO E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint Lashone Hollis vs. Andrew Saul, Commissioner of Social Security Administration. No payment received. (Attachments: #1 Pauper Proposed Order, #2 Complaint, #3 Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Summons US Attorney, #5 Summons Office Regional Chief Counsel, #6 Summons Attorney General)(Piemonte, George)SUMMONS WILL BE ISSUED BY THE DOCKET CLERK UPON IFP APPROVAL(smw).
September 25, 2020 Filing 3001 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:20-CV-3972 MHC 465 05:0702 FIVE E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint OLANRELE vs. WOLF. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number AGANDC-10186311. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #7 Summons Barr, #8 Summons Cuccinelli, #9 Summons Miller, #10 Summons Pak, #11 Summons Wolf)(Fogle, H.)(smw).
September 25, 2020 Filing 3000 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:20-CV-3971 LMM 820 28:1338cp. TWO E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint Barry Rosen vs. United Pool Management, Inc. dba USA Pool Management, LLC. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number AGANDC-10186268. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Registration, #2 Exhibit 2 - Infringement, #3 Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Summons, #5 Summons, #6 Form AO121, #7 Certificate of Interested Parties)(Rothman, Joel)(smw).
September 25, 2020 Filing 2999 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:20-CV-3970 ELR 850 15:0080. TWO E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint Securities and Exchange Commission vs. Lindner Capital Advisors, Inc.. No payment received. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Summons)(Hicks, William)(smw).
September 25, 2020 Filing 2998 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:20-CV-3969 SDG JKL 442 42:2000sx. TWO E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint Jasmine Brown vs. Hire Dynamics, LLC. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number AGANDC-10185676. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons to Hire Dynamics, #3 Summons to De Wafelbakkers)(Miller, Adian)(smw).
September 25, 2020 Filing 2997 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:20-CV-3968 WMR 830 28:1338pt. ONE E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint Karmagreen, LLC vs. Mossad & J Distribution Inc.. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number BGANDC-10185616. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Patent, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Summons)(Covington, Troy)(smw).
September 24, 2020 Filing 2996 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:20-CV-3966 SCJ 350 28:1441mv. NO E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Notice of Removal, Charles M. Adams vs. Karsten Lamar Perry. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number AGANDC-10183683. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit D-1 - State Court Documents, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Exhibit Defendants' Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement, #4 Exhibit Answer of Defendant Perry, #5 (Exhibit Answer of Defendant Drivelink Services, LLC)(Wyrick, Jason){smw).
September 24, 2020 Filing 2995 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:20-CV-3965 CC 190 28:1332bc. ONE E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint CitiMortgage, Inc. vs. Suzanna Sligh. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number AGANDC-10183259. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Exhibit Motion to Enforce Settlement Agreement, #4 Exhibit Opinion and Ordeer)(Howell, Erin)(smw).
September 24, 2020 Filing 2994 FILED IN WRONG DIVISION. CIVIL ACTION NO: 4:20-cv-0219 AT 350 28:1441mv Case Initiating Documents-Notice of Removal, Robert Allen Barfield vs. Dash Point Distributing, LLC. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number AGANDC-10182783. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Defendant Dash Point Distributing LLCs Answers to Plaintiff's Complaint, #4 Defendant Jeffrey Lee Hand's Answers to Plaintiff's Complaint, #5 Civil Cover Sheet)(Christopher, Mark) DOCUMENTS FILED IN INCORRECT DIVISION SHELL CASE. DOCUMENTS FORWARDED TO ROME ON 09/24/2020 BY SWB(smw).
September 24, 2020 Filing 2993 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:20-CV-3964 TCB CCB 480 15:1692. NO E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint Amanda Babbit vs. Credit Services, Inc,. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number AGANDC-10182917. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Berry, Matthew)(smw).
September 24, 2020 Filing 2992 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:20-CV-3963 TWT 360 28:1441pi. NO E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Notice of Removal, Sheila Weed vs. Publix Super Markets, Inc.. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number AGANDC-10182577. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Civil Cover Sheet)(Major, Gene)(smw).
September 24, 2020 Filing 2991 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:20-CV-3962 CAP 360 28:1441pi. NO E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Notice of Removal, IDONGESIT EKONG vs. TARGET CORPORATION. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number AGANDC-10182489. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet - NDGA, #2 Exhibit Exhibit A - Filing in USDC - Service Packet Target, #3 Exhibit Exhibit B - Plaintiff's Offer of Judgment, #4 Exhibit Exhibit C - Certificate of Incorporation, #5 Exhibit Exhibit D - Notice of Removal Filed in Douglas State Court)(Dermer, Stephen)(smw).
September 24, 2020 Filing 2990 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:20-CV-3961 SDG 360 28:1332pi. ONE E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint Rose vs. Becton, Dickinson, and Company. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number AGANDC-10182360. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)(Bailey, Charles)(smw).
September 24, 2020 Filing 2989 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:20-CV-3960 JPB 360 28:1332pi. ONE E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint Fuller vs. Becton, Dickinson, and Company. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number AGANDC-10182254. (Attachments: #1 Summons Summons, #2 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet)(Bailey, Charles)(smw).
September 24, 2020 Filing 2988 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:20-CV-3959 ELR 365 28:1332pl ONE E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint Richard Burnett vs. Amazon.com, Inc.. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number AGANDC-10182249. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)(Sleppy, David)(smw).
September 24, 2020 Filing 2987 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:20-CV-3958 WMR CMS 445 42:12101. ONE E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint JUSTIN SPRUILL vs. UNITED STATES COLD STORAGE, INC.. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number AGANDC-10182081. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Bradley, Nikeisha)(smw).
September 24, 2020 Filing 2986 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:20-CV-3957 MHC 791 29:1132. ONE E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint Renea Mosely vs. The Fresh Market, Inc.. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number AGANDC-10182018. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons Summons Form)(Karrh, Heather)(smw).
September 24, 2020 Filing 2985 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:20-CV-3956 LMM JKL 480 15:1681. ONE E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint Reshonda M. Smith vs. HireRight, LLC. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number AGANDC-10181801. Attachments: #1 Exhibit A to Complaint, #2 Exhibit B to Complaint, #3 Exhibit C to Complaint, #4 Civil Cover Sheet, #5 Summons)(Drake, E.)(smw).
September 24, 2020 Filing 2984 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:20-CV-3955 RWS 367 28:1332pl. NO E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint Richard Johnson vs. Ethicon. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number AGANDC-10181804. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Farnolo, Nicholas)(smw).
September 24, 2020 Filing 2983 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:20-CV-3954 TCB 350 28:1441mv. NO E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Notice of Removal, Ronny B. Shorts vs. Omar Jama. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number AGANDC-10181712. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Summons & Complaint, #2 Exhibit B - Defendants' Answer, #3 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet)(Pate, William)(smw).
September 24, 2020 Filing 2982 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:20-CV-3953 RWS 367 28:1332pl. NO E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint Matthew McConkey vs. Johnson & Johnson. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number AGANDC-10181085. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Harvey, William)(smw).
September 23, 2020 Filing 2981 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:20-CV-3952 MLB JSA 751 29:2601. ONE E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint Latisha Gerald vs. City of College Park, Georgia. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number AGANDC-10179212. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)(Keebaugh, Regan)(smw).
September 23, 2020 Filing 2980 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:20-CV-3951 CAP 110 28:1441in. NO E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Notice of Removal, Cynthia L. Nunnally vs. Berkshire Life Insurance Company of America. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number AGANDC-10178137. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Complaint Fulton Superior, #2 Exhibit B - Notice of Lawsuit and Request for Waiver of Service of Summons, #3 Exhibit C - General Civil and Domestic Relations Case Filing Information Form, #4 Exhibit D - Filing of Waiver of Service of Summons Form, #5 Exhibit E - NOR Fulton Superior, #6 Civil Cover Sheet, #7 Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement)(Bondurant, Elizabeth) (smw).
September 23, 2020 Filing 2979 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:20-CV-3950 SDG 470 18:1961. NO E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint Gerardo Cosme vs. Messer Financial Group Inc.. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number AGANDC-10177906. (Dalziel, Charles)CIVIL COVER SHEET NOT INCLUDED. NOTIFIED ATTORNEY TO FILE THE DOCUMENT IN THE OPEN CASE(smw).
September 23, 2020 Filing 2978 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:20-CV-3949 JPB 110 28:1441in. NO E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Notice of Removal, Enesa Mehic vs. Allstate Property and Casualty Insurance Company. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number AGANDC-10177850. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A - Summons and Complaint, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B - Plaintiff's Notice of Filing Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit Exhibit C - Perfected Sheriff's Entry of Service on Defendant, #4 Exhibit Exhibit D - Answer, #5 Verification of Marvin D. Dikeman, #6 Affidavit Affidavit of Marvin D. Dikeman, #7 Jury Demand, #8 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet)(Dikeman, Marvin)(smw).
September 23, 2020 Filing 2977 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:20-CV-3948 AT 110 28:2201in. TWO E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint Elite Integrated Medical, LLC vs. Hiscox, Inc.. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number AGANDC-10177478. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 01 to Complaint, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 02 to Complaint, #3 Exhibit Exhibit 03 to Complaint, #4 Exhibit Exhibit 04 to Complaint, #5 Exhibit Exhibit 05 to Complaint, #6 Exhibit Exhibit 06 to Complaint, #7 Exhibit Exhibit 07 to Complaint, #8 Exhibit Exhibit 08 to Complaint, #9 Exhibit Exhibit 09 to Complaint, #10 Exhibit Exhibit 10 to Complaint, #11 Exhibit Exhibit 11 to Complaint, #12 Summons Summons for Hiscox, Inc., #13 Summons Summons for Hiscox Dedicated Corporate Member Limited, as Representative Member of Syndicate 3624 at Lloyds, #14 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #15 Plaintiffs' Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement, #16 Plaintiffs' Notice of Related Case)(Porter, Theodore)(smw).
September 23, 2020 Filing 2976 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:20-CV-3947 MLB 350 28:1441mv. NO E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Notice of Removal, Annemarie Steinwarz vs. Dennis Young. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number AGANDC-10177446. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet)(Jenniges, Eric)(smw).
September 23, 2020 Filing 2975 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:20-CV-3946 MHC 362 28:1346pi. TWO E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint Tyler Self vs. United States of America. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number AGANDC-10177538. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons Summons For AG, #3 Summons Summons for NDGA-USA, #4 Exhibit Exhibit A, #5 Exhibit Exhibit B)(Rollins, Charles)(smw).
September 23, 2020 Filing 2974 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:20-CV-3945 LMM 365 28:1332pl. FIVE E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint Patricia Rodriguez vs. TEVA PHARMACEUTICALS USA, INC.. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number AGANDC-10177514. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons CooperSurgical, #3 Summons TEVA USA, #4 Summons TEVA Women's Inc., #5 Summons TEVA Women's LLC, #6 Summons Cooper Companies)(Hammers, Robert) (smw).
September 23, 2020 Filing 2973 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:20-CV-3944 CAP 465 08:1329. NO E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint Deposco, Inc. vs. USCIS. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number AGANDC-10177494. (Attachments: #1 Ex. 1 - redacted, #2 Ex. 2 - redacted, #3 Ex. 3, #4 Ex. 4 - redacted, #5 Ex. 5, #6 Ex. 6, #7 Ex. 7 - redacted, #8 Ex. 8 - redacted, #9 Ex. 9 - redacted, #10 Ex. 10 -redacted, #11 Civil Cover Sheet)(Lowther, Joshua)(smw).
September 23, 2020 Filing 2972 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:20-CV-3943 ELR WEJ 445 42:12101. NO E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint Sandra Porter vs. Rogers Benefit Group, Inc.. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number AGANDC-10177422. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet)(Carter, Meredith)(smw).
September 23, 2020 Filing 2971 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:20-CV-3942 ELR 365 28:1332pl. FIVE E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint Allison Lewis vs. TEVA PHARMACEUTICALS USA, INC.. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number AGANDC-10176652. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons CooperSurgical, #3 Summons TEVA USA, #4 Summons TEVA Women's Inc., #5 Summons TEVA Women's LLC, #6 Summons Cooper Companies)(Hammers, Robert)(smw).
September 23, 2020 Filing 2970 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:20-CV-3939 LMM 350 28:1441mv. NO E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Notice of Removal, SOLOMON MILES vs. THE AUTO CLUB GROUP, INC.. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number AGANDC-10176479. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A-Summons and Complaint, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B- Pre-Suit Demand, #3 Exhibit Exhibit C- The Auto Club Group Certificate, #4 Exhibit Exhibit D- State Court Notice of Removal, #5 Exhibit Exhibit E- All Pleadings served on Defendant, #6 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet)(Kamensky, Lauren)(smw).
September 23, 2020 Filing 2969 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:20-CV-3938 TWT CCB 863 42:0405ww. NO E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint Mary Rachel vs. Andrew M Saul Commissioner of Social Security. No payment received. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Summons, #5 Summons, #6 Summons, #7 Motion to Proceed in Forma Paupres)(Comerford, Ida)(smw).
September 23, 2020 Filing 2968 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:20-CV-3937 MLB 350 28:1441mv. NO E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Notice of Removal, SHENICA GIBBS vs. PENSKE LOGISTICS, LLC d/b/a TRANSFREIGHT. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number AGANDC-10175567. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Complaint For Damages, #2 Exhibit 2 - Answer of Defendant Penske Truck Leasing Co., LP dba Penske Truck Rental, #3 Exhibit 3 - Answer of Defendants Penske Logistics, LLC and Old Republic Insurance Company, #4 Exhibit 4 - Order Dismissing Less Than All Parties Without Prejudice, #5 Exhibit 5 - June 8, 2020 Email, #6 Exhibit 6 - Plaintiff's Responses and Objections To Defendant Penske Logistics, LLC's First Continuing Interrogatories, First Request For Production of Documents, and First Request For Admissions To Plaintiff, #7 Exhibit 7 - Affidavit of Evan E. Smith, IV)(Smith, Evan)CIVIL COVER SHEET NOT INCLUDED. NOTIFIED ATTORNEY TO FILE THE DOCUMENT IN THE OPEN CASE(smw).
September 23, 2020 Filing 2967 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:20-CV-3936 MHC AJB 445 42:12101. NO E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint EQUAL EMPLOYMENT OPPORTUNITY COMMISSION vs. GENTIVA HEALTH SERVICES, INC. D/B/A KINDRED AT HOME. No payment received. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Flegal, Robyn)(smw).
September 22, 2020 Filing 2966 SUBMISSION of additional TRO CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:20-CV-3932 JPB. THREE E-SUMMONS ISSUED. attachments re: #2965 Case Initiating Documents-Complaint. (Attachments: #1 Brief MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT OF THE FTCS EX PARTE MOTION FOR TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER WITH ASSET FREEZE, IMMEDIATE ACCESS, APPOINTMENT OF TEMPORARY RECEIVER, AND OTHER EQUITABLE RELIEF, AND ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE WHY A PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION SHOULD NOT ISSUE, #2 Table of Exhibits, #3 Exhibit PX1 Declaration of Michael S. Liggins, #4 PX1 (Attachment A), #5 PX1 (Attachment B), #6 PX1 (Attachment C), #7 PX1 (Attachment D), #8 PX1 (Attachment E), #9 PX1 (Attachment F), #10 PX1 (Attachment G), #11 PX1 (Attachment H), #12 PX1 (Attachment I), #13 PX1 (Attachment J), #14 PX1 (Attachment K), #15 PX1 (Attachment L), #16 PX1 (Attachment M), #17 PX1 (Attachment N), #18 PX1 (Attachment O), #19 PX1 (Attachment P), #20 PX1 (Attachment Q), #21 Exhibit PX2 (Enom Inc.), #22 Exhibit PX3 (GoDaddy ), #23 Exhibit PX4 (Actum Processing, LLC), #24 Exhibit PX5 (Ameris Bank), #25 Exhibit PX6 (ADP, LLC), #26 Exhibit PX7 (Esquire Bank, N.A), #27 Exhibit PX9 (PNC Bank, N.A), #28 Exhibit PX10 (TSYS Merchant Solutions, LLC), #29 Exhibit PX11 (Voxtelesys LLC), #30 Exhibit PX12 (Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.), #31 Exhibit PX13 (Woodforest National Bank), #32 Exhibit PX14 (Declaration of Ann Cymanski)(Signet Jewelers LTD), #33 Exhibit PX15 (Declaration of Sarah Barkulis), #34 Exhibit PX16 (Declaration of Laurelle Faust), #35 Exhibit PX17 (Declaration of Pamela Fichtel), #36 Exhibit PX18 (Declaration of Ryan Fitzgerald), #37 Exhibit PX19 (Declaration of Jessica Grant), #38 Exhibit PX20 (Declaration of Melissa Greenfield), #39 Exhibit PX21 (Declaration of Victoria Hans), #40 Exhibit PX22 (Declaration of Denetria McGlown), #41 Exhibit PX24 (Declaration of Shea Peterson), #42 Exhibit PX25 (Declaration of Alexa Rosen), #43 Exhibit PX26 (Declaration of Travis Short), #44 Exhibit PX27 (Declaration of Mary Staton), #45 Exhibit PX28 (Declaration of John Sterling), #46 Exhibit PX29 (Declaration of M. Nicholas Winter), #47 Exhibit PX30 (Declaration of Sean Wright), #48 Exhibit PX31 (Declaration of Bailey Young), #49 Exhibit PX32 (Assurance of Voluntary Compliance), #50 Exhibit PX33 (State of Georgia Production), #51 Exhibit PX34 (JP Morgan Chase Bank, N.A.), #52 Exhibit PX35 (Declaration of Tom Van Wazer- FTC Accountant), #53 Exhibit PX36 (Rule 65 Declaration of Hans Clausen), #54 Exhibit PX37 (Declaration of Jessica Phillips), #55 Exhibit PX38 (Declaration of Jamie Powell), #56 Recommendation of Receiver, #57 Attachment A to Recommendation of Receiver, #58 Attachment B to Recommendation of Receiver, #59 Text of Proposed Order Proposed TRO and other relief, #60 Summons Critical Resolution Mediation LLC, #61 Summons Parliament Services LLC, #62 Summons Brian Charles McKenzie, #63 PLAINTIFF FTCS EX PARTE MOTION TO TEMPORARILY SEAL THE CASE FILE, #64 MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFF FTCS EX PARTE MOTION TO TEMPORARILY SEAL THE CASE FILE, #65 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order (Motion to seal), #66 Civil Cover Sheet)(Rock, Robin) Modified on 9/23/2020 (smw).
September 22, 2020 Filing 2965 TRO - CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:20-CV-3932 JPB 890 15:1692. NO E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint. No payment received. (Rock, Robin)(smw).
September 22, 2020 Filing 2964 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:20-CV-3931 ELR 360 28:1441wd. NO E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Notice of Removal, Jose Antonio Camacho vs. Texas Roadhouse Holdings LLC. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number AGANDC-10173558. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Camacho - NOR Exhibit A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet Camacho - Civil Cover Sheet)(Bramlett, Payton)(smw).
September 22, 2020 Filing 2963 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:20-CV-3930 SCJ 820 28:2201dj. NO E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number AGANDC-10172832. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit, #3 Certificate of Interested Persons)(Sperry, Marcy)(smw).
September 22, 2020 Filing 2962 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:20-CV-3929 MHC CMS 480 15:1692. NO E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint Terry Baker vs. Hollis Cobb Associates, Inc. d/b/a Patient Accounts Bureau. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number AGANDC-10172540. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Berry, Matthew) (smw).
September 22, 2020 Filing 2961 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:20-CV-3927 CAP LTW 442 42:2000sx. ONE E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint Amber Edwards vs. Watts & Browning Engineers, Inc.. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number AGANDC-10172244. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)(Miller, Adian)(smw).
September 22, 2020 Filing 2960 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:20-CV-3926 AT 446 42:12101 ONE E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint Brown, Yvonne vs. BraDandEB, LLC. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number AGANDC-10172130. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)(Ehrlich, Craig)(smw).
September 22, 2020 Filing 2959 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:20-CV-3925 LMM JCF 480 15:1681. NO E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint Darsha Kaye Stuart vs. Experian Information Solutions, Inc. and Colony Brands, Inc.,. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number AGANDC-10169814. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Erkenbrack, Joseph)(smw).
September 22, 2020 Filing 2958 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:20-CV-3924 AT JSA 480 15:1681. NO E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint Sherri Lynn Haase vs. Experian Information Solutions, Inc. and Prosper Marketplace, Inc.,. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number AGANDC-10169752. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Erkenbrack, Joseph)(smw).
September 21, 2020 Filing 2957 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:20-CV-3921 TWT 465 05:0702. FOUR E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint Mauricio Garcia Moreno vs. Chad Wolf. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number AGANDC-10168290. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Summons, #7 Summons, #8 Summons, #9 Summons)(Claffey, Danielle)(smw).
September 21, 2020 Filing 2956 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:20-CV-3920 CAP 350 28:1441mv. NO E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Notice of Removal, Jamelle Tillman vs. Derrick Leavigne. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number AGANDC-10167677. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Process, pleadings and/or orders in this case, #2 Exhibit B - Copy of the Notice of Filing Notice of Removal, #3 Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Defendants' Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement)(Bentley, Elizabeth)(smw).
September 21, 2020 Filing 2955 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:20-CV-3919 MLB 370 28:1332fr. TWO E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint IOU CENTRAL, INC. d/b/a IOU FINANCIAL, INC. vs. ZAVALA FAMILY, INC. et al. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number AGANDC-10167482. (Attachments: #1 Summons Zavala Family, #2 Summons Jose Summons, #3 Summons Mayra Summons, #4 Civil Cover Sheet)(Wersant, Paul)SUMMONS FOR MAYRA WILL NOT BE ISSUED BECAUSE IT WAS ADDRESSED TO JOSE. NOTIFIED ATTORNEY TO RESUBMIT THE CORRECT SUMMONS IN THE OPEN CASE(smw).
September 21, 2020 Filing 2954 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:20-CV-3918 ELR 465 08:1329. FIVE E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint NWANKWO vs. WOLF. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number AGANDC-10166846. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Civil Cover Sheet civil cover sheet, #8 Summons Wolf, #9 Summons Cuccinelli, #10 Summons Miller, #11 Summons Barr, #12 Summons Pak)(Fogle, H.)(smw).
September 21, 2020 Filing 2953 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:20-CV-3917 SDG RDC 442 42:2000rl . ONE E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint MICHAEL LATTIMORE vs. RENT-A-TIRE/RENT-A-WHEEL, L.P.. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number AGANDC-10166805. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)(Bradley, Nikeisha)(smw).
September 21, 2020 Filing 2952 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:20-CV-3916 JPB CCB 442 42:2000sx. NO E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Notice of Removal, Mariah Bryant vs. Publix Super Markets, Inc.. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number AGANDC-10166675. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Marquardt, Elizabeth) CIVIL COVER SHEET WAS NOT INCLUDED. NOTIFIED ATTORNEY TO FILE THE DOCUMENT IN THE OPEN CASE(smw).
September 21, 2020 Filing 2951 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:20-CV-3915 TWT 465 05:0702. FIVE E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint SHOBANDE vs. WOLF. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number AGANDC-10166575. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Civil Cover Sheet civil cover sheet, #7 Summons Cuccinelli, #8 Summons Miller, #9 Summons Williams, #10 Summons Pak, #11 Summons Barr, #12 Summons Wolf)(Fogle, H.)(smw).
September 21, 2020 Filing 2950 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:20-CV-3913 TCB 820 28:1338cp. FOUR E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint Azar Walsh Architects, LLC vs. Summit Design Build, LLC. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number AGANDC-10166601. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit Exhibit C, #4 Civil Cover Sheet civil cover sheet, #5 Summons summons for 5791 Zebulon, #6 Summons summons for Robison, #7 Summons summons for SMA, #8 Summons summons for Summit)(Bailey, Benjamin)(smw).
September 21, 2020 Filing 2949 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:20-CV-3912 TWT 360 28:1441pi. NO E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Notice of Removal, Gail Coggins vs. Dollar Tree Stores, Inc. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number AGANDC-10166217. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit State Court Pleadings, #2 Exhibit Notice of Removal, #3 Exhibit pre-suit demand, #4 Civil Cover Sheet civil cover sheet)(Timmons, Kyle)(smw).
September 21, 2020 Filing 2948 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:20-CV-3911 CAP 350 28:1441mv. NO E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Notice of Removal, Ana G. Reynolds vs. Janvier Reginald. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number AGANDC-10166310. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-State Court File, #2 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover)(Cole, Brenton)(smw).
September 21, 2020 Filing 2947 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:20-CV-3910 SDG 370 28:1332fr. TWO E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint IOU CENTRAL, INC. d/b/a IOU FINANCIAL, INC. vs. SHAEN HARRINGTON, INC et al. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number AGANDC-10166136. (Attachments: #1 Summons Shean Harrinton, #2 Summons Jessica Harrington, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(Wersant, Paul)(smw).
September 21, 2020 Filing 2946 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:20-CV-3909 RWS 367 28:1332pl. NO E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint Marjorie Williams vs. Ethicon, Inc. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number AGANDC-10165938. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Cornell, Katherine)(smw).
September 21, 2020 Filing 2945 TRO - CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:20-CV-3907 WMR 360 28:1331pi. FOUR E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number AGANDC-10165600. (Attachments: #1 Summons Summons - Charles, #2 Summons Summons - Crowe, #3 Summons Summons - Evans, #4 Summons Summons - Mulroney, #5 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet)(Whitaker, Angelina)(smw).
September 21, 2020 Filing 2944 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:20-CV-3906 MLB RGV 220 28:1444. NO E-SUMMONS ISSUED. SUBMISSION of additional attachments re: #2867 Case Initiating Documents-Complaint,. (Robinson, Kendra)(smw).
September 21, 2020 Filing 2943 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:20-CV-3896 SCJ RDC 480 15:1692. NO E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint Lori Nichols vs. Ability Recovery Services, LLC. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number AGANDC-10164024. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Berry, Matthew)(smw).
September 21, 2020 Filing 2942 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:20-CV-3895 AT CCB 480 15:1692. NO E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint Leslie Ellis vs. Southwest Credit Systems, LP. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number AGANDC-10164004. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Berry, Matthew)(smw).
September 21, 2020 Filing 2941 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:20-CV-3894 TWT JKL 480 15:1692. NO E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint Shakira Harris vs. Carter-Young, Inc.,. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number AGANDC-10163984. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Berry, Matthew)(smw).
September 21, 2020 Filing 2940 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:20-CV-3893 SDG 140 28:1332ni. TWO E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint JH Stark Companies, a California Corporation vs. Christopher Martorella. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number AGANDC-10163822. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Certificate of Interest Persons)(Puccini, Margaret) (smw).
September 20, 2020 Filing 2939 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:20-CV-3892 MHC AJB 751 29:2601. ONE E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint Rhonda Wilson vs. Pyramid Consulting, Inc.. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number AGANDC-10162851. (Attachments: #1 Summons Summons to Defendant Pyramid Consulting, Inc., #2 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet)(Martin, Thomas)(smw).
September 19, 2020 Filing 2938 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:20-CV-3891 MHC 830 28:1338pt. TWO E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint Aegis 11 S.A. vs. Hisense Company, Ltd.. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number AGANDC-10162549. (Attachments: #1 Ex. A - US 9,350,434, #2 Ex. B - 434 claim chart - 802.11ac-2013, #3 Ex. C - US 9,848,443, #4 Ex. D - 443 claim chart - 802.11-2016, #5 Ex. E - US 9,584,200, #6 Ex. F - 200 claim chart - 802.11ac-2013, #7 Civil Cover Sheet, #8 Form AO 120, #9 Summons to Hisense Company Ltd., #10 Summons to Hisense USA Corp, #11 Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement)(Kent, Daniel)(smw).
September 19, 2020 Filing 2937 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:20-CV-3890 MHC 830 28:1338pt. TWO E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint Aegis 11 S.A. vs. Funai Electric Company, Ltd.. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number AGANDC-10162548. (Attachments: #1 Ex. A - US 9,350,434, #2 Ex. B - 434 claim chart - 802.11ac-2013, #3 Ex. C - US 9,848,443, #4 Ex. D - 443 claim chart - 802.11-2016, #5 Ex. E - US 9,584,200, #6 Ex. F - 200 claim chart - 802.11ac-2013, #7 Civil Cover Sheet, #8 Form AO 120, #9 Summons to Funai Corporation, #10 Summons to Funai Electric Company, #11 Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement)(Kent, Daniel)(smw).
September 19, 2020 Filing 2936 TRO - CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:20-CV-3889 ELR 840 15:1114. NO E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Notice of Removal. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number AGANDC-10162521. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service, #2 Exhibit Attachment A)(Debranski, Ronald)CIVIL COVER SHEET WAS NOT INCLUDED. NOTIFIED ATTORNEY TO FILE THE DOCUMENT IN THE OPEN CASE(smw).
September 18, 2020 Filing 2935 Case Initiating Documents-Complaint AN vs. WOLF. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number AGANDC-10161601. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Civil Cover Sheet Civil cover sheet, #6 Summons Wolf, #7 Summons Cuccinelli, #8 Summons Miller, #9 Summons Barr, #10 Summons Pak)(Fogle, H.)
September 18, 2020 Filing 2934 Case Initiating Documents-Notice of Removal, Cathy Frazier Segal vs. James Edward Trent. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number AGANDC-10161588. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Civil Cover Sheet)(Kingsley, Daniel)
September 18, 2020 Filing 2933 Case Initiating Documents-Complaint BLUE STAR KITCHEN, INC. vs. YUMARCUS C. MANUEL. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number AGANDC-10161033. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)(Maurer, Eric)
September 18, 2020 Filing 2932 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:20-CV-3885-RWS 367 28:1332pl. NO E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint Patrick A. Thomas vs. Ethicon, Inc.. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number AGANDC-10161265. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Richardson, Katelyn)(smw).
September 18, 2020 Filing 2931 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:20-CV-3884-RWS 367 28:1332pl. NO E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint Monica A. Puente vs. Ethicon, Inc.. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number AGANDC-10161186. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Richardson, Katelyn)(smw).
September 18, 2020 Filing 2930 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:20-CV-3883-ELR 360 28:1446pi. NO E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Notice of Removal, Thad McIntyre vs. The Atlanta Pride Committee. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number AGANDC-10161026. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Summons & Complaint, #2 Exhibit B - Defendants' Answer, #3 Exhibit C - Plaintiff's Discovery Responses, #4 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet)(Pate, William)(smw).
September 18, 2020 Filing 2929 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:20-CV-3882-JPB 820 28:1338cp. NO E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint KONTROLFREEK, LLC vs. JACQUES WEBSTER p/k/a TRAVIS SCOTT. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number AGANDC-10160735. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit)(Gregory, Lauren) (smw).
September 18, 2020 Filing 2928 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:20-CV-3881-SCJ 360 28:1446wd. NO E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Notice of Removal, GLORIA HARVEY vs. RENAISSANCE FOOD GROUP, LLC. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number AGANDC-10160582. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit Exhibit A - Copy of complaint and summons, #3 Exhibit Exhibit B - RFG Amended and Restated Operating Agreement, #4 Exhibit Exhibit C - GHGA Limited Liability Company Agreement, #5 Exhibit Exhibit D - Affidavit of Timothy Slaughter, #6 Exhibit Exhibit E - Declaration of Paul Bruns, #7 Exhibit Exhibit F - State Court Notice of Removal, #8 Exhibit Exhibit G -All pleadings filed in state court)(Atkinson, David)(smw).
September 18, 2020 Filing 2927 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:20-CV-3880-AT 791 29:1132. NO E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint Lolitha Bigby vs. Aetna Life Insurance Company. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number AGANDC-10160638. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet)(Karrh, Heather)(smw).
September 18, 2020 Filing 2926 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:20-CV-3879-TWT 360 28:1446pi. NO E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Notice of Removal, Cynthia Macaluso vs. GWR Georgia Property Owner LLC dba "Great Wolf Lodge". Filing fee $ 400, receipt number AGANDC-10160389. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Initication Form; complaint; summons; affidavits of service, #2 Exhibit Answers of Defendants, #3 Exhibit Affidavit in Support, #4 Exhibit Notice of Filing Notice of Removal)(Nanninga, Matthew)(smw).
September 18, 2020 Filing 2925 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:20-CV-3878-RWS 367 28:1332pl. TWO E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint Irene Gallegos vs. Ethicon, Inc. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number AGANDC-10159969. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Summons)(Elliott, J.)(smw).
September 18, 2020 Filing 2924 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:20-CV-3876-LMM 446 42:12101. TWO E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint Brown, Yvonne vs. H R C. Store, Inc.. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number AGANDC-10160015. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons as to Defendant H R C. Store, Inc., #3 Summons as to Defendant Hall's Crossing, LLC)(Ehrlich, Craig)(smw).
September 18, 2020 Filing 2923 TRO - IMMEDIATE HEARING REQUESTED 1:20-CV-3875-LMM 190 28:1332bc. TWO E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number AGANDC-10159918. (Attachments: #1 Summons Greg Hulsey, #2 Summons Commerce Bank, #3 Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Exhibit A, #5 Exhibit B, #6 Exhibit C, #7 Exhibit D, #8 Exhibit E, #9 Exhibit F, #10 Exhibit G, #11 Exhibit H, #12 Exhibit I, #13 Plaintiff's Emergency Motion for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction and Supporting Memorandum of Law, #14 Plaintiff's Motion for Expedited Discovery and Supporting Memorandum of Law, #15 Plaintiff's Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement)(Elkon, Michael)(smw).
September 18, 2020 Filing 2922 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:20-CV-3874-SDG-CMS 863 42:0405ww. NO E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint Teresa Duhart vs. Andrew M Saul Commissioner of Social Security. No payment received. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Summons, #5 Summons, #6 Summons, #7 Motion to Proceed in Forma Paupres)(Comerford, Ida)SUMMONS WILL BE ISSUED BY THE DOCKET CLERK UPON IFP APPROVAL(smw).
September 18, 2020 Filing 2921 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:20-CV-3873-JPB 320 28:1332lb. ONE E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Initiating Documents-Complaint Alfred Hagler vs. Tammy Rivera Williams. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number AGANDC-10159439. (Attachments: #1 Summons Proposed Summons, #2 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet)(Ross, Tremaine)(smw).
September 18, 2020 Filing 2920 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:20-CV-3872-LMM 422 28:0158. NO E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Bankruptcy Notice of Appeal, USBC Case#: 20-68124-sms. Notice of Appeal filed 9/17/2020 from Order entered 9/3/2020 by Appellant Hall Los Angeles WTS, LLC, et al.. Fee Paid: Yes. USBC Receipt No. 54393636.(Attachments: #1 Original NOA doc127, #2 Amended NOA doc129, #3 Appealed Order doc107, #4 Motion to leave to Appeal doc130, #5 Docket sheet)(Lugo, Yahaira)(smw).
September 18, 2020 Filing 2919 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:20-CV-3871-RWS 367 28:1332pl. NO E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint Sherry Lamb vs. Ethicon, Inc.. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number AGANDC-10159014. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Kinsman, Robert)(smw).
September 18, 2020 Filing 2918 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:20-CV-3870-RWS 367 28:1332pl. NO E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint Kimberly Frank vs. Ethicon, Inc.. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number AGANDC-10158981. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Kinsman, Robert)(smw).
September 18, 2020 Filing 2917 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:20-CV-3869-RWS 367 28:1332pl. NO E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint Sharon Bartlett vs. Ethicon, Inc.. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number AGANDC-10158949. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Kinsman, Robert)(smw).
September 18, 2020 Filing 2916 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:20-CV-3868-JPB 130 40:3131. TWO E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint United States of America Ex. Rel. Double P Grading, Inc. vs. 4K Global-ACC JV, LLC. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number AGANDC-10158908. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A-Liberty Bond, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B-Contract, #3 Exhibit Exhibit C-Pay Apps, #4 Exhibit Exhibit D-Notice, #5 Exhibit Exhibit E-Liberty Response, #6 Exhibit Exhibit F-2020 Notice, #7 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #8 Summons Summons-4K Global-ACC JV, LLC, #9 Summons Summons-Liberty Insurance Company)(Cathey, Matthew)(smw).
September 17, 2020 Filing 2915 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:20-CV-3859-AT-CMS 480 15:1681. ONE E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint LaKenya K. Monfort vs. Equifax Information Services LLC. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number AGANDC-10156612. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)(Bertschi, Craig) (smw).
September 17, 2020 Filing 2914 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:20-CV-3858-SDG. NO E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Notice of Removal, WILLIAM SAVALAS DAVIS vs. GREYHOUND LINES, INC.. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number AGANDC-10156379. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A (Complaint in Fulton Superior), #2 Exhibit B (Summons from Fulton Superior), #3 Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Notice to Plaintiff of Removal to Federal Court, #5 Verification of Contents of Notice of Removal, #6 Verification of Filing Notice of Removal in Fulton Superior)(Keith, Christopher)(smw).
September 17, 2020 Filing 2913 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:20-CV-3856-CAP 791 29:1132. NO E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint Roger Edeker vs. American United Life Insurance Company. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number BGANDC-10155868. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet)(Karrh, Heather)(smw).
September 17, 2020 Filing 2912 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:20-CV-3854-MHC 350 28:1446mv. NO E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Notice of Removal, Lisa Brown vs. Select Dedicated Solutions, LLC. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number AGANDC-10155032. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A - Plaintiff Depo, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B - Plaintiffs Pleadings, #3 Exhibit Exhibit C - Plaintiff Response to Interrogatory 15, #4 Exhibit Exhibit D - Plaintiff Response to Interrogatory 19, #5 Exhibit Exhibit E - State Court Notice of Removal, #6 Exhibit Exhibit F - Defendant's Pleadings, #7 Exhibit Exhibit G - Orders, #8 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet)(Hannay, John)(smw).
September 17, 2020 Filing 2911 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:20-CV-3853-LMM 365 28:1332pl. ONE E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint Daniel Lindvall vs. Monsanto Company. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number AGANDC-10154940. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Van Remmen, Gordon)(smw).
September 17, 2020 Filing 2910 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:20-CV-3852-AT 710 29:0201fd. ONE E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint Jennifer Williams vs. United States Postal Service. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number AGANDC-10154869. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Walker, Jermaine)(smw).
September 17, 2020 Filing 2909 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:20-CV-3851-SDG-JSA 863 42:0405ww. NO E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint Jonathan Devon Riles vs. Andrew M. Saul, Commissioner of Social Security. No payment received. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Summons, #5 Summons, #6 Summons, #7 Motion To Proceed In Forma Pauperis)(Comerford, Ida)SUMMONS WILL BE ISSUED BY THE DOCKET CLERK UPON IFP APPROVAL(smw).
