Livingston v. Robinson et al
Plaintiff: Siara Livingston
Defendant: Les Robinson and Martha Robinson
Case Number: 1:2021cv00371
Filed: January 22, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: Steven D Grimberg
Referring Judge: Russell G Vineyard
Nature of Suit: Rent Lease & Ejectment
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 18, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 18, 2021 Submission of #5 FINAL REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION re #4 Notice of Removal, filed by Les Robinson, Martha Robinson, to District Judge Steven D. Grimberg. (bdb)
March 11, 2021 Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Siara Livingston, Les Robinson, Martha Robinson re #7 Notice (Other). (adg)
March 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ELEVENTH AMENDMENT TO GENERAL ORDER 20-01 RE: COURT OPERATIONS UNDER THE EXIGENT CIRCUMSTANCES CREATED BY COVID-19 AND RELATED CORONAVIRUS. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 03/09/2021 (adg) (ADI)
February 26, 2021 Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Siara Livingston, Les Robinson, Martha Robinson re #6 Order and #5 FINAL REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION. (jpk)
February 26, 2021 Opinion or Order ORDER GRANTING In Forma Pauperis for the purpose of remand only. Ruled on by Magistrate Judge Russell G. Vineyard on 2/25/2021 within the #5 R&R. (jpk)
February 26, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE OF REMOVAL with COMPLAINT filed by Martha Robinson, Les Robinson. (jpk) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form.
February 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER for Service of #5 Final Report and Recommendation. Each party may file written objections to the Report & Recommendation within 14 days of service. If no objections are filed, the Report & Recommendation may be adopted as the opinion and order of the District Court. Signed by Magistrate Judge Russell G. Vineyard on 2/25/2021. (jpk)
February 25, 2021 Filing 5 FINAL REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION on the #4 Notice of Removal. It is RECOMMENDED that this case be REMANDED to the Magistrate Court of Fulton County. The Clerk is DIRECTED to terminate this reference. Signed by Magistrate Judge Russell G. Vineyard on 2/25/2021. (jpk)
February 1, 2021 Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Siara Livingston, Les Robinson, and Martha Robinson re #3 Notice (Other). (jed) Modified on 2/1/2021 to edit text (jed).
January 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 TENTH AMENDMENT TO GENERAL ORDER 20-01 RE: COURT OPERATIONS UNDER THE EXIGENT CIRCUMSTANCES CREATED BY COVID-19 AND RELATED CORONAVIRUS. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 01/27/2021. (adg) (ADI)
January 22, 2021 Submission of #1 APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed in Forma Pauperis, to Magistrate Judge Russell G. Vineyard. (eop)
January 22, 2021 Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Siara Livingston, Les Robinson and Martha Robinson re #2 Order. (eop)
January 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 NINTH AMENDMENT TO GENERAL ORDER 20-01 RE: COURT OPERATIONS UNDER THE EXIGENT CIRCUMSTANCES CREATED BY COVID-19 AND RELATED CORONA VIRUS. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 12/8/20. (eop)
January 22, 2021 Filing 1 APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed in Forma Pauperis by Les Robinson and Martha Robinson. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Removal, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(eop)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Livingston