Mileski v. Whole Foods Market Group, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: David Mileski
Defendant: ABC Corp., John Doe 1-10, Jane Doe 1-10, Whole Foods Market Group, Inc. and XYZ Corp.
Case Number: 1:2021cv00235
Filed: January 14, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: William M Ray
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1446
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 10, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ELEVENTH AMENDMENT TO GENERAL ORDER 20-01 RE: COURT OPERATIONS UNDER THE EXIGENT CIRCUMSTANCES CREATED BY COVID-19 AND RELATED CORONAVIRUS. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 03/09/2021 (adg) (ADI)
March 1, 2021 Submission of #7 MOTION to Remand to State Court to District Judge William M. Ray, II. (cmd)
February 12, 2021 Filing 9 RESPONSE re #7 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by Whole Foods Market Group, Inc.. (Carrier, Sarah)
February 8, 2021 Filing 8 NOTICE OF VIDEO PROCEEDING re: #7 MOTION to Remand to State Court. Motion Hearing set for 3/24/2021 at 01:30 PM on Zoom before Judge William M. Ray II. Connection Instructions will be sent separately from the docket. You must follow the instructions of the Court for remote proceedings available #here. The procedure for filing documentary exhibits admitted during the proceeding is available #here. Photographing, recording, or broadcasting of any judicial proceedings, including proceedings held by video teleconferencing or telephone conferencing, is strictly and absolutely prohibited. (cmd)
February 3, 2021 Filing 7 MOTION to Remand to State Court by David Mileski. (Hait, Alexander)
January 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 TENTH AMENDMENT TO GENERAL ORDER 20-01 RE: COURT OPERATIONS UNDER THE EXIGENT CIRCUMSTANCES CREATED BY COVID-19 AND RELATED CORONAVIRUS. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 01/27/2021. (adg) (ADI)
January 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Standing Order Regarding Civil Litigation. Signed by Judge William M. Ray, II on 1/22/21. (ah)
January 19, 2021 Filing 4 Defendant's ANSWER to #1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Whole Foods Market Group, Inc. Discovery ends on 6/18/2021.(Carrier, Sarah) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov to obtain Pretrial Instructions. Modified to edit text on 1/21/2021 (ah).
January 15, 2021 Filing 3 NOTICE Of Filing Civil Cover Sheet by Whole Foods Market Group, Inc. (Carrier, Sarah)
January 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 NINTH AMENDMENT TO GENERAL ORDER 20-01 RE: COURT OPERATIONS UNDER THE EXIGENT CIRCUMSTANCES CREATED BY COVID-19 AND RELATED CORONA VIRUS. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 12/8/20. (eop)
January 14, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL with COMPLAINT filed by Whole Foods Market Group, Inc.. (Filing fee $ 402.00 receipt number AGANDC-10605589) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit -Complaint, #2 Exhibit -Gwinnett County Notice of Removal)(eop) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mileski v. Whole Foods Market Group, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ABC Corp.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jane Doe 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Whole Foods Market Group, Inc.
Represented By: Sarah Margaret Carrier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: XYZ Corp.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Mileski
Represented By: Alexander Gray Hait
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?