September 17, 2020 Filing 2908 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:20-CV-3850-RWS 367 28:1332pl. NO E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint Rosemary Nixon vs. Ethicon, Inc.. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number AGANDC-10154551. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(McCarley, Matthew)(smw).
September 17, 2020 Filing 2907 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:20-CV-3849-CAP-LTW 442 42:2000sx. TWO E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint Jennifer West vs. YRC Worldwide, Inc. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number AGANDC-10154425. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons YRC Worldwide, Inc, #3 Summons Darnell White)(Attwood, Eleanor)(smw).
September 17, 2020 Filing 2906 CIVIL ACTION NO. 3:20-CV-0174-TCB 29:201FL 710 ONE E-SUMMONS ISSUED. FILED IN WRONG DIVISION. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint CANDANCE FORD vs. COMMUNITY ACTION FOR IMPROVEMENT, INC.. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number AGANDC-10153963. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)(Bradley, Nikeisha)DOCUMENTS FILED IN INCORRECT DIVISION SHELL CASE. DOCUMENTS FORWARDED TO NEWNAN ON 09/16/2020 BY SWB(smw). Modified on 9/17/2020 (dmb).
September 17, 2020 Filing 2905 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:20-CV-3855-ELR 360 28:1441pi. NO E-SUMMONS ISSUED. FILED IN WRONG DIVISION. Case Initiating Documents-Notice of Removal, Ivan Molina vs. The Kroger Co.. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number AGANDC-10153913. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Civil Cover Sheet, #5 Exhibit Kroger's Answer to Complaint, #6 Exhibit Kroger's Jury Demand)(Lisle, Sarah Raquel)DOCUMENTS FILED IN INCORRECT DIVISION SHELL CASE. DOCUMENTS FORWARDED TO ROME ON 09/17/2020 BY SWB(smw).
September 17, 2020 Filing 2904 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:20-CV-3848-JPB-JSA 480 15:1692. TWO E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint RICHARD J. LACHANCE vs. NORTHSTAR LOCATION SERVICES, LLC. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number AGANDC-10153602. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons Summons Northstar Collection Services, #3 Summons Summons Barclays Bank Delaware, #4 Exhibit Dunning Letter, #5 Exhibit Debt Validation Letter, #6 Exhibit USPS Proof of Delivery)(Honsalek, Brandon)(smw).
September 17, 2020 Filing 2903 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:20-CV-3847-WMR 190 28:1332bc. TWO E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint Lindsay M. Francis vs. Key Surgical LLC. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number AGANDC-10153412. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Exclusive License Agreement, #2 Exhibit B - Key Surgical - Find Your Georgia Rep, #3 Exhibit C - Key Surgical Sales Rep LinkedIn, #4 Exhibit D - Assignment from Mectra to KVI, #5 Exhibit E - Assignment from Miller to Co-Trustees, #6 Exhibit F - Key Surgical UK Web Page, #7 Exhibit G - Key Surgical DE Web Page, #8 Exhibit H - Big Fish Partners Partnership Agreement, #9 Exhibit I - Mectra-Miller Agreement, #10 Exhibit J - Email exchange between T. English and L. Francis, #11 Exhibit K - U.S. Patent No. 7,217,270, #12 Civil Cover Sheet, #13 Summons to Key Surgical LLC, #14 Summons to KVI LLC)(Alexander, Cortney)(smw).
September 16, 2020 Filing 2902 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:20-CV-3845-SCJ 446 42:12101. ONE E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint Holt, Dakota vs. Goodness Grocery, Inc.. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number AGANDC-10151587. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)(Ehrlich, Craig)(smw).
September 16, 2020 Filing 2901 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:20-CV-3844-MLB 710 29:0216b. TWO E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint Korey Montgomery vs. International Follies, Inc.. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number AGANDC-10151281. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons International Follies, Inc., #3 Summons Jack Braglia)(Dudley, Ainsworth)smw).
September 16, 2020 Filing 2900 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:20-CV-3843-LMM 440 28:1443. NO E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Notice of Removal, Nicole Coleman vs. City of East Point, GA. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number AGANDC-10151151. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A - Complaint for Damages, #3 Exhibit B - Pleadings and Orders, #4 Exhibit C - Notice of Filing Notice of Removal)(Maine, Dana)(smw).
September 16, 2020 Filing 2899 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:20-CV-3842-SCJ-RGV 480 15:1681. ONE E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint Michael Oliver, Jr., et al. vs. Peach State Federal Credit Union f/k/a Gwinnett Federal Credit Union. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number AGANDC-10151065. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Weiner, Andrew)(smw).
September 16, 2020 Filing 2898 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:20-CV-3841-CAP-WEJ 480 15:1681. ONE E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint Alvia DuBose, et al. vs. Flagstar Bancorp, Inc.. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number AGANDC-10150865. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Weiner, Andrew)(smw).
September 16, 2020 Filing 2897 TRO - CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:20-CV-3840-AT 840 15:1125. THREE E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number AGANDC-10150700. (Attachments: #1 Summons Summons Krayzman, #2 Summons Summons L Commerce, #3 Summons Summons Decor Sel, #4 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet)(Katz, Seth)(smw).
September 16, 2020 Filing 2896 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:20-CV-3839 JPB 720 28:1441lm. NO E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Notice of Removal, RACHEL BLANKENSHIP vs. GEORGIA ASSOCIATION OF EDUCATORS. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number AGANDC-10150245. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Declaration of Michael Thomas McGonigle, #2 Exhibit A-1 to Declaration of Michael Thomas McGonigle, #3 Exhibit A-2 to Declaration of Michael Thomas McGonigle, #4 Exhibit B - State Court Pleadings, #5 Exhibit C - Notice to State Court of Removal, #6 Motion for Leave to File Exhibit to Notice of Removal Under Seal, #7 Brief, #8 Exhibit A - Order to Seal Complaint, #9 Text of Proposed Order, #10 Complaint to be Filed Under Seal, #11 Civil Cover Sheet)(Abastillas, Noelle)(smw).
September 16, 2020 Filing 2895 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:20-CV-3838 WMR JSA 550 42:1983pr. NO E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Notice of Removal, CORANZO L. STERLING vs. LIEUTENANT MATTHEW KENNEDY. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number AGANDC-10150362. (Attachments: #1 State Notice of Removal, #2 Answer, #3 1 Petition, #4 2 Affidavit of Poverty, #5 3 Order IFP, #6 4 Change of Address, #7 5 Letter, #8 6 Other - Demand Discovery, #9 7 Order dtd 7/21/20, #10 8 Order dtd 8/27/20, #11 Civil Cover Sheet 1, #12 Civil Cover Sheet 2)(Lones, Laura)(smw).
September 16, 2020 Filing 2894 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:20-CV-3837 MHC 791 29:1001. NO E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint Eugene Scalia, Secretary of Labor, U.S. Department of Labor vs. Jamar International, Inc. dba Unitorq Actuators & Controls, Inc.. No payment received. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Ellis, Cameron)(smw).
September 16, 2020 Filing 2893 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:20-CV-3836 MHC AJB 863 42:0405wc. THREE E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint Lauren E. Jayne vs. Andrew Saul. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number AGANDC-10150287. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons)(Whitlow, Robert) (smw).
September 16, 2020 Filing 2892 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:20-CV-3835 LMM 110 28:2201in. THREE E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint OWNERS INSURANCE COMPANY vs. N.B.H. ENTERPRISES, INC. DBA KAM'S AUTO SALES. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number AGANDC-10150112. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - UL Complaint, #2 Exhibit B - Certified Policy, #3 Exhibit C - Reservation of Rights, #4 Civil Cover Sheet, #5 Summons N.B.H. Enterprises, Inc., #6 Summons Charles W. Howington, #7 Summons Angela Lofton)(Mercer, Dennis)(smw).
September 16, 2020 Filing 2891 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:20-CV-3834 SCJ 350 28:1441mv. NO E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Notice of Removal, Henry Hill vs. Todd A. Ruck, Inc.. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number AGANDC-10149944. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A: Summons and Complaint, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B: Notice of Filing Notice of Removal)(Stone, Parks)CIVIL COVER SHEET WAS NOT INCLUDED. NOTIFIED ATTORNEY TO FILE THE DOCUMENT IN THE OPEN CASE (smw).
September 16, 2020 Filing 2890 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:20-CV-3833 AT 446 42:12101. ONE E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint Michael Estrada vs. Petco Animal Supplies Stores, Inc.. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number AGANDC-10149872. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Brief Certificate of Interested Persons)(Pope, Matthew)(smw).
September 16, 2020 Filing 2889 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:20-CV-3832 CAP 365 28:1441pl. NO E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Notice of Removal, ETHAN CECCARINI vs. HARBOR FREIGHT TOOLS USA, INC.. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number AGANDC-10149775. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C)(Johnson, Myrece)(smw).
September 16, 2020 Filing 2888 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:20-CV-3831 JPB 465 08:1329. FIVE E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint HASAN vs. WOLF. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number AGANDC-10149512. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Civil Cover Sheet civil cover sheet, #4 Summons Wolf, #5 Summons Cuccinelli, #6 Summons Renaud, #7 Summons Barr, #8 Summons Pak)(Fogle, H.)(smw).
September 16, 2020 Filing 2887 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:20-CV-3830 WMR AJB 480 15:1692. NO E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint Angela Clark vs. Frost-Arnett Company. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number AGANDC-10149522. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Berry, Matthew)(smw).
September 16, 2020 Filing 2886 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:20-CV-3829 MHC RDC 480 15:1692. NO E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint Michael Pruitt vs. Life Line Billing Systems, LLC. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number AGANDC-10149430. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Berry, Matthew)(smw).
September 16, 2020 Filing 2885 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:20-CV-3828 MHC CCB 480 15:1681. NO E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint Phillip Lyons vs. Trans Union LLC and Wells Fargo Bank, National Association (Inc.) as successor by merger to Wells Fargo Home Mortgage. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number AGANDC-10149387. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Erkenbrack, Joseph)(smw).
September 16, 2020 Filing 2884 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:20-CV-3826 AT JKL 480 15:1692. NO E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint Leslie Gray vs. Asset Recovery Solutions, LLC. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number AGANDC-10147894. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Berry, Matthew)(smw).
September 15, 2020 Filing 2883 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:20-CV-3825 WMR 710 29:0216b. NO E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint Revilla vs. Atlanta Imports, Inc. d/b/a Suvidha Indo-Pak Groceries. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number AGANDC-10146234. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Thomas, Brandon)(smw).
September 15, 2020 Filing 2882 TRO - IMMEDIATE HEARING REQUESTED CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:20-CV-3824 MLB 840 28:1338tr. TWO HUNDRED FIFTY-EIGHT SUMMONS. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number AGANDC-10145751. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A to Plaintiff's Complaint, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Form AO120, #4 Summons, #5 Certificate of Interested Persons, #6 Motion for Ex Parte TRO, #7 Brief in Support of Motion for TRO, #8 Declaration of Stella Padovani, #9 Declaration of Jeffrey B. Sladkus, #10 Text of Proposed Order on Motion for Ex Parte TRO, #11 Motion for Authorization to Serve Process on Defendants by Electronic Means Pursuant to Rule 4(f)(3), #12 Brief in Support of Motion for Authorization to Serve Process on Defendants by Electronic Means Pursuant to Rule 4(f)(3), #13 Text of Proposed Order on Motion for Authorization to Serve Process on Defendants by Electronic Means Pursuant to Rule 4(f)(3))(Hanlon, Carrie)(smw).
September 15, 2020 Filing 2881 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:20-CV-3823 RWS 367 28:1332pl. NO E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint Eleanor Francis vs. Ethicon, Inc.. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number AGANDC-10145777. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Hollingsworth, Caroline)(smw).
September 15, 2020 Filing 2880 TRO - CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:20-CV-3822 TWT 840 15:1125a. ONE E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number AGANDC-10145478. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - trademark registration, #2 Affidavit Verification, #3 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Summons Summons - Terry Pitts, #5 Exhibit AO120, #6 Exhibit Motion for Preliminary Injunction, #7 Brief Brief in Support of Motion for Preliminary Injunction, #8 Affidavit Declaration of K. Groff, #9 Text of Proposed Order Proposed preliminary injunction order, #10 Exhibit Motion to exceed page numbers)(Lilenfeld, David)(smw).
September 15, 2020 Filing 2879 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:20-CV-3821-RWS 367 28:1332pl. NO E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint Juanita Maes vs. Ethicon, Inc.. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number AGANDC-10145673. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Hollingsworth, Caroline)(smw).
September 15, 2020 Filing 2878 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:20-CV-3820-SDG 840 15:1114. NO E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint Diversitech Corp. vs. Mainstream Engineering Corp.. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number AGANDC-10145467. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - (QwikProducts ND GA Wholesalers), #2 Exhibit B - (GENPAD Registration Certificate), #3 Exhibit C - (QwikHurricane Google Ad Words), #4 Exhibit D - (The Hurricane Pad), #5 Exhibit E - (Green Trade Dress), #6 Exhibit F - (Orange Trade Dress), #7 Exhibit G - (Yellow Trade Dress), #8 Exhibit H - (The Hurricane PAD Dress Specimen), #9 Civil Cover Sheet)(Garroway, Nathan)(smw).
September 15, 2020 Filing 2877 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:20-CV-3819-RWS 367 28:1332pl. NO E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint Lynette Bateman vs. Ethicon, Inc.. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number AGANDC-10145505. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Hollingsworth, Caroline)(smw).
September 15, 2020 Filing 2876 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:20-CV-3818-RWS 367 28:1332pl. NO E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint Johnny Simmons vs. Ethicon, Inc.. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number AGANDC-10145435. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Hollingsworth, Caroline)(smw).
September 15, 2020 Filing 2875 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:20-CV-3817-SDG-RDC 445 42:12101. ONE E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint Lisa Francis vs. Board of Regents of the University System of Georgia. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number AGANDC-10145284. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)(Werner, Daniel) (smw).
September 15, 2020 Filing 2874 CIVIL ACTION NO 1:20-CV-3816-CAP-LTW 863 42:0405wc. THREE E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint YVONNE LEA COYLE vs. ANDREW SAUL, COMMISSIONER OF SOCIAL SECURITY. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number AGANDC-10145145. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons Atty Gen, #3 Summons Defendant, #4 Summons US Atty)(Hogan, John)(smw).
September 15, 2020 Filing 2873 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:20-CV-3814-SDG 710 29:0216b. TWO E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint Josie Marmolejos vs. Savage Poultry, Inc.. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number AGANDC-10144605. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons Savage Poultry, Inc., #3 Summons William H. Savage III)( Taylor, Lisa)(smw).
September 15, 2020 Filing 2872 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:20-CV-3812-RWS 367 28:1332pl. NO E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint Gavin S. Erlenborn vs. Ethicon, Inc. and Johnson & Johnson. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number AGANDC-10143975. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet "A")(Bossier, Sheila)(smw).
September 15, 2020 Filing 2871 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:20-CV-3811-JPB-CCB 442 42:2000sx. TWO E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint Bridgett Marzett vs. Carolina Placement, Inc.. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number AGANDC-10143861. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Charge of Discrimination, #2 Exhibit B - Notice of Rights to Sue, #3 Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Summons to CPI, #5 Summons to DHL)(Mixon, J.)(smw).
September 15, 2020 Filing 2870 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:20-CV-3810 LMM 190 28:1332bc. ONE E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint SKB Industries, Inc. vs. Brouwer Kesmac a/k/a Kesmac, Inc.. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number AGANDC-10143165. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Phillips, Devin) (smw).
September 15, 2020 Filing 2869 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:20-CV-3809 WMR JKL 442 29:0791. NO E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint Oliver Jones vs. Ryan D. McCarthy, Secretary of the Army. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number AGANDC-10143336. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Scott, Justin)(smw).
September 15, 2020 Filing 2868 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:20-CV-3808 AT 710 29:0216b. TWO E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint Marlon Lee vs. Kennesaw Drywall & Supply, Inc.. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number AGANDC-10143113. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-Consents, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Summons, #4 Summons)(Weiner, Andrew)(smw).
September 14, 2020 Filing 2867 CASE SKIPPED BECAUSE THERE IS NO COMPLAINT OR NOTICE OF REMOVAL. WAITING ON CALL BACK FROM THE ATTORNEY. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint Clayton E. Bell vs. Bank of America, NA. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number AGANDC-10141723. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet civil cover sheet)(Robinson, Kendra)(smw).
September 14, 2020 Filing 2866 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:20-CV-3802 TWT 190 28:1332bc. NO E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint RAJON, LLC d/b/a VERTICAL AEROSPACE vs. DELTA FLIGHT PRODUCTS, LLC. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number AGANDC-10141324. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Civil Cover Sheet)(Morris, Anthony) (smw).
September 14, 2020 Filing 2865 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:20-CV-3801 CAP 350 28:1441mv. NO E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Notice of Removal, Jerome Johnson Jr. vs. Chaser Inc.. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number AGANDC-10141367. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A - Complaint, #3 Exhibit B - Pre-suit Demand, #4 Exhibit C - Notice of Removal to State Court, #5 American Hallmark Insurance Company Answer to Plaintiff's Complaint, #6 Chaser, LLC Answer to Plaintiff's Complaint, #7 Freeman Answer to Plaintiff's Complaint, #8 Corporate Disclosure Statement, #9 Jurisdictional Statement)(Dougherty, Brenden)(smw).
September 14, 2020 Filing 2864 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:20-CV-3800 SDG RDC 863 42:0405ww. NO E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint James Kiwon Yoon vs. Andrew M. Saul, Commissioner of Social Security. No payment received. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Summons, #5 Summons, #6 Summons, #7 Motion To Proceed In Forma Pauperis)(Comerford, Ida)SUMMONS WILL BE ISSUED BY THE DOCKET CLERK UPON IFP APPROVAL(smw).
September 14, 2020 Filing 2863 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:20-CV-3799 JPB 470 18:1962. NO E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint Zachary Hodges vs. GM Law Firm, LLC. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number AGANDC-10141136. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet)(Scarbrough, Tyler)(smw).
September 14, 2020 Filing 2862 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:20-CV-3798 WMR CCB 863 42:0405ww. NO E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint Stephen Willis vs. Andrew M. Saul, Commissioner of Social Security. No payment received. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Summons, #5 Summons, #6 Summons, #7 Motion for In Forma Pauperis)(Comerford, Ida)SUMMONS WILL BE ISSUED BY THE DOCKET CLERK UPON IFP APPROVAL(smw).
September 14, 2020 Filing 2861 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:20-CV-3797 MHC 465 05:0702. FIVE E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint Niranjan Pandey vs. William Barr. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number AGANDC-10140722. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons Summons Barr, #3 Summons Summons Koumans, #4 Summons Summons Pak, #5 Summons Summons Riddle, #6 Summons Summons Wolf, #7 Exhibit Exhibit A, #8 Exhibit Exhibit B, #9 Exhibit Exhibit C, #10 Exhibit Exhibit D, #11 Exhibit Exhibit E, #12 Exhibit Exhibit F, #13 Exhibit Exhibit G, #14 Exhibit Exhibit H, #15 Exhibit Exhibit I, #16 Exhibit Exhibit J)(Kuck, Phillip)(smw).
September 14, 2020 Filing 2860 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:20-CV-3796 AT JKL 863 42:0405ww. NO E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint O'Dell Bill Thomas vs. Andrew M. Saul, Commissioner of Social Security. No payment received. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Summons, #5 Summons, #6 Summons, #7 Motion to Proceed In Forma Pauperis)(Comerford, Ida)SUMMONS WILL BE ISSUED BY THE DOCKET CLERK UPON IFP APPROVAL(smw).
September 14, 2020 Filing 2859 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:20-CV-3795 RWS 367 28:1332pl. NO E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint Estate of Norman Miller vs. Ethicon, Inc.. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number BGANDC-10140365. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Hollingsworth, Caroline)(smw).
September 14, 2020 Filing 2858 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:20-CV-3794 MLB 446 42:12101. ONE E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint Holt, Dakota vs. Fatima Investments, Inc.. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number AGANDC-10140421. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)(Ehrlich, Craig)(smw).
September 14, 2020 Filing 2857 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:20-CV-3793 RWS 367 28:1332pl. NO E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint Kevin McLouth vs. Ethicon, Inc.. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number AGANDC-10140249. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Hollingsworth, Caroline)(smw).
September 14, 2020 Filing 2856 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:20-CV-3792 RWS 367 28:1332pl. NO E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint Michael Newman vs. Ethicon, Inc.. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number AGANDC-10139674. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(McEwen, Gregory)(smw).
September 14, 2020 Filing 2855 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:20-CV-3791 TWT 465 08:1329. FIVE E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint ONYEJIAKA vs. WOLF. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number AGANDC-10139399. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Civil Cover Sheet civil cover sheet, #8 Summons Wolf, #9 Summons Cuccinelli, #10 Summons Miller, #11 Summons Barr, #12 Summons Pak)(Fogle, H.)(smw).
September 14, 2020 Filing 2854 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:20-CV-3790 ELR 820 28:1338cp. TWO E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint Eric Champlin vs. Chapman Hall Realtors, Inc.. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number AGANDC-10139340. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Registration, #2 Exhibit 2 - Infringement, #3 Exhibit 3 - Demand Letters, #4 Civil Cover Sheet, #5 Report on the Filing of an Action Regarding a Copyright, #6 Summons, #7 Summons, #8 Certificate of Interested Persons & Corporate Disclosure)(Rothman, Joel)(smw).
September 14, 2020 Filing 2853 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:20-CV-3789 RWS 367 28:1332pl. NO E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint INEED ROBINSON vs. ETHICON INC.. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number AGANDC-10139352. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Smith, Michael)(smw).
September 14, 2020 Filing 2852 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:20-CV-3788 RWS 367 28:1332pl. NO E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint RUSSELL AUSTIN vs. ETHICON INC.. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number AGANDC-10139330. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Smith, Michael)(smw).
September 14, 2020 Filing 2851 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:20-CV-3787 RWS 367 28:1332pl. NO E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint Rosa C. Fernandez vs. Ethicon, Inc.. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number AGANDC-10139275. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Giovannone, Andrea)(smw).
September 14, 2020 Filing 2850 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:20-CV-3786 CAP 440 28:1443. NO E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Notice of Removal, Albert Robinson vs. Statewide Wrecker Service, Inc.. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number AGANDC-10139232. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A-Part 1 Pleadings, #3 Exhibit A-Part 2 Pleadings, #4 Exhibit A-Part 3 Pleadings, #5 Exhibit A-Part 4 Pleadings, #6 Exhibit A-Part 5 Pleadings, #7 Exhibit A-Part 6 Pleadings)(Hill, Robert)(smw).
September 14, 2020 Filing 2849 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:20-CV-3785 WMR 710 29:0216b. ONE E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Initiating Documents-Complaint Kevin Hope vs. Lazer Spot, Inc., a Georgia Corporation. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number AGANDC-10139146. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Notice of Filing Notice of Consent to Join, #3 Exh A to Notice of Filing, #4 Summons Proposed Summons)(Morgan, Charles)(smw).
September 14, 2020 Filing 2848 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:20-CV-3784 MLB CMS 480 15:1681. THREE E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint Jarrett C. Dempsey vs. Capital Accounts, LLC. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number AGANDC-10138933. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons Summons-Capital Accounts, #3 Summons Summons- Trans Union, #4 Summons Summons- Equifax, #5 Exhibit Exhibit 1, #6 Exhibit Exhibit 2, #7 Exhibit Exhibit 3, #8 Exhibit Exhibit 4, #9 Exhibit Exhibit 5)(Webb, Orion)(smw).
September 14, 2020 Filing 2847 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:20-CV-3783 ELR CMS 442 42:2000sx. ONE E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint Rachel Fletcher vs. Resurgens Orthopaedics. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number AGANDC-10138953. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)(Wilensky, Michael)(smw).
September 14, 2020 Filing 2846 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:20-CV-3782 ELR 422 28:0158. NO E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Bankruptcy Notice of Appeal, USBC Case#: 16-59003-bem, ADV case#: 16-5222. Notice of Appeal filed 9/11/2020 from Judgment entered 9/4/2020 by Appellant James Daniel Wisner. Fee Paid: Yes. USBC Receipt No. 54367106. (Attachments: #1 NOA doc81, #2 Appelaed Judgment doc79, #3 Docket sheet)(Lugo, Yahaira)(smw).
September 14, 2020 Filing 2845 CIVIL ACTION NO.1:20-CV-3781 MHC 350 28:1441mv. NO E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Notice of Removal, Lamont Jones vs. Penske Truck Leasing Corporation. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number AGANDC-10138842. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit Exhibit J, #11 Exhibit Exhibit K, #12 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet)(Hardee, James) (smw).
September 14, 2020 Filing 2844 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:20-CV-3780 RWS 367 28:1332pl. NO E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint Lawrence Speranske vs. Ethicon, Inc.. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number AGANDC-10138481. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Seeger, Christopher)(smw).
September 11, 2020 Filing 2843 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:20-CV-3777 CAP 365 28:1332pl. TWO E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint Tiffany Silvera vs. Apple, Inc. et. al.. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number AGANDC-10134720. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons Apple, Inc., #3 Summons Sprint Communications, Inc.)(Orren, Matthew)(smw).
September 11, 2020 Filing 2842 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:20-CV-3776 RWS 367 28:1332pl. NO E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint Carolyn A. Gunther vs. Ethicon, Inc.. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number AGANDC-10135124. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Richardson, Katelyn)(smw).
September 11, 2020 Filing 2841 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:20-CV-3775 RWS 367 28:1332pl. NO E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint Gloria J. Rivas vs. Ethicon. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number AGANDC-10135002. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Stokes, Kelsey)(smw).
September 11, 2020 Filing 2840 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:20-CV-3774 RWS 367 28:1332pl. NO E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint Susan A. Presley vs. Ethicon. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number AGANDC-10134932. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Stokes, Kelsey)(smw).
September 11, 2020 Filing 2839 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:20-CV-3773 RWS 367 28:1332pl. NO E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint Beverly S. Rhodes vs. Ethicon. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number AGANDC-10134806. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Stokes, Kelsey)(smw).
September 11, 2020 Filing 2838 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:20-CV-3772 SDG 350 28:1441mv. NO E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Notice of Removal, Karla White vs. Trevor Maddigan. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number AGANDC-10134889. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Underlying Case, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Le Jeune, Danielle)(smw).
September 11, 2020 Filing 2837 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:20-CV-3771 RWS 367 28:1332pl. NO E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint Holly Kaufmann Hall vs. Ethicon, Inc.. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number AGANDC-10134873. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Richardson, Katelyn)(smw).
September 11, 2020 Filing 2836 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:20-CV-3770 MLB 465 05:0702. FIVE E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint Armida Galvis de Torres vs. William P. Barr. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number AGANDC-10134782. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover sheet, #2 Summons Summons Barr, #3 Summons Summons Miller, #4 Summons Summons Cuccinelli, #5 Summons Summons Wolf, #6 Summons Summons U.S. Attorney Pak, #7 Exhibit Exhibit A, #8 Exhibit Exhibit B, #9 Exhibit Exhibit C, #10 Exhibit Exhibit D, #11 Exhibit Exhibit E, #12 Exhibit Exhibit F, #13 Exhibit Exhibit G, #14 Exhibit Exhibit H, #15 Exhibit Exhibit I, #16 Exhibit Exhibit J, #17 Exhibit Exhibit K)(Cookorinis, Cherie)(smw).
September 11, 2020 Filing 2835 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:20-CV-3769 JPB 791 28:1441er. NO E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Notice of Removal, Brenda Garland vs. Voya Services Company. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number AGANDC-10134626. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Meeks, Jo)(smw).
September 11, 2020 Filing 2834 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:20-CV-3764 CC JSA. SUBMISSION of additional attachments re: #2830 Case Initiating Documents-Complaint. (Coleman, Donald) (smw).
September 11, 2020 Filing 2833 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:20-CV-3767 ELR CMS 863 42:0405ww. NO E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint Mye'Dreciah Barnwell vs. Andrew M Saul Commissioner of Social Security. No payment received. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Summons, #4 Summons, #5 Summons, #6 Civil Cover Sheet, #7 Motion to Proceed in Forma Paupres)(Comerford, Ida)SUMMONS WILL BE ISSUED BY THE DOCKET CLERK UPON IFP APPROVAL(smw).
September 11, 2020 Filing 2832 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:20-CV-3766 MHC 446 42:12101. ONE E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint Brown, Yvonne vs. ASI Enterprise, Inc.. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number AGANDC-10133889. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)(Ehrlich, Craig)(smw).
September 11, 2020 Filing 2831 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:20-CV-3765 AT JSA 480 15:1692. NO E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint Toni-Shae Wiggins vs. Simm Associates, Inc.,. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number AGANDC-10133789. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Berry, Matthew)(smw).
September 11, 2020 Filing 2830 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:20-CV-3764 CC JSA 864 42:0405id. NO E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint Austin vs. Brooks. No payment received. (Coleman, Donald)IFP IS FILED IN SUBMISSION #2834 (smw).
September 11, 2020 Filing 2829 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:20-CV-3762 RWS 367 28:1332pl. NO E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint Middleton, Christopher vs. Ethicon, Inc.. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number AGANDC-10133354. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Giovannone, Andrea)(smw).
September 11, 2020 Filing 2828 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:20-CV-3760 CAP AJB 863 42:0405wc. NO E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint SHEREE Y. POPE vs. ANDREW SAUL, COMMISSIONER OF SOCIAL SECURITY. No payment received. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Motion to File IFP, #3 IFP Application, #4 Summons Atty Gen, #5 Summons Defendant, #6 Summons US Atty)(Hogan, John)SUMMONS WILL BE ISSUED BY THE DOCKET CLERK UPON IFP APPROVAL(smw).
September 11, 2020 Filing 2827 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:20-CV-3759 SDG LTW 863 42:0405wc. THREE E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint Luchria G. Noel vs. Andrew Saul. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number AGANDC-10132336. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)(Ginsberg, Jonathan)(smw).
September 11, 2020 Filing 2826 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:20-CV-3757 WMR 190 28:1332bc. TWO E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint GreenSky, LLC vs. Breaking Ground, LLC. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number AGANDC-10131994. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Civil Cover Sheet, #5 Summons to Breaking Ground, LLC, #6 Summons to Lamottis Woods)(Barnett, Keith)(smw).
September 11, 2020 Filing 2825 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:20-CV-3756 MLB 360 28:1441pi. NO E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Notice of Removal, Tyrone Clark a/k/a Tyron Clark vs. Wal-Mart Stores, Inc.. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number AGANDC-10131773. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A - Demand Letter, #3 Exhibit B - State Court Pleadings)(Lessinger, Howard)(smw).
September 10, 2020 Filing 2824 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:20-CV-3755 MHC RGV 480 15:1681. FIVE E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint Andrew Degan vs. Five Star Dodge, Inc.. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number AGANDC-10130539. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A - Five Star Dodge FBPA Ante Litem Notice, #3 Exhibit B - Capital One FBPA Ante Litem Notice, #4 Exhibit C - Five Stars Response to FBPA Ante Litem, #5 Exhibit D - Capital Ones Response to FBPA Ante Litem, #6 Exhibit E - Signed Authorization for Capital One, #7 Exhibit F - Follow-up Letter to Five Star, #8 Exhibit G - Follow-up Letter to Capital One, #9 Exhibit H - Letter Received from Capital One, #10 Exhibit I - Letter Received from Capital One, #11 Exhibit J - Acceleration Notice from Capital One, #12 Exhibit K - Plaintiffs' Credit Reports, #13 Exhibit L - Dispute Letters, #14 Exhibit M - Response to Dispute, #15 Exhibit N - Dispute Letters, #16 Exhibit O - Response from CRAs, #17 Certificate of Interested Persons, #18 Summons as to Five Star, #19 Summons as to Capital One, #20 Summons as to Equifax, #21 Summons as to Experian, #22 Summons as to Transunion)(Carlson, Clifford)(smw).
September 10, 2020 Filing 2823 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:20-CV-3754 LMM 465 05:0702. NO E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint Hamida Aziz vs. Chad F. Wolf. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number AGANDC-10130497. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1)(Radin, Samuel)CIVIL COVER SHEET WAS NOT INCLUDED. NOTIFIED ATTORNEY TO FILE THE DOCUMENT IN THE OPEN CASE(smw).
September 10, 2020 Filing 2822 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:20-CV-3753 AT 360 28:1441pi. NO E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Notice of Removal, Kierra C. Crawford vs. Starbucks Corporation. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number AGANDC-10130158. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit Ex. A All process, pleadings & orders served, #3 Exhibit Ex. B Defendants' Answer, #4 Exhibit Ex. C Email showing claimed damages, #5 Affidavit Ex. D Affidavit Supporting Removal, #6 Exhibit Ex. E Notice of Removal to State Court)(Gillis, Lucian)(smw).
September 10, 2020 Filing 2821 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:20-CV-3752 CAP RDC 864 42:0405id. THREE SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint Candy Murphy vs. Commissioner of Social Security. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number AGANDC-10130023. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Notice of Appeals Council Action, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Summons Attorney General, #4 Summons Regional Chief Counsel, #5 Summons U.S. Attorney)(Budde, Francis)(smw).
September 10, 2020 Filing 2820 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:20-CV-3751 CC WEJ 480 15:1681. ONE E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint Bobby Ross vs. Equifax Information Services LLC. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number AGANDC-10129923. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)(Gomez, Octavio)(smw).
September 10, 2020 Filing 2819 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:20-CV-3750 SDG 110 28:1332in. ONE E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint National Trust Insurance Company vs. Finishing Dynamics, LLC. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number AGANDC-10129875. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Civil Cover Sheet, #7 Summons)(Savrin, Philip)(smw).
September 10, 2020 Filing 2818 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:20-CV-3749 JPB 710 29:0216b. ONE E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint Claudia Madera vs. Hire Dynamics, LLC. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number AGANDC-10129858. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, Consent to Sue, #2 Summons, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(Holcombe, Justin)(smw).
September 10, 2020 Filing 2817 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:20-CV-3748 WMR 360 28:1441pi. NO E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Notice of Removal, Joshua Bandoo vs. Bassett Direct Stores, LLC. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number AGANDC-10129283. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Pleadings, #2 Exhibit B - Notice of Filing Notice of Removal, #3 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet)(Miller, Stevan)(smw).
September 10, 2020 Filing 2816 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:20-CV-3745 CAP 791 29:1132. NO E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint BARBARA A. FRANCIS vs. STANDARD INSURANCE COMPANY. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number AGANDC-10129407. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Pyles, Bradley)(smw).
September 10, 2020 Filing 2815 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:20-CV-3743 LMM 360 28:1441pi. NO E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Notice of Removal, Michelle Dukes vs. Schindler Elevator Corporation. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number AGANDC-10128802. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A - Complaint, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B - Plaintiff's Discovery Responses, #3 Exhibit Exhibit C - Notice of Filing Notice of Removal, #4 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet)(Lighthiser, Mary)(smw).
September 10, 2020 Filing 2814 MISCELLANEOUS ACTION NO. 1:20-MI-0105 JPB JSA 890 frcp45b. NO E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Miscellaneous (Motion to Quash), Habersham Funding LLC vs. JASON BOUTROS, M.D.. Filing fee $ 47, receipt number AGANDC-10128677. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Civil Cover Sheet Cover Letter, #3 Exhibit Exhibit A - Amended Subpoena, #4 Exhibit Exhibit B - Dismissal and Order Denying Motion to File Third Party Complaint, #5 Exhibit Exhibit C - Order on Sanctions, #6 Exhibit Exhibit D - Correspondence regarding Objections, #7 Exhibit Exhibit E - Original Subpoena)(Worth, Kimberly)(smw).
September 10, 2020 Filing 2813 CIVIL ACTION NO.1:20-CV-3742 CC 625 21:0881. NO E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint United States of America vs. $125,000.00 United States Currency. No payment received. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Nations, Radka)(smw).
September 10, 2020 Filing 2812 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:20-CV-3741 SDG 110 28:1441in. NO E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Notice of Removal, North American On-Site, LLC vs. Zurich American Insurance Company. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number AGANDC-10128099. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B Service of Process, #3 Exhibit Exhibit C Declaration, #4 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #5 Supplement Certificate of Filing Removal)(Schatz, Stephen)(smw).
September 10, 2020 Filing 2811 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:20-CV-3740 TCB 840 28:1338tr. THREE E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint Nexcor Food Safety Technolgies Inc. vs. 8th Floor, LLC. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number AGANDC-10127949. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons 8th Floor, LLC, #3 Summons Up in the Lab, Inc., #4 Summons Ronny Mirel, #5 Certificate of Interested Persons)(Seigel, Mark)(smw).
September 10, 2020 Filing 2810 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:20-CV-3739 SCJ 850 15:0077. NO E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint Securities and Exchange Commission vs. FLIK. No payment received. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Hong, Richard)(smw).
September 10, 2020 Filing 2809 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:20-CV-3738 JPB 360 28:1441pi. NO E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Notice of Removal, Lisa D. Miller vs. Becton, Dickinson and Company. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number AGANDC-10127219. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporation Disclosure Statement, #5 Appearance of Counsel)(Cohen, Lori)(smw).
September 9, 2020 Filing 2808 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:20-CV-3731 CC AJB 480 15:1681. ONE E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint Dilan Sinem Basaran vs. Martin Data LLC. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number AGANDC-10125335. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)(Bertschi, Craig)(smw).
September 9, 2020 Filing 2807 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:20-CV-3730 LMM CCB 863 42:0405ww. NO E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint Mark Wilkinson vs. Andrew M. Saul, Commissioner of Social Security. No payment received. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Summons, #5 Summons, #6 Summons, #7 Motion to Proceed In Forma Pauperis)(Comerford, Ida)SUMMONS WILL BE ISSUED BY THE DOCKET CLERK UPON IFP APPROVAL(smw).
September 9, 2020 Filing 2806 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:20-CV-3728 SDG 350 28:1441mv. NO E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Notice of Removal, CLINTON WEEKS vs. MORROW CARRIERS, LLC. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number AGANDC-10124479. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit)(Moretz, Michael)(smw).
September 9, 2020 Filing 2805 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:20-CV-3727 JPB 710 29:0216b. ONE E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint ARIEL TEJEDA SANTAMARIA vs. TROTTER COMPANY, LLC. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number AGANDC-10124661. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons to Trotter Company, LLC)(Bridgers, Charles)(smw).
