Cleveland Swaby v. Cheese
Plaintiff: Cleveland Swaby Properties LLC and Cleveland Swaby
Defendant: Patrice Cheese and Patreice Cheese
Case Number: 1:2021cv00369
Filed: January 22, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: Alan J Baverman
Referring Judge: William M Ray
Nature of Suit: Rent Lease & Ejectment
Cause of Action: 15:1692
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 11, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 11, 2021 Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Patreice Cheese, Cleveland Swaby re #7 Order. (cmd)
March 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ELEVENTH AMENDMENT TO GENERAL ORDER 20-01 RE: COURT OPERATIONS UNDER THE EXIGENT CIRCUMSTANCES CREATED BY COVID-19 AND RELATED CORONAVIRUS. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 03/09/2021 (adg) (ADI)
February 23, 2021 Submission of #5 FINAL REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION to District Judge William M. Ray, II. (cmd)
February 4, 2021 Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Patreice Cheese, Cleveland Swaby re #5 FINAL REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION re #4 Notice of Removal; #6 Order for Service of Report and Recommendation. (cmd)
February 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER for Service of #5 Final Report and Recommendation by Magistrate Judge Alan J. Baverman. Each party may file written objections to the Report & Recommendation within 14 days of service. If no objections are filed, the Report & Recommendation may be adopted as the opinion and order of the District Court. Signed by Magistrate Judge Alan J. Baverman on 2/3/2021. (cmd)
February 3, 2021 Opinion or Order ORDER GRANTING Defendant's #1 In Forma Pauperis Application for purposes of this action only. Ruled on by Magistrate Judge Alan J. Baverman on 2/3/2021 within the #5 R&R. (cmd)
February 3, 2021 Filing 5 FINAL REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION re #4 Notice of Removal RECOMMENDING that the action be REMANDED to the Magistrate Court of Fulton County. Signed by Magistrate Judge Alan J. Baverman on 2/3/2021. (cmd)
February 3, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE OF REMOVAL with COMPLAINT filed by Patreice Cheese. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(cmd) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form.
January 29, 2021 Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Patreice Cheese, Cleveland Swaby re #3 Notice (Other). (adg)
January 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 TENTH AMENDMENT TO GENERAL ORDER 20-01 RE: COURT OPERATIONS UNDER THE EXIGENT CIRCUMSTANCES CREATED BY COVID-19 AND RELATED CORONAVIRUS. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 01/27/2021. (adg) (ADI)
January 22, 2021 Submission of #1 APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed in Forma Pauperis, to Magistrate Judge Alan J. Baverman. (eop)
January 22, 2021 Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Patrice Cheese and Cleveland Swaby Properties LLC re #2 Order. (eop)
January 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 NINTH AMENDMENT TO GENERAL ORDER 20-01 RE: COURT OPERATIONS UNDER THE EXIGENT CIRCUMSTANCES CREATED BY COVID-19 AND RELATED CORONA VIRUS. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 12/8/20. (eop)
January 22, 2021 Filing 1 APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed in Forma Pauperis by Patrice Cheese. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Removal, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(eop)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cleveland Swaby v. Cheese
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cleveland Swaby Properties LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cleveland Swaby
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Patrice Cheese
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Patreice Cheese
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?