September 9, 2020 Filing 2804 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:20-CV-3725 WMR 710 29:0216b. TWO E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint FIDENCIA GARCIA vs. SANTOS LANDSCAPING, INC.. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number AGANDC-10124450. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons to Santos Landscaping, Inc., #3 Summons to Reynaldo Santos)(Bridgers, Charles)(smw).
September 9, 2020 Filing 2803 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:20-CV-3724 MLB 350 28:1441mv. NO E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Notice of Removal, DOUGLAS CAMERON vs. PAUL NELSON. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number AGANDC-10124218. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Pleadings from State Court Case, #2 Exhibit B - Plaintiff's Demand, #3 Exhibit C - Notice of Filing Removal in State Court, #4 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #5 Exhibit Answer of Defendants to Plaintiff's Complaint for Damages)(Branch, Kevin) (smw).
September 9, 2020 Filing 2802 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:20-CV-3723 ELR LTW 480 15:1681. NO E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint Indiana Adina Christie vs. Equifax Information Services LLC and PHH Mortgage Corporation. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number AGANDC-10124377. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Erkenbrack, Joseph)(smw).
September 9, 2020 Filing 2801 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:20-CV-3722 CAP 110 28:1441in. NO E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Notice of Removal, Fight for Fitness, LLC vs. Hartford Underwriters Insurance Company. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number BGANDC-10124299. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - State Court File, #2 Exhibit B - Dun and Bradstreet Report, #3 Exhibit C - Secretary of State Information, #4 Civil Cover Sheet)(Frost, Christopher) (smw).
September 9, 2020 Filing 2800 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:20-CV-3721 MHC 422 28:0158. NO E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Bankruptcy Notice of Appeal, USBC Case#: 18-59637-BEM, ADV case#: 18-5320. Notice of Appeal filed 9/8/2020 from Order entered 8/7/2020 and 8/24/2020 by Appellant Jason L. Pettie, Chapter 7 Trustee for the Estate of Saleema Lawton-Kerr. Fee Paid: No. (No fee-Trustee) (Attachments: #1 NOA doc38, #2 First Appealed Order doc34, #3 Second Appealed Order doc36, #4 Docket sheet)(Lugo, Yahaira)(smw).
September 9, 2020 Filing 2799 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:20-CV-3719 WMR 365 28:1332pl. NO E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint Erica McClarty vs. TEVA PHARMACEUTICALS USA, INC.. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number AGANDC-10123503. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons CooperSurgical, #3 Summons Teva Women's Inc., #4 Summons Teva Women's LLC, #5 Summons Cooper Companies, #6 Summons Teva USA)(Hammers, Robert)SUMMONS WILL NOT BE ISSUED BECAUSE THERE IS NO ADDRESS FOR THE DEFENDANTS. NOTIFIED THE ATTORNEY TO RESUBMIT THE SUMMONS IN THE OPEN CASE(smw).
September 9, 2020 Filing 2798 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:20-CV-3718 MHC RDC 480 15:1681. NO E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint Tyronya Watson vs. Trans Union, LLC. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number AGANDC-10123180. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Armor, Christopher)(smw).
September 9, 2020 Filing 2797 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:20-CV-3717 ELR 350 28:1441mv. NO E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Notice of Removal, John King vs. Johnathan Scarborough. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number AGANDC-10122847. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit pleadings filed in Fulton State Court, #2 Exhibit Secty State search - Central States Trucking Co, #3 Exhibit Secty State search - Protective Insur. Co, #4 Exhibit Plf's pre-suit demand, #5 Civil Cover Sheet)(Cooper, M.)(smw).
September 9, 2020 Filing 2796 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:20-CV-3716 MHC JKL 863 42:0405ww. NO E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint Clarence Burks vs. Andrew M Saul Commissioner of Social Security. No payment received. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Summons, #5 Summons, #6 Summons, #7 Motion to Proceed in Forma Paupres)(Comerford, Ida)SUMMONS WILL BE ISSUED BY THE DOCKET CLERK UPON IFP APPROVAL(smw).
September 8, 2020 Filing 2795 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:20-CV-3712 RWS 367 28:1332pl. NO E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint Christine Martin vs. Johnson & Johnson. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number AGANDC-10120245. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(London, Michael)(smw).
September 8, 2020 Filing 2794 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:20-CV-3711 RWS 367 28:1332pl. NO E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint Teresa Schlosser vs. Ethicon, Inc.. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number AGANDC-10120228. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Oliver, Jami)(smw).
September 8, 2020 Filing 2793 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:20-CV-3710 LMM 465 08:1329. NO E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint Folake vs. Kenneth. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number AGANDC-10119858. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet civil cover sheet, #2 Exhibit USCIS Receipt Folake A, #3 Exhibit USCIS Receipt Adeola A., #4 Exhibit USCIS Receipt Oluwaseyi A, #5 Exhibit family photograph, #6 Exhibit USCIS Response to case inquiry, #7 Exhibit USCIS Notice of Action for cancelation of interview, #8 Exhibit USCIS Response to inquiry, #9 Exhibit USCIS response to attorney inquiry, #10 Exhibit USCIS Processing times June 2020, #11 Exhibit USCIS Processing times August 2020, #12 Exhibit USCIS Response to Congressional Inquiry, #13 Exhibit OIG Report on USCIS Processing times, #14 Exhibit USCIS Historical Processing times, #15 Exhibit high school Diploma Oluwaseyi A., #16 Exhibit Acceptance letter for Oluwaseyi A. Case Western Reserve and Kentucky University, #17 Summons Summons Chad Wolf Acting Secretary DHS, #18 Summons Summons District Director Denise Frazier USCIS Atlanta Field Office, #19 Summons Summons US DHS General Counsel, #20 Summons Summons US Attorney General Barr, #21 Summons Summons USCIS Director Cuccinelli)(Chaney, Justin)SUMMONS WILL NOT BE ISSUED BECAUSE THEY ARE NOT ON THE SUMMONS FORM. NOTIFIED ATTORNEY TO RESUBMIT THE SUMMONS ON THE FORM IN THE OPEN CASE(smw).
September 8, 2020 Filing 2792 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:20-CV-3709 RWS 367 28:1332pl. NO E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint Taylor, Kinchen vs. Ethicon, Inc.. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number AGANDC-10119855. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Giovannone, Andrea)(smw).
September 8, 2020 Filing 2791 MISCELLANEOUS ACTION NO. 1:20-MI-0103 UNA 890 28:1963. NO E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Miscellaneous (Registration of Judgment from another district), K&N Electric Motors, Inc. vs. Ray Lofthouse. Filing fee $ 47, receipt number AGANDC-10119093. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Supplement Judgment, #3 Supplement Letter to Clerk)(Dinardo, Joseph)(smw).
September 8, 2020 Filing 2790 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:20-CV-3708 AT CCB 480 15:1692. NO E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint Leslie Ellis vs. Grant & Weber, Inc.,. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number AGANDC-10118841. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Berry, Matthew)(smw).
September 8, 2020 Filing 2789 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:20-CV-3707 CC 360 28:1441pi. NO E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Notice of Removal, Gena M. McLendon vs. Becton, Dickinson and Company. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number AGANDC-10118449. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Stateent, #5 Appearance of Counsel)(Cohen, Lori)(smw).
September 8, 2020 Filing 2788 CIVIL ACTIN NO. 1:20-CV-3706 SDG JKL 480 15:1692. NO E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint JEANNE MARIE BLEVINS vs. CRMG, LLC. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number AGANDC-10118811. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit 1)(Berry, Matthew)(smw).
September 8, 2020 Filing 2787 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:20-CV-3705 JPB JSA 550 42:1983pr. NO E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Notice of Removal, HOLLY ELIZABETH DEAN vs. GEORGIA DEPARTMENT OF CORRECTIONS. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number AGANDC-10118006. (Attachments: #1 State Notice of Removal, #2 Entry of Service, #3 State Pleadings, #4 Civil Cover Sheet)(Crowder, Elizabeth)(smw).
September 8, 2020 Filing 2786 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:20-CV-3703 MHC 110 28:1441in. NO E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Notice of Removal, Shawn C. Leftwich vs. State Farm Fire and Casualty Company. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number AGANDC-10117523. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit Certificate of Filing Notice of Removal, #4 Civil Cover Sheet, #5 Exhibit Answer and Affirmative Defenses)(Vigilant, Kristen)(smw).
September 8, 2020 Filing 2785 TRO - IMMEDIATE HEARING REQUESTED CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:20-CV-3702 WMR 440 05:0702. FOUR E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number AGANDC-10116860. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons, #5 Summons)(Hawkins, James) (smw).
September 8, 2020 Filing 2784 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:20-CV-3701 SCJ 350 28:1332mv. TWO E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint Roland Kidd vs. Kevin J. Frain. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number AGANDC-10116497. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons Summons to Defendant Frain, #3 Summons Summons to Defendant Owens & Minor, #4 Exhibit Certificate of Interested Persons, #5 Exhibit RFAs to Defendant Frain, #6 Exhibit RFAs to Defendant Owens & Minor, #7 Exhibit ROGs and RPDs to Defendant Frain, #8 Exhibit ROGs and RPDs to Defendant Owens & Frain)(Branch, Matthew)(smw).
September 8, 2020 Filing 2783 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:20-CV-3700 CAP LTW 751 29:2601. ONE E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint Derek Boyd vs. Team One Logistics, LLC. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number AGANDC-10116604. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)(Martoccio, Gary)(smw).
September 7, 2020 Filing 2782 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:20-CV-3696 RWS 367 28:1332pl. NO E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint Lynn Edwards vs. Ethicon, Inc.. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number AGANDC-10113957. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Bell, Bobby)(smw).
September 4, 2020 Filing 2781 Case Initiating Documents-Complaint BRP COLLEAGUE INC. vs. EDWARD "TEDDY" GILLEN. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number AGANDC-10112254. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons Summons to Edward Teddy Gillen, #3 Summons Summons to Edgewood Partners Insurance Center d/b/aEpic Insurance Brokers & Consultants)(Duffield, Todd)
September 4, 2020 Filing 2780 Case Initiating Documents-Notice of Removal, Dana Hagood White vs. The Lawandales Group. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number AGANDC-10111955. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 (Complaint), #2 Exhibit 2 (Waiver of Service), #3 Exhibit 3 (Superior Court Docket Sheet), #4 Exhibit 4 (Website Printout), #5 Exhibit 5 (Summons), #6 Exhibit 6 (Summons), #7 Exhibit 7 (Civil Case Filing Information Form), #8 Exhibit 8 (Disclosure Statement), #9 Civil Cover Sheet (Exhibit 9))(Wizig, Diane)
September 4, 2020 Filing 2779 Case Initiating Documents-Complaint Leslie Snell vs. NES Administrative Services, Ind.. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number AGANDC-10111921. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Messer, David)
September 4, 2020 Filing 2778 Case Initiating Documents-Complaint. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number AGANDC-10111699. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet CIVIL COVER SHEET, #2 Summons SUMMONS- PRICE INDUSTRIES INC, #3 Summons SUMMONS- PRICE INDUSTRIES LIMITED, #4 Exhibit EXHIBIT A TO COMPLAINT, #5 Exhibit EXHIBIT B TO COMPLAINT, #6 Exhibit EXHIBIT C TO COMPLAINT, #7 Exhibit EXHIBIT D TO COMPLAINT, #8 Exhibit EXHIBIT E TO COMPLAINT, #9 Exhibit EXHIBIT F TO COMPLAINT, #10 Exhibit EXHIBIT G TO COMPLAINT, #11 Exhibit EXHIBIT H TO COMPLAINT, #12 Exhibit EXHIBIT I TO COMPLAINT, #13 Exhibit EXHIBIT J TO COMPLAINT)(Deutchman, Jill)
September 4, 2020 Filing 2777 Case Initiating Documents-Complaint ROGER DALE MORRIS vs. ANDREW SAUL, COMMISSIONER OF SOCIAL SECURITY. No payment received. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1 to Complaint - EAJA Assignment, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 IFP Motion, #4 Affidavit IFP, #5 Affidavit IFP Long Form, #6 Affidavit IFP Short Form, #7 Summons AUSA NDGA, #8 Summons REGION IV, #9 Summons SUMMONS US ATTY GENERAL, #10 Summons SUMONS GENERAL COUNSEL)(Atkins, Pamela)
September 4, 2020 Filing 2776 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:20-CV-3689 RWS 365 28:1332pl. NO E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint Peggy Watts vs. Ethicon Physiomesh. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number AGANDC-10111219. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Snyder, Brian)(smw).
September 4, 2020 Filing 2775 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:20-CV-3688 MLB 448 42:1983cv. ONE E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint Kristin Nicholas vs. Fulton County School District. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number AGANDC-10111238. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibits 1-10, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Summons)(Goodmark, Craig)(smw).
September 4, 2020 Filing 2774 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:20-CV-3687 TWT 446 42:12101. ONE E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint Brown, Yvonne vs. Saniha & Sameer, Inc.. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number AGANDC-10110811. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)(Ehrlich, Craig)(smw).
September 4, 2020 Filing 2773 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:20-CV-3686 ELR CMS 220 28:1444. NO E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Notice of Removal, Thane A. Greene vs. Ocwen Financial Corporation. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number BGANDC-10110757. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A - Superior Court Pleadings, #3 Exhibit B- Tax Records, #4 Exhibit C- Consent to Removal, #5 Exhibit D - Notice of Filing Notice of Removal)(Windham, Mark)(smw).
September 4, 2020 Filing 2772 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:20-CV-3685 MHC JSA 863 42:0405ww . NO E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint Ladonna Davis OBO R.D. vs. Andrew M Saul Commissioner of Social Security. No payment received. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Summons, #5 Summons, #6 Summons, #7 Motion to Proceed in Forma Paupres)(Comerford, Ida)SUMMONS WILL BE ISSUED BY THE DOCKET CLERK UPON IFP APPROVAL(smw).
September 4, 2020 Filing 2771 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:20-CV-3684 LMM 710 29:0216b. THREE E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint Christina Young vs. Ray of Hope Counseling Services, Inc.. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number AGANDC-10110237. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons Ray of Hope Summons, #3 Summons Jennifer Lynn Umstead Summons, #4 Summons Kevin Umstead Summons)(Warlick, Danielle)(smw).
September 4, 2020 Filing 2770 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:20-CV-3683 RWS 367 28:1332pl. NO E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint Janice M. Graff vs. Ethicon, Inc.. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number AGANDC-10110292. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Richardson, Katelyn)(smw).
September 4, 2020 Filing 2769 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:20-CV-3682 CC CCB 480 15:1681. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint Debbie Veasley vs. Experian Information Solutions, Inc.. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number AGANDC-10110020. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Dakroub, Jenna)(smw).
September 4, 2020 Filing 2768 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:20-CV-3681 RWS 367 28:1332pl. NO E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint Dennis Sampson vs. Ethicon, Inc. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number AGANDC-10109804. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Cornell, Katherine)(smw).
September 4, 2020 Filing 2767 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:20-CV-3680 RWS 367 28:1332pl. NO E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint Tanya Murnahan vs. Ethicon, Inc. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number AGANDC-10109779. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Cornell, Katherine)(smw).
September 4, 2020 Filing 2766 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:20-CV-3679 RWS 367 28:1332pl. NO E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint Lewis Marroulis vs. Ethicon, Inc. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number AGANDC-10109732. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Cornell, Katherine)(smw).
September 4, 2020 Filing 2765 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:20-CV-3678 RWS 367 28:1332pl. NO E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint Anissa Jones vs. Ethicon, Inc. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number AGANDC-10109634. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Cornell, Katherine)(smw).
September 4, 2020 Filing 2764 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:20-CV-3677 RWS 367 28:1332pl. NO E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint Linda Floyd vs. Ethicon, Inc.. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number AGANDC-10109614. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Cornell, Katherine)(smw).
September 4, 2020 Filing 2763 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:20-CV-3676 RWS 367 28:1332pl. NO E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint Maurice Bull vs. Ethicon, Inc.. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number AGANDC-10109559. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Cornell, Katherine)(smw).
September 4, 2020 Filing 2762 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:20-CV-3675 RWS 367 28:1332pl. NO E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint Jennifer Bailey vs. Ethicon, Inc.. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number AGANDC-10109494. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Cornell, Katherine)(smw).
September 4, 2020 Filing 2761 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:20-CV-3674 SCJ 140 28:1441ni. NO E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Notice of Removal, MADISON TITLE AGENCY, LLC vs. BANK OF AMERICA CORPORATION. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number AGANDC-10109236. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A - Complaint, #2 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet)(Kapur, Christine)(smw).
September 4, 2020 Filing 2760 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:20-CV-3670 JPB 360 28:1441pi. NO E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Notice of Removal, Dennis Smith vs. Wal-Mart, Inc.. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number AGANDC-10108469. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A - Demand letter, #3 Exhibit B - state court pleadings)(Lessinger, Howard)(smw).
September 4, 2020 Filing 2759 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:20-CV-3669 WMR 360 28:1441pi. NO E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Notice of Removal, Floriana Reyes Perez vs. Walmart Inc.. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number AGANDC-10108467. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A - Demand letter, #3 Exhibit B - state court pleadings)(Lessinger, Howard)(smw).
September 3, 2020 Filing 2758 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:20-CV-3668 MLB 367 28:1332pl. FIVE E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint Denise Tatum vs. Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc.. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number AGANDC-10107182. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons COOPERSURGICAL, INC., #3 Summons THE COOPER COMPANIES, INC., #4 Summons TEVA PHARMACEUTICALS USA, INC., #5 Summons TEVA WOMEN'S HEALTH, INC. d/b/a TEVA WOMEN'S HEALTH LLC, #6 Summons TEVA WOMEN'S HEALTH, LLC)(Sanders, Douglas) (smw).
September 3, 2020 Filing 2757 CIVIL ACTION NO.1:20-CV-3667 ELR 367 28:1332pl. FIVE E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint Heather Spence vs. Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc.. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number AGANDC-10107163. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons COOPERSURGICAL, INC., #3 Summons THE COOPER COMPANIES, INC., #4 Summons TEVA PHARMACEUTICALS USA, INC., #5 Summons TEVA WOMENS HEALTH, INC. d/b/a TEVA WOMENS HEALTH, LLC, #6 Summons TEVA WOMEN'S HEALTH, LLC)(Sanders, Douglas)(smw).
September 3, 2020 Filing 2756 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:20-CV-3666 MHC 367 28:1332pl. FIVE E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint Tiana Plendl vs. Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc.. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number AGANDC-10107040. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons COOPERSURGICAL, INC., #3 Summons THE COOPER COMPANIES, INC., #4 Summons TEVA PHARMACEUTICALS USA, INC., #5 Summons TEVA WOMENS HEALTH, INC. d/b/a TEVA WOMENS HEALTH, LLC, #6 Summons TEVA WOMENS HEALTH, LLC)(Sanders, Douglas) (smw).
September 3, 2020 Filing 2755 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:20-CV-3665 SDG 446 42:12101. ONE E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint Maria Gallagher vs. CIS Hospitality, LLC. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number AGANDC-10106199. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons Summons)(Huffman, Jon David)(smw).
September 3, 2020 Filing 2754 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:20-CV-3664 CC AJB 864 42:0405id. NO E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint Geoniva O. Calmes vs. Commissioner of Social Security. No payment received. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A: Notice of Appeals Council Action, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Letter to Clerk, #4 Proposed Summons, #5 Proposed Summons, #6 Proposed Summons, #7 In Forma Pauperis, #8 Certificate of Interested Parties)(Olinsky, Howard)SUMMONS WILL BE ISSUED BY THE DOCKET CLERK UPON IFP APPROVAL(smw).
September 3, 2020 Filing 2753 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:20-CV-3663 LMM LTW 863 42:0405ww. NO E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint Kesha Andrews vs. Andrew M Saul Commissioner of Social Security. No payment received. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Summons, #5 Summons, #6 Summons, #7 Motion to Proceed in Forma Paupres)(Comerford, Ida)SUMMONS WILL BE ISSUED BY THE DOCKET CLERK UPON IFP APPROVAL(smw).
September 3, 2020 Filing 2752 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:20-CV-3662 AT 440 42:1983cv. TEN E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint Tiffany Wingo as Administrator of the Estate of Kevil Wingo, Sr. vs. Wellstar Health System, Inc.. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number BGANDC-10105367. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A - Ante Litem Notice, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B - Claire Teske Affidavit, #3 Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Summons Wellstar Health System, Inc., #5 Summons Annaleen Visser, #6 Summons Yvette Burton, #7 Summons Shanna Griffith, #8 Summons Samantha Garland, #9 Summons Kelly Jones, #10 Summons Shannea Hopkins, #11 Summons Branson Harris, #12 Summons Charles Gordon, #13 Summons Paul Wilkerson)(Gardner, Timothy)(smw).
September 3, 2020 Filing 2751 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:20-CV-3661 CAP 840 15:1125. ONE E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint KontrolFreek, LLC vs. The Millennium Mat Company, LLC. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number AGANDC-10105156. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Trademark, #2 Summons, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(Barr, Jonathan)(smw).
September 3, 2020 Filing 2750 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:20-CV-3660 WMR 110 28:1441in. NO E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Notice of Removal, Joel Lasile vs. Auto-Owners Insurance Company. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number AGANDC-10104902. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Appendix Certificate of Filing Removal, #4 Appendix Notice of Filing Removal)(Phillips, Jessica)(smw).
September 3, 2020 Filing 2749 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:20-CV-3659 RWS 367 28:1332pl. TWO E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint Cynthia Young vs. Ethicon, Inc.. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number AGANDC-10104767. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons Summons as to Ethicon, #3 Summons Summons as to Johnson & Johnson)(Orent, Jonathan)(smw).
September 3, 2020 Filing 2748 INJ CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:20-CV-3658 MLB 442 28:1443. NO E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Notice of Removal, Gene Law, III vs. Fulton County Board of Commissioners. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number AGANDC-10104332. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A)(Martinez, Dominique)(smw).
September 3, 2020 Filing 2747 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:20-CV-3656 TWT 190 28:1441bc. NO E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Notice of Removal, Olivia Mooney vs. ILG Technologies, LLC. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number AGANDC-10104263. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Murray complaint, #2 Exhibit May 2, 2018 email from counsel, #3 Exhibit Order on motion to remand, #4 Exhibit state court summons, #5 Exhibit state court complaint, #6 Exhibit state court case information form, #7 Exhibit state court rule 3.2 certificate, #8 Exhibit state court acknowledgement of service, #9 Civil Cover Sheet, #10 Exhibit Certificate of interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure)(Wasmuth, Edward)(smw).
September 3, 2020 Filing 2746 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:20-CV-3655 TWT 190 28:1441bc. NO E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Notice of Removal, Terrell Thomas vs. ILG Technologies, LLC. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number AGANDC-10104198. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Murray complaint, #2 Exhibit May 2, 2018 email from counsel, #3 Exhibit Opinion on motion to remand, #4 Exhibit state court summons, #5 Exhibit state court complaint, #6 Exhibit state court information form, #7 Exhibit state court rule 3.2 certificate, #8 Exhibit state court acknowledgement of service, #9 Civil Cover Sheet, #10 Exhibit Certificate of Interested persons and Corporate Disclosure)(Wasmuth, Edward)(smw).
September 3, 2020 Filing 2745 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:20-CV-3654 TWT 190 28:1441bc. NO E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Notice of Removal, JB Hilliard vs. ILG Technologies, LLC. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number AGANDC-10104119. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Murray complaint, #2 Exhibit may 2, 2018 email from counsel, #3 Exhibit opinion on motion to remand, #4 Exhibit state court summons, #5 Exhibit state court complaint, #6 Exhibit state court case information form, #7 Exhibit state court Rule 3.2 certificate, #8 Exhibit state court acknowledgement of service, #9 Civil Cover Sheet, #10 Exhibit Certificate of Interested persons and Corporate Disclosure)(Wasmuth, Edward)(smw).
September 3, 2020 Filing 2744 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:20-CV-3652 TWT 190 28:1441bc. NO E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Notice of Removal, Kiran Chaitram vs. ILG Technologies, LLC. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number AGANDC-10104045. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Murray Complaint, #2 Exhibit May 2, 2018 email from counsel, #3 Exhibit Opinion on motion to remand, #4 Exhibit state court summons, #5 Exhibit state court complaint, #6 Exhibit state court case information form, #7 Exhibit state court Rule 3.2 certificate, #8 Exhibit state court acknowledgement of service, #9 Civil Cover Sheet, #10 Exhibit Certificate of interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure)(Wasmuth, Edward)(smw).
September 3, 2020 Filing 2743 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:20-CV-3651 TWT 190 28:1441bc. NO E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Notice of Removal, Woroma Ejiowhor vs. ILG Technologies, LLC. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number AGANDC-10103971. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Murray Complaint, #2 Exhibit May 2, 2018 email from counsel, #3 Exhibit order on motion to remand, #4 Exhibit state court summons, #5 Exhibit state court complaint, #6 Exhibit state court case information form, #7 Exhibit state court rule 3.2 certificate, #8 Exhibit state court acknowledgement of service, #9 Civil Cover Sheet, #10 Exhibit Certificate of Interested persons and Corporate Disclosure)(Wasmuth, Edward)(smw).
September 3, 2020 Filing 2742 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:20-CV-3649 LMM 140 28:1332ni. ONE E-SUMMONS FILED/ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint TRUIST BANK f/k/a BRANCH BANKING AND TRUST COMPANY, a North Carolina state chartered banking corporation vs. OPTIMA PHYSICAL THERAPY SERVICES, INC.. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number AGANDC-10103370. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Summons Optima Physical Therapy Services, Inc., #7 Civil Cover Sheet)(Levy, Brian) (bc).
September 2, 2020 Filing 2741 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:20-CV-3648 SCJ 830 28:1338pt. ONE E-SUMMONS FILED/ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint Heavy Duty Lighting, LLC vs. Acuity Brands Lighting, Inc.. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number AGANDC-10101789. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - USPN 8,399,899, #2 Exhibit B - 8,421,094, #3 Exhibit C - 8,723,195, #4 Exhibit D - 9,093,357, #5 Exhibit E - 9,243,791, #6 Exhibit F - 9,425,236, #7 Exhibit G - 9,484,309, #8 Exhibit H - 9,679,942, #9 Exhibit I - 9,735,133, #10 Exhibit J - 9,966,367, #11 Exhibit K, #12 Exhibit L, #13 Exhibit M, #14 Exhibit N, #15 Exhibit O, #16 Exhibit P, #17 Civil Cover Sheet, #18 Summons, #19 AO120 Form, #20 Corporate Disclosure Statement)(Burt, Jacqueline) (bc).
September 2, 2020 Filing 2740 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:20-CV-3647 SCJ JSA 480 15:1692. NO E-SUMMONS FILED. Case Initiating Documents-Notice of Removal, Gregory Doctor vs. Santander Consumer USA Inc.. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number AGANDC-10101771. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A)(Mendel, Jarrod) (bc).
September 2, 2020 Filing 2739 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:20-CV-3646 AT 710 29:0216b. NO E-SUMMONS FILED. Case Initiating Documents-Notice of Removal, Tanya L. Fowlkes vs. American Health Associates, Inc.. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number AGANDC-10101357. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Summons and Complaint, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Exhibit L.R. 3.3 Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement)(Fattahi, Parsa) (bc).
September 2, 2020 Filing 2738 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:20-CV-3645 CAP 710 29:0216b. ONE E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint CASSANDRA WILLIAMS vs. ELIJAH HEALTH CARE SOLUTIONS LLC. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number AGANDC-10101052. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)(Roberts, Victor) (smw).
September 2, 2020 Filing 2737 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:20-CV-3644 CC WEJ 480 15:1681. FIVE E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint James Burress vs. Equifax Information Services, LLC. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number AGANDC-10100437. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons, #5 Summons, #6 Summons, #7 Certificate of Interested Persons)(Paxton, Misty)(smw).
September 2, 2020 Filing 2736 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:20-CV-3643 SDG 350 28:1441mv. NO E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Notice of Removal, Shakari Smiley vs. Crete Carrier Corporation d/b/a Crete Carrier Corp. Shaffer Trucking. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number AGANDC-10100064. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A - Summons and Complaint, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B - Plaintiffs' discovery requests to Defendant Crete Carrier Corp., #3 Exhibit Exhibit C - Plaintiffs' discovery responses to Defendant Travis Lewayne Pernell, #4 Exhibit Exhibit D - Affidavit of Service on Crete Carrier Corporation, #5 Exhibit Exhibit E - Defendants' Answer to Complaint, #6 Verification of Marvin D. Dikeman, #7 Affidavit Affidavit of Marvin D. Dikeman, #8 Jury Demand, #9 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet)(Dikeman, Marvin)(smw).
September 2, 2020 Filing 2735 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:20-CV-3642 JPB 446 42:12101. NO E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint Cordero, Alexander vs. J & Shim Lawrenceville, LLC. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number AGANDC-10100006. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)(Ehrlich, Craig)(smw).
September 2, 2020 Filing 2734 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:20-CV-3641 JPB 448 20:1683. NO E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint Jane Doe vs. Gwinnett County Public Schools. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number AGANDC-10099749. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Block, Aaron)(smw).
September 2, 2020 Filing 2733 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:20-CV-3640 MHC 350 28:1441mv. NO E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Notice of Removal, MARK EUGENE HUFFMAN vs. PANTHER II TRANSPORTATION, INC.. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number AGANDC-10097179. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit Exhibit A-Summons and Complaint, #3 Exhibit Exhibit B- Defendant's Answer, #4 Exhibit Exhibit C - Jury Demand)(Patel, Stephanie)(smw).
September 2, 2020 Filing 2732 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:20-CV-3638 SCJ 140 28:1332ni. FIVE E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint TRUIST BANK f/k/a BRANCH BANKING AND TRUST COMPANY, successor by merger to SUNTRUST BANK vs. THE KANE CLINICS LLC. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number AGANDC-10097023. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Summons Enrique Francis, #11 Summons Maria A. Francis, #12 Summons The Kane Clinics LLC, #13 Summons CIMA Obgyn CV, LLC, #14 Summons CIMA Pediatrics CV, LLC, #15 Civil Cover Sheet)(Levy, Brian)(smw).
September 2, 2020 Filing 2731 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:20-CV-3637 RWS 367 28:1332pl. NO E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint Fontella Hampton vs. Ethicon, Inc.. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number GANDC-10096547. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(McCarley, Matthew)(smw).
September 2, 2020 Filing 2730 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:20-CV-3634 CAP CCB 863 42:0405wc. NO E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint LAVERN COARDE vs. ANDREW SAUL, COMMISSIONER OF SOCIAL SECURITY. No payment received. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Motion to File IFP, #3 IFP Application, #4 Summons Atty Gen, #5 Summons Defendant, #6 Summons US Atty)(Hogan, John)SUMMONS WILL BE ISSUED BY THE DOCKET CLERK UPON IFP APPROVAL(smw).
September 2, 2020 Filing 2729 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:20-CV-3633 WMR CCB 442 42:2000rl. ONE E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint KELLY LAKSHMI STRAW vs. MADISON MARQUETTE REAL ESTATE SERVICES LLC. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number AGANDC-10094213. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)(Garber, Marc)(smw).
September 2, 2020 Filing 2728 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:20-CV-3632 MLB JKL 442 42:1981ra. ONE E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint BARBARA GODWIN vs. THE INTERVENTIONAL SPINE AND PAINMANAGEMENT CENTER, P.C. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number AGANDC-10094090. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)(Wolfe, Steven)(smw).
September 1, 2020 Filing 2727 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:20-CV-3628 RWS 367 28:1332pl. NO E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint Evelyn Kent vs. Ethicon, Inc.. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number AGANDC-10091820. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Conlin, Jon)(smw).
September 1, 2020 Filing 2726 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:20-CV-3627 RWS 367 28:1332pl. NO E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint Kurt Cowger vs. Ethicon, Inc.. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number AGANDC-10091748. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Conlin, Jon)(smw).
September 1, 2020 Filing 2725 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:20-CV-3626 MHC 890 47:0227. NO E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint mGage LLC vs. Citgo Petroleum Corporation. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number AGANDC-10091521. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A - Wisconsin Complaint, #2 Civil Cover Sheet Exbibit B - Civil Cover Sheet)(Schoenthaler, Peter)(smw).
September 1, 2020 Filing 2724 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:20-CV-3625 RWS 367 28:1332pl. NO E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint Chris Isom vs. Ethicon, Inc.. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number AGANDC-10091565. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Conlin, Jon)(smw).
September 1, 2020 Filing 2723 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:20-CV-3624 RWS 367 28:1332pl. NO E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint Darriel Young vs. Ethicon, Inc.. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number AGANDC-10091313. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Conlin, Jon)(smw).
September 1, 2020 Filing 2722 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:20-CV-3623 RWS 367 28:1332pl. NO E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint Larry Moyer vs. Ethicon, Inc.. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number AGANDC-10091233. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Conlin, Jon)(smw).
September 1, 2020 Filing 2721 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:20-CV-3621 SCJ 110 28:2201in. SIX SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint Main Street America Protection Insurance Company vs. Keith Barry. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number AGANDC-10090283. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Certified Policy, #2 Exhibit B - Barrow County Sheriff Incident Report, #3 Exhibit C - Theft Affidavit (redacted), #4 Exhibit D - Indictment (redacted), #5 Exhibit E - Complaint in the Underlying Lawsuit, #6 Exhibit F - Reservation of Rights Letter to Barry (2020-07-31), #7 Summons Casandra Hayman, #8 Summons Keith Barry (Barrow County Detention Center), #9 Summons Keith Barry (Residence), #10 Summons Korin Taylor, #11 Summons Monique Mike, #12 Summons Scarlett Espinoza, #13 Civil Cover Sheet)(Sprinkle, Brian)(smw).
September 1, 2020 Filing 2720 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:20-CV- 3619 CAP JKL 863 42:0405wc. NO E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint Samantha Tarbush vs. Andrew Saul, Commissioner of Social Security Administration. No payment received. (Attachments: #1 Pauper Proposed Order, #2 Complaint, #3 Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Summons US Attorney, #5 Summons Office Regional Chief Counsel, #6 Summons Attorney General)(Piemonte, George)SUMMONS WILL BE ISSUED BY THE DOCKET CLERK UPON IFP APPROVAL(smw).
September 1, 2020 Filing 2719 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:20-CV-3618 CC 360 28:1332pi. TWO E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint Brian Dickerson vs. PLZ Aeroscience Corporation. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number AGANDC-10089774. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons Hazmat Emergency Response and Remediation, Inc., #3 Summons PLZ Aeroscience Corporation)(Goldberg, Michael)(smw).
September 1, 2020 Filing 2718 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:20-CV-3617 ELR CMS 442 29:0626. NO E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint Tammy Smith vs. Sanders Reality Holdings, LLC. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number AGANDC-10089317. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Reid, Tilden)(smw).
September 1, 2020 Filing 2717 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:20-CV-3616 SDG 820 28:1338cp. FOUR E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint Bryan Zack Mason vs. Sony Pictures Entertainment Inc.. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number AGANDC-10089076. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons, #5 Summons, #6 Form AO121, #7 Certificate of Interested Parties)(Rothman, Joel)(smw).
September 1, 2020 Filing 2716 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:20-CV-3615 SDG 470 18:1961. FIVE E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint ASCENTIUM CAPITAL LLC vs. FIRST AMERICAN CAPITAL EQUIPMENT, LLC. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number AGANDC-10088353. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit 12, #13 Exhibit 13, #14 Exhibit 14, #15 Exhibit 15, #16 Exhibit 16, #17 Exhibit 17, #18 Exhibit 18, #19 Exhibit 19, #20 Exhibit 20, #21 Exhibit 21, #22 Summons FIRST AMERICAN CAPITAL EQUIPMENT, LLC, #23 Summons MARCUS MARCHMAN, #24 Summons TAMMY MARCHMAN, #25 Summons ROBERTO CLARK, #26 Summons PRISCILLA POWELL, #27 Summons DONALD ROZZELLE, #28 Summons KRM SERVICES LLC, #29 Summons MTM FINANCIAL GROUP LLC, #30 Summons EMBRACE YOUR PURPOSE OUTREACH CENTER INCORPORATED, #31 Summons A PLACE OF REST FOUNDATION INC., #32 Summons DYNASTY AUTO GROUP LLC, #33 Summons A1A TECH LLC, #34 Summons P&C AUTO SALES LLC, #35 Summons FIRST RATE TRUCKING LLC, #36 Summons BFF INVESTMENT GROUP LLC, #37 Summons EXPERT CONSULTING SERVICES LLC, #38 Civil Cover Sheet)(Colletti, Timothy)ELEVEN SUMMONS WILL NOT BE ISSUED BECAUSE THEY HAVE MORE THAN ONE ADDRESS FOR THE DEFENDANT. NOTIFIED ATTORNEY TO RESUBMIT THE SUMMONS IN THE OPEN CASE(smw).
August 31, 2020 Filing 2715 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:20-CV-3609 MLB LTW 480 15:1681. NO E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint Dena Louise Ayer vs. Experian Information Solutions, Inc., Santander Consumer USA Inc., and Comenity Bank. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number AGANDC-10087253. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Erkenbrack, Joseph)(smw).
August 31, 2020 Filing 2714 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:20-CV-3608 ELR RDC 480 15:1681. NO E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint Justin Alexander Hunt vs. Equifax Information Services LLC and Suntrust Banks, Inc.,. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number AGANDC-10087247. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Erkenbrack, Joseph)(smw).
August 31, 2020 Filing 2713 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:20-CV-3607 WMR CCB 480 15:1681. NO E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint James Edward Worthan vs. Trans Union LLC. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number AGANDC-10087242. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Erkenbrack, Joseph)(smw).
August 31, 2020 Filing 2712 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:20-CV-3606 TWT JKL 480 15:1681. NO E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint Diane Loretta Plummer vs. Equifax Information Services LLC and Wells Fargo Bank, National Association (Inc.) as successor by merger to Wells Fargo Home Mortgage,. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number AGANDC-10086922. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Erkenbrack, Joseph)(smw).
August 31, 2020 Filing 2711 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:20-CV-3605 MHC JSA 445 42:12101. ONE E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint Annette Albritten vs. ADP, INC.. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number AGANDC-10086883. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)(Smith, Ian)(smw).
August 31, 2020 Filing 2710 MISCELLANEOUS CASE NO. 1:20-MI-0101 UNA 890 28:0754. RECEIVERSHIP - NO E-SUMMONS FILED. Case Initiating Documents-Miscellaneous (Receivership(28 U.S.C 754)), Fannie Mae vs. Capital Senior Living Properties 2. Filing fee $ 47, receipt number AGANDC-10086458. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Gordon, Neil) (bc).
August 31, 2020 Filing 2709 CASE NOT OPENED FILED WITHOUT PAYMENT - ATTORNEY WILL REFILE CASE WITH PAYMENT. SEE ENTRY 2711 for REFILING Case Initiating Documents-Miscellaneous (Receivership(28 U.S.C 754)), Fannie Mae vs. Capital Senior Living Properties 2. No payment received. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Notice of Filing Pursuant to 28 U.S.C, Section 754)(Gordon, Neil) (bc).
August 31, 2020 Filing 2708 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:20-CV-3604 CAP CMS 480 15:1681. SIX E-SUMMONSES FILED/ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint Michelle Sidney vs. Equifax Information Services, LLC. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number AGANDC-10086213. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons, #5 Summons, #6 Summons, #7 Summons)(Landreau, Matthew) (bc).
August 31, 2020 Filing 2707 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:20-CV-3602 SDG 465 08:1329. SEVEN E-SUMMONSES FILED/ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint Pankajkumar Patel vs. William Barr. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number AGANDC-10085279. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 1.Copy of Plaintiffs Indian Passport., #3 Exhibit Exhibit 2.Copy of Plaintiffs I-918A Petition for Qualifying Family Member Receipt Notice., #4 Exhibit Exhibit 3.Copy of Plaintiffs I-192, Application for Advance Permission to Enter as a Nonimmigrant receipt notice., #5 Exhibit Exhibit 4.Copy of Spouse Falguniben Patels I-918 Petition for U Nonimmigrant Status receipt notice., #6 Exhibit Exhibit 5.Spouse Falguniben Patels I-918 Petition for U Nonimmigrant Status approval notice., #7 Exhibit Exhibit 6.Copy of Plaintiffs I-192, Application for Advance Permission to Enter as a Nonimmigrant approval notice., #8 Exhibit Exhibit 7.Copy of Plaintiffs A20 work permit., #9 Exhibit Exhibit 8.Copy of Plaintiffs Form I-485 Application To Register Permanent Residence Or Adjust Status receipt notice., #10 Exhibit Exhibit 9.Copy of the Plaintiffs U visa extension approval notice., #11 Exhibit Exhibit 10. Copy of Spouse Falguniben Patels Green Card, #12 Exhibit Exhibit 11. Copy of the May 2, 2019 Request for Evidence Notice., #13 Exhibit Exhibit 12. Print Out of Online Case Status Report., #14 Exhibit Exhibit 13. Print Out of USCISS Online Case Processing Times., #15 Summons W. Barr Summons in a Civil Action, #16 Summons C.Wolf Summons in a Civil Action, #17 Summons K.Cuccinelli Summons in a Civil Action, #18 Summons K.Riddle Summons in a Civil Action, #19 Summons P. Onyango Summons in a Civil Action, #20 Summons C. Wray Summons in a Civil Action, #21 Summons B. Pak Summons in a Civil Action)(Durishan, John) (bc).
August 31, 2020 Filing 2706 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:20-CV-3600 ELR 430 28:1332oc. NO E-SUMMONS FILED. COVER SHEET MISSING FIRST PAGE - ATTORNEY NOTIFIED VIA EMAIL TO FILE COMPLETE COVER SHEET ONCE CASE IS OPEN IN CM/ECF. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint Ability Rehab LLC vs. First Horizon Bank. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number AGANDC-10085304. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Pierson, Holly) (bc).
August 31, 2020 Filing 2705 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:20-CV-3599 MHC CMS 863 42:0405wc. THREE E-SUMMONSES FILED/ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint KERI NICHOLE RANDOLPH vs. ANDREW SAUL, COMMISSIONER OF SOCIAL SECURITY. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number AGANDC-10085310. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons Attorney General, #3 Summons Defendant, #4 Summons US Atty)(Hogan, John) (bc).
August 31, 2020 Filing 2704 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:20-CV-3598 RWS 367 28:1332pl. NO E-SUMMONS FILED - TWO WAIVER OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint Bertis Glen Fancher vs. Ethicon, Inc.. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number AGANDC-10085083. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Summons)(Heard, Denman) (bc).
August 31, 2020 Filing 2703 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:20-CV-3597 LMM 446 42:12101. ONE E-SUMMONS FILED/ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint Blinkhorn, Jessica vs. Murli Manohar LLC. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number AGANDC-10084909. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)(Ehrlich, Craig) (bc).
August 31, 2020 Filing 2702 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:20-CV-3596 SCJ 710 29:0216b. TWO E-SUMMONSES FILED/ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint Ericka Myers vs. North American On-Site, LLC a Georgia Limited Liability Company. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number AGANDC-10084456. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Notice of Filing Notice of Consent to Join, #3 Exhibit A to Notice of Filing, #4 Summons Corporation, #5 Summons Corporation2)(Morgan, Charles) (bc).
August 31, 2020 Filing 2701 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:20-CV-3595 TWT 360 28:1441pi. NO E-SUMMONS FILED. Case Initiating Documents-Notice of Removal, James Harris vs. QuikTrip Corporation. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number AGANDC-10084814. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Hynes, Sean) (bc).
August 30, 2020 Filing 2700 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:20-CV-3591 CAP JSA 480 15:1681. NO E-SUMMONS FILED. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint Sheila Zea Woodfin vs. Equifax Information Services LLC and MidFirst Bank a/k/a and d/b/a Midland Mortgage. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number AGANDC-10082771. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Erkenbrack, Joseph) (bc).
August 30, 2020 Filing 2699 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:20-CV-3590 SDG RGV 480 15:1681. NO E-SUMMONS FILED. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint Daywaren Stewart and Kenya Stewart vs. Experian Information Solutions, Inc. and Santander Consumer USA Inc.. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number AGANDC-10082770. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Erkenbrack, Joseph) (bc).
August 30, 2020 Filing 2698 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:20-CV-3589 JPB WEJ 480 15:1681. NO E-SUMMONS FILED. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint Richard Allen Hancock vs. Equifax Information Services LLC. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number AGANDC-10082769. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Erkenbrack, Joseph) (bc).
August 30, 2020 Filing 2697 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:20-CV-3588 WMR AJB 480 15:1681. NO E-SUMMONS FILED. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint Jeffery Green vs. Experian Information Solutions, Inc. and LendingClub Corporation. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number AGANDC-10082768. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Erkenbrack, Joseph) (bc).
August 30, 2020 Filing 2696 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:20-CV-3587 MLB LTW 480 15:1681. NO E-SUMMONS FILED. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint Efrem Zimbalist Burton vs. Equifax Information Services LLC and Village Capital Investment LLC,. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number AGANDC-10082767. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Erkenbrack, Joseph) (bc).
August 30, 2020 Filing 2695 CIVIL ACTION NO. 3:20-cv-162-TCB-RGV 15:1681 480 NO E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint John Rufus Bell vs. Equifax Information Services LLC and Statebridge Company, LLC. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number AGANDC-10082766. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Erkenbrack, Joseph) DOCUMENTS FILED IN INCORRECT DIVISION. DOUCMENTS FORWARDED TO NEWNAN DIVISION ON 8/31/20 BY BC. (bc). (dmb).
August 28, 2020 Filing 2694 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:20-CV-3586 AT 830 28:2201dj. ONE E-SUMMONS FILED/ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint BLUE ECHO CARE LLC vs. CHRISTOPHER ACKERMAN. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number AGANDC-10081630. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Proposed AO120, #13 Civil Cover Sheet, #14 Summons Proposed)(Breloski, Jeffrey) (bc).
August 28, 2020 Filing 2693 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:20-CV-3585 RWS 367 28:1332pl. NO E-SUMMONS FILED. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint Maria Trejo vs. Ethicon, Inc.. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number AGANDC-10081473. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Bell, Bobby) (bc).
August 28, 2020 Filing 2692 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:20-CV-3584 ELR 465 08:1329. FIVE E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint ONYEOGOH vs. CUCINNELLI. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number AGANDC-10081198. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Summons Cuccinelli, #6 Summons Pompeo, #7 Summons Cowan, #8 Summons Barr, #9 Summons Pak, #10 Civil Cover Sheet Civil cover sheet)(Fogle, H.) (smw).
August 28, 2020 Filing 2691 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:20-CV-3583 LMM 365 28:1441pl. NO E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Notice of Removal, Jerry McClure vs. Morgan Truck Body, LLC. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number CGANDC-10080270. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons David Daws Summons, #3 Summons Hino Motors Summons, #4 Summons Morgan Truck Body Summons, #5 Summons Penske Truck Co. Summons, #6 Summons Penske Truck Corp. Summons, #7 Summons Penske Vehicle Summons, #8 Summons Sam Rutledge Summons, #9 Complaint, #10 Hino Sheriff's Entry of Service, #11 Penske Vehicle Sheriff's Entry of Service, #12 Morgan Truck Sheriff's Entry of Service, #13 Penske Truck Corp. Sheriff's Entry of Service, #14 Penske Truck Sheriff's Entry of Service, #15 Sam Rutledge Sheriff's Entry of Service, #16 David Daws Sheriff's Entry of Service, #17 Answer of Penske Corp., #18 Answer of Penske Vehicle, #19 Daws Answer & Defenses, #20 Morgan Truck Body Answer & Aff Defenses, #21 Answer of Sam Rutledge, #22 Answer of Hino Motors, #23 Answer of Penske LP, #24 Hino Jury Demand, #25 Joint Notice of Consent, #26 Certificate of Interested Parties, #27 Notice of Filing the Notice of Removal, #28 Gwinnett State Court Docket)(Mazziotti, Thomas) (smw).
August 28, 2020 Filing 2690 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:20-CV-3582 CAP. NO E-SUMMONS ISSUED. SUBMISSION of additional attachments re: #2689 Case Initiating Documents-Notice of Removal,. (Barre, Kenneth)(smw).
August 28, 2020 Filing 2689 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:20-CV-3582 CAP 350 28:1441mv. NO E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Notice of Removal, Anthony Matthews vs. James A. Colbert. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number AGANDC-10080662. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Pleadings from State Court Case, #2 Exhibit B - Corporations Database printout for RKL)(Barre, Kenneth)CIVIL COVER SHEET IS IN SUBMISSION #2690 (smw).
August 28, 2020 Filing 2688 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:20-CV-3581 JPB 110 28:1332in. TWO E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint Martin Concrete Construction, Inc. vs. Allied World Assurance Company (U.S.), Inc.. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number AGANDC-10080352. (Attachments: #1 Plaintiff's Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Summons, #4 Summons)(Ely, Shattuck)(smw).
August 28, 2020 Filing 2687 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:20-CV-3580 WMR 110 28:2201in. TWO E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint American Family Connect Insurance Company f/k/a Ameriprise Insurance Company vs. Ali Neema. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number AGANDC-10080194. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Incident Report, #2 Exhibit Underlying Complaint, #3 Exhibit Policy, #4 Civil Cover Sheet, #5 Summons as to Neema, #6 Summons as to Bolden)(Kershaw, Jeffrey)(smw).
August 28, 2020 Filing 2686 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:20-CV-3579 MLB 360 28:1441pi. NO E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Notice of Removal, PAMELA BAILEY vs. PUBLIX SUPER MARKETS, INC.. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number AGANDC-10080173. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(Major, Gene)(smw).
August 28, 2020 Filing 2685 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:20-CV-3578 RWS 367 28:1332pl. NO E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint Maria Criselda Trevino vs. Ethicon, Inc.. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number AGANDC-10080154. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Kreis, Douglass)(smw).
August 28, 2020 Filing 2684 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:20-CV-3577 RWS 367 28:1332pl. NO E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint Jo Ann Robison vs. Ethicon, Inc.. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number AGANDC-10080074. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Kreis, Douglass)(smw).
August 28, 2020 Filing 2683 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:20-CV-3576 RWS 367 28:1332pl. NO E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint Ian Hummel vs. Ethicon, Inc. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number AGANDC-10079954. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Kreis, Douglass)(smw).
August 28, 2020 Filing 2682 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:20-CV-3575 RWS 367 28:1332pl. NO E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint Timothy Gozdecki vs. Ethicon, Inc.. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number AGANDC-10079905. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Kreis, Douglass)(smw).
August 28, 2020 Filing 2681 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:20-CV-3574 RWS 367 28:1332pl. TWO E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint Diana Lynn Gonzalez vs. Johnson & Johnson. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number AGANDC-10079881. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons Johnson & Johnson, #3 Summons Ethicon, Inc.)(Orent, Jonathan)(smw).
August 28, 2020 Filing 2680 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:20-CV-3573 SCJ 446 42:12101. ONE E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint Brown, Yvonne vs. Rajpoot Property, Inc.. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number AGANDC-10079860. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)(Ehrlich, Craig)(smw).
August 28, 2020 Filing 2679 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:20-CV-3572 RWS 367 28:1332pl. NO E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint Susan Battle vs. Ethicon, Inc. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number AGANDC-10079833. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Kreis, Douglass)(smw).
August 28, 2020 Filing 2678 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:20-CV-3571 RWS 367 28:1332pl. NO E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint Christina Gurreri vs. Johnson & Johnson. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number AGANDC-10079835. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Waechter, Joe)(smw).
August 28, 2020 Filing 2677 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:20-CV-3570 ELR 465 08:1329. FIVE E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint SANNI vs. WOLF. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number AGANDC-10079700. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Civil Cover Sheet civil cover sheet, #7 Summons wolf, #8 Summons cuccinelli, #9 Summons miller, #10 Summons barr, #11 Summons pak)(Fogle, H.)(smw).
August 28, 2020 Filing 2676 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:20-CV-3569 MHC JSA 863 42:0405is. NO E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint Noelle Tenaglia vs. Andrew Saul. No payment received. (Attachments: #1 IFP, #2 Summons Attorney General, #3 Summons OGC, #4 Summons US Attorney, #5 Civil Cover Sheet)(Williams, Melanie)SUMMOMS WILL BE ISSUED BY THE DOCKET CLERK UPON IFP APPROVAL(smw).
August 28, 2020 Filing 2675 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:20-CV-3568 SCJ AJB 863 42:0405wc. NO E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint Kemon P. White vs. Andrew Saul. No payment received. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 In Forma Pauperis)(Ginsberg, Jonathan)(smw).
August 28, 2020 Filing 2674 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:20-CV-3567 TWT 360 28:1441pi. NO E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Notice of Removal, Ruth Helen Josey vs. Wal-Mart Stores East, LP. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number AGANDC-10079090. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A (Plaintiff's Responses to Interrogatories and Requests for Production of Documents), #3 Exhibit B (Record of Plaintiff's Spinal Surgery), #4 Exhibit C (Plaintiff's Recommendation for Shoulder Surgery), #5 Exhibit D (State Court Pleadings))(Lessinger, Howard)(smw).
August 28, 2020 Filing 2673 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:20-CV-3566 SDG RDC 480 15:1692. NO E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint Latoya Seals vs. Caine & Weiner Company, Inc.,. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number AGANDC-10079229. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Berry, Matthew)(smw).
August 28, 2020 Filing 2672 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:20-CV-3565 JPB CCB 371 15:1601. NO E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Notice of Removal, Scot E. Hanley vs. Citigroup. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number AGANDC-10078886. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Summons and Complaint, #2 Exhibit B - Certificate of Interested Persons)(Jackman, Stefanie)CIVIL COVER SHEET NOT INCLUDED. NOTIFIED ATTORNEY TO FILE THE DOCUMENT IN THE OPEN CASE(smw).
August 28, 2020 Filing 2671 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:20-CV-3564 WMR 440 42:1983cv. ONE E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint Sean Aaron Hall vs. Shermaine Alberto Carlisle. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number AGANDC-10078937. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)(Begnaud, Mark)(smw).
August 28, 2020 Filing 2670 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:20-CV-3563 MLB LTW 863 42:0405ww. NO E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint Batavia Labrion Laster vs. Andrew M. Saul, Commissioner of Social Security. No payment received. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Summons, #5 Summons, #6 Summons, #7 Motion to Proceed InForma Pauperis)(Comerford, Ida)SUMMONS WILL BE ISSUED BY THE DOCKET CLERK UPON IFP APPROVAL(smw).
August 28, 2020 Filing 2669 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:20-CV-3562 TCB 830 28:1338pt. ONE E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint Hydro Net LLC vs. Aegex Technologies, Inc.. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number AGANDC-10078870. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - '706 Patent, #2 Exhibit 2 - '706 claim chart, #3 Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Summons, #5 AO120, #6 Corporate Disclosure Statement)(Burt, Jacqueline)(smw).
August 28, 2020 Filing 2668 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:20-CV-3561 RWS. RESUBMISSION of #2662 SKIPPED CASE WAITING ON RETURN CALL FROM ATTORNEY. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint Glenda Townsend vs. Johnson & Johnson. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number AGANDC-10076463. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Waechter, Joe)(smw).
August 27, 2020 Filing 2667 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:20-CV-3555 MHC JKL 480 15:1681. TWO E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint James Burress vs. Experian Information Solutions, Inc.. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number AGANDC-10077409. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Certificate of Interested Persons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons)(Paxton, Misty)(smw).
August 27, 2020 Filing 2666 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:20-CV-3554 RWS 367 28:1332pl. NO E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint Michael Masterson vs. Johnson & Johnson. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number AGANDC-10077363. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(London, Michael)(smw).
August 27, 2020 Filing 2665 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:20-CV-3553 SCJ 465 08:1329. THREE E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint Silvia Hidalgo Canevaro vs. Chad Wolf. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number AGANDC-10077313. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Summons, #7 Summons, #8 Summons)(Claffey, Danielle)(smw).
August 27, 2020 Filing 2664 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:20-CV-3552 AT 360 28:1441pi. NO E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Notice of Removal, Brihaynan Yanez vs. Target Corporation. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number AGANDC-10076753. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A - Plaintiff's Demand Letter dated March 21, 2019, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B - All Pleadings Filed in DeKalb State Court, #3 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Exhibit Defendant Target Corporation's Answer and Defenses to Plaintiff's Complaint for Damages, #5 Exhibit Defendant Target Corporation's Demand for Twelve Person Jury)(Carson, William)(smw).
August 27, 2020 Filing 2663 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:20-CV-3551 TWT 710 29:0216b. TWO E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint Jonathan Culver vs. ATM Response, Inc.. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number AGANDC-10076585. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A - Consent to Join Forms, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Summons Proposed Summons to Defendant ATM Response, Inc., #4 Summons Proposed Summons to Clayton Braswell)(Scott, Justin)(smw).
August 27, 2020 Filing 2662 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:20-CV-3561. NO E-SUMMONS ISSUED. SKIPPED CASE WAITING ON RETURN CALL FROM ATTORNEY. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint Glenda Townsend vs. Johnson & Johnson. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number AGANDC-10076463. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Waechter, Joe)CORRECT COMPLAINT #2668 (smw).
August 27, 2020 Filing 2661 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:20-CV-3549 JPB CMS 480 15:1692. NO E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint Stacey French vs. Vance and Huffman, LLC. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number AGANDC-10076198. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Berry, Matthew)(smw).
August 27, 2020 Filing 2660 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:20-CV-3548 WMR JSA 480 15:1692. NO E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint Latresia Brown vs. I.Q. Data International, Inc.. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number AGANDC-10076166. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Berry, Matthew)(smw).
August 27, 2020 Filing 2659 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:20-CV-3547 AT RGV 480 15:1692. NO E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint Tonya Spriggs vs. Nationwide Recovery Service, Inc.,. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number AGANDC-10076107. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Berry, Matthew)(smw).
August 27, 2020 Filing 2658 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:20-CV-3546 ELR 360 28:1441pi. NO E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint JULIA WETHINGTON vs. THE KROGER, CO.. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number AGANDC-10075523. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)(Windham, Benjamin)SUMMONS WILL NOT BE ISSUED BECAUSE THE ATTORNEY ADDRESS IS MISSING. NOTIFIED THE ATTORNEY TO RESUBMIT THE SUMMONS IN THE OPEN CASE(smw).
August 27, 2020 Filing 2657 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:20-CV-3543 JPB RDC 864 42:0405id. NO E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint Marie Stanley Williamson vs. Andrew Saul, Commissioner, Soc Sec Admin. No payment received. (Attachments: #1 Complaint, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Summons Commissioner, #4 Summons General Counsel, #5 Summons US Attorney General, #6 Summons US Attorney)(Blakeney, Walter)SUMMONS WILL BE ISSUED BY THE DOCKET CLERK UPON IFP APPROVAL(smw).
August 27, 2020 Filing 2656 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:20-CV-3542 RWS 367 28:1332pl. NO E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint Diana Ford vs. Ethicon, Inc.. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number AGANDC-10074072. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(McEwen, Gregory)(smw).
August 26, 2020 Filing 2655 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:20-CV-3537 WMR 465 05:0702. FIVE E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint DA SILVA vs. WOLF. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number AGANDC-10071960. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Summons Barr, #7 Summons Cuccinelli, #8 Summons Miller, #9 Summons Pak, #10 Summons Wolf, #11 Civil Cover Sheet Civil cover sheet)(Fogle, H.)(smw).
August 26, 2020 Filing 2654 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:20-CV-3536 RWS 367 28:1332pl. NO E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint ALCARDIO REYES vs. JOHNSON & JOHNSON. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number AGANDC-10071419. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(McLaughlin, Robert)(smw).
August 26, 2020 Filing 2653 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:20-CV-3535 MLB 350 28:1441mv. NO E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Notice of Removal, Sara Mitchell vs. Robert Otis Shannon. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number AGANDC-10071399. (Sierra, Michael) (smw).
August 26, 2020 Filing 2652 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:20-CV-3534 RWS 367 28:1332pl. NO E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint Linda D. Lambert vs. Ethicon, Inc.. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number AGANDC-10071328. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Richardson, Katelyn)(smw).
August 26, 2020 Filing 2651 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:20-CV-3532 ELR CCB 863 42:0405wc. NO E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint Patricia Anne Snyder vs. Andrew Saul, Commissioner of Social Security Administration. No payment received. (Attachments: #1 Pauper Proposed Order, #2 Complaint, #3 Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Summons US Attorney, #5 Summons Office Regional Chief Counsel, #6 Summons Attorney General)(Piemonte, George)SUMMONS WILL BE ISSUED BY THE DOCKET CLERK UPON IFP APPROVAL(smw).
August 26, 2020 Filing 2650 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:20-CV-3531 MHC 140 28:1332ni. TWO E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint PNC Bank, National Association vs. Blueprint Business Services Limited Liability Company, et al.. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number AGANDC-10070658. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Summons)(Ross, Jeremy)(smw).
August 26, 2020 Filing 2649 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:20-CV-3529 TWT. ONE E-SUMMONS ISSUED. SUBMISSION of additional attachments re: #2647 Case Initiating Documents-Complaint,,. (Attachments: #1 Summons)(Bryant, William)(smw).
August 26, 2020 Filing 2648 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:20-CV-3530 LMM CCB 480 15:1692. NO E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint William Phelps vs. Capital Accounts, LLC. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number AGANDC-10070261. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Berry, Matthew)(smw).
August 26, 2020 Filing 2647 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:20-CV-3529 TWT 110 28:2201in. NO E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint Mt. Hawley Insurance Company vs. East Perimeter Pointe Apartments LP. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number AGANDC-10070007. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A (Wilder Complaint), #2 Exhibit B (Johnson Amended Complaint), #3 Exhibit C (Policy), #4 Exhibit D (Nov. 17, 2017 Reservation of Rights ltr.), #5 Exhibit E (Dec. 20, 2017 Reservation of Rights ltr.), #6 Exhibit F (Petition in First DJ Action), #7 Exhibit G (Aug. 29, 2019 Opinion and Order), #8 Exhibit H (Sept. 3, 2019 Judgment), #9 Civil Cover Sheet)(Bryant, William)(smw).
August 26, 2020 Filing 2646 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:20-CV-3527 TWT JKL 480 15:1692. NO E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint Rosea Jackson vs. Midland Credit Management, Inc.,. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number AGANDC-10069184. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Berry, Matthew)(smw).
August 26, 2020 Filing 2645 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:20-CV-3526 CAP CMS 480 15:1692. NO E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint Joan Hagle vs. Dynamic Recovery Solutions, LLC,. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number AGANDC-10069158. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Berry, Matthew)(smw).
August 26, 2020 Filing 2644 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:20-CV-3525 SDG JSA 480 15:1692. NO E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint Gloria Gaines vs. Customer Contact Solutions, LLC, d/b/a Credit Collection Services. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number AGANDC-10069067. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Berry, Matthew)(smw).
August 26, 2020 Filing 2643 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:20-CV-3523 RWS 367 28:1332pl. NO E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint Arcelia Bustos vs. Ethicon, Inc., and Johnson and Johnson. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number AGANDC-10068319. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Bradley, Michael)(smw).
August 25, 2020 Filing 2642 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:20-CV-3522 JPB 190 28:1332bc. FOUR E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint Christian Blair Wiater vs. Shalom Steckerl. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number AGANDC-10066910. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Summons, #5 Summons, #6 Summons, #7 Summons, #8 Exhibit Rule 7.1 Disclosure)(Marbutt, Olivia)(smw).
August 25, 2020 Filing 2641 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:20-CV-3521 MLB 871 26:7609. NO E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint Eagle Mountain View, LLC vs. United States of America. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number AGANDC-10066921. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Brief In Support of Petition to Quash IRS Summonses, #3 Exhibit 1 - Summons Eagle Mountain View, LLC, #4 Exhibit 2 - Summons English Mountain View, LLC, #5 Exhibit 3 - Summons Carver Mountain Reserve, LLC, #6 Exhibit 4 - Eagle Deed of Conservation, #7 Exhibit 5 - Carver Deed of Conservation, #8 Exhibit 6 - English Quitclaim Deed, #9 Exhibit 7 - Contemporaneous Written Acknowledgement, #10 Exhibit 8 - Declaration of Kerry Mock in Support of Petition)(Carter, Jason) (smw).
August 25, 2020 Filing 2640 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:20-CV-3520 ELR 190 28:1332bc. ONE E-SUMMONS ISSUED Case Initiating Documents-Complaint EyeCare Advisors, Inc., vs. FR Enterprises, LLC. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number AGANDC-10066761. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons Summons)(Bazzani, Roberto)(smw).
August 25, 2020 Filing 2639 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:20-CV-3519 WMR 110 28:1332in. NO E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint The Last Resort-Mobile LLC vs. Westchester Surplus Lines Insurance Company. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number AGANDC-10066663. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Cover Sheet)(Glover, Christopher)(smw).
August 25, 2020 Filing 2638 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:20-CV-3518 MHC RGV 480 15:1692. NO E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint Dana Bryant vs. Firstpoint Collection Resources, Inc.,. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number AGANDC-10066224. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Berry, Matthew)(smw).
August 25, 2020 Filing 2637 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:20-CV-3517 LMM WEJ 480 15:1692. NO E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint Charles Cook vs. Midwest Recovery Systems, LLC. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number AGANDC-10066169. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Berry, Matthew)(smw).
August 25, 2020 Filing 2636 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:20-CV-3516 AT 110 28:1441in. NO E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Notice of Removal, DEBRA D. PIPER vs. USAA GENERAL INDEMNITY COMPANY. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number AGANDC-10065743. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Complaint, #2 Exhibit B - Notice of Filing of Notice of Removal, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(Bingham, William) (smw).
August 25, 2020 Filing 2635 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:20-CV-3515 CAP 110 28:1332in. ONE E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint LM Insurance Corporation vs. Integrated Service Solutions, LLC. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number AGANDC-10065495. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Exhibit Exhibit A - BAO57439627 2018-2019 Policy, #4 Exhibit Exhibit B - BKS57439627 2016-2017 Policy, #5 Exhibit Exhibit C - BKS57439627 2017-2018 Policy, #6 Exhibit Exhibit D - XWS57439627 2016-2017 Policy, #7 Exhibit Exhibit E - XWS57439627 2017-2018 Policy)(Crosby, Scott)(smw).
August 25, 2020 Filing 2634 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:20-CV-3514 SDG 365 28:1332pl. TWO E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint Jason Eisenhauer vs. LG Chem, LTD. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number AGANDC-10065372. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Summons)(Sleppy, David)(smw).
August 25, 2020 Filing 2633 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:20-CV-3513 JPB 110 28:2201in. FOUR E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint Travelers Casualty Insurance Company of America vs. Signature Day Spa, LLC et al.. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number AGANDC-10065325. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Certified Policy, #2 Summons to Signature Day Spa, #3 Summons to Trang Huynh Thi Tran aka Huynh My T Tran, #4 Summons to Phuong Dang, #5 Summons to Allison Carpenter, #6 Civil Cover Sheet)(Friedman, Seth)(smw).
August 25, 2020 Filing 2632 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:20-CV-3512 RWS 367 28:1332pl. NO E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint Matthew Watterson vs. Ethicon, Inc.. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number AGANDC-10065327. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)(Guerra, Gerardo)SUMMONS IS A WAVIER OF SERVICE(smw).
August 25, 2020 Filing 2631 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:20-CV-3509 ELR AJB 480 15:1681. TWO E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Initiating Documents-Complaint Shana McDade vs. Equifax Information Services, LLC. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number AGANDC-10064535. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Summons)(Landreau, Matthew) (smw).
August 25, 2020 Filing 2630 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:20-CV-3507 AT RDC 480 15:1692. ONE E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint Whitney Stewart vs. CBC Recovery, Inc. d/b/a Credit Bureau Central, Inc. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number AGANDC-10064037. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)(Landreau, Matthew)(smw).
August 25, 2020 Filing 2629 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:20-CV-3506 CAP CCB 480 15:1681. TWO E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint Brandon Viverette vs. Equifax Information Services, LLC. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number AGANDC-10063846. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Summons)(Landreau, Matthew)(smw).
August 25, 2020 Filing 2628 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:20-CV-3505 SDG JKL 480 15:1692. ONE E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint Corey Luster vs. First Financial Investment Fund Holdings, LLC. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number AGANDC-10063754. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)(Landreau, Matthew)(smw).
August 24, 2020 Filing 2627 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:20-CV-3502 JPB JKL 863 42:0405wc. NO E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint James Mack vs. Andrew Saul. No payment received. (Attachments: #1 IFP, #2 Summons Attorney General, #3 Summons OGC, #4 Summons United States Atty, #5 Civil Cover Sheet Cover Sheet)(Williams, Melanie)(smw).
August 24, 2020 Filing 2626 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:20-CV-3501 WMR CMS 863 42:0405wc. NO E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint Collin Hutchinson vs. Andrew Saul, Commissioner of Social Security Administration. No payment received. (Attachments: #1 Pauper Proposed Order, #2 Complaint, #3 Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Summons US Attorney, #5 Summons Office Regional Chief Counsel, #6 Summons Attorney General)(Piemonte, George)(smw).
August 24, 2020 Filing 2625 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:20-CV-3500 TWT 446 42:12101. ONE E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint Britton, Tiawan vs. Siarah Investments, Inc.. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number AGANDC-10061349. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)(Ehrlich, Craig)(smw).
August 24, 2020 Filing 2624 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:20-CV-3499 MLB 360 28:1441pi. NO E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Notice of Removal, Tiffany Davis Hubert vs. Office Depot, Inc.. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number BGANDC-10061255. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Complaint, #2 Exhibit B - Discovery filed by Plaintiff, #3 Exhibit C - Summons, #4 Exhibit D - General Case Initiation Form, #5 Exhibit E - Entry of Service for Office Depot, #6 Exhibit F - Entry of Service for Office Max, Inc., #7 Exhibit G - Answer of Defendants, #8 Exhibit H - State Court Notice of Removal)(Cornwell, Dorothy)(smw).
August 24, 2020 Filing 2623 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:20-CV-3498 ELR 710 29:0216b. ONE E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint Keiko Tagawa vs. Bridgestone Golf, Inc.. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number AGANDC-10061270. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)(Mays, John)(smw).
August 24, 2020 Filing 2622 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:20-CV-3497 MHC 140 28:1332ni. THREE E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint Truist Bank f/k/a Branch Banking and Trust Company, a North Carolina state chartered banking corporation vs. Diagnostic Equipment Services, Inc.. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number AGANDC-10060975. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Summons Roland Galatas, #7 Summons John E. Galatas, #8 Summons Diagnostic Equipment Services, Inc., #9 Civil Cover Sheet)(Levy, Brian)(smw).
August 24, 2020 Filing 2621 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:20-CV-3496 LMM JSA 480 15:1692. ONE E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint Kandice Green vs. General Revenue Corporation. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number AGANDC-10061127. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)(Landreau, Matthew)(smw).
August 24, 2020 Filing 2620 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:20-CV-3495 TWT 465 05:0702. FIVE E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint ANGELICA MEJICANOS MARAVILLA vs. WILLIAM BARR. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number AGANDC-10060830. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover, #2 Summons Summons - Barr, #3 Summons Summons - Wolf, #4 Summons Summons- Miller, #5 Summons Summons - Cuccinelli, #6 Summons Summons - Pak, #7 Exhibit A - AOS Denial, #8 Exhibit B - AOS Application, #9 Exhibit C - TPS Status, #10 Exhibit D - AP Entry, #11 Exhibit E - I-130/485 Receipts, #12 Exhibit F - ASC Notice, #13 Exhibit G- Interview Notice, #14 Exhibit H - Interview Results)(Rojas, Rebecca)(smw).
August 24, 2020 Filing 2619 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:20-CV-3494 WMR AJB 480 15:1681. SEVEN E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint Kalinda Redel vs. Equifax Information Services, LLC. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number AGANDC-10060359. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons, #5 Summons, #6 Summons, #7 Summons, #8 Summons)(Landreau, Matthew)(smw).
August 24, 2020 Filing 2618 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:20-CV-3493 MLB LTW 480 15:1681. FOUR E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint Latara Oglesby vs. Equifax Information Services, LLC. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number AGANDC-10060133. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons, #5 Summons)(Landreau, Matthew)(smw).
August 24, 2020 Filing 2617 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:20-CV-3491 RWS 422 28:0158. NO E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Bankruptcy Notice of Appeal, USBC Case#: 15-58443-wlh. Notice of Appeal filed 8/21/2020 from Order entered 8/7/2020 by Appellant Norcross Hospitality, LLC. Fee Paid: Yes. USBC Receipt No. 54269741. (Attachments: #1 NOA doc175, #2 Appealed Order doc164, #3 Docket sheet)(Lugo, Yahaira)(smw).
August 24, 2020 Filing 2616 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:20-CV-3490 ELR 710 29:0216b. ONE E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint Ezemond Smith vs. BFI Waste Services, LLC d/b/a Republic Services. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number AGANDC-10059008. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)(Herrington, Matthew)(smw).
August 24, 2020 Filing 2615 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:20-CV-3487 MLB RDC 480 15:1681. TWO E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint Prince Brantley vs. LVNV Funding, LLC. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number AGANDC-10058416. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A: Brandsmart Receipt, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B: State Lawsuit, #3 Exhibit Exhibit C: State Lawsuit Answer, #4 Exhibit Exhibit D: State Lawsuit Dismissal, #5 Affidavit Plaintiff's Verification, #6 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #7 Summons Summons for Defendant LVNV Funding, LLC, #8 Summons Summons for Defendant Resurgent Capital Services, LP)(Sandt, Jillian)(smw).
August 23, 2020 Filing 2614 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:20-CV-3486 SCJ 350 28:1441mv. NO E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Notice of Removal, Jonathan Bussey vs. Crossroad Properties A, Inc.. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number AGANDC-10057240. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Fulton County State Court Notice of Filing Notice of Removal, #2 Exhibit B - Defendant has attached hereto a copy of the Summons, Complaint, Interrogatories, and Requests for Production of Documents to Tyson Foods, Inc., which are the only process, pleadings and/or orders in this case, #3 Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Defendant Tyson Foods, Inc.'s Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement)(Bentley, Elizabeth)(smw).
August 22, 2020 Filing 2613 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:20-CV-3485 CAP AJB 445 42:12101. ONE E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint Ralph E. White vs. Process Equipment and Controls, LLC. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number AGANDC-10057198. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A (Charge of Discrimination), #2 Exhibit B (Notice of Right to Sue), #3 Exhibit C (Separation Notice), #4 Civil Cover Sheet, #5 Summons)(Smith, Louise)(smw).
August 22, 2020 Filing 2612 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:20-CV-3484 AT 443 42:3601. NO E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint RON LESLIE vs. MID-AMERICA APARTMENT COMMUNITIES INC. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number AGANDC-10057079. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)(Goldberg, Ralph) SUMMONS WILL NOT BE ISSUED BECAUSE THE DEFENDANTS NAME IS MISSING. NOTIFIED ATTORNEY TO RESUBMIT THE SUMMONS IN THE OPEN CASE(smw).
August 21, 2020 Filing 2611 Case Initiating Documents-Complaint Carolyn Michelle Morehead vs. Ethicon, Inc.. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number AGANDC-10056191. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Greenwell, Robert)
August 21, 2020 Filing 2610 Case Initiating Documents-Complaint CHERYL VARLARO vs. GRACO CHILDRENS PRODUCTS, INC.. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number AGANDC-10056164. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons (Proposed to Graco Children's Products, Inc.), #3 Summons (Proposed to Newell Brands DTC, Inc.))(Worley, David)
August 21, 2020 Filing 2609 Case Initiating Documents-Complaint Gail T. Pemberton vs. Andrew M. Saul, Commissioner of Social Security. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number AGANDC-10055881. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Summons, #5 Summons, #6 Summons)(Flynn, Kathleen)
August 21, 2020 Filing 2608 Case Initiating Documents-Complaint Tawanda Lowe vs. Medciphers, LLC. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number AGANDC-10055837. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Consent to Join Form)(Scott, Justin)
August 21, 2020 Filing 2607 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:20-CV-3479 WMR 190 28:1332bc. TWO E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint Belakip, LLC vs. Cascade Sweep Products LLC,. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number AGANDC-10055710. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Summons)(Ferrand, Frederick) (smw).
August 21, 2020 Filing 2606 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:20-CV-3478 RWS 367 28:1332pl. NO E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint Gary C. Harrer vs. Ethicon. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number AGANDC-10055734. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Stokes, Kelsey)(smw).
August 21, 2020 Filing 2605 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:20-CV-3476 SDG 446 42:12101. ONE E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint Blinkhorn, Jessica vs. Wellbuilt, Inc.. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number AGANDC-10055033. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)(Ehrlich, Craig)(smw).
August 21, 2020 Filing 2604 MISCELLANEOUS ACTION NO. 1:20-MI-0099 UNA 890 28:1963. NO E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Miscellaneous (Registration of Judgment from another district), Bell, Kenneth D. vs. Youngblood, Julia. Filing fee $ 47, receipt number AGANDC-10054421. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Supplement Final Judgment, #3 Supplement Amended Receivership Order Appointing Successor Receiver, #4 Supplement Letter to Clerk)(Dinardo, Joseph)(smw).
August 21, 2020 Filing 2603 MISCELLANEOUS ACTION NO. 1:20-MI-0098 UNA 890 28:1963. NO E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Miscellaneous (Registration of Judgment from another district), Bell, Kenneth D. vs. Vasile, Gabriel. Filing fee $ 47, receipt number AGANDC-10054411. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Supplement Final Judgment, #3 Supplement Amended Receivership Order Appointing Successor Receiver, #4 Supplement Letter to Clerk)(Dinardo, Joseph)(smw).
August 21, 2020 Filing 2602 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:20-CV-3475 MHC CCB 480 15:1681. ONE E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint Owen Couture vs. Equifax Information Services LLC. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number AGANDC-10054410. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Weiner, Andrew)(smw).
August 21, 2020 Filing 2601 MISCELLANEOUS ACTION NO. 1:20-MI-0097 UNA 890 28:1963. NO E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Miscellaneous (Registration of Judgment from another district), Bell, Kenneth D. vs. Shi, Hailiang. Filing fee $ 47, receipt number AGANDC-10054402. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Supplement Final Judgment, #3 Supplement Amended Receivership Order Appointing Successor Receiver, #4 Supplement Letter to Clerk)(Dinardo, Joseph)(smw).
August 21, 2020 Filing 2600 MISCELLANEOUS ACTION NO. 1:20-MI-0096 UNA 890 28:1963. NO E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Miscellaneous (Registration of Judgment from another district), Bell, Kenneth D. vs. Pham, Quynh Ngoc. Filing fee $ 47, receipt number AGANDC-10054377. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Supplement Final Judgment, #3 Supplement Amended Receivership Order Appointing Successor Receiver, #4 Supplement Letter to Clerk)(Dinardo, Joseph)(smw).
August 21, 2020 Filing 2599 MISCELLANEOUS ACTION NO. 1:20-MI-0095 UNA 890 28:1963. NO E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Miscellaneous (Registration of Judgment from another district), Bell, Kenneth D. vs. Nguyen, Thang M. Filing fee $ 47, receipt number AGANDC-10054363. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Supplement Final Judgment, #3 Supplement Amended Receivership Order Appointing Successor Receiver, #4 Supplement Letter to Clerk)(Dinardo, Joseph)(smw).
August 21, 2020 Filing 2598 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:20-CV-3474 SCJ 442 28:1443. NO E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Notice of Removal, Roger Halstead vs. Fidel Espinoza. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number AGANDC-10054327. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Superior Court filings, #2 Exhibit B - Consent form, #3 Exhibit C - Notice to Plaintiff, #4 Civil Cover Sheet)(Gignilliat, Richard)(smw).
August 21, 2020 Filing 2597 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:20-CV-3473 RWS 367 28:1332pl. NO E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint Tomika Alamo vs. Ethicon, Inc.. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number AGANDC-10054217. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Burke, Daniel)(smw).
August 21, 2020 Filing 2596 MISCELLANEOUS ACTION NO. 1:20-MI-0094 UNA 890 28:1963. NO E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Miscellaneous (Registration of Judgment from another district), Bell, Kenneth D. vs. Nguyen, Lien. Filing fee $ 47, receipt number AGANDC-10054182. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Supplement Final Judgment, #3 Supplement Amended Receivership Order Appointing Successor Receiver, #4 Supplement Letter to Clerk)(Dinardo, Joseph)(smw).
August 21, 2020 Filing 2595 MISCELLANEOUS ACTION NO. 1:20-MI-0093 UNA 890 28:1963. NO E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Miscellaneous (Registration of Judgment from another district), Bell, Kenneth D. vs. Hill, Lori. Filing fee $ 47, receipt number AGANDC-10054086. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Supplement Final Judgment, #3 Supplement Amended Receivership Order Appointing Successor Receiver, #4 Supplement Letter to Clerk)(Dinardo, Joseph)(smw).
August 21, 2020 Filing 2594 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:20-CV-3472 CAP 110 28:1441in. NO E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Notice of Removal, Cascade Parc Property Owners Association, Inc. vs. American Alternative Insurance Corporation. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number AGANDC-10053991. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A to Notice of Removal - Underlying Pleadings, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Friedman, Seth)(smw).
August 21, 2020 Filing 2593 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:20-CV-3471 RWS 367 28:1332pl. NO E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint Sylvianna A. Esquibel vs. Ethicon, Inc.. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number AGANDC-10054019. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Burke, Daniel)(smw).
August 21, 2020 Filing 2592 MISCELLANEOUS ACTION NO. 1:20-MI-0092 UNA 890 28:1963. NO E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Miscellaneous (Registration of Judgment from another district), Bell, Kenneth D. vs. Ha, Lai K. Filing fee $ 47, receipt number AGANDC-10053981. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Supplement Final Judgment, #3 Supplement Amended Receivership Order Appointing Successor Receiver, #4 Supplement Letter to Clerk)(Dinardo, Joseph) (smw).
August 21, 2020 Filing 2591 MISCELLANEOUS ACTION NO. 1:20-MI-0091 UNA 890 28:1963. NO E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Miscellaneous (Registration of Judgment from another district), Bell, Kenneth D. vs. Francis, Leroy. Filing fee $ 47, receipt number AGANDC-10053959. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Supplement Final Judgment, #3 Supplement Amended Receivership Order Appointing Successor Receiver, #4 Supplement Letter to Clerk)(Dinardo, Joseph)(smw).
August 21, 2020 Filing 2590 MISCELLANEOUS ACTION NO. 1:20-MI-0090 UNA 890 28:1963. NO E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Miscellaneous (Registration of Judgment from another district), Bell, Kenneth D. vs. Cox, Michelle. Filing fee $ 47, receipt number AGANDC-10053935. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Supplement Final Judgment, #3 Supplement Amended Receivership Order Appointing Successor Receiver, #4 Supplement Letter to Clerk)(Dinardo, Joseph)(smw).
August 21, 2020 Filing 2589 MISCELLANEOUS ACTION NO. 1:20-MI-0089 UNA 890 28:1963. NO E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Miscellaneous (Registration of Judgment from another district), Bell, Kenneth D. vs. Bui, Tri Luong. Filing fee $ 47, receipt number AGANDC-10053905. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Supplement Final Judgment, #3 Supplement Amended Receivership Order Appointing Successor Receiver, #4 Supplement Letter to Clerk)(Dinardo, Joseph)(smw).
August 21, 2020 Filing 2588 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:20-CV-3470 RWS 367 28:1332pl. NO E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint Johnny Youngman vs. Ethicon, Inc.. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number AGANDC-10053690. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Kinsman, Robert)(smw).
August 21, 2020 Filing 2587 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:20-CV-3469 RWS 367 28:1332pl. TWO E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint Jason Lockard vs. Ethicon, Inc.. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number AGANDC-10053722. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons Summons as to Ethicon, Inc., #3 Summons Summons as to Johnson & Johnson)(Orent, Jonathan)(smw).
August 21, 2020 Filing 2586 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:20-CV-3468 RWS 367 28:1332pl. NO E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint Cynthia Skinner vs. Ethicon, Inc.. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number AGANDC-10053674. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Kinsman, Robert)(smw).
August 21, 2020 Filing 2585 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:20-CV-3467 RWS 367 28:1332pl. NO E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint Fred Petry vs. Ethicon, Inc.. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number AGANDC-10053639. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Kinsman, Robert)(smw).
August 21, 2020 Filing 2584 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:20-CV-3466 RWS 367 28:1332pl. NO E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint Brenda McMurray vs. Ethicon, Inc.. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number AGANDC-10053612. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Kinsman, Robert)(smw).
August 21, 2020 Filing 2583 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:20-CV-3465 RWS 367 28:1332pl. NO E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint Christopher Gruendler vs. Ethicon, Inc.. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number AGANDC-10053572. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Kinsman, Robert)(smw).
August 21, 2020 Filing 2582 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:20-CV-3463 SDG 870 26:7401. ONE E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint United States of America vs. Frederick Cortez Lee, Jr.. No payment received. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)(Vanaskie, Thomas)(smw).
August 21, 2020 Filing 2581 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:20-CV-3462 RWS 367 28:1332pl. NO E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint Diane Capel vs. Ethicon, Inc.. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number AGANDC-10053309. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Kinsman, Robert)(smw).
August 21, 2020 Filing 2580 MISCELLANEOUS ACTION NO. 1:20-MI-0088 UNA 890 28:1963. NO E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Miscellaneous (Registration of Judgment from another district), Bell, Kenneth D. vs. Bellevue, Marie. Filing fee $ 47, receipt number AGANDC-10053398. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Supplement Final Judgment, #3 Supplement Amended Receivership Order Appointing Successor Receiver, #4 Supplement Letter to Clerk)(Dinardo, Joseph)(smw).
August 21, 2020 Filing 2579 MISCELLANEOUS ACTION NO. 1:20-MI-0087 UNA 890 28:1963. NO E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Miscellaneous (Registration of Judgment from another district), Bell, Kenneth D. vs. Bedward, Olga. Filing fee $ 47, receipt number AGANDC-10053379. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Supplement Final Judgment, #3 Supplement Amended Receivership Order Appointing Successor Receiver, #4 Supplement Letter to Clerk)(Dinardo, Joseph)(smw).
August 21, 2020 Filing 2578 MISCELLANEOUS ACTION NO. 1:20-MI-0086 UNA 890 28:1963. NO E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Miscellaneous (Registration of Judgment from another district), Bell, Kenneth D. vs. Bedward, Cleffen. Filing fee $ 47, receipt number AGANDC-10053367. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Supplement Final Judgment, #3 Supplement Amended Receivership Order Appointing Successor Receiver, #4 Supplement Letter to Clerk)(Dinardo, Joseph)(smw).
August 21, 2020 Filing 2577 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:20-CV-3460 SCJ . NO E-SUMMONS ISSUED. SUBMISSION of additional attachments re: #2574 Case Initiating Documents-Complaint. (Barash, Jonathan)SUMMONS WILL NOT BE E-ISSUED BECAUSE THE DEFENDANTS ADDRESS IS MISSING. NOTIFIED ATTORNEY TO RESUBMIT THE SUMMONS IN THE OPEN CASE(smw).
August 21, 2020 Filing 2576 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:20-CV-3460 SCJ. NO E-SUMMONS ISSUED. SUBMISSION of additional attachments re: #2574 Case Initiating Documents-Complaint. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Consent Judgment (From CAFN. 1:10-cv-469-RLV, #2 Exhibit Consent Order Granting Final Judgment (From CAFN. 1:10-cv-469-RLV, #3 Exhibit O.C.G.A. 9-12-60, #4 Exhibit O.C.G.A. 9-12-61)(Barash, Jonathan)(smw).
August 21, 2020 Filing 2575 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:20-CV-3461 MHC 360 28:1441pi. NO E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Notice of Removal, Al-Teric Mitchell vs. Walmart, Inc.. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number AGANDC-10052800. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A - State Court Pleadings)(Lessinger, Howard)(smw).
August 20, 2020 Filing 2574 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:20-CV-3460 SCJ 150 28:1332ej. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint Blue Lake Recovery Company, LLC, as assignee of U.S. Acquisition, LLC vs. Thaddeus John Pryor. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number AGANDC-10051438. (Barash, Jonathan)CIVIL COVER SHEET ONLY IN THIS FILING. COMPLAINT IS FILED IN #2576 (smw).
August 20, 2020 Filing 2573 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:20-CV-3459 RWS 367 28:1332pl. NO E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint Cynthia A. Gallik vs. Ethicon, Inc.. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number AGANDC-10051386. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Giovannone, Andrea)(smw).
August 20, 2020 Filing 2572 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:20-CV-3458 AT AJB 863 42:0405ww. NO E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint Eddie Leon Patten vs. Andrew M. Saul, Commissioner of Social Security. No payment received. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Civil Cover Sheet, #5 Summons, #6 Summons, #7 Summons, #8 Motion for In Forma Pauperis)(Comerford, Ida)SUMMONS WILL BE ISSUED BY THE DOCKET CLERK UPON IFP APPROVAL (smw).
August 20, 2020 Filing 2571 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:20-CV-3453 CAP 350 28:1441mv. NO E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Notice of Removal, MUNIR ALZEAR vs. YORK FREIGHT, INC.. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number AGANDC-10050944. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit State Court Filings, #2 Exhibit Affidavit of Scott W. McMickle, #3 Exhibit Notice of Filing Notice of Removal, #4 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet)(McMickle, Scott)(smw).
August 20, 2020 Filing 2570 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:20-CV-3452 SDG 791 28:1441er. NO E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Notice of Removal, Alison Rhodes vs. Anthem Insurance Companies, Inc.. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number AGANDC-10050802. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A. State Court Filing, #2 Exhibit B. State Court Notice, #3 Certificate of Interested Parties, #4 Civil Cover Sheet)(Hollis, James)(smw).
August 20, 2020 Filing 2569 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:20-CV-3451 RWS 367 28:1332pl. NO E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint Jon Walker vs. Ethicon, Inc.. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number AGANDC-10050541. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(McCarley, Matthew)(smw).
August 20, 2020 Filing 2568 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:20-CV-3449 MLB 710 29:0216b. TWO E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint SAMUEL TY NORTON vs. ON THE LEVEL DEVELOPMENT GROUP, INC.. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number AGANDC-10050339. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons On the Level Development Group, Inc., #3 Summons to Robert Brian Travers)(Bridgers, Charles)(smw).
August 20, 2020 Filing 2567 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:20-CV-3448 RWS 367 28:1332pl. NO E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint Marie Tillery vs. Ethicon, Inc.. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number AGANDC-10049968. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Giovannone, Andrea)(smw).
August 20, 2020 Filing 2566 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:20-CV-3447 ELR 350 28:1441mv. NO E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Notice of Removal, Flentrus Murdock vs. Walter Early. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number AGANDC-10049941. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet)(Wilson, David)(smw).
August 20, 2020 Filing 2565 MISCELLANEOUS ACTION NO. 1:20-MI-0085 UNA 890 28:1963. NO E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Miscellaneous (Registration of Judgment from another district), Bell, Kenneth D. vs. Evans, Carl. Filing fee $ 47, receipt number AGANDC-10049669. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Supplement Final Judgment, #3 Supplement Amended Receivership Order Appointing Successor Receiver, #4 Supplement)(Dinardo, Joseph)(smw).
August 20, 2020 Filing 2564 MISCELLANEOUS ACTION NO. 1:20-MI-0084 UNA 890 28:1963. NO E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Miscellaneous (Registration of Judgment from another district), Bell, Kenneth D. vs. Wong, Caesar. Filing fee $ 47, receipt number AGANDC-10049605. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Supplement Final Judgment, #3 Supplement Amended Receivership Order Appointing Successor Receiver, #4 Supplement Letter to Clerk)(Dinardo, Joseph)(smw).
August 20, 2020 Filing 2563 MISCELLANEOUS ACTION NO. 1:20-MI-0083 UNA 890 28:1963. NO E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Miscellaneous (Registration of Judgment from another district), Bell, Kenneth D. vs. Johnson, Anatal. Filing fee $ 47, receipt number AGANDC-10049555. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Supplement Final Judgment, #3 Supplement Amended Receivership Order Appointing Successor Receiver, #4 Supplement Letter to Clerk)(Dinardo, Joseph)(smw).
August 20, 2020 Filing 2562 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:20-CV-3446 MHC LTW 863 42:0405ww. THREE E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint Barrnisha Smith o/b/o R.A.M., III vs. Andrew M. Saul, Commissioner of Social Security. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number AGANDC-10049539. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Summons, #5 Summons, #6 Summons)(Flynn, Kathleen)(smw).
August 20, 2020 Filing 2561 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:20-CV-3445 AT RDC 863 42:0405id. THREE E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint Deonta Jamal Jones vs. Andrew M. Saul, Commissioner of Social Security. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number AGANDC-10049270. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Civil Cover Sheet, #5 Summons, #6 Summons, #7 Summons)(Comerford, Ida)(smw).
August 20, 2020 Filing 2560 PLEASE SEE #2560 . CASE SKIPPED BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT. Case Initiating Documents-Miscellaneous (Registration of Judgment from another district), Bell, Kenneth D. vs. Wong, Caesar. No payment received. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Supplement Final Judgment, #3 Supplement Amended Receivership Order Appointing Successor Receiver, #4 Supplement Letter to Clerk)(Dinardo, Joseph) (smw).
August 20, 2020 Filing 2559 PLEASE SEE #2563 CASE SKIPPED BECAUSE ON NON-PAYMENT. Case Initiating Documents-Miscellaneous (Registration of Judgment from another district), Bell, Kenneth D. vs. Johnson, Anatal. No payment received. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Supplement Judgment, #3 Supplement Amended Receivership Order Appointing Successor Receiver, #4 Supplement Letter to Clerk)(Dinardo, Joseph)(smw).
August 20, 2020 Filing 2558 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:20-CV-3443 CAP 710 29:0216b. THREE E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint Yesenia Tovar vs. Fannie's, Inc.. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number AGANDC-10048795. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons)(Herrington, Matthew)(smw).
August 20, 2020 Filing 2557 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:20-CV-3442 SDG 470 18:1964. NO E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint Advantage Behavioral Health Systems vs. Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc.. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number AGANDC-10048364. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet)(Byrd, Charles)(smw).
August 19, 2020 Filing 2556 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:20-CV-3440 RWS 367 28:1332pl. TWO E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint Lea vs. Meadows. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number AGANDC-10046202. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons Summons as to Ethicon, Inc., #3 Summons Summons as to Johnson & Johnson)(Orent, Jonathan)(smw).
August 19, 2020 Filing 2555 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:20-CV-3439 JPB 446 42:12101. ONE E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint Cordero, Alexander vs. Herrington Center, LLC. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number AGANDC-10045952. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)(Ehrlich, Craig)(smw).
August 19, 2020 Filing 2554 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:20-CV-3438 JPB 350 28:2674. FIVE E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint Carl Richardson vs. The United States of America. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number AGANDC-10045745. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Notice of Lawsuit and Service Waiver, #3 Summons Summons DOJ, #4 Summons Summons Johnson, #5 Summons Summons Massey, #6 Summons Summons USA, #7 Summons Summons VA)(Joyner, William)(smw).
August 19, 2020 Filing 2553 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:20-CV-3437 WMR LTW 442 42:2000sx. ONE E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint Corey R. Rumbold vs. Trader Joe's East, Inc.. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number AGANDC-10045314. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A: Rumbold Charge of Discrimination, #2 Exhibit B: EEOC Dismissal and Notice of Suit Rights, #3 Summons, #4 Civil Cover Sheet)(Fuchs, Dean)(smw).
August 19, 2020 Filing 2552 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:20-CV-3436 WMR 196 28:1441bc. NO E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Notice of Removal, Holiday Hospitality Franchising, LLC f/k/a Holiday Hospitality Franchising, Inc. vs. Suresh Anandani. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number AGANDC-10044721. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Complaint in State Court, #2 Exhibit B - Affidavits of Service, #3 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet)(Tady, Aaron)(smw).
August 19, 2020 Filing 2551 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:20-CV-3434 MLB 446 42:12101. ONE E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint Deborah Laufer vs. J AND J HOTELS LLC. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number AGANDC-10043251. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)(Gillespie, Tristan)(smw).
August 19, 2020 Filing 2550 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:20-CV-3433 CAP 470 18:1961. FOUR E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint Interactive Learning Systems Inc. dba Interactive College of Technology vs. Minerva Capital Management Inc.. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number AGANDC-10042711. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Certificate of Interested Persons & Corporate Disclosure Statement, #3 Summons)(Burroughs, Brannon)(smw).
August 19, 2020 Filing 2549 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:20-CV-3431 LMM 422 28:0158. NO E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Bankruptcy Notice of Appeal, USBC Case#: 16-52291-jrs. Notice of Appeal filed 8/18/2020 from Order entered 6/29/2020 and 8/4/2020 by Appellant WBY,Inc., d/b/a Follies. Fee Paid: Yes. USBC Receipt No. 54251460. (Attachments: #1 NOA doc 750, #2 Appealed Order doc 741, #3 Appealed Order doc 746, #4 Motion for Leave to Appeal doc 752, #5 Docket Sheet)(Lugo, Yahaira)(smw).
August 18, 2020 Filing 2548 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:20-CV-3429 JPB CCB 864 42:0405id. NO E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint Matthew Hiltman vs. Andrew Saul. No payment received. (Attachments: #1 Summons Attorney General, #2 Summons OGC, #3 Summons US Attorney, #4 Civil Cover Sheet, #5 Affidavit)(Williams, Melanie)CIVIL COVER SHEET IS BLANK. NOTIFIED ATTORNEY TO REFILE THE DOCUMENT FILLED OUT. SUMMONS WILL BE E-ISSUED BY THE DOCKET CLERK UPON IFP APPROVAL(smw).
August 18, 2020 Filing 2547 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:20-CV-3428 WMR 462 08:1329. FOUR E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint Melizza Wilson vs. Chad Wolf. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number AGANDC-10041618. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons Summons Cuccinelli, #3 Summons Summons Miller, #4 Summons Summons US Atty Pak, #5 Summons Summons Wolf, #6 Exhibit Exhibit A, #7 Exhibit Exhibit B, #8 Exhibit Exhibit C)(Levine, Kenneth)(smw). Modified on 8/19/2020 (aar).
August 18, 2020 Filing 2546 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:20-CV-3427 MHC RDC 751 29:2601. NO E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint Kenneth Smith vs. Sysco Atlanta, LLC. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number AGANDC-10041601. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)(Herrington, Matthew)(smw).
August 18, 2020 Filing 2545 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:20-CV-3426 RWS 367 28:1332pl. NO E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint Shelley Johnson vs. Ethicon, Inc.. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number AGANDC-10041398. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Finson, Lowell)(smw).
August 18, 2020 Filing 2544 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:20-CV-3425 LMM JKL 863 42:0405WW. THREE E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint Jack Peyton Newton vs. Commissioner of Social Security. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number AGANDC-10040957. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A: Notice of Appeals Council Action, #2 Exhibit B: Granted Extension Request, #3 Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Letter to Clerk, #5 Proposed Summons, #6 Proposed Summons, #7 Proposed Summons, #8 Certificate of Interested Parties)(Olinsky, Howard)(smw).
August 18, 2020 Filing 2543 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:20-CV-3424 RWS 367 28:1332pl. NO E-SUMMON ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint Sharena Bennett vs. Ethicon, Inc.. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number AGANDC-10040430. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Hymes, William)(smw).
August 18, 2020 Filing 2542 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:20-CV-3423 MLB 350 28:1332mv. FOUR E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint Donna L. Seitz vs. Swift Transportation Co. of Arizona, LLC. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number AGANDC-10040294. (Attachments: #1 Summons for Swift Transportation Co. of Arizona, LLC, #2 Summons for Red Rock Risk Retention Group, Inc, #3 Summons for Target Corporation, #4 Summons for Thomas Benson, #5 Civil Cover Sheet + Addendum)(Cheeley, Robert)(smw).
August 18, 2020 Filing 2541 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:20-CV-3422 AT 360 28:1441pi. NO E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Notice of Removal, Adriana Mendez vs. Wal-Mart Stores, Inc.. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number AGANDC-10040103. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A - Plaintiff's Responses to Discovery, #3 Exhibit B - Pleadings)(Rogers, Jennie)(smw).
August 18, 2020 Filing 2540 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:20-CV-3421 AT JKL 480 15:1692. NO E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint Johnny Jackson vs. Receivables Performance Management, LLC,. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number AGANDC-10040097. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Berry, Matthew)(smw).
August 18, 2020 Filing 2539 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:20-CV-3420 TWT CMS 480 15:1681. THREE E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint Kateryna Vykhopen vs. Equifax Information Services, LLC. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number AGANDC-10039913. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons to be issued for Equifax, #3 Summons to be issued for Experian, #4 Summons to be issued for Trans Union)(Gomez, Octavio)(smw).
August 18, 2020 Filing 2538 2:20-cv-189-RWS (28:2671/350) FILED IN WRONG DIVISION. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint Jeffrey Wheeler vs. United States of America. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number AGANDC-10039371. (Attachments: #1 Summons Summons -Def. Akana, #2 Summons Summons -Def. Renschler, #3 Summons Summons -U.S. Gov., #4 Civil Cover Sheet Cover Sheet)(Patel, Amit)DOCUMENTS FILED IN INCORRECT DIVISION SHELL CASE. DOCUMENTS FORWARDED TO GAINSEVILLE ON 08/18/2020 BY SWB(smw). Modified on 8/19/2020 (dgr).
August 18, 2020 Filing 2537 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:20-CV-3417 MLB 896 09:0009. TWO E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. vs. Zachary Seth Lewis. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number AGANDC-10038599. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons for Zachary Seth Lewis, #3 Summons for Angel Aquino Ilagan)(Richard, John)(smw).
August 18, 2020 Filing 2536 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:20-CV-3416 MLB JCF 480 15:1692. TWO E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint JAMES BURRESS vs. MIDLAND FUNDING, LLC. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number AGANDC-10038493. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A Affidavit of Service, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B Order Denying Default Motion, #3 Summons Midland Summons, #4 Summons Mitchell Summons, #5 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet)(Parisi, Jerald)(smw).
August 18, 2020 Filing 2535 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:20-CV-3410 TWT CMS 864 42:0405id. FOUR E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint PAMELA C. PALMER vs. ANDREW SAUL, COMMISSIONER OF SOCIAL SECURITY. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number AGANDC-10036780. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons AUSA, #3 Summons GENERAL, #4 Summons Region IV, #5 Summons US ATTY)(Atkins, Pamela)(smw).
August 17, 2020 Filing 2534 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:20-CV-3409 SDG 440 42:1983cv. NO E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint Christopher Johnson vs. Chance Belcher. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number AGANDC-10035999. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex. A - Ante Litem Notice, #2 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Summons Notice of Lawsuit and Request to Waiver Service of Summons-Black, #4 Summons Notice of Lawsuit and Request to Waive Service of Summons-Byun, #5 Summons Notice of Lawsuit and Request to Waive Service of Summons-Kessler, #6 Summons Notice of Lawsuit and Request to Waive Service of Summons-Mathew, #7 Summons Notice of Lawsuit and Request to Waive Service of Summons-Thomasto, #8 Summons Notice of Lawsuit and Request to Waive Service of Summons-Dusik, #9 Summons Notice of Lawsuit and Request to Waive Service of Summons-Difatta, #10 Summons Notice of Lawsuit and Request to Waive Service of Summons-Legerme, #11 Summons Notice of Lawsuit and Request to Waive Service of Summons-Kirschner, #12 Summons Notice of Lawsuit and Request to Waive Service of Summons-Suk, #13 Summons Notice of Lawsuit and Request to Waive Service of Summons-Pachoke, #14 Summons Notice of Lawsuit and Request to Waive Service of Summons-Belcher)(Kendall, Wayne)THERE ARE NO SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED. THEY ARE WAIVER OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS(smw).
August 17, 2020 Filing 2533 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:20-CV-3408 JPB 190 28:1332bc. NO E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint UPS Supply Chain Services, Inc. vs. Foam Depot, Inc.. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number AGANDC-10036063. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Toman, Gary) SUMMONS WILL NOT BE ISSUED BECAUSE THE FILE IS CORRUPT. NOTIFIED ATTORNEY TO RESUBMIT THE SUMMONS IN THE OPEN CASE(smw).
August 17, 2020 Filing 2532 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:20-CV-3407 WMR 465 05:0702. THREE E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint Precious M. Mejias vs. Kenneth T. Cuccinelli. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number AGANDC-10034787. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons USAG, #3 Summons USAO, #4 Summons USCIS)(Polanco, Carlos)(smw).
August 17, 2020 Filing 2531 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:20-CV-3406 MLB JSA 480 15:1692. TWO E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint Dajai Norman vs. Unifund CCR LLC. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number AGANDC-10035080. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A - State Court Complaint, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B - State Court Answer and Affidavit, #3 Exhibit Exhibit C - State Court Dismissal, #4 Affidavit Plaintiff's Verification, #5 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #6 Summons Summons for Defendant Unifund CCR LLC, #7 Summons Summons for Defendant Cooling & Winter)(Sandt, Jillian)(smw).
August 17, 2020 Filing 2530 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:20-CV-3405 MLB 360 28:1441pi. NO E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Notice of Removal, Alexis Lundy vs. Publix Super Markets, Inc.. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number AGANDC-10034338. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(Major, Gene)(smw).
August 17, 2020 Filing 2529 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:20-CV-3404 RWS 367 28:1332pl. NO E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint John Kimball Smith vs. Ethicon, Inc.. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number AGANDC-10034156. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)(Guerra, Gerardo)THERE IS NO SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED. IT IS A WAIVE OF SERVICE OF A SUMMONS(smw).
August 17, 2020 Filing 2528 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:20-CV-3403 ELR WEJ 480 15:1692. NO E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint Kimberly Holland vs. AssetCare, LLC. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number AGANDC-10034089. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Berry, Matthew)(smw).
August 17, 2020 Filing 2527 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:20-CV-3402 AT AJB 480 15:1692. NO E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint Barbara Beals-Morris vs. CMRE Financial Services, Inc.,. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number AGANDC-10034060. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Berry, Matthew)(smw).
August 17, 2020 Filing 2526 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:20-CV-3401 LMM CCB 751 29:2601. NO E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint OSAGIODUWA IDAHOR vs. ARBOR EAST COBB, LLC. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number AGANDC-10034007. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)(Roberts, Victor)SUMMONS WILL NOT BE ISSUED BECAUSE IT IS BLANK. NOTIFIED ATTORNEY TO RESUBMIT THE SUMMONS IN THE OPEN CASE(smw).
August 17, 2020 Filing 2525 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:20-CV-3400 SDG LTW 480 15:1692. NO E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint CHERYL ESTRADA vs. MIDLAND CREDIT MANAGEMENT, INC. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number AGANDC-10033968. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3)(Berry, Matthew)(smw).
August 17, 2020 Filing 2524 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:20-CV-3399 RWS 367 28:1332pl. NO E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint Dwain Irish vs. Johnson & Johnson. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number AGANDC-10033900. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Harvey, William)(smw).
August 17, 2020 Filing 2523 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:20-CV-3398 JOB 710 29:0216b. NO E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint Daniel St. Clair vs. CMS Mechanical Services, LLC. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number AGANDC-10033376. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)(Smith, Nicholas)SUMMONS WILL NOT BE ISSUED BECAUSE IT HAS MORE THAN ONE ADDRESS FOR THE DEFENDANTS. NOTIFIED ATTORNEY TO RESUBMIT THE SUMMONS IN THE OPEN CASE(smw).
August 17, 2020 Filing 2522 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:20-CV-3392 MLB 440 28:1443. NO E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Notice of Removal, Andre Johnson vs. Victor Hill. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number AGANDC-10032995. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B, #3 Civil Cover Sheet Cover Sheet)(Sabzevari, Arash)(smw).
August 15, 2020 Filing 2521 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:20-CV-3391 MLB RDC 480 15:1692. ONE E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint Millicent Harrison vs. Cavalry SPV I, LLC. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number AGANDC-10031787. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Traverse, #2 Exhibit B - Third Party Claim, #3 Exhibit C - Proposed Release, #4 Civil Cover Sheet, #5 Summons as to Cavalry, #6 Certificate of Interested Persons)(Carlson, Clifford)(smw).
August 15, 2020 Filing 2520 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:20-CV-3390 ELR 440 42:1983cv. NO E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint LONDON R. BOUVIER vs. CITY OF COVINGTON, GEORGIA. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number AGANDC-10031693. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Howard, James)(smw).
August 14, 2020 Filing 2519 Case Initiating Documents-Complaint James Gregory Howell, Jr. vs. THE MOREHOUSE SCHOOL OF MEDICINE, INC.. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number AGANDC-10031116. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit AA MSM's ODS Website, #2 Exhibit AB MSM's ODS Disability Policy Statement, #3 Exhibit AC Initiating Review Process - Email, #4 Exhibit AD 2017-2018 Handbook, #5 Exhibit AE 2018-2019 Handbook, #6 Exhibit AF 2019-2020 Handbook, #7 Exhibit AG Student Request for Accommodations Packet, #8 Exhibit AH Accommodations Granted - Email, #9 Exhibit AI Accommodation Letters, #10 Exhibit AJ 2017 Student Information Guide, #11 Exhibit AK 1st Written Complaint 2017-08-01, #12 Exhibit AL 2017-10-31 Knight Email, #13 Exhibit AM 2017-07-24 Knight Email, #14 Exhibit AN Academic Transcript, #15 Exhibit AO 2nd Written Complaint 2018-05-07, #16 Exhibit AP 2019-01-07 To Knight Email, #17 Exhibit AQ 2019-01-17 Knight Email, #18 Exhibit AR 2019-01-22 Knight Email, #19 Exhibit AS 3rd Written Complaint 2019-02-25, #20 Exhibit AT 2020-02-17 To Anachebe Email, #21 Exhibit AU 2020-02-17 To Anachebe Email Attachment, #22 Exhibit AV 2020-02-18 Anachebe Email, #23 Exhibit AW 4th Written Complaint 2020-02-18 Thompson Email, #24 Exhibit AX 4th Written Complaint 2020-02-18 Attachment, #25 Exhibit AY 2020-03 Thompson Email, #26 Exhibit AZ 2020-03-16 Anachebe Email, #27 Exhibit BA 2020-03-16 Henderson Email, #28 Exhibit BB Compliance Complaint, #29 Exhibit BC 2020-05-27 Bell Email, #30 Exhibit BD 2020-05-29 Dismissal Hearing, #31 Exhibit BE 2020-05&06 Klement Emails.pdf, #32 Exhibit BF 2020-05&06 Bell Emails, #33 Exhibit BG 2020-06-05 Meeting Summary.pdf, #34 Exhibit BH 2020-06-24 Bell Email, #35 Exhibit BI 2020-06-23 Bell Email, #36 Exhibit BJ 2020-07-01 Bell Email, #37 Exhibit BK 2020-07-06 Bell Email, #38 Exhibit BL 2020-07-09 To Bell Email, #39 Exhibit BM 2020-07-13 Dismissal Hearing, #40 Exhibit BN 2020-06-29 Bell Emaill, #41 Exhibit BO 2020-07-14 Determination Email, #42 Exhibit BP MSM Accreditation, #43 Exhibit BQ 2020-07 Anachebe Dismissal Email, #44 Exhibit BR Dismissal Hearing Exhibits, #45 Exhibit BS 2020-07-28 Klement Email, #46 Exhibit BT Letter of Dismissal, #47 Exhibit BU 2020-06-30 Bell Email, #48 Exhibit BV 2020-06-30 Health Insurance Email, #49 Exhibit BW 2020-07-02 Bell&Thompson Email, #50 Exhibit BX 2020 Bell Email COVID Testing, #51 Exhibit BY Welcome to MSM, #52 Exhibit BZ MSM 2020 Match Data, #53 Exhibit CA 2019-2020 Resident Stipends and Benefits Report, #54 Civil Cover Sheet)(Mosley, Andrew)
August 14, 2020 Filing 2518 Case Initiating Documents-Complaint Sterigenics U.S., LLC vs. Roger Phelps. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number AGANDC-10031175. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Civil Cover Sheet, #6 Corporate Disclosure Statement, #7 Summons, #8 Summons, #9 Summons, #10 Summons, #11 Summons)(Diffley, Daniel)
August 14, 2020 Filing 2517 Case Initiating Documents-Notice of Removal, Carol Fust vs. Johnson & Johnson. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number AGANDC-10030775. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex. 1 - Complaint, #2 Exhibit Ex. 2 - State Court File, #3 Exhibit Ex. 3 - CAMC Consent to Removal, #4 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Action Cover Sheet, #5 Appendix Johnson & Johnson Defendants' Answer to Plaintiff's Complaint, #6 Appendix Motion to Stay All Proceedings, #7 Appendix Memorandum in Support of Motion to Stay All Proceedings, #8 Appendix Ex. A to Memorandum in Support of Motion to Stay All Proceedings Kannady Order, #9 Appendix Ex. B to Memorandum in Support of Motion to Stay All Proceedings - Phillips Order, #10 Appendix Ex C to Memorandum in Support of Motion to Stay All Proceedings - Transfer Order 1, #11 Appendix Ex. D to Memorandum in Support of Motion to Stay All Proceedings - Transfer Order 2, #12 Appendix Ex. E to Memorandum in Support of Motion to Stay All Proceedings - Transfer Order 3, #13 Appendix Ex. F to Memorandum in Support of Motion to Stay All Proceedings - Transfer Order 4, #14 Appendix Johnson & Johnson's Corporate Disclosure Statement, #15 Appendix Johnson & Johnson Consumer Inc.'s Corporate Disclosure Statement)(Gieser, Caroline)
August 14, 2020 Filing 2516 Case Initiating Documents-Complaint Vennwest Global Technologies, Inc. vs. George H. McGovern, III. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number AGANDC-10030708. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Verification, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Kaufman, Robert)
August 14, 2020 Filing 2515 Case Initiating Documents-Notice of Removal, Elie Njem vs. Facebook, Inc.. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number AGANDC-10030632. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Declaration of Bryn Williams, #2 Exhibit Exhibits to Declaration, #3 State Court Record, #4 Defendant's Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement, #5 Motion to Dismiss, #6 Brief Memorandum of Law in Support of Defendant Facebook's Motion to Dismiss)(Horst, Jeffrey)
August 14, 2020 Filing 2514 Case Initiating Documents-Complaint Paul McCain vs. Andrew Saul, Comm'r of SSA. No payment received. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons #1, #3 Summons #2, #4 Summons #3, #5 Supplement Assignment of EAJA Fees, #6 Supplement Motion to Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees, #7 Supplement Application IFP Supplement)(Jackson, Forrest)
August 14, 2020 Filing 2513 Case Initiating Documents-Notice of Removal, SUSAN SOLOMON vs. KIM ANNETTE ROBERSON. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number AGANDC-10030134. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E)(Codrington, Anelise)
August 14, 2020 Filing 2512 Case Initiating Documents-Complaint Elizabeth Bruner vs. Andrew Saul, Comm'r of SSA. No payment received. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons #1, #3 Summons #2, #4 Summons #3, #5 Supplement Assignment of EAJA Fees, #6 Supplement Motion to Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees, #7 Supplement Application IFP Supplement)(Jackson, Forrest)
August 14, 2020 Filing 2511 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:20-CV-3381 SDG 360 28:1441pi. NO E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Notice of Removal, Khaliyl J. Hamilton vs. Lonestar Forklift 2017 USA, Inc.. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number AGANDC-10030174. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement, #3 Exhibit A - State Court Case File, #4 Exhibit B - Responses to Requests for Admissions, #5 Exhibit C - Notice of Filing of Notice of Removal)(White, Joseph)(smw).
August 14, 2020 Filing 2510 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:20-CV-3380 CC JKL 442 42:2000ra. TWO E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint Corey Moore vs. City of Atlanta, Georgia. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number AGANDC-10030221. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons City of Atlanta, #3 Summons Darin Schierbaum, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit, #7 Exhibit, #8 Exhibit, #9 Exhibit, #10 Exhibit, #11 Exhibit, #12 Exhibit, #13 Exhibit)(Cole, James)(smw).
August 14, 2020 Filing 2509 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:20-CV-3379 JPB 440 42:3613. NO E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint Jean Paraison vs. Nationstar Mortgage, LLC. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number AGANDC-10030224. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet)(Gibson, Catherine)(smw).
August 14, 2020 Filing 2508 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:20-CV-3378 WMR 710 29:0216b. FOUR E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint CHARLES KELLY vs. STEADFAST SERVICES INC.. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number AGANDC-10029563. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons, #5 Summons)(Feldman, Mitchell)(smw).
August 14, 2020 Filing 2507 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:20-CV-3377 CC 360 28:1441pi. NO E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Notice of Removal, Gwendolyn Williams vs. The Kroger Company. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number AGANDC-10029545. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - All Pleadings Filed, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Defendant The Kroger Co.'s Answer and Defenses to Plaintiff's Complaint, #4 Defendant The Kroger Co.'s Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement, #5 Defendant The Kroger Co.'s Jury Demand)(Wasick, Jeffrey)(smw).
August 14, 2020 Filing 2506 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:20-CV-3376 MLB 110 28:1441in. NO E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Notice of Removal, Fairington Park Condominium Association, Inc. d/b/a Fairington Park Condominium Association vs. Great American Insurance Company. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number AGANDC-10029152. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Complaint, #2 Exhibit B - Certificate of Service, #3 Exhibit C - Policy, #4 Exhibit D - Notice of Removal to Opposing Counsel, #5 Exhibit E - Notice of Filing Notice of Removal, #6 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet)(Goanos, Theodore)(smw).
August 14, 2020 Filing 2505 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:20-CV-3374 SCJ 140 28:1332ni. ONE E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint CAJUN GLOBAL LLC vs. SHAWN EBY. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number AGANDC-10028636. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex. 1 - Promissory Note, #2 Exhibit Ex. 2 - Demand, #3 Civil Cover Sheet 2020.08.14 Cover Sheet (Eby), #4 Summons 2020.08.14 Proposed Summons (Eby))(Caiola, Anne)(smw).
August 14, 2020 Filing 2504 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:20-CV-3373 TWT LTW 863 42:0405wc. NO E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint Lisa Marie Comrie vs. Andrew Saul. No payment received. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 In Forma Pauperis)(Ginsberg, Jonathan) SUMMONS WILL BE E-ISSUED BY THE DOCKET CLERK UPON IFP APPROVAL(smw).
August 14, 2020 Filing 2503 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:20-CV-3372 CAP RDC 863 42:0405ww. THREE E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint Charles Deangelo Moore vs. Andrew M. Saul, Commissioner of Social Security. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number AGANDC-10028656. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Summons, #5 Summons, #6 Summons)(Comerford, Ida)(smw).
August 14, 2020 Filing 2502 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:20-CV-3371 AT 446 42:12101. THREE E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint Valerie E. Gibbs vs. U.S. Auto Sales, Inc.. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number AGANDC-10028081. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons for U.S. Auto Sales, Inc., #3 Summons for Myron Parker, #4 Summons For Ken Evans)(Kealy, Victoria) (smw).
August 14, 2020 Filing 2501 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:20-CV-3370 SDG 625 21:0881. NO E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint United States of America vs. $34,200.00 in United States Currency. No payment received. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Smith, Cynthia)(smw).
August 14, 2020 Filing 2500 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:20-CV-3368 WMR CCB 480 15:1692. NO E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint Cheryl Estrada vs. Receivable Solutions, Inc.. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number AGANDC-10027815. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Berry, Matthew)(smw).
August 14, 2020 Filing 2499 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:20-CV-3366 MLB 360 28:1441pi. NO E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Notice of Removal, Lysandra Howard vs. Wal-Mart Stores, Inc.. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number AGANDC-10027240. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A - State Court pleadings)(Lessinger, Howard)(smw).
August 14, 2020 Filing 2498 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:20-CV-3365 MLB 360 28:1441pi. NO E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Notice of Removal, Savannah Hunter vs. Wal-Mart Stores East, LP. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number AGANDC-10027239. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A - Demand letter, #3 Exhibit B - State court Pleadings)(Lessinger, Howard)(smw).
August 13, 2020 Filing 2497 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:20-CV-3364 RWS 367 28:1332pl. NO E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint Winona Sheldon vs. Ethicon, Inc.. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number AGANDC-10025813. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Kinsman, Robert)(smw).
August 13, 2020 Filing 2496 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:20-CV-3363 RWS 367 28:1332pl. NO E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint Reginald Daniels vs. Ethicon, Inc.. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number AGANDC-10025807. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Kinsman, Robert)(smw).
August 13, 2020 Filing 2495 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:20-CV-3362 RWS 367 28:1332pl. NO E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint Elsie Almeyda vs. Ethicon, Inc.. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number AGANDC-10025799. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Kinsman, Robert)(smw).
August 13, 2020 Filing 2494 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:20-CV-3361 MHC CCB 864 42:0405id. THREE E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint Kam Newalu vs. Commissioner of Social Security. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number AGANDC-10025778. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Notice of Appeals Council Action, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Summons Attorney General, #4 Summons Regional Chief Counsel, #5 Summons U.S. Attorney)(Budde, Francis)(smw).
August 13, 2020 Filing 2493 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:20-CV-3360 LMM 350 28:1441mv. NO E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Notice of Removal, MARCELLA WILKEY vs. BILLY EUGENE WILLIAMS. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number AGANDC-10025755. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - all pleadings, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Brahmbhatt, Sheetal)(smw).
August 13, 2020 Filing 2492 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:20-CV-3359 SCJ 896 09:0004. ONE E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint Mitchell G. Stockwell vs. JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number AGANDC-10025672. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 2, #3 Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Summons)(Stockwell, Mitchell)(smw).
August 13, 2020 Filing 2491 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:20-CV-3356 ELR. SUBMISSION of additional TRO attachments re: #2489 Case Initiating Documents-Complaint,. (Wasserman, Daniel)(smw).
August 13, 2020 Filing 2490 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:20-CV-3357 ELR 360 18:1836a. NO E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Notice of Removal, Ann Rodgers vs. Prime Comms Retail, LLC. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number AGANDC-10025128. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit "A" to Notice of Removal, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(White, Craig)(smw).
August 13, 2020 Filing 2489 TRO - IMMEDIATE HEARING REQUESTED CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:20-CV-3356 ELR 190 18:1836a. TWO E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number AGANDC-10023747. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1 to the Verified Complaint, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 2 to the Verified Complaint, #3 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Summons Summons, #5 Summons Summons, #6 Appearance of Counsel, #7 Certificate of Interested Persons Statement)(Wasserman, Daniel)(smw).
August 13, 2020 Filing 2488 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:20-CV-3355 TCB 446 42:12101. TWO E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint Holt, Dakota vs. Star Canton Inc. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number AGANDC-10025189. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons as to Defendant Star Canton Inc, #3 Summons as to Defendant K&M Inter Pride LLC)(Ehrlich, Craig)(smw).
August 13, 2020 Filing 2487 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:20-CV-3351 ELR . NO E-SUMMONS ISSUED. SUBMISSION of additional attachments re: #2483 Case Initiating Documents-Notice of Removal,. (Abbott, David)(smw).
August 13, 2020 Filing 2486 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:20-CV-3354 MLB CMS 480 15:1692. ONE E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint Dana Rogers vs. Foster and Monroe, LLC. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number AGANDC-10024909. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)(Hormozdi, Shireen)(smw).
August 13, 2020 Filing 2485 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:20-CV-3353 MLB 110 28:2201in. NO E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint Great American Alliance Insurance Company vs. LD OT Villas, LLC. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number AGANDC-10024798. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A - Complaint, #3 Exhibit B - Amended Complaint, #4 Exhibit C - Policy, #5 Exhibit D - Certificate of Coverage, #6 Exhibit E - QBE Policy, #7 Exhibit F - Application)(Athans, Michael)(smw).
August 13, 2020 Filing 2484 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:20-CV-3352 ELR CMS 530 28:2254. NO E-SUMMONS ISSUED Case Initiating Documents-Habeas Corpus, Robert Alexander vs. Jeff Coleman. Filing fee $ 5, receipt number AGANDC-10024358. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Yurachek, Mark)(smw).
August 13, 2020 Filing 2483 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:20-CV-3351 ELR 190 28:1441pi. NO E-SUMMONS ISSUED. LOWER COMPLAINT #2487 . Case Initiating Documents-Notice of Removal, Marcella Corporation vs. Roger Vanden Berghe NV/SA. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number AGANDC-10024552. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit Certificate of Interested Parties)(Abbott, David)(smw).
August 13, 2020 Filing 2482 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:20-CV-3350 LMM 710 29:0216b. ONE E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint David Simister vs. Cobb County, Georgia. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number AGANDC-10024504. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons Summons)(LoRusso, Lawrence)(smw).
August 13, 2020 Filing 2481 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:20-CV-3349 TWT 446 42:12101. ONE E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint Blinkhorn, Jessica vs. SSV Enterprises, LLC. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number AGANDC-10024432. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)(Ehrlich, Craig)(smw).
August 13, 2020 Filing 2480 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:20-CV-3346 RWS 367 28:1332pl. NO E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint Tamera Ochs Rothschild, Bankruptcy Trustee for Wayne Robl Sr. vs. Johnson & Johnson. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number AGANDC-10023971. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Selby, David)(smw).
August 13, 2020 Filing 2479 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:20-CV-3341 AT. SUBMISSION of additional attachments re: #2476 Case Initiating Documents-Complaint,. (Attachments: #1 Supplement cover sheet correctly filled)(Hand, Kerry)(smw).
August 13, 2020 Filing 2478 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:20-CV-3345 SCJ JKL 863 42:0405ww. NO E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint Chirag Makhija vs. Andrew M. Saul, Commissioner of Social Security. No payment received. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Summons, #5 Summons, #6 Summons, #7 Motion for In Forma Pauperis)(Comerford, Ida)SUMMONS WILL BE ISSUED BY THE DOCKET CLERK UPON IFP APPROVAL(smw).
August 12, 2020 Filing 2477 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:20-CV-3344. NO E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Notice of Removal, Marilyn E. Goodrich vs. Federal Home Loan Mortgage Corporation. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number AGANDC-10021555. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Krivo, Gregory)(smw).
August 12, 2020 Filing 2476 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:20-CV-3341 AT 190 28:1441pi. FOUR E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint AV Hospitality, LLC vs. Vendors Depot.com LLC. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number AGANDC-10021182. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet cover sheet, #2 Summons summons first plaintiff, #3 Summons summons second plaintiff, #4 Summons summons third plaintiff, #5 Summons summons fourth plaintiff)(Hand, Kerry)COMPLAINT AND CIVIL COVER SHEET [2479}(smw).
August 12, 2020 Filing 2475 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:20-CV-3340 CC 360 28:1441pi. NO E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Notice of Removal, Margaret Carroll vs. The Kroger Co.. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number AGANDC-10021199. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit Exhibit A - Pre-suit Demand Letter, #3 Exhibit Exhibit B - All Pleadings Filed in DeKalb State Court, #4 Exhibit Defendant The Kroger Co.'s Answer and Defenses to Plaintiff's Complaint, #5 Exhibit Defendant The Kroger Co.'s Demand for Twelve Person Jury)(Herald, Sean)(smw).
August 12, 2020 Filing 2474 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:20-CV-3339 SDG CMS 442 42:2000ra. THREE E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint Joel Williamson vs. Georgia-Pacific Wood Products LLC. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number AGANDC-10021170. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons)(Bassett, Leslie)(smw).
August 12, 2020 Filing 2473 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:20-CV-3338 TWT CMS 863 42:0405wc. NO E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint Joey Causey vs. Andrew Saul, Commissioner of Social Security Administration. No payment received. (Attachments: #1 Pauper Proposed Order, #2 Complaint, #3 Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Summons US Attorney, #5 Summons Office Regional Chief Counsel, #6 Summons Attorney General)(Piemonte, George SUMMONS WILL BE ISSUED BY THE DOCKET CLERK UPON IFP APPROVAL(smw).
August 12, 2020 Filing 2472 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:20-CV-3337-SDG 190 28:1446bc. NO E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Notice of Removal, Posco America Corporation vs. Nance Steel Sales, Inc.. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number BGANDC-10020495. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Exhibit A Case Initiation Form, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B Rule 5.2 Certificate of Service of Discovery, #3 Summons Exhibit C Summons, #4 Exhibit Exhibit D Complaint, #5 Exhibit Exhibit E Acknowledgment of Service, #6 Exhibit Exhibit F Notice of Removal to Superior Court of Fulton County, #7 Affidavit Certification of Notice of Removal to Plaintiff)(Domenico, Lawrence) Modified on 8/12/2020 (smw).
August 12, 2020 Filing 2471 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:20-CV-3336-WMR 110 28:1446in. NO E-SUMMONS ISSUED .Case Initiating Documents-Notice of Removal, Stephen Nadeau vs. Allstate Property and Casualty Insurance Company. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number AGANDC-10020154. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A - Summons and Complaint, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B - Plaintiffs' Interrogatories, Requests for Production of Documents and Requests for Admissions Directed to Defendant, #3 Exhibit Exhibit C - Defendant Allstate Property and Casualty Insurance Company's Motion to Dismiss the Plaintiffs' Complaint, supporting Brief and Exhibits, #4 Exhibit Exhibit D - Defendant Allstate's Answer and Affirmative Defenses, #5 Exhibit Exhibit E - Defendant Allstate's Demand for a Twelve Person Jury, #6 Exhibit Exhibit F - Defendant Allstate's Rule 5.2 Discovery Certificate, #7 Exhibit Exhibit G - Defendant Allstate's Rule 5.2 Discovery Certificate, #8 Exhibit Exhibit H - Plaintiffs' Responses and/or Objections to Defendant's First Interrogatories and Request for Production of Documents to Plaintiffs, #9 Exhibit Exhibit I - Plaintiffs' Amended Complaint, #10 Exhibit Exhibit J - Defendant Allstate's Answer and Affirmative Defenses to Plaintiffs' Amended Complaint, #11 William E. Zschunke Verification, #12 Affidavit Affidavit of William E. Zschunke, #13 Jury Demand, #14 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet)(Zschunke, William)(smw).
August 12, 2020 Filing 2470 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:20-CV-3335-MLB 360 28:1331pi. THREE E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint C.D. vs. Lincoln Hotels, LLC. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number AGANDC-10020137. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons, #5 Plaintiff's Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement, #6 Plaintiff's Motion for Protective Order and Leave to Proceed Anonymously and Brief in Support Thereof, #7 Text of Proposed Order)(Law, Peter)(smw).
August 12, 2020 Filing 2469 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:20-CV-3334-MLB 442 38:4301. ONE E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint Casey Little vs. Norfolk Southern Corporation. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number AGANDC-10020128. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons Norfolk Southern Corporation)(Buckley, Edward)(smw).
August 12, 2020 Filing 2468 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:20-CV-3333-ELR 110 28:1446in. NO E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Notice of Removal, Brian Finneran vs. Allstate Property and Casualty Insurance Company. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number AGANDC-10019772. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A - Summons and Complaint, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B - Affidavit of Service by Private Process Server, #3 Exhibit Exhibit C - Allstate Property and Casualty Insurance Company's Answer to Plaintiffs' Complaint, #4 Marvin D. Dikeman's Verification, #5 Affidavit Affidavit of Marvin D. Dikeman, #6 Jury Demand, #7 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet)(Dikeman, Marvin)(smw).
August 12, 2020 Filing 2467 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:20-CV-3332 MHC 360 18:1589. THREE E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint R.E. vs. Lincoln Hotels, LLC. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number AGANDC-10019009. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons, #5 Plaintiff's Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement, #6 Plaintiff's Motion for Protective Order and Brief in Support Thereof, #7 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Law, Peter)(smw).
August 12, 2020 Filing 2466 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:20-CV-3331 SCJ 190 28:1332bc. TWO E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint Polyloom Corporation of America d/b/a Tencate Grass North America vs. Jacob Farrant. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number AGANDC-10019378. (Attachments: #1 Summons Jacob Farrant, #2 Summons Bryce Farrant, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(Stone, Kevin)(smw).
August 12, 2020 Filing 2465 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:20-CV-3329 CC 360 28:1441pi. NO E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Notice of Removal, Jo Carol Black vs. The Kroger Co.. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number AGANDC-10019265. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Summons & Complaint, #2 Exhibit B - Plf's Demand Letter, #3 Exhibit C - Pleadings Served, #4 Civil Cover Sheet, #5 Exhibit Kroger's Answer & Defenses, #6 Exhibit Kroger's Jury Demand)(Lisle, Sarah Raquel)(smw).
August 12, 2020 Filing 2464 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:20-CV-3328 SDG JSA 863 2:0405wc. NO E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint ANDREW MICHAEL SISK vs. ANDREW SAUL, COMMISSIONER OF SOCIAL SECURITY. No payment received. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Motion to File IFP, #3 IFP Application, #4 Summons ATTY Gen, #5 Summons Defendant, #6 Summons US Atty)(Hogan, John)SUMMONS WILL BE E-ISSUED BY THE DOCKET CLERK UPON IFP APPROVAL(smw).
August 12, 2020 Filing 2463 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:20-CV-3324 RWS 367 28:1332pl. NO E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint Joseph Toto vs. ETHICON PHYSIOMESH.. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number AGANDC-10017639. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Oshman, Theodore)(smw).
August 11, 2020 Filing 2462 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:20-CV-3323 JPB JSA 442 42:2000ot. ONE E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint TERMAINE TRAVIS vs. NUTRACAP LABS, LLC. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number AGANDC-10017254. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)(Roberts, Victor)(smw).
August 11, 2020 Filing 2461 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:20-CV-3322 CC 625 21:0881. NO E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint United States of America vs. 1234 Pirkle Road, Norcross, Gwinnett County, Georgia. No payment received. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Brown, Michael)(smw).
August 11, 2020 Filing 2460 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:20-CV-3321 LMM 4650 08:1329. FIVE E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint NDOW vs. WOLF. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number AGANDC-10017113. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Civil Cover Sheet Civil cover sheet, #4 Summons Wolf, #5 Summons Cuccinelli, #6 Summons Miller, #7 Summons Barr, #8 Summons Pak)(Fogle, H.)(smw).
August 11, 2020 Filing 2459 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:20-CV-3320 WMR RGV 442 42:2000ot. ONE E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint RICHARD BARRETT vs. MEDLINE INDUSTRIES, INC.. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number AGANDC-10016872. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)(Roberts, Victor)(smw).
August 11, 2020 Filing 2458 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:20-CV-3319 AT 350 28:1332mv. THREE E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint Kenny Quach vs. Terry Vickery. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number AGANDC-10016441. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons Summons for Def Vickery, #3 Summons Summons for Def PTG, #4 Summons Summons for Def National Interstate)(Taylor, Gilbert)(smw).
August 11, 2020 Filing 2457 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:20-CV-3318 TWT 310 28:1331pi. NO E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Notice of Removal, Mehriban Alizarova and Maliksha Mukhtazov vs. Qatar Airways Q.C.S.C. (Inc.). Filing fee $ 400, receipt number AGANDC-10015673. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B)(Bauer, James)(smw).
August 11, 2020 Filing 2456 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:20-CV-3317 MLB 446 42:12101. ONE E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint Deborah Laufer vs. JAY SAI GANESH LLC. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number AGANDC-10015479. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons Summons)(Gillespie, Tristan)(smw).
August 11, 2020 Filing 2455 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:20-CV-3316 SDG. SUBMISSION of additional attachments re: #2450 Case Initiating Documents-Notice of Removal,. (Attachments: #1 Trinity Services Complaint)(Miller, Staci)(smw).
August 11, 2020 Filing 2454 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:20-CV-3315 JOB 710 29:0216b. NO E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint Melanie Day vs. Seabreeze Retreat LLC. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number AGANDC-10014939. (Attachments: #1 Summons Seabreeze Retreat LLC, #2 Summons Cobblestone Care Inc, #3 Summons Shariema Haniff, #4 Civil Cover Sheet)(Watson-Caffe, Ayanna) SUMMONS WILL NOT BE ISSUED. BECAUSE THE ATTORNEY ADDRESS IS MISSING. NOTIFIED ATTORNEY TO RESUBMIT THE SUMMONS IN THE OPEN CASE(smw).
August 11, 2020 Filing 2453 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:20-CV-3314 WMR 442 28:1443. NO E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Notice of Removal, SCOTT MILLSPAUGH vs. Cobb County Fire and Emergency Services Department. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number AGANDC-10014976. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Case Initiating Documents - Superior Court of Cobb County (Complaint, Summons, Affidavits of Service), #2 Exhibit Notice of Removal to Plaintiff, #3 Exhibit Notice of Removal to Clerk of Superior Court of Cobb County, #4 Civil Cover Sheet)(Boughey, Timothy)(smw).
August 11, 2020 Filing 2452 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:20-CV-3313 ELR AJB 442 42:2000sx. NO E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Notice of Removal, Tiffany Chambers vs. ExpressJet Airlines, Inc.. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number AGANDC-10014914. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A - Complaint Filed in Fulton County Superior Court, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B - Summons and Affidavit of Service Filed in Fulton County Superior Court, #3 Exhibit Exhibit C - Notice of Filing of Removal to be filed in Fulton County Superior Court, #4 Civil Cover Sheet Exhibit D - Civil Cover Sheet)(Wimberly, Sarah)(smw).
August 11, 2020 Filing 2451 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:20-CV-3312 MLB 190 28:1332bc. ONE E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint Fine Tune Expense Management, LLC vs. Westrock Fulfillment Company. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number AGANDC-10014865. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosures, #4 Exhibit Ex. 1 - Agreement, #5 Exhibit Ex. 2 - SOW, #6 Exhibit Ex. 3 - Email, #7 Exhibit Ex. 4 - Letter to Westrock, #8 Exhibit Ex. 5 - Termination Letter)(Foreman, Christopher)(smw).
August 11, 2020 Filing 2450 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:20-CV-3316 SDG 190 28:1441bc. SKIPPED CASE WAITING ON DOCUMENTS TO BE FILED. SPOKE WITH ATTORNEY MILLER. WAITING FOR THE SUBMISSION OF ADDITIONAL ATTACHMENTS #2455 . Case Initiating Documents-Notice of Removal, Trinity Services Group, Inc. vs. City of Atlanta. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number AGANDC-10014352. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Removal (State))(Miller, Staci)(smw).
August 11, 2020 Filing 2449 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:20-CV-3311 RWS 367 28:1332pl. NO E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint James King vs. Johnson & Johnson. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number AGANDC-10014099. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Harvey, William)(smw).
August 11, 2020 Filing 2448 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:20-CV-3305 TWT JSA 480 15:1692. NO E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint Cynthia Williams vs. Southern Credit Adjusters, Inc.,. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number AGANDC-10013856. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Berry, Matthew)(smw).
August 11, 2020 Filing 2447 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:20-CV-3304 CAP WEJ 480 15:1692. NO E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint Tonya Spriggs vs. Cloud Willis & Ellis, LLC. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number AGANDC-10013774. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Berry, Matthew)(smw).
August 10, 2020 Filing 2446 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:20-CV-3303 MLB RGV 220 28:1444. NO E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Notice of Removal, Floyd Harrell vs. Bank of America, N.A.. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number AGANDC-10012370. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(Mendel, Jarrod)(smw).
August 10, 2020 Filing 2445 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:20-CV-3302 LMM 360 15:2301. TWO E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint REJENNA CHAVEZ vs. GRACO CHILDRENS PRODUCTS, INC.. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number AGANDC-10011666. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons for Graco Children's Products, Inc., #3 Summons for Newell Brands DTC)(Worley, David)(smw).
August 10, 2020 Filing 2444 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:20-CV-3301 CC 190 28:1441bc. NO E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Notice of Removal, MyCal Group, LLC vs. Auerbach Grayson & Company, LLC. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number BGANDC-10011549. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Documents from Superior Court of Fulton County, Georgia, #2 Exhibit B - Letter to Plaintiff's Counsel, #3 Exhibit C - Certificate of Filing of Notice of Removal, #4 Civil Cover Sheet)(McMahan, Sean)(smw).
August 10, 2020 Filing 2443 MISCELLANEOUS ACTION NO. 1:20-MI-0077 UNA 890 28:1963. SUBMISSION of additional attachments re: #2434 Case Initiating Documents-Miscellaneous Case,. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A0451 Form, #2 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover sheet)(Rogers, Beth)(smw).
August 10, 2020 Filing 2442 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:20-CV-3300 JPB 360 28:1441pi. NO E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Notice of Removal, Essence Brown-Legette vs. QuikTrip Corporation. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number AGANDC-10011004. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Hynes, Sean)(smw).
August 10, 2020 Filing 2441 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:20-CV-3299 RWS 367 28:1332pl. NO E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint Angelica Araiza vs. Ethicon, Inc.. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number AGANDC-10010977. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Nations, Howard)(smw).
August 10, 2020 Filing 2440 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:20-CV-3295 WMR 360 28:1441pi. NO E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Notice of Removal, Debra West Badger vs. Circle K Stores Inc. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number AGANDC-10010446. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Complaint, #2 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet)(Martin, Sean)(smw).
August 10, 2020 Filing 2439 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:20-CV-3294 MLB 370 28:1441fr. NO E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Notice of Removal, Bradford Ridge Holdings LLC vs. The Cone Company Inc. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number AGANDC-10010285. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Complaint, #2 Exhibit Certificate of Authority and Application, #3 Exhibit Amended Certificate of Authority, #4 Exhibit 2020 Annual Registration, #5 Civil Cover Sheet USDC Cover sheet)(Martin, Sean)(smw).
August 10, 2020 Filing 2438 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:20-CV-3292 MLB 440 42:1983cv. NO E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint ALMA GRANDY, as guardian of MIKKIA GRANDY vs. NEWTON COUNTY, GEORGIA. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number AGANDC-10008936. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B, #3 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Summons Summons)(Gibson, Catherine)SUMMONS WILL NOT BE ISSUED BECAUSE THERE IS MORE THAN ONE DEFENDANT AND NO ADDRESS. NOTIFIED ATTORNEY TO RESUBMIT THE SUMMONS IN THE OPEN CASE(smw).
August 8, 2020 Filing 2437 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:20-CV-3290 LMM 465 08:1329. FOUR E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint Trang Van DO vs. William P BARR, US Atty Gen. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number AGANDC-10007123. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A: Plaintiff's passport and visa page with admission stamp, #2 Exhibit B: Approval Notice of Form I-140, #3 Exhibit C: Receipt for Plaintiff Do's Form I-485, #4 Exhibit D: Receipt for Plaintiff Pham's Form I-485, #5 Exhibit E: Plaintiff Do's employment authorization documents, #6 Exhibit F: Evidence of exhaustion, #7 Exhibit G: Historical Processing Times, #8 Exhibit H: USCIS.gov Processing Times, #9 Exhibit I: August 2020 Visa Bulletin, #10 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #11 Summons to William Barr, #12 Summons to Chad Wolf, #13 Summons to Kenneth Cuccinelli, #14 Summons to Gregory Richardson)(Echols, Eli)(smw).
August 8, 2020 Filing 2436 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:20-CV-3289 AT 465 08:1329. FOUR E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint Trang Thi Kim PHAN vs. William P BARR, US Atty Gen. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number AGANDC-10007122. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A: Plaintiff's passport and visa page with admission stamp, #2 Exhibit B: Approval Notice of Form I-140, #3 Exhibit C: Receipts for Form I-485, #4 Exhibit D: Employment Authorization Documents, #5 Exhibit E: Exhaustion Efforts, #6 Exhibit F: Historical Processing Times, #7 Exhibit G: USCIS.gov processing times, #8 Exhibit H: August 2020 Visa Bulletin, #9 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #10 Summons to William Barr, #11 Summons to Chad Wolf, #12 Summons to Kenneth Cuccinelli, #13 Summons to Gregory Richardson)(Echols, Eli)(smw).
August 8, 2020 Filing 2435 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:20-CV-3288 TWT 465 08:1329. FOUR E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint Ngoc Vu Hong HOANG vs. William P BARR, US Atty Gen. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number AGANDC-10007121. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A: Plaintiff's passport and visa page with admission stamp, #2 Exhibit B: Approval Notice of Form I-140, #3 Exhibit C: Receipts for Forms I-485, #4 Exhibit D: Employment Authorization Documents, #5 Exhibit E: Exhaustion Efforts, #6 Exhibit F: Historical Processing Times, #7 Exhibit G: USCIS.gov processing times, #8 Exhibit H: August 2020 Visa Bulletin, #9 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #10 Summons to William Barr, #11 Summons to Chad Wolf, #12 Summons to Kenneth Cuccinelli, #13 Summons to Gregory Richardson)(Echols, Eli)(smw).
August 7, 2020 Filing 2434 Case Initiating Documents-Miscellaneous (Registration of Judgment from another district), Transportation Alliance Bank, Inc. vs. Kiwi International, Inc.. Filing fee $ 47, receipt number AGANDC-10006180. (Rogers, Beth)
August 7, 2020 Filing 2433 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:20-CV-3287 RWS 367 28:1332pl. NO E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint Florence Derryberry vs. Ethicon, Inc.. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number AGANDC-10005054. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Babin, Steven)(smw).
August 7, 2020 Filing 2432 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:20-CV-3286 SDG 365 28:1332pl. TWO E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint Christopher Milan vs. LG Chem, LTD. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number AGANDC-10005725. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Summons)(Sleppy, David)(smw).
August 7, 2020 Filing 2431 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:20-CV-3285 RWS 367 28:1332pl. NO E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint Edward Schroeder vs. Ethicon, Inc.. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number AGANDC-10005653. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Cornell, Katherine)(smw).
August 7, 2020 Filing 2430 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:20-CV-3284 RWS 367 28:1332pl. NO E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint Noel Sanders vs. Ethicon, Inc.. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number AGANDC-10005638. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Cornell, Katherine)(smw).
August 7, 2020 Filing 2429 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:20-CV-3283 RWS 367 28:1332pl. NO E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint Jennifer Montoro vs. Ethicon, Inc.. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number AGANDC-10005623. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Cornell, Katherine)(smw).
August 7, 2020 Filing 2428 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:20-CV-3281 JPB 840 28:1338tr. THREE E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number AGANDC-10004925. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons)(Karinshak, Zahra) (smw).
August 7, 2020 Filing 2427 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:20-CV-3280 MLB 360 28:1441pi. NO E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Notice of Removal, Kelvin Meredith vs. McKesson Medical-Surgical Inc.. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number AGANDC-10004552. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Defendant McKesson Medical-Surgical Inc.'s Answer and Affirmative Defenses, #3 Defendant McKesson Corporation's Answer and Affirmative Defenses, #4 Defendants McKesson Medical-Surgical Inc.'s and McKesson Corporation's Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement)(Portivent, Negin)(smw).
August 7, 2020 Filing 2426 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:20-CV-3279 CC RDC 480 15:1692. ONE E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint LOUTRICIA CODY vs. DURHAM & DURHAM, L.L.P.. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number AGANDC-10004159. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Summons Summons)(Parisi, Jerald)(smw).
August 7, 2020 Filing 2425 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:20-CV-3278 MLB 820 28:1338cp. ONE E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint Jennifer A. Richards vs. TOMS Shoes, LLC. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number AGANDC-10003902. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Richards Blog, #2 Exhibit B - Reg, #3 Exhibit C - Instagram Ad, #4 Exhibit D - Newsletter, #5 Exhibit E - TOMS Website, #6 Exhibit F - Toms ToU, #7 Civil Cover Sheet, #8 Summons, #9 Form AO121, #10 Cert of Interested Persons and Corp. Discl. Stmt.)(Cooper, Jason)(smw).
August 7, 2020 Filing 2424 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:20-CV-3277 RWS 367 28:1332pl. NO E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint Larry Wildey vs. Ethicon, Inc.. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number AGANDC-10003875. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Kinsman, Robert)(smw).
August 7, 2020 Filing 2423 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:20-CV-3276 RWS 367 28:1332pl. NO E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint Keenan Warren vs. Ethicon, Inc.. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number AGANDC-10003824. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Kinsman, Robert)(smw).
August 6, 2020 Filing 2422 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:20-CV-3271 AT 440 42:1983cv. ONE E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint 341 Cobb, LLC vs. City of Marietta, Georgia. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number AGANDC-10002194. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Exhibit 1, #4 Exhibit 2, #5 Exhibit 3, #6 Exhibit 4)(Wiggins, Cary)(smw).
August 6, 2020 Filing 2421 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:20-CV-3270 CAP 710 29:0216b. ONE E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint LEARA MORRIS-STOKES vs. ADECCO USA, INC.. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number AGANDC-10001445. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit One: Tolling Agreement, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Summons)(Canfield, Rachel)(smw).
August 6, 2020 Filing 2420 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:20-CV-3269 JPB 440 28:1443. NO E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Notice of Removal, KHANAY YANCEY vs. GREGORY TILLMAN. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number AGANDC-9999953. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B, #3 Brief Civil Coversheet)(Sabzevari, Arash)(smw).
August 6, 2020 Filing 2419 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:20-CV-3268 WMR 462 08:1329. NO E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint Hector Jaramillo TRUJILLO vs. Chad Wolf et Al. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number AGANDC-9999971. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(De Gaeta, Zachary-Jon)SUMMONS WILL NOT BE ISSUED BECAUSE THEY ARE NOT ON THE CORRECT FORM. INFORMED THE ATTORNEY TO RESUBMIT THE SUMMONS IN THE OPEN CASE(smw).
August 6, 2020 Filing 2418 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:20-CV-3267 MLB AJB 864 42:0405id. NO E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint Edwin Obiora vs. Andrew Saul. No payment received. (Attachments: #1 application, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 complaint, #4 order, #5 Summons attorney general, #6 Summons general counsel, #7 Summons us attorney)(Flynn, Jeffrey) SUMMONS WILL BE E-ISSUED BY THE DOCKET CLERK UPON IFP APPROVAL(smw)
August 6, 2020 Filing 2417 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:20-CV-3266 LMM 350 28:1441mv. NO E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Notice of Removal, Jesse R. Smith III vs. Randy A. Drake. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number AGANDC-9999734. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Summons and Complaint, #2 Exhibit B - Corporation Entity Details for CRST, #3 Exhibit C - CRST Acknowledgment of Service, #4 Exhibit D - Drake Acknowledgment of Service, #5 Exhibit E - Corporation Entity Details for ACE, #6 Exhibit F - ACE Acknowledgment of Service, #7 Exhibit G - Notice of Filing Notice of Removal, #8 Civil Cover Sheet)(Arnold, Brannon)(smw).
August 6, 2020 Filing 2416 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:20-CV-3265 MHC RDC 442 42:1981ra. NO E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint Paul Zwier vs. Emory University. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number GANDC-9999594. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons Emory, #3 Summons Hughes)(Parks, Allan)(smw).
August 6, 2020 Filing 2415 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:20-CV-3264 RWS 367 28:1332pl. NO E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint Joseph Hoagland vs. Ethicon, Inc.. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number GANDC-9999560. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Giovannone, Andrea)(smw).
August 6, 2020 Filing 2414 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:20-CV-3263 LMM 441 42:1983cv. FIFTY E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number AGANDC-9998713. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons, #5 Summons, #6 Summons, #7 Summons, #8 Summons, #9 Summons, #10 Summons, #11 Summons, #12 Summons, #13 Summons, #14 Summons, #15 Summons, #16 Summons, #17 Summons, #18 Summons, #19 Summons, #20 Summons, #21 Summons, #22 Summons, #23 Summons, #24 Summons, #25 Summons, #26 Summons, #27 Summons, #28 Summons, #29 Summons, #30 Summons, #31 Summons, #32 Summons, #33 Summons, #34 Summons, #35 Summons, #36 Summons, #37 Summons, #38 Summons, #39 Summons, #40 Summons, #41 Summons, #42 Summons, #43 Summons, #44 Summons, #45 Summons, #46 Summons, #47 Summons, #48 Summons, #49 Summons, #50 Summons, #51 Summons)(Sparks, Adam)(smw).
August 5, 2020 Filing 2413 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:20-CV-3259 ELR 840 28:1338tr. ONE E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint Edible IP, LLC vs. World Media Group, LLC. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number AGANDC-9996810. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Form AO120, #4 Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure)(Bowler, John)(smw).
August 5, 2020 Filing 2412 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:20-CV-3258 RWS 367 28:1332pl. NO E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint Rachel Peacock vs. Ethicon, Inc.. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number AGANDC-9996601. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Chambers, Jason)(smw).
August 5, 2020 Filing 2411 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:20-CV-3257 AT 710 29:0216b. NO E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint Kareem Bruce vs. Southeast Connections, LLC. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number AGANDC-9996576. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet)(Benson, Donald)(smw).
August 5, 2020 Filing 2410 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:20-CV-3256 JPB 465 08:1447. NO E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Initiating Documents-Complaint Giwa Omogbolahana vs. Chad Wolf et Al. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number AGANDC-9995816. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(De Gaeta, Zachary-Jon)(smw).
August 5, 2020 Filing 2409 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:20-CV-3255 RWS 367 28:1332pl. NO E-SUMMONS ISSUED Case Initiating Documents-Complaint Tara Nemitz vs. Ethicon, Inc.. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number AGANDC-9995893. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(McCarley, Matthew)(smw).
August 5, 2020 Filing 2408 TRO - IMMEDIATE HEARING REQUESTED CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:20-CV-3254 MHC 190 18:1836a. ONE E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number AGANDC-9995482. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Exhibit A to Complaint for Injunctive Relief, #4 Exhibit B to Complaint for Injunctive Relief, #5 Exhibit C to Complaint for Injunctive Relief, #6 Emergency Motion for a Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction and Supporting Memorandum of Law)(Elkon, Michael)(smw).
August 5, 2020 Filing 2407 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:20-CV-3253 SDG 365 28:1332pl. TWO E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint Peter S. Bishop vs. LG Chem, LTD. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number AGANDC-9995144. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Summons)(Sleppy, David)(smw).
August 5, 2020 Filing 2406 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:20-CV-3252 WMR 710 29:0216b. TWO E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint Marcus Arnold vs. Commercial Furniture Services, LLC. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number AGANDC-9995130. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons Commercial Furniture Services, LLC, #3 Summons McMenimen, #4 Summons Gookin)(Molden, Regina) (smw).
August 5, 2020 Filing 2405 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:20-CV-3251 CC 360 28:1441pi. NO E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Notice of Removal, Francis Royal vs. Big Lots Stores, Inc.. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number AGANDC-9994732. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Civil Cover Sheet)(Noble, Robert)(smw).
August 5, 2020 Filing 2404 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:20-CV-3250 MLB 465 08:1446. SIX E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint Atinuke Adesoye vs. Chad Wolf. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number AGANDC-9993875. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - N-400 Receipt, #2 Exhibit B - Intvw Notice, #3 Exhibit C - online status, #4 Civil Cover Sheet civil cover sheet, #5 appearance of counsel, #6 Summons Wolf - summons, #7 Summons Cuccinelli - summons, #8 Summons Wray - summons, #9 Summons Frazier - summons, #10 Summons Barr - summons, #11 Summons Pak - summons)(Cohen, Marshall)(smw).
August 5, 2020 Filing 2403 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:20-CV-3248 ELR 465 08:1329. FIVE E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint ONAH vs. WOLF. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number AGANDC-9993748. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Summons Wolf, #4 Summons Cuccinelli, #5 Summons Miller, #6 Summons Barr, #7 Summons Pak, #8 Civil Cover Sheet Civil cover sheet)(Fogle, H.)(smw).
August 5, 2020 Filing 2402 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:20-CV-3247 MHC LTW. SUBMISSION of additional attachments re: #2401 Case Initiating Documents-Complaint,. (Comerford, Ida)(smw).
August 5, 2020 Filing 2401 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:20-3247 MHC LTW 863 42:0405ww. NO E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint Vielka Sheppard o/b/o J.Q.S. vs. Andrew M. Saul, Commissioner of Social Security. No payment received. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Summons, #5 Summons, #6 Summons)(Comerford, Ida)IFP DOC. #2402 SUMMONS WILL BE ISSUED BY THE DOCKET CLERK UPON IFP APPROVAL(smw).
August 5, 2020 Filing 2400 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:20-CV-3245 TWT RDC 863 42:0405wc. NO E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint CYNTHIA LOUISE MARTIN vs. ANDREW SAUL, COMMISSIONER OF SOCIAL SECURITY. No payment received. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Motion to File IFP, #3 IFP Application, #4 Summons Atty Gen, #5 Summons Defendant, #6 Summons US Atty)(Hogan, John)SUMMONS WILL BE ISSUED BY THE DOCKET CLERK UPON IFP APPROVAL(smw).
August 4, 2020 Filing 2399 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:20-CV-3244 LMM CCB 442 29:0791. NO E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint Aaliyah Taylor vs. Amazon.com. Inc.. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number AGANDC-9992025. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Letter)(Kelly, Jesse)(smw).
August 4, 2020 Filing 2398 CIVIL ACTION 1:20-CV-3243 CAP 710 29:216b. NO E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint Nathaniel Russell vs. AF Group. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number AGANDC-9991817. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet)(Benson, Donald)(smw).
August 4, 2020 Filing 2397 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:20-CV-3242 JPB 465 08:1329. FIVE E-SUMMONS. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint ENENMUO vs. WOLF. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number AGANDC-9991801. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Summons Wolf, #9 Summons Cuccinelli, #10 Summons Miller, #11 Summons Pak, #12 Summons Barr, #13 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet)(Fogle, H.)(smw).
August 4, 2020 Filing 2396 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:20-CV-3241 RWS 367 28:1332pl. NO E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint Tabitha Posvic vs. Ethicon, Inc.. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number AGANDC-9990580. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(McCarley, Matthew)(smw).
August 4, 2020 Filing 2395 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:20-CV-3240 WMR CCB 480 15:1681. TWO E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint AMISHA BAKER vs. EXPERIAN INFORMATION SOLUTIONS, INC.. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number AGANDC-9991074. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons equifax, #3 Summons experian)(Gomez, Octavio)(smw).
August 4, 2020 Filing 2394 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:20-CV-3239 RWS 367 28:1332pl. NO E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint MARK THORSON vs. ETHICON INC.. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number AGANDC-9990870. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Smith, Michael)(smw).
August 4, 2020 Filing 2393 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:20-CV-3238 AT JKL 442 42:2000ra. ONE E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint NICHOLA HINES vs. DELAWARE NORTH COMPANIES TRAVEL HOSPITALITY SERVICES, INC.. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number AGANDC-9990359. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons Summons)(Ragan, Amelia)(smw).
August 4, 2020 Filing 2392 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:20-CV-3237 RWS 367 28:1332pl. NO E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint KIM LYON vs. ETHICON INC.. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number AGANDC-9990231. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Smith, Michael)(smw).
August 4, 2020 Filing 2391 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:20-CV-3236 RWS 367 28:1332pl. NO E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint PATRICK KELLEY vs. ETHICON INC.. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number AGANDC-9990013. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Smith, Michael)(smw).
August 4, 2020 Filing 2390 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:20-CV-3235 RWS 367 28:1332pl. NO E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint JOSE DEBRITO vs. ETHICON INC.. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number AGANDC-9989861. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Smith, Michael)(smw).
August 4, 2020 Filing 2389 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:20-CV-3234 MLB 360 28:1441pi. NO E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Notice of Removal, Silvia Nava vs. Wal-Mart Stores East, LP. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number AGANDC-9989508. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A-1 - Plaintiff's Disc Responses, #3 Exhibit A-2 - Itemized Chart, #4 Exhibit B - Pleadings)(Pickett, Mark)(smw).
August 4, 2020 Filing 2388 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:20-CV-3233 MHC 350 28:1441mv. NO E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Notice of Removal, Bettie Crosby vs. Marten Transport, LTD. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number AGANDC-9989399. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Complaint and Summons, #2 Exhibit B - Georgia Secretary of State, #3 Exhibit C - Pleadings and/or order served, #4 Notice of Filing Notice of Removal (State Court), #5 Civil Cover Sheet, #6 Answer, #7 Jury Demand, #8 Certificate of Interested Persons)(Carter, Avery)(smw).
August 4, 2020 Filing 2387 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:20-CV-3231 RWS 367 28:1332pl. NO E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint FRANCINE COFFMAN vs. ETHICON INC.. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number AGANDC-9988507. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Smith, Michael)(smw).
August 4, 2020 Filing 2386 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:20-CV-3230 SDG 365 28:1332pl. TWO E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint Richard Johnson vs. LG Chem LTD. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number AGANDC-9987822. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Summons)(Sleppy, David)(smw).
August 4, 2020 Filing 2385 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:20-CV-3229 AT CCB 863 42:0405wc. THREE E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint SANDRA M. CHRYSTAL vs. COMMISSIONER OF SOCIAL SECURITY. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number AGANDC-9985432. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons to SSA/OGC; USAG; USA)(Grist, Joel)(smw).
August 4, 2020 Filing 2384 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:20-CV-3228 TWT JKL 863 42:0405wc. THREE E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint SELINA YVETTE GILLUS-LIVINGSTON vs. COMMISSIONER OF SOCIAL SECURITY. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number AGANDC-9984923. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons to SSA/OGC; USAG; USA)(Grist, Joel)(smw).
August 3, 2020 Filing 2383 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:20-CV-3225 CAP CMS 751 29:2601. ONE E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint Michelle Jones vs. Georgia Department of Community Health. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number AGANDC-9982047. (Attachments: #1 Supplement Font and Point Certification, #2 Summons Summons, #3 Supplement Certificate of Interested Parties, #4 Civil Cover Sheet Cover Sheet, #5 Cert of Service)(Crafter, Danielle)(smw).
August 3, 2020 Filing 2382 DUPLICATE FILING NO. 1:20-CV-3225 CAP CMS 751 29:2601. NO E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint Michelle Jones vs. Georgia Department of Community Health. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number AGANDC-9981848. (Crafter, Danielle)(smw).
August 3, 2020 Filing 2381 TRO - IMMEDIATE HEARING REQUESTED CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:20-CV-3224 LMM 190 18:1836a. THREE E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number AGANDC-9981854. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit, #7 Exhibit, #8 Exhibit, #9 Exhibit, #10 Summons, #11 Summons, #12 Summons, #13 Civil Cover Sheet, #14 Brief, #15 Text of Proposed Order)(Smith, Mary)(smw).
August 3, 2020 Filing 2380 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:20-CV-3223 CC JSA 442 42:2000sx. ONE E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint SHENISA REID vs. BM GWINNETT, INC.. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number AGANDC-9981632. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)(Roberts, Victor)(smw).
August 3, 2020 Filing 2379 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:20-CV-3222 RWS 367 28:1332pl. NO E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint Joann Hill vs. Ethicon, Inc.. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number AGANDC-9981372. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Giovannone, Andrea)(smw).
August 3, 2020 Filing 2378 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:20-CV-3221 TCB 446 42:12101. ONE E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint Holt, Dakota vs. Woodstock Village II, LP. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number AGANDC-9980633. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)(Ehrlich, Craig)(smw).
August 3, 2020 Filing 2377 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:20-CV-3220 JPB 350 28:1441mv. NO E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Notice of Removal, Patty Ashworth vs. Mike Galbusieri Trucking, Inc.. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number AGANDC-9980313. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit Exhibit J, #11 Exhibit Exhibit K, #12 Exhibit Exhibit L, #13 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet)(Hardee, James)(smw).
August 3, 2020 Filing 2376 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:20-CV-3219 ELR 330 28:2671. THREE E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint Jonathan Jake Wells vs. Yahminah Monae Graham. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number AGANDC-9980039. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons Summons Defendant Graham, #3 Summons Summons Attorney General, #4 Summons Summons US Attorney)(Jackson, Nola)(smw).
August 3, 2020 Filing 2375 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:20-CV-3218 MHC 190 28:1332bc. NO E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint Commercial Disaster Recovery, LLC vs. Lisenby, LLLP. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number BGANDC-9979783. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Summons)(King, Scott)SUMMONS WILL NOT BE ISSUED BECAUSE THE DEFENDANTS ADDRESS IS MISSING. NOTIFIED ATTORNEY TO RESUBMIT THE SUMMONS IN THE OPEN CASE(smw).
August 3, 2020 Filing 2374 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:20-CV-3217 RWS 367 28:1332pl. NO E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint Alan Bryant vs. Ethicon, Inc.. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number AGANDC-9979946. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Preston, A.)(smw).
August 3, 2020 Filing 2373 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:20-CV-3216 LMM 360 28:1332pi. NO E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint Benjamin Armstrong vs. Tyler Swope. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number AGANDC-9979868. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Summons)(Karinshak, Zahra) SUMMONS WILL NOT BE ISSUED BECAUSE THERE ARE NO ADDRESS. NOTIFIED ATTORNEY TO RESUBMIT THE SUMMONS IN THE OPEN CASE(smw).
August 3, 2020 Filing 2372 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:20-CV-3215 SDG JKL 442 42:2000sx. NO E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint DEMOND ANTONIO PUCKETT vs. CHESLEY BROWN COMPANIES, INC.. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number AGANDC-9979803. (Attachments: #1 Summons Chesley Brown Co., #2 Summons Chesley Brown Int., #3 Summons Felita Davis, #4 Summons Jeff Greene, #5 Summons Ricky Muse (sp.), #6 Civil Cover Sheet)(Price, Anitra) SUMMONS WILL NOT BE ISSUED BECAUSE THEY ARE BLANK. NOTIFIED ATTORNEY TO RESUBMIT THE SUMMONS IN THE OPEN CASE(smw).
August 3, 2020 Filing 2371 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:20-CV-3214 RWS 367 28:1332pl. NO E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint Vera Edwards-Chin vs. Ethicon, Inc.. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number AGANDC-9979362. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Giovannone, Andrea)(smw).
August 2, 2020 Filing 2370 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:20-CV-3212 RWS 367 28:1332pl. NO E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint Paula Hornback vs. Ethicon, Inc. and Johnson & Johnson. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number AGANDC-9977544. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(McLaughlin, Robert)(smw).
August 2, 2020 Filing 2369 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:20-CV-3211 TWT JKL 480 15:1692. TWO E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint Sherman Morton vs. Lien Filers, Etc. of Heath W. Williams, L.L.C.. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number AGANDC-9977505. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons as to Lien Filers, etc., #3 Summons as to Heath Williams, #4 Certificate of Interested Persons)(Carlson, Clifford)(smw).
August 1, 2020 Filing 2368 TRO - IMMEDIATE HEARING REQUESTED CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:20-CV-3210 SCJ 840 15:1125a. THREE E-SUMMONS ISSUED Case Initiating Documents-Complaint. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number AGANDC-9977314. (Attachments: #1 Summons Jack Parker, #2 Summons Executive Auto Sales & Service LLC, #3 Summons Cherie Parker, #4 Civil Cover Sheet)(Tenley, Christine)(smw).
July 31, 2020 Filing 2367 Case Initiating Documents-Complaint SnapNurse, Inc. vs. Columbus Specialty Hospital. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number AGANDC-9976786. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet cover sheet, #2 Summons Columbus summons)(Bailey, Benjamin)
July 31, 2020 Filing 2366 Case Initiating Documents-Complaint Cecile Alleyne vs. Experian Information Solutions, Inc.. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number AGANDC-9976516. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)(Dakroub, Jenna)
July 31, 2020 Filing 2365 Case Initiating Documents-Complaint Tavera Lashoner Baker vs. Equifax Information Services LLC and Freedom Mortgage Corporation. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number AGANDC-9976400. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Erkenbrack, Joseph)
July 31, 2020 Filing 2364 Case Initiating Documents-Complaint Denisse Muniz vs. Fenix International Limited. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number AGANDC-9976249. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)(Williams, Mario)
July 31, 2020 Filing 2363 Case Initiating Documents-Complaint Sonya Butler vs. First Financial Investment Fund Holdings, LLC. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number AGANDC-9976109. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)(Landreau, Matthew)
July 31, 2020 Filing 2362 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:20-CV-3198-TWT-AJB 480 15:1692. ONE E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint Latara Oglesby vs. Credence Resource Management, LLC. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number AGANDC-9975930. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)(Landreau, Matthew)(smw).
July 31, 2020 Filing 2361 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:20-CV-3197-CAP-CCB 480 15:1681. TWO E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint Patricia Gregory vs. Equifax Information Services, LLC. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number AGANDC-9975838. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Summons)(Landreau, Matthew)(smw).
July 31, 2020 Filing 2360 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:20-CV-3196-JPB-WEJ 442 42:2000ot. THREE E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint DOROTHY SHEFFIELD vs. LEONARD CABINET CO. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number AGANDC-9975630. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons)(Kaspers, Tyler)(smw).
July 31, 2020 Filing 2359 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:20-CV-3195-WMR-AJB 751 29:2601. ONE E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint Clarence Clay vs. Steak n Shake, Inc.. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number AGANDC-9975504. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)(Lakraj, Adeash)(smw).
July 31, 2020 Filing 2358 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:20-CV-3194-SDG 690 18:0981. NO E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint United States of America vs. $1,707,937.91 in Funds Seized from Atlantic Capital Bank Account Number XXXXXX2583 Held in the Name of Concentric Health Alliance LLC. No payment received. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Brown, Michael)(smw).
July 31, 2020 Filing 2357 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:20-CV-3192-JPB 110 28:1441in. NO E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Notice of Removal, G&A Family Enterprises, LLC d/b/a Smokin' Pig BBQ vs. American Family Insurance Company. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number AGANDC-9975152. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit Exhibit A - Summons, #3 Exhibit Exhibit B - Complaint, #4 Exhibit Exhibit C - Entry of Service, #5 Exhibit Exhibit D - Declaration of Nicholas R. Boyd, #6 Exhibit Exhibit E - Cobb County Court Docket, #7 Exhibit Exhibit F - Filings in Cobb State Court)(Daniel, Laurie)(smw).
July 31, 2020 Filing 2356 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:20-CV-3191-WMR 110 28:1441in. NO E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Notice of Removal, James Robertson vs. Universal Property & Casualty Insurance Company. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number AGANDC-9974873. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Insured's Complaint, #2 Exhibit Defendant's Answer to Complaint, #3 Exhibit NOTICE OF FILING NOTICE OF REMOVAL, #4 Exhibit CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS AND CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT, #5 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet)(Bagley, Harold)(smw).
July 31, 2020 Filing 2355 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:20-CV-3189-SCJ 422 28:0158. NO E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Bankruptcy Notice of Appeal, USBC Case#: 15-58444-wlh. Notice of Appeal filed 7/30/2020 from Order entered 7/16/2020 by Appellant Chuck Takkar, Rohan Thakkar and Niloy Thakkar. Fee Paid: Yes. USBC Receipt No. 54165872. (Attachments: #1 Original NOA doc 144, #2 Amended NOA doc146, #3 Appealed Order doc132, #4 docket sheet)(Lugo, Yahaira)(smw).
July 31, 2020 Filing 2354 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:20-CV-3188-LMM 350 28:1441mv. NO E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Notice of Removal, Milos Lalic vs. Pemberton Truck Lines, Inc.. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number AGANDC-9974517. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit D-1 - State Court Documents, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Exhibit Answer of Pemberton Truck Lines, Inc., #4 Exhibit Answer of Mark A. Lucas, #5 Exhibit Special Answer of Cherokee Insurance Company, #6 Exhibit Defendants' Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement)(Wyrick, Jason) (smw).
July 31, 2020 Filing 2353 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:20-CV-3187-RWS 367 28:1332pl. NO E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint Cheryl Rogers vs. Ethicon, Inc.. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number AGANDC-9974311. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Kinsman, Robert)(smw).
July 31, 2020 Filing 2352 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:20-CV-3186-RWS 367 28:1332pl. NO E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint Stacy Mills vs. Ethicon, Inc.. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number AGANDC-9974295. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Kinsman, Robert)(smw).
July 31, 2020 Filing 2351 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:20-CV-3185-MLB-LTW 751 29:2601. ONE E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint NIKIA DRUMMOND vs. GEORGIAS OWN CREDIT UNION. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number AGANDC-9974251. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)(Roberts, Victor)(smw).
July 31, 2020 Filing 2350 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:20-CV-3184-RWS 367 28:1332pl. NO E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint Deena King vs. Ethicon, Inc.. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number AGANDC-9974262. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Kinsman, Robert)(smw).
July 31, 2020 Filing 2349 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:20-CV-3183-RWS 367 28:1332pl. NO E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint Francine Holder vs. Ethicon, Inc.. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number AGANDC-9974219. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Kinsman, Robert)(smw).
July 31, 2020 Filing 2348 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:20-CV-3182-RWS 367 28:1332pl. NO E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint Kristy Garofalo vs. Ethicon, Inc.. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number AGANDC-9974136. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Kinsman, Robert) Modified on 7/31/2020 (smw).
July 31, 2020 Filing 2347 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:20-CV-3181-RWS 367 28:1332pl. NO E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint Connie Fitzgerald vs. Ethicon, Inc.. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number AGANDC-9974066. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Kinsman, Robert)(smw).
July 31, 2020 Filing 2346 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:20-CV-3180-SCJ-RDC 480 15:1692. NO E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint Michael Hines vs. Creditors Bureau Associates. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number AGANDC-9973751. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)(Landreau, Matthew)(smw).
July 31, 2020 Filing 2345 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:20-CV-3179-CAP-CCB 480 15:1692. ONE E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint Michael Hines vs. Medical Data Systems, Inc.. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number AGANDC-9973697. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)(Landreau, Matthew)(smw).
July 31, 2020 Filing 2344 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:20-CV-3178-SDG-JKL 480 15:1692. ONE E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint Michael Hines vs. One Advantage, LLC. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number AGANDC-9973587. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)(Landreau, Matthew)(smw).
July 30, 2020 Filing 2343 WRONG DIVISION Case CIVIL ACTION NO. 2:20-CV-176-RWS-JCF 445 42:12101. Initiating Documents-Complaint DIANAH SOPHIA HUNTER vs. PEST CONTROL INSULATION, LLC d/b/a TAP PEST CONTROL. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number AGANDC-9972157. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Miller, Adian)DOCUMENTS FILED IN INCORRECT DIVISION SHELL CASE. DOCUMENTS FORWARDED TO GAINSEVILLE ON 07/31/2020 BY SWB(smw). Modified on 7/31/2020 (rsg).
July 30, 2020 Filing 2342 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:20-CV-3175-WMR 360 28:1332pi. NO E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint Damita Larkin vs. Walmart, Inc.. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number AGANDC-9971519. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Granville, Brian)(smw).
July 30, 2020 Filing 2341 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:20-CV-3174-MHC 380 28:1441pd. NO E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Notice of Removal, Billy McLaughlin vs. NewRez, LLC dba Shellpoint Mortgage, LLC. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number AGANDC-9971473. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Civil Cover Sheet)(Anderson, Keith)(smw).
July 30, 2020 Filing 2340 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:20-CV-3173-LMM 465 08;1329. FIVE E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint Reyna Maria Ruiz Rivas De Barahona vs. William Barr. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number AGANDC-9971067. (Attachments: #1 Brief Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit Exhibit E, #7 Summons, #8 Summons, #9 Summons, #10 Summons, #11 Summons)(Kuck, Phillip)(smw).
July 30, 2020 Filing 2339 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:20-CV-3172-SCJ 350 28:1441mv. NO E-SUMMONS ISSUE. Case Initiating Documents-Notice of Removal, Curthicha Felix vs. Lyft, Inc.. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number AGANDC-9971036. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A to Notice of Removal, #2 Exhibit B to Notice of Removal, #3 Exhibit C to Notice of Removal, #4 Exhibit D to Notice of Removal, #5 Exhibit E to Notice of Removal, #6 Exhibit F to Notice of Removal, #7 Exhibit G to Notice of Removal, #8 Civil Cover Sheet, #9 Certificate of Interested Persons)(Rogers, Alyssa)(smw).
July 30, 2020 Filing 2338 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:20-CV-3170-AT-CMS 480 15:1692. TWO E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint Robyne Alexander vs. Portfolio Recovery Associates LLC. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number AGANDC-9970557. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons Summons to Portfolio Recovery Associates LLC, #3 Summons Summons to Weber & Olcese PLC LLC, #4 Certificate of Interested Parties)(Nelson, John) (smw).
July 30, 2020 Filing 2337 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:20-CV-3169-ELR-RDC 442 29:0626. ONE E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint Shelley Murphy vs. Cengage Learning, Inc.. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number AGANDC-9970551. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)(Pridgen, Nancy)(smw).
July 30, 2020 Filing 2336 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:20-CV-3168-SDG 190 49:14705. TWO E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint AXA INSURANCE COMPANY vs. PANALPINA TRANSPORT MALAYSIA SDN BHD. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number AGANDC-9970176. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons Panalpina, Inc., #3 Summons Panalpina Transport Malaysia SDN BHD)(Baiad, Todd)(smw).
July 30, 2020 Filing 2335 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:20-CV-3167-RWS 367 28:1332pl. NO E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint Jackie Garmany vs. Ethicon. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number AGANDC-9969627. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Hollingsworth, Caroline)(smw).
July 30, 2020 Filing 2334 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:20-CV-3166-JPB 350 28:1441mv. NO E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Notice of Removal, Terry Michaels vs. Robert Carroll. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number AGANDC-9969504. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Hynes, Sean)(smw).
July 30, 2020 Filing 2333 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:20-CV-3165-WMR-JCF 480 15:1681. ONE E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint David Gill vs. RealPage, Inc.. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number AGANDC-9969068. (Attachments: #1 Summons to Defendant RealPage, Inc., #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Bertschi, Craig) (smw).
July 30, 2020 Filing 2332 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:20-CV-3164-TWT 850 15:0077. TWO E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint Securities and Exchange Commission vs. Clarence Dean Alford. No payment received. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Consent of Defendant Clarence Dean Alford, #5 Judgment as to Defendant Clarence Dean Alford)(Loomis, Madison)(smw).
July 29, 2020 Filing 2331 CIVIL ACTION NO. 10:20-CV-3161-CAP-CCB 442 42:2000ra. ONE E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint JAMES BENNETT vs. KLOECKNER METALS CORP.. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number AGANDC-9966936. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)(Roberts, Victor)(smw).
July 29, 2020 Filing 2330 MISCELLANEOUS ACTION NO. 1:20-MI-0074 890 28:1963. NO E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Miscellaneous (Registration of Judgment from another district), Frank Recruitment Group Inc. vs. IT Gurus of Atlanta. Filing fee $ 47, receipt number AGANDC-9966852. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Le Jeune, Danielle)(smw).
July 29, 2020 Filing 2329 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:20-CV-3160-RWS 367 28:1332pl. NO E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint Betty Y. Newboles vs. Ethicon. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number AGANDC-9966846. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Stokes, Kelsey)(smw).
July 29, 2020 Filing 2328 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:20-CV-3159-MLB. SUBMISSION of additional attachments re: #2327 Case Initiating Documents-Notice of Removal. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Interested Persons and Defendant's Corporate Disclosure Statement)(Hunter, Hilary)(smw).
July 29, 2020 Filing 2327 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:20-CV-3159-MLB 110 28:1441in. NO E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Notice of Removal, Gaetane Cadet vs. Liberty Mutual Insurance Company. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number AGANDC-9966053. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A)(Hunter, Hilary)(smw).
July 29, 2020 Filing 2326 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:20-CV-3158-RWS 367 28:1332pl. NO E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint Carol Crofford, Individually and as Administrator of the Estate of Geary D. Crofford vs. Ethicon. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number AGANDC-9966124. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Stokes, Kelsey)(smw).
July 29, 2020 Filing 2325 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:20-CV-3157-ELR 791 29:1132. ONE E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint Christopher W. Ghattas vs. Blue Cross Blue Shield Healthcare Plan of Georgia, Inc.. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number AGANDC-9966069. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Exhibit A- AIM PBT Guideline, #4 Exhibit B- BCBS Order Summary, #5 Exhibit C- AIM Clinical Rationales, #6 Exhibit D- Dr. Shu April 29 2020 Appeal, #7 Exhibit E- 2017 ASTRO Model Policy, #8 Exhibit F- BCBS May 13 2020 Denial, #9 Exhibit G- Dr. Shu May 22 2020 Appeal, #10 Exhibit H- BCBS June 9 2020 Denial)(Olson, Erik)(smw).
July 29, 2020 Filing 2324 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:20-CV-3156-RWS 367 28:1332pl. NO E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint Robert Spry vs. Ethicon. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number AGANDC-9966110. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Stokes, Kelsey)(smw).
July 29, 2020 Filing 2323 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:20-CV-3155-RWS 367 28:1332pl. NO E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint Sonia H. Thomas vs. Ethicon. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number AGANDC-9966097. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Stokes, Kelsey)(smw).
July 29, 2020 Filing 2322 CIVIL ACTION 1:20-CV-3154-RWS 367 28:1332pl. NO E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint Javier S. Mejia vs. Ethicon. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number AGANDC-9966076. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Stokes, Kelsey)(smw).
July 29, 2020 Filing 2321 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:20-CV-3153-RWS 367 28:1332pl. NO E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint Doreen Carroll-Joyner vs. Ethicon. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number AGANDC-9966038. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Stokes, Kelsey)(smw).
July 29, 2020 Filing 2320 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:20-CV-3152-LMM-JSA 480 15:1681. NO E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint Gary Michael Buck vs. Trans Union LLC and Freedom Mortgage Corporation. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number AGANDC-9965210. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Erkenbrack, Joseph) (smw).
July 29, 2020 Filing 2319 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:20-CV-3151-CAP-RGV 480 15:1681. NO E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint Dexter Lee Cunningham vs. Equifax Information Services LLC and Navy Federal Financial Group, LLC a/k/a and d/b/a Navy Federal Credit Union. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number AGANDC-9965164. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Erkenbrack, Joseph) (smw).
July 29, 2020 Filing 2318 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:20-CV-3150-SDG-AJB 480 15:1681. NO E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint Clark Richardson Taylor III vs. TransUnion LLC and Freedom Mortgage. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number AGANDC-9965032. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Erkenbrack, Joseph)(smw).
July 29, 2020 Filing 2317 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:20-CV-3149-RWS 367 28:1332pl. NO E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint Donald Kubik vs. Ethicon, Inc.. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number AGANDC-9964997. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Alonso, Andres)(smw).
July 29, 2020 Filing 2316 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:20-CV-3148-JPB-LTW 480 15:1681. NO E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint Cynthia Darlene Woodall vs. Experian Information Solutions, Inc. and Comenity Bank. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number AGANDC-9965007. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Erkenbrack, Joseph)(smw).
July 28, 2020 Filing 2315 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:20-CV-3145-WMR-RDC 480 15:1692. THREE E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint Esney Smith vs. Midland Credit Management Inc. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number AGANDC-9962660. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons as to Midland Credit Management Inc., #3 Summons as to Midland Funding LLC, #4 Summons as to Encore Capital)(Carlson, Clifford)(smw).
July 28, 2020 Filing 2314 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:20-CV-3144-ELR 710 29:0216b. ONE E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint Charles Andrew Toler vs. AT&T Mobility Services LLC. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number BGANDC-9962232. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit "A" - Plaintiff Consent to Join Form, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Certificate of Interested Persons & Corporate Disclosure Statement, #4 Summons)(Maxim, Kevin)(smw).
July 28, 2020 Filing 2313 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:20-CV-3143-CAP 360 28:1332pi. ONE E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint Ruben Perez vs. Aldi, Inc. (Georgia). Filing fee $ 400, receipt number AGANDC-9962284. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)(Eshman, Michael)(smw).
July 28, 2020 Filing 2312 CIVIL ACTION NO.1:20-CV-3142-RWS 367 28:1332pl. NO E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint Tiffany Munson vs. Ethicon, Inc.. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number AGANDC-9962251. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Whitten, Allison)(smw).
July 28, 2020 Filing 2311 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:20-CV-3141-RWS 367 28:1332pl. NO SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint Awhenjiosta Myers vs. Ethicon, Inc.. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number AGANDC-9962131. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Whitten, Allison)(smw).
July 28, 2020 Filing 2310 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:20-CV-3140 TWT JSA 863 42:0405ww. NO E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint Monica Elizabeth Taylor vs. Andrew M. Saul, Commissioner of Social Security. No payment received. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Summons, #5 Summons, #6 Summons, #7 Motion to Proceed In Forma Pauperis)(Comerford, Ida)SUMMONS WILL BE E-ISSUED BY THE DOCKET CLERK UPON IFP APPROVAL(smw).
July 28, 2020 Filing 2309 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:20-CV-3139 MHC (CMS ifp) 446 42:12101. NO E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint Kamon Ross vs. 4 Kids College Fund, LLC. No payment received. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons Summons, #3 Affidavit Application to Proceed Without Paying Fees or Costs)(Carter, Meredith)SUMMONS WILL BE E-ISSUED BY THE DOCKET CLERK UPON IFP APPROVAL(smw).
July 28, 2020 Filing 2308 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:20-CV-3138 CAP 710 29:0216b. ONE E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint Brock Picklesimer vs. The Baking Grounds, LLC. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number AGANDC-9960870. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Barto, Brittany)(smw).
July 28, 2020 Filing 2307 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:20-CV-3137 SDG CCB 480 15:1692. TWO E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint Yolanda Washington vs. Absolute Resolution Investments LLC. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number AGANDC-9961739. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons as to Absolute Resolutions Coproation, #3 Summons as to Absolute Resolutions Investments LLC, #4 Certificate of Interested Persons)(Carlson, Clifford)(smw).
July 28, 2020 Filing 2306 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:20-CV-3136 ELR AJB 863 42:0405ww. NO E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint Dana Brinson vs. Andrew M Saul Commissioner of Social Security. No payment received. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Summons, #5 Summons, #6 Summons, #7 Motion to Proceed in Forma Paupres)(Comerford, Ida)SUMMONS WILL BE E-ISSUED BY THE DOCKET CLERK UPON IFP APPROVAL(smw).
July 28, 2020 Filing 2305 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:20-CV-3135 WMR LTW 864 42:0405id. NO E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint Wendy Buice vs. Andrew Saul, Commissioner of SSA. No payment received. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed IFP)(Sturla, Juliette)(smw).
July 28, 2020 Filing 2304 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:20-CV-3134 ELR JKL 480 15:1681. TWO E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint Sandra Mead vs. Comenity Bank. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number AGANDC-9961102. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons - Comenity, #3 Proposed Summons - Equifax)(Gomez, Octavio)(smw).
July 28, 2020 Filing 2303 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:20-CV-3133 MHC 360 28:11441pi. NO E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Notice of Removal, Guadalupe Kelly vs. Wal-Mart Stores East, LP. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number AGANDC-9960750. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Plaintiff's Discovery Responses, #2 Exhibit B - Pleadings, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(Rogers, Jennie)(smw).
July 28, 2020 Filing 2302 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:20-CV-3132 RWS 367 28:1332pl. NO E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint Dennis Officer vs. Ethicon, Inc.. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number AGANDC-9960368. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(McEwen, Gregory)(smw).
July 28, 2020 Filing 2301 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:20-CV-3131 LMM 190 28:1332bc. NO E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Notice of Removal, Jeffrey T. McAdams vs. ILG Technologies, LLC. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number AGANDC-9959961. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Murray complaint, #2 Exhibit email from counsel, #3 Exhibit Murray order on motion to remand, #4 Exhibit McAdams complaint, #5 Exhibit McAdams summons, #6 Exhibit McAdams rule 3.2 certificate, #7 Exhibit McAdams civil case information form, #8 Exhibit McAdams Acknowledgement of Service, #9 Civil Cover Sheet, #10 Exhibit Certificate of interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure)(Wasmuth, Edward)(smw).
July 28, 2020 Filing 2300 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:20-CV-3130 TWT 190 28:1441bc. NO E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Notice of Removal, Eric Heath vs. ILG Technologies, LLC. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number AGANDC-9959905. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Murray Complaint, #2 Exhibit email from counsel, #3 Exhibit Murray order on motion to remand, #4 Exhibit Heath complaint, #5 Exhibit Heath summons, #6 Exhibit Heath rule 3.2 certificate, #7 Exhibit Heath civil filing information form, #8 Exhibit Acknowledgement of Service, #9 Civil Cover Sheet, #10 Exhibit Certificate of Interested persons and Corporate Disclosure)(Wasmuth, Edward)(smw).
July 27, 2020 Filing 2299 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:20-CV-3129 CAP 360 28:1441wd. NO E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Notice of Removal, Tijuana Frazier vs. Contour Eastwyck LLC. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number AGANDC-9957985. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Plaintiffs' Demand, #2 Exhibit Plaintiffs' Complaint, #3 Exhibit All Filed Pleadings)(Perniciaro, Christopher)CIVIL COVER SHEET NOT INCLUDED. NOTIFIED ATTORNEY TO FILE THE DOCUMENT IN THE OPEN CASE(smw).
July 27, 2020 Filing 2298 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:20-CV-3128 SCJ JKL 442 42:2000ra. ONE E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint ANITRA T. MOORE vs. NEXTRAQ, LLC AND MICHELIN NORTH AMERICA, INC., a/k/a OLIVER RUBBER COMPANY, LLC. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number AGANDC-9957640. (Attachments: #1 Summons upon NexTraq, #2 Summons upon Michelin a/k/a Oliver Rubber, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(Miller, Adian)SUMMONS FOR NEXTRAQ WAS NOT ISSUED BECAUSE ATTORNEY NAME WAS REDACTED. NOTIFIED ATTORNEY TO RESUBMIT SUMMONS IN OPEN CASE(smw).
July 27, 2020 Filing 2297 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:20-CV-3127 SDG 350 28:1441mv. NO E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Notice of Removal, TATENDA TANYANYIWA vs. GARY WAYNE SLAY. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number AGANDC-9957614. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit Pleadings, #3 Exhibit Answer, #4 Exhibit Plaintiff's Demand, #5 Exhibit Notice of Filing Removal)(Horowitz, Andrew)(smw).
July 27, 2020 Filing 2296 TRO - IMMEDIATE HEARING REQUESTED. RESUBMISSION of #2295 TRO - IMMEDIATE HEARING REQUESTED CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:20-CV-3126 AT. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number AGANDC-9957325. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6, # 7 Exhibit 7, # 8 Exhibit 8, # 9 Exhibit 9, # 10 Exhibit 10, # 11 Exhibit 11, # 12 Exhibit 12, # 13 Exhibit 13, # 14 Civil Cover Sheet, # 15 Summons for Joseph Jespersen, # 16 Summons for SuperiorPro Exteriors, LLC)(Stapleton, John). (Stapleton, John)(smw).
July 27, 2020 Filing 2295 TRO - IMMEDIATE HEARING REQUESTED CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:20-CV-3126 AT 840 15:1125. TWO E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number AGANDC-9957325. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit 12, #13 Exhibit 13, #14 Civil Cover Sheet, #15 Summons for Joseph Jespersen, #16 Summons for SuperiorPro Exteriors, LLC)(Stapleton, John)(smw).
July 27, 2020 Filing 2294 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:20-CV-3125 AT CMS 751 29:2601. ONE E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint VONTRICE BROWN vs. THE FEDERAL RESERVE BANK OF ATLANTA. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number AGANDC-9957295. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)(Smith, Ian) (smw).
July 27, 2020 Filing 2293 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:20-CV-3124 RWS 367 28:1332pl. NO E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint Adine Parker vs. Ethicon, Inc.. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number AGANDC-9957308. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Whitten, Allison)(smw).
July 27, 2020 Filing 2292 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:20-CV-3123 WMR CMS 480 15:1681. TWO E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint MATTHEW L. DECKER vs. EQUIFAX INFORMATION SERVICES LLC. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number AGANDC-9956897. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons Proposed Summons, #3 Summons Proposed Summons)(McClelland, Joseph)(smw).
July 27, 2020 Filing 2291 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:20-CV-3122 RWS 367 28:1332pl. NO E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint Gregory Wilson vs. Ethicon, Inc.. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number AGANDC-9956882. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Malone, Matthew)(smw).
July 27, 2020 Filing 2290 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:20-CV-3121 ELR RDC 864 42:0405id. NO E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint Calvin Griffin vs. Andrew Saul. No payment received. (Attachments: #1 application, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 complaint, #4 order, #5 Summons attorney general, #6 Summons general counsel, #7 Summons us attorney)(Flynn, Jeffrey) SUMMONS WILL BE E-ISSUED BY THE DOCKET CLERK UPON IFP APPROVAL(smw).
July 27, 2020 Filing 2289 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:20-CV-3120 MHC 791 29:1132. NO E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint Derek Lomax vs. Metropolitan Life Insurance Company. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number AGANDC-9956478. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet)(Karrh, Heather)(smw).
July 27, 2020 Filing 2288 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:20-CV-3119 LMM 710 29:0216b. ONE E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint Natasha Brown vs. Lauren Patin. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number AGANDC-9955835. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)(Keegan, Marcus)(smw).
July 27, 2020 Filing 2287 CIVIL ACION NO. 1:20-CV-3118 SCJ RGV 480 15:1692. ONE E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint Phala Heard vs. CCS Commercial LLC d/b/a Credit Collection Services. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number AGANDC-9956118. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)(Landreau, Matthew)(smw).
July 27, 2020 Filing 2286 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:20-CV-3117 JPB 791 29:1132. NO E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint Jameel Martin vs. The Prudential Insurance Company of America. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number AGANDC-9955881. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet)(Karrh, Heather)(smw).
July 27, 2020 Filing 2285 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:20-CV-3116 CAP LTW 445 42:12101. ONE E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint Marvin Craven vs. Alpha Omega Construction Group, Inc.. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number AGANDC-9955799. (Attachments: #1 Brief, #2 Summons)(Kertscher, Douglas)(smw).
July 27, 2020 Filing 2284 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:20-CV-3115 WMR AJB 480 15:1692. ONE E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint Sonya Butler vs. First Financial Investment Fund Holdings, LLC. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number AGANDC-9955728. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)(Landreau, Matthew)(smw).
July 27, 2020 Filing 2283 MISCELLANEOUS NO. 1:20-MI-0072 SCJ AJB. DOCUMENTS LINKED TO #2281 . Case Initiating Documents-Miscellaneous (Motion to Quash), Roberto Ortiz vs. Experian Information Solutions, Inc.. Filing fee $ 47, receipt number AGANDC-9955725. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit)(Hanson, Cindy)(smw).
July 27, 2020 Filing 2282 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:20-CV-3114 ELR LTW 480 15:1681. ONE E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint Kevon Phillips vs. Equifax Information Services LLC. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number AGANDC-9955748. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)(Gomez, Octavio)(smw).
July 27, 2020 Filing 2281 MISCELLANEOUS ACTION NO. 1:20-MI-0072 SCJ AJB 890 frcp45b. NO E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Miscellaneous (Motion to Quash), Roberto Ortiz vs. Experian Information Solutions, Inc.. Filing fee $ 47, receipt number AGANDC-9955031. (Hanson, Cindy)CIVIL COVER SHEET NOT INCLUDED. NOTIFIED ATTORNEY TO FILE THE DOCUMENT IN THE OPEN CASE(smw).
July 27, 2020 Filing 2280 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:20-CV-3111 RWS 367 28:1332pl. NO E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint Floyd Eliason vs. Johnson & Johnson. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number AGANDC-9955210. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Causey-Streete, Lisa) Modified on 7/27/2020(smw).
July 27, 2020 Filing 2279 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:20-CV-3099 TWT RDC 480 15:1692. NO E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint Myra Henderson vs. Collection Services of Athens, Inc.,. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number AGANDC-9953886. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Berry, Matthew)(smw).
July 27, 2020 Filing 2278 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:20-CV-3098 JPB CCB 480 15:1692. NO E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint Aspen Coursey vs. Nationwide Recovery Service, Inc.,. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number AGANDC-9953865. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Berry, Matthew)(smw).
July 27, 2020 Filing 2277 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:20-CV-3097 CAP JSA 480 15:1681. NO E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Notice of Removal, Brian Lamar Ponder vs. Synchrony Bank aka Synchrony Financial. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number AGANDC-9953834. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Motion to Dismiss, #3 Brief Brief in Support of Motion to Dismiss, #4 Corporate Disclosure Statement)(Gilroy, Monica)(smw).
July 27, 2020 Filing 2276 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:20-CV-3096 AT . ONE E-SUMMONS ISSUED. SUBMISSION of additional attachments re: #2275 Case Initiating Documents-Complaint,. (Attachments: #1 Summons summons)(Little, Samuel) (smw).
July 25, 2020 Filing 2275 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:20-CV-3096 AT 899 05:0702. NO E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint Hancock County Land Acquisitions, LLC vs. United States of America. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number AGANDC-9952533. (Little, Samuel)CIVIL COVER SHEET NOT FILED. NOTIFIED ATTORNEY TO FILE THE DOCUMENT IN THE OPEN CASE(smw).
July 24, 2020 Filing 2274 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:20-CV-3095 LMM 360 15:2301. TWO E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint ELIZABETH DAVIS-BERG vs. GRACO CHILDRENS PRODUCTS, INC.. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number AGANDC-9951221. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons Proposed to Graco Childrens Products, #3 Summons Proposed to Newell Brands DTC)(Worley, David)(smw).
July 24, 2020 Filing 2273 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:20-CV-3094 MLB 440 28:1443. NO E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Notice of Removal, AMANDA TURNER vs. KEITH FLOWERS. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number AGANDC-9950911. (Attachments: #1 State Notice of Removal, #2 Answer, #3 State Pleadings, #4 Civil Cover Sheet, #5 Civil Cover Sheet Attachment)(Cowart, Annette)(smw).
July 24, 2020 Filing 2272 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:20-CV-3092 ELR 355 28:1332ml. NO E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint Jane Fisher vs. Honda Motor Company, LTD.. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number AGANDC-9949671. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Ashby, Andrew)(smw).
July 24, 2020 Filing 2271 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:20-CV-3091 MHC 190 28:1441bc. NO E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Notice of Removal, Ven Air Unlimited Company vs. General Dynamics Corporation. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number AGANDC-9950173. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - State Court Complaint, #2 Exhibit B - Ven Air Arbitration Demand, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(Kachmar, Shawn)(smw).
July 24, 2020 Filing 2270 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:20-CV-3090 LMM 362 28:2674. TWO E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint Lorenzo Byrd vs. United States of America. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number AGANDC-9950059. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Affidavit, #3 Summons, #4 Summons)(Tyrone, Nelson)(smw).
July 24, 2020 Filing 2269 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:20-CV-3089 AT 360 28:1441pi. NO E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Notice of Removal, Brittany Garcia vs. The Kroger Co.. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number AGANDC-9950096. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit Exhibit A - Plaintiff's Complaint for Damages, #3 Exhibit Exhibit B - All Pleadings Filed in the State Court of Cobb County, #4 Exhibit Defendant The Kroger Co.'s Answer and Defenses to Plaintiff's Complaint, #5 Exhibit Defendant The Kroger Co.'s Demand for Twelve Person Jury)(Herald, Sean)(smw).
July 24, 2020 Filing 2268 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:20-CV-3088 SCJ 410 15:0001. TEN E-SUMMON ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint American Spirit and Cheer Essentials, Inc. vs. Varsity Brands, LLC. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number AGANDC-9949913. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons Varsity Brands Summons, #3 Summons Bain Capital Summons, #4 Summons BSN Sports Summons, #5 Summons CharlesBank Capital Summons, #6 Summons Herff Jones Summons, #7 Summons Varsity Intropia Tours Summons, #8 Summons Stanbury Summons, #9 Summons USA Cheer Summons, #10 Summons USASF Summons, #11 Summons Varsity Brands Holding Summons, #12 Summons Jeff Webb Summons, #13 Exhibit Exhibit A to Complaint, #14 Exhibit Exhibit B to Complaint)(Falanga, Robert)SUMMONS FOR VARSITY BRANDS WILL NOT BE ISSUED BECAUSE THERE IS MORE THAN ONE DEFENDANT ON THE SUMMONS. NOTIFIED ATTORNEY TO RESUBMIT THE SUMMONS WITH ONE DEFENDANT FOR EACH SUMMONS(smw).
July 24, 2020 Filing 2267 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:20-CV-3087 CAP 360 28:1441pi. NO E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Notice of Removal, Esmirla Mejia vs. Target Corporation. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number AGANDC-9949817. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit Exhibit A - Plaintiff's Complaint, #3 Exhibit Exhibit B - All Pleadings Filed in the State Court of Gwinnett County, #4 Exhibit Defendant Target Corporation's Answer and Defenses to Plaintiff's Complaint, #5 Exhibit Defendant Target Corporation's Demand for Twelve Person Jury)(Herald, Sean)(smw).
July 24, 2020 Filing 2266 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:20-CV-3086 JPB 465 08:1329. FOUR E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint Long Duc Vu vs. William Barr, US Atty Gen. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number AGANDC-9949127. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A: Plaintiff's passport and visa page with admission stamp, #2 Exhibit B: Approval Notice of Form I-140, #3 Exhibit C: Receipt for Form I-485, #4 Exhibit D: Approval notice of Plaintiff's work cards, #5 Exhibit E: July 2020 Visa Bulletin, #6 Exhibit F: Processing Times, #7 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #8 Summons Summons to William Barr, #9 Summons Summons to Chad F. Wolf, #10 Summons Summons to Kenneth T. Cuccinelli, #11 Summons Summons to Gregory A Richardson)(Echols, Eli)(smw).
July 24, 2020 Filing 2265 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:20-CV-3085 ELR 360 28:1441pi. NO E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Notice of Removal, Sooyeon Livengood vs. Costco Wholesale Corporation. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number AGANDC-9948969. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Summons & Complaint, #2 Exhibit B - Answer to Complaint, #3 Exhibit C- Plf's Demand Letter, #4 Civil Cover Sheet)(Duncan, George)(smw).
July 24, 2020 Filing 2264 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:20-CV-3083 MHC 360 28:1441pi. NO E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Notice of Removal, John Oliver vs. Wal-Mart Stores East, LP. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number AGANDC-9948621. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A Pleadings, #2 Exhibit B - Discovery Responses, #3 Exhibit C - Demand Letter, #4 Civil Cover Sheet)(Hill, Robert) (smw).
July 23, 2020 Filing 2263 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:20-CV-3082 SDG JSA 442 29:0626. TWO E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint James Besselman vs. Dassault Systemes Americas Corp.. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number AGANDC-9947139. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons as to Dassault Systemes Americas Corp. (MA Reg Agent), #3 Summons as to Dassault Systemes Americas Corp. (GA Reg Agent))(Buckley, Edward)(smw).
July 23, 2020 Filing 2262 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:20-CV-3081 LMM 360 28:1441pi. NO E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Notice of Removal, Elizabeth Santos vs. Regal Cinemas, Inc.. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number AGANDC-9947096. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-Pleadings for Regal Cinemas, Inc., #2 Exhibit B-Pleadings for Cinescapr Property, LLC, #3 Exhibit C-Notice of Filing Notice of Removal, #4 Exhibit D-Georgia Secretary of State Annual Registration, #5 Exhibit E-Declaration of Craig Evans, #6 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet)(Stevens, John)(smw).
July 23, 2020 Filing 2261 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:20-CV-3080 SCJ 190 28:1441bc. NO E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Notice of Removal, EQUITY ONE (SOUTHEAST PORTFOLIO) LLC vs. OLD NAVY, LLC. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number AGANDC-9946950. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Complaint, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Caiola, Anne)(smw).
July 23, 2020 Filing 2260 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:20-CV-3079 AT 190 28:2201dj. ONE E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint RCG-BOLINGBROOK, LLC, vs. MEPLEX REAL ESTATE HOLDING LLC,. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number BGANDC-9946925. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Purchase and Sale Agreement, #2 Exhibit First Amendment to Purchase and Sale Agreement, #3 Exhibit June 19, 2020 Email, #4 Exhibit June 29, 2020 Letter, #5 Exhibit July 1, 2020, #6 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #7 Summons Proposed Summons)(Caiola, Anne)(smw).
July 23, 2020 Filing 2259 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:20-CV-3078 TWT 350 28:1441mv. NO E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Notice of Removal, Adia Josephson vs. Carlos Massey. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number AGANDC-9946835. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Complaint, #2 Exhibit B - Massey Return of Service, #3 Exhibit C - Email of 7.16.20, #4 Exhibit D - Email of 7.21.20, #5 Exhibit E - Case Pleadings, #6 Civil Cover Sheet)(Lazarus, Matthew)(smw).
July 23, 2020 Filing 2258 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:20-CV-3077 RWS 367 28:1332pl. NO E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint James Mandigo vs. Ethicon, Inc.. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number AGANDC-9946795. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Conlin, Jon)(smw).
July 23, 2020 Filing 2257 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:20-CV-3076 RWS 367 28:1332pl. NO E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint Erica Hernandez vs. Ethicon, Inc.. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number AGANDC-9946746. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Conlin, Jon)(smw).
July 23, 2020 Filing 2256 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:20-CV-3075 RWS 367 28:1332pl. NO E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint John Ludwig vs. Ethicon, Inc.. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number AGANDC-9946625. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Conlin, Jon)(smw).
July 23, 2020 Filing 2255 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:20-CV-3074 CAP CCB 864 42:0405id. NO E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint Sheryl Dozier vs. Andrew Saul. No payment received. (Attachments: #1 application, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 complaint, #4 order, #5 Summons attorney general, #6 Summons general counsel, #7 Summons us attorney)(Flynn, Jeffrey) SUMMONS WILL BE E-ISSUED BY THE DOCKET CLERK UPON IFP APPROVAL(smw).
July 23, 2020 Filing 2254 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:20-CV-3073 MLB 791 29:1132. FOUR E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint John Panuska vs. BUREAU VERITAS HOLDINGS INCORPORATED, in its capacity as the Plan Administrator of the Bureau Veritas Holdings Incorporated Employee Benefit Plan. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number AGANDC-9946502. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Civil Cover Sheet, #7 Summons, #8 Summons, #9 Summons, #10 Summons)(Pridgen, Nancy)(smw).
July 23, 2020 Filing 2253 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:20-CV-3072 ELR 360 28:1141pi. NO E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Notice of Removal, JULIA WEAVER vs. FAMILY DOLLAR STORES OF GEORGIA, LLC,. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number AGANDC-9946459. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Pleadings, #2 Exhibit B - Affidavit of Rico Langford, #3 Exhibit C - Notice of Removal)(Hankins, James) Modified on 7/23/2020 CIVIL COVER SHEET WAS NOT FILED. NOTIFIED ATTORNEY TO FILE THE DOCUMENT IN THE OPEN CASE(smw).
July 23, 2020 Filing 2252 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:20-CV-3071 RWS 367 28:1332pl. NO E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint Suzanne Sloan vs. Ethicon, Inc.. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number AGANDC-9946288. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Conlin, Jon)(smw).
July 23, 2020 Filing 2251 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:20-CV-3070 JPB RGV 445 42:12101. NO E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint Michael Perry vs. Don Park USA Limited Partnership. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number AGANDC-9946419. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)(Smith, Ian)SUMMONS WILL NOT BE ISSUED BECAUSE IT IS BLANK. NOTIFIED ATTORNEY TO RESUBMIT THE SUMMONS IN THE OPEN CASE(smw).
July 23, 2020 Filing 2250 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:20-CV-3069 RWS 367 28:1332pl. NO E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint Jennifer Huber vs. Ethicon, Inc. and Johnson & Johnson. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number AGANDC-9946147. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Binstock, Melissa(smw).
July 23, 2020 Filing 2249 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:20-CV-3068 RWS 367 28:1332pl. NO E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint Melissa Galvan vs. Ethicon, Inc.. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number AGANDC-9946113. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Giovannone, Andrea)(smw).
July 23, 2020 Filing 2248 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:20-CV-3067 RWS 367 28:1332pl. NO E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint Cherel Evans vs. Ethicon, Inc.. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number AGANDC-9946010. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Conlin, Jon)(smw).
July 23, 2020 Filing 2247 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:20-CV-3066 RWS 367 28:1332pl. NO E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint Christy Lewis, on behalf of Donna Merritt vs. Ethicon, Inc. and Johnson & Johnson. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number AGANDC-9946089. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Binstock, Melissa)(smw).
July 23, 2020 Filing 2246 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:20-CV-3061-SCJ 462 08:1329. FIVE E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint TOURE vs. WOLF. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number AGANDC-9945546. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Summons Barr, #9 Summons Cuccinelli, #10 Summons Miller, #11 Summons Pak, #12 Summons Wolf, #13 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet)(Fogle, H.)(smw).
July 23, 2020 Filing 2245 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:20-CV-3060 TWT 625 21:0881. NO E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint United States of America vs. $25,283.00 in United States Currency. No payment received. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Brown, Michael)(smw).
July 23, 2020 Filing 2244 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:20-CV-3059 CAP JKL 480 15:1681. TWO E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint THOMAS TEN PAS vs. FIRST NATIONAL BANK OF OMAHA and EQUIFAX INFORMATION SERVICES, LLC. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number AGANDC-9944484. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Summons)(Douglas, Chaka)(smw).
July 22, 2020 Filing 2243 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:20-CV-3057 SDG CMS 480 15:1692. NO E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint Tonya Spriggs vs. Capital Accounts, LLC. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number AGANDC-9942180. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Berry, Matthew)(smw).
July 22, 2020 Filing 2242 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:20-CV-3056 JPB JCF 480 15:1692. NO E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint Tonya Spriggs vs. Collection Receivables, Inc.,. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number AGANDC-9942171. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Berry, Matthew)(smw).
July 22, 2020 Filing 2241 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:20-CV-3055 WMR JSA 480 15:1692. NO E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint Tonya Spriggs vs. Netcollections LLC. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number AGANDC-9942154. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Berry, Matthew)(smw).
July 22, 2020 Filing 2240 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:20-CV-3054 MLB AJB 480 15:1692. NO E-SUMMONS ISSUED Case Initiating Documents-Complaint Floyd Moore vs. Rent Recovery Solutions, LLC,. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number AGANDC-9942125. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Berry, Matthew)(smw).
July 22, 2020 Filing 2239 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:20-CV-3053 ELR LTW 480 15:1692. NO E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint Jaclyn Perkins vs. Nationwide Recovery Service, Inc.,. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number AGANDC-9942101. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Berry, Matthew)(smw).
July 22, 2020 Filing 2238 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:20-CV-3052 MHC 360 28:1441pi. NO E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Notice of Removal, Jacquelyn George vs. Caribou Coffee Company, Inc. dba Einstein Bros. Bagels. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number AGANDC-9941956. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Complaint, #2 Exhibit Demand Letter, #3 Exhibit Affidavit of Service, #4 Exhibit Email, #5 Exhibit State Court Documents, #6 Civil Cover Sheet)(Tornillo, Glenn)(smw).
July 22, 2020 Filing 2237 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:20-CV-3051 LMM RDC 480 15:1692. TWO E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint Lois Okoli vs. Portfolio Recovery Associates, LLC. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number AGANDC-9942007. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons Summons for Cooling & Winter LLC, #3 Summons Summons for Portfolio Recovery Associates, LLC, #4 Affidavit Plaintiff's Verification)(Sandt, Jillian)(smw).
July 22, 2020 Filing 2236 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:20-CV-3050 AT CCB 480 15:1692. NO E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint Ana Vazquez vs. Enhanced Recovery Company, LLC. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number AGANDC-9942064. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Berry, Matthew)(smw).
July 22, 2020 Filing 2235 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:20-CV-3049 CAP JKL 480 15:1692. NO E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint Zebre Jones vs. I.Q. Data International, Inc.,. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number AGANDC-9942034. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Berry, Matthew)(smw).
July 22, 2020 Filing 2234 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:20-CV-3048 SDG CMS 480 15:1692. NO E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint Leslie Ellis vs. Vance and Huffman, LLC. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number AGANDC-9942000. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Berry, Matthew)(smw).
July 22, 2020 Filing 2233 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:20-CV-3047 JPB JCF 480 15:1692. NO E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint Caidre Cartman vs. Rent Recovery Solutions, LLC,. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number AGANDC-9941961. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Berry, Matthew)(smw).
July 22, 2020 Filing 2232 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:20-CV-3046 WMR 360 28:1441pi. NO E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Notice of Removal, Marla Bexley-Lovell vs. CSX Transportation, Inc.. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number AGANDC-9941916. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - 2020-05-06 Plaintiff's Settlement Demand, #2 Exhibit B - 2020-05-21 Plaintiff's 1st Supplement to Settlement Demand, #3 Exhibit C - DeKalb County Pleadings, #4 Exhibit D - 2020-07-22 Notice of Filing Notice of Removal, #5 Civil Cover Sheet, #6 Corporate Disclosure Statement)(Golden, Peter)(smw).
July 22, 2020 Filing 2231 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:20-CV-3045 ELR 190 28:1332bc. TWO E-SUMMONSES FILED/ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint LUOYANG SIFON ELECTRONIC MATERIALS CO., LTD. vs. ELMET TECHNOLOGIES, LLC. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number AGANDC-9941797. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Summons, #6 Summons, #7 Civil Cover Sheet)(Isenberg, Ryan) (bc).
July 22, 2020 Filing 2230 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:20-CV-3044 MHC 110 28:1441in. NO E-SUMMONS FILED. Case Initiating Documents-Notice of Removal, Robert L. Oliver vs. State Farm Fire and Casualty Company. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number AGANDC-9941502. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Certificate (of Removal), #4 Answer (Defendant State Farm and Casualty Company's Answer and Affirmative Defenses)(Vigilant, Kristen) (bc).
July 22, 2020 Filing 2229 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:20-CV-3043 CC 190 28:1331bc. ONE E-SUMMONS FILED/ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint John M. Read, III vs. Georgia Clinic, P.C.. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number AGANDC-9941469. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)(Coalson, Jennifer) (bc).
July 22, 2020 Filing 2228 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:20-CV-3042 RWS 367 28:1332pl. NO E-SUMMONS FILED. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint Peggy Rosario vs. Ethicon, Inc. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number AGANDC-9941407. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Dunken, Bert) (bc).
July 22, 2020 Filing 2227 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:20-CV-3041 AT 443 42:3601. NO E-SUMMONS FILED. Case Initiating Documents-Notice of Removal, Sherita Gordon vs. Brooks Crossing Atlanta Apartments LP. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number AGANDC-9941104. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint, #2 Exhibit B - State Court Pleadings, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(Moss, Alycen) (bc).
July 22, 2020 Filing 2226 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:20-CV-3040 TWT 350 28:1441mv. NO E-SUMMONS FILED. Case Initiating Documents-Notice of Removal, Harold Banks vs. Southern Haulers, LLC. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number AGANDC-9940992. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A - Summons and Complaint, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B- Answer of Defendants, #3 Exhibit Exhibit C - Defendants' Demand for Jury of Twelve, #4 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet)(Patel, Stephanie) (bc).
July 22, 2020 Filing 2225 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:20-CV-3039 CAP 440 42:1983cv. TWO E-SUMMONSES FILED/ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint The Estate of William C. Barnett vs. Fulton County, GA. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number AGANDC-9940955. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit Ante Litem Notice, #3 Summons Fulton County, #4 Summons Sheriff Theodore Jackson)(Harper, Michael) (bc).
July 22, 2020 Filing 2224 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:20-CV-3038 WMR WEJ 442 42:2000ra. THREE E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint Tylisha James vs. Randstad US, LLC. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number AGANDC-9940476. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons Anthem, Inc., #3 Summons BCBS Foundation, #4 Summons Randstad)(Wilensky, Michael)(smw).
July 22, 2020 Filing 2223 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:20-CV-3037 JPB. SUBMISSION of additional TRO attachments re: #2222 Case Initiating Documents-Complaint,. (Attachments: #1 Brief, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Stapleton, John)(smw).
July 22, 2020 Filing 2222 TRO - IMMEDIATE HEARING REQUESTEDCIVIL ACTION NO. 1:20-CV-3037 JPB 190 18:1836a. NO E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number AGANDC-9940223. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Kelly Keith, #2 Declaration of JohnTyrrell, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(Stapleton, John)(smw).
July 22, 2020 Filing 2221 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:20-CV-3036 MLB 446 42:12101. ONE E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint Michael Estrada vs. Office Depot, Inc.. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number AGANDC-9939530. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Brief)(Pope, Matthew)(smw).
July 22, 2020 Filing 2220 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:20-CV-3035 MLB CCB 480 15:1681. TWO E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint Raquel Cochran vs. ProCollect, Inc.. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number AGANDC-9939273. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Summons)(Gomez, Octavio)(smw).
July 21, 2020 Filing 2219 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:20-CV-3032 RWS 367 28:1332pl. NO E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint Miguel Nunez Rivera vs. Ethicon, Inc. and Johnson & Johnson. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number AGANDC-9937913. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet "A")(Bossier, Sheila)(smw).
July 21, 2020 Filing 2218 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:20-CV-3031 ELR 350 28:1441mv. NO E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Notice of Removal, Kaye K. Young vs. Ramon W. Oduardo. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number AGANDC-9937100. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit Exhibit A- Summons and Complaint, #3 Exhibit Exhibit B -Answer, #4 Exhibit Exhibit C - Jury Demand)(Patel, Stephanie)(smw).
July 21, 2020 Filing 2217 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:20-CV-3030 LMM 360 15:2301. TWO E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint JENNIFER MURPHY vs. GRACO CHILDRENS PRODUCTS, INC.. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number AGANDC-9937033. (Attachments: #1 Summons (Proposed) to Graco Children's Products, #2 Summons (Proposed) to Newell Brands DTC, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(Worley, David)(smw).
July 21, 2020 Filing 2216 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:20-CV-3029 RWS 367 28:1332pl. TWO E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint Calvin Mitchell vs. Johnson & Johnson. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number AGANDC-9936839. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons J&J Cover Sheet, #3 Summons Ethicon, Inc. Cover Sheet)(Orent, Jonathan)(smw).
July 21, 2020 Filing 2215 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:20-CV-3028-AT 350 28:1441mv. NO E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Notice of Removal, Naomi Mitchell Tate vs. Ketcham's Concessions, LLC. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number AGANDC-9936391. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A - General Civil and Domestic Relations Case Filing Information Form, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B - Complaint, #3 Exhibit Exhibit C - Summons, #4 Exhibit Exhibit D - Plaintiff's First Interrogatories to Ketcham's Concessions, LLC and Jonathan Ketcham, #5 Exhibit Exhibit E - Plaintiff's First Request for Production of Documents to Ketcham's Concessions, LLC and Jonathan Ketcham, #6 Exhibit Exhibit F - Plaintiff's First Request for Admissions to Jonathan Ketcham, #7 Exhibit Exhibit G - Plaintiff's First Request for Admissions to Ketcham's Concessions, LLC, #8 Exhibit Exhibit H - Answer of Defendants Ketcham Concessions, LLC and Jonathan Ketcham, #9 Brian R. Neary's Verification, #10 Affidavit Brian R. Neary's Affidavit, #11 Jury Demand, #12 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet)(Neary, Brian)(smw).
July 21, 2020 Filing 2214 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:20-CV-3027- CAP 360 28:1441pi. NO E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Notice of Removal, Terrance Johnson vs. Costco Wholesale Corporation. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number AGANDC-9936275. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A - Summons & Complaint, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B - Answer to Complaint, #3 Exhibit Exhibit C - WA Secretary of State Profile, #4 Exhibit Exhibit D - GA Secretary of State Profile, #5 Exhibit Exhibit E - Notice of Filing Notice of Removal)(Miller, Heather)CIVIL COVER SHEET WAS OMITTED. NOTIFIED ATTORNEY TO FILE THE DOCUMENT IN THE OPEN CASE(smw).
July 21, 2020 Filing 2213 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:20-CV-3025 SDG 190 28:1441bc. NO E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Notice of Removal, Mobile Apps Enterprises, LLC vs. Photon Infotech, Inc.. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number AGANDC-9935683. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 1 20CV366999, #3 Exhibit Exhibit 2 2020CV337499)(Smith, Gregory)(smw).
July 21, 2020 Filing 2212 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:20-CV-3022 RWS 367 28:1332pl. NO E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint Carla Swanson Judah vs. Ethicon, INC. and Johnson & Johnson. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number AGANDC-9935563. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Short term complaint)(Smith, Macklyn)(smw).
July 21, 2020 Filing 2211 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:20-CV-3021 JPB 440 28:1443. NO E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Notice of Removal, James Robert Pitts vs. Mark A. Grant. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number AGANDC-9935462. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Affidavit Removal, #3 Summons Grant, #4 Summons Holder, #5 Summons Gates, #6 Civil Cover Sheet, #7 Complaint, #8 Entry of Appearance, #9 Affidavit Service of Gates, #10 Affidavit Service of Holder, #11 Waiver of Service of Grant, #12 Order for Service)(Joiner, Amelia)(smw).
July 21, 2020 Filing 2210 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:20-CV-3020 WMR AJB 480 15:1681. ONE E-SUMMONS ISSUED .Case Initiating Documents-Complaint Breanne Cooper vs. JPMorgan Chase Bank. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number AGANDC-9935370. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)(Landreau, Matthew)(smw).
July 21, 2020 Filing 2209 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:20-CV-3019 ELR JKL 480 15:1681. NO E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint Joanne Tucker vs. Andrew Saul, Commissioner, Social Security Administration. No payment received. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Summons)(Blakeney, Walter) SUMMONS WILL BE E-ISSUED BY THE DOCKET CLERK UPON IFP APPROVAL(smw).
July 21, 2020 Filing 2208 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:20-CV-3018 MHC LTW 480 15:1681. ONE E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint Barbara Sanders Norwood vs. Peach State Federal Credit Union. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number AGANDC-9935308. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)(Landreau, Matthew)(smw).
July 21, 2020 Filing 2207 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:20-CV-3017 LMM RDC 480 15:1681. SEVEN E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint Linda Hardnett vs. Equifax Information Services, LLC. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number AGANDC-9935295. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons, #5 Summons, #6 Summons, #7 Summons, #8 Summons)(Landreau, Matthew)(smw).
July 21, 2020 Filing 2206 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:20-CV-3016 SCJ CCB 480 15:1681. TWO E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint Albert Brown III vs. Equifax Information Services, LLC. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number AGANDC-9935177. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Summons)(Landreau, Matthew)(smw).
July 21, 2020 Filing 2205 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:20-CV-3015 AT JKL 480 15:1681. TWO E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint Yolanda Sanders vs. Equifax Information Services, LLC. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number AGANDC-9935061. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Summons)(Landreau, Matthew)(smw).
July 21, 2020 Filing 2204 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:20-CV-3014 TWT CMS 864 42:0405id. NO E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint Carrie Strozier vs. Andrew Saul, Commissioner, Social Security Administration. No payment received. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Summons)(Blakeney, Walter)SUMMONS WILL BE E-ISSUED BY THE DOCKET CLERK UPON IFP APPROVAL (smw).
July 21, 2020 Filing 2203 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:20-CV-3013 CAP CMS 480 15:1681. THREE E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint Mechelle Barnes vs. Equifax Information Services, LLC. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number AGANDC-9934996. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons)(Landreau, Matthew)(smw).
July 21, 2020 Filing 2202 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:20-CV-3012 RWS 367 28:1332pl. NO E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint John Caraway vs. Ethicon, Inc.. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number AGANDC-9934982. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Whitten, Allison)(smw).
July 21, 2020 Filing 2201 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:20-CV-3011 SDG JCF 480 15:1681. FOUR E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint Serena Flournoy vs. Equifax Information Services, LLC, et al.. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number AGANDC-9934936. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons, #5 Summons)(Landreau, Matthew)(smw).
July 21, 2020 Filing 2200 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:20-CV-3010 RWS 367 28:1332pl. NO E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint Gladys Fernandez vs. Ethicon, Inc.. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number AGANDC-9934884. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Whitten, Allison)(smw).
July 21, 2020 Filing 2199 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:20-CV-3009 JPB JSA 480 15:1692. NO E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Notice of Removal, Clay E. Campbell, Jr. vs. Resurgent Capital Services, LP. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number AGANDC-9934851. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit ("A" - Copy of Statement of Claim and Service Documents), #2 Civil Cover Sheet (Civil Cover Sheet))(Kleber, David)(smw).
July 21, 2020 Filing 2198 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:20-CV-3008 RWS 367 28:1332pl. NO E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint John Marenda vs. Ethicon, etal. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number AGANDC-9934670. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Farnolo, Nicholas)(smw).
July 20, 2020 Filing 2197 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:20-CV-3006 WMR RGV 480 15:1681. NO E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint Louis Israel Sullivan, Jr., vs. Equifax Information Services, LLC. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number AGANDC-9932924. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Erkenbrack, Joseph)(smw).
July 20, 2020 Filing 2196 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:20-CV-3005 MHC 110 28:1332in. TWO E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint DEBORAH JONES BASS vs. GROUP LONG TERM DISABILITY INSURANCE FOR EMPLOYEES OF BOARD OF CONTROL FOR SOUTHERN REGIONAL EDUCATION, DBA SOUTHERN REGIONAL EDUCATION BOARD. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number AGANDC-9932893. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit LTD POlicy, #2 Exhibit Entity list, #3 Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Summons Plan Administrator, #5 Summons LTD Plan, #6 Summons Life Plan, #7 Summons LNL, #8 Summons LNC)(Atkins, Pamela)THREE SUMMONS WILL NOT BE ISSUED BECAUSE THE DEFENDANT IS WRONG. NOTIFIED THE ATTORNEY TO RESUBMIT THE SUMMONS IN THE OPEN CASE(smw).
July 20, 2020 Filing 2195 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:20-CV-3004 LMM AJB 480 15:1681. NO E-SUMMONS ISSUED .Case Initiating Documents-Complaint Carleen Denese Mincey vs. Trans Union LLC. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number AGANDC-9932905. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Erkenbrack, Joseph)(smw).
July 20, 2020 Filing 2194 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:20-CV-3003 SCJ RDC 480 15:1681. NO E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint Kathleen Bennett vs. Trans Union LLC and Rushmore Loan Management Services LLC. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number AGANDC-9932890. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Erkenbrack, Joseph)(smw).
July 20, 2020 Filing 2193 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:20-CV-3002 AT CCB 480 15:1692. NO E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint Kirsten Tamara Shoemaker vs. Nationwide Recovery Service, Inc.,. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number AGANDC-9932882. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Erkenbrack, Joseph)(smw).
July 20, 2020 Filing 2192 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:20-CV-3001 CAP 365 28:1332pl. ONE E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint Adrienne Sadural vs. Neutron Holdings, Inc.. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number AGANDC-9932771. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 to Complaint - Ltr, #2 Summons, #3 Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Supplement Certificate of Interested Persons)(Moriarty, Daniel)(smw).
July 20, 2020 Filing 2191 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:20-CV-3000 SDG 190 28:1441bc. NO E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Notice of Removal, Jennifer Shelfer vs. Gregory Pest Control, Inc.. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number AGANDC-9932597. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit Complaint, #3 Exhibit Case Info Sheet, #4 Exhibit Summons, #5 Exhibit Defendant's Acknowledgment of Service, #6 Exhibit Answer and Jury Demand of Defendant, #7 Errata Notice of Removal)(Sheridan, Kimberly)(smw).
July 20, 2020 Filing 2190 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:20-CV-2999 JPB JSA 863 42:0405wc. NO E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint Jennifer Palmer vs. Andrew Saul, Commissioner of Social Security Administration. No payment received. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Complaint, #3 Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Summons US Attorney, #5 Summons Office Regional Chief Counsel, #6 Summons Attorney General)(Piemonte, George)SUMMONS WILL BE E-ISSUED BY THE DOCKET CLERK UPON IFP APPROVAL(smw).
July 20, 2020 Filing 2189 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:20-CV-2998 CAP 440 28:1443. NO E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Notice of Removal, Saleem Wilson vs. City of Atlanta. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number AGANDC-9932179. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Motion to Dismiss and Incorporated Brief)(Foster, Joshua)(smw).
July 20, 2020 Filing 2188 TRO - IMMEDIATE HEARING REQUESTED CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:20-CV-2997 WMR 840 15:1125a. NO E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number AGANDC-9931394. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Summons, #6 Civil Cover Sheet, #7 Supplement Motion for Temporary Restraining Order, #8 Brief in Support of Motion for Temporary Restraining Order, #9 Text of Proposed Order [proposed] TRO)(Fuchs, Dean)SUMMONS WILL NOT BE ISSUED BECAUSE THERE ARE TWO ADDRESSES FOR THE DEFENDANTS. NOTIFIED ATTORNEY TO RESUBMIT THE SUMMONS IN THE OPEN CASE(smw).
July 20, 2020 Filing 2187 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:20-CV-2993 RWS 367 28:1332pl. NO E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint Brian Ganley vs. Ethicon Physiomesh Flexible Composite Hernia Mesh Products Liability Litigation. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number AGANDC-9930090. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Summerlin, Amanda)(smw).
July 20, 2020 Filing 2186 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:20-CV-2992 MHC JKL 480 15:1692. NO E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint Beatrix Margit Egerer vs. ZenResolve, LLC. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number AGANDC-9929805. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Berry, Matthew)(smw).
July 18, 2020 Filing 2185 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:20-CV-2990 WMR AJB 863 42:0405ww. NO E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint Brandy Lachelle Wilcoxson vs. Commissioner of Social Security. No payment received. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A: Notice of Appeals Council Action, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Letter to Clerk, #4 In Forma Pauperis, #5 Proposed Summons, #6 Proposed Summons, #7 Proposed Summons, #8 Certificate of Interested Parties)(Olinsky, Howard)SUMMONS WILL BE E-ISSUED BY THE DOCKET CLERK UPON IFP APPROVAL(smw).
July 17, 2020 Filing 2184 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:20-CV-2989 TWT 830 28:1338pt. ONE E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint Regal Beloit America, Inc. vs. East West Manufacturing, LLC. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number AGANDC-9926815. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A to Complaint for Patent Infringement, #2 Exhibit B to Complaint for Patent Infringement, #3 Exhibit C to Complaint for Patent Infringement, #4 Civil Cover Sheet, #5 Summons)(Anderson, Carl)(smw).
July 17, 2020 Filing 2183 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:20-CV-2988 SCJ 446 42:12101. TWO E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint Holt, Dakota vs. Riyadh Associates, Inc.. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number AGANDC-9926816. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons as to Defendant Riyadh Associates, Inc., #3 Summons as to Defendant Song Ki Ho)(Ehrlich, Craig)(smw).
July 17, 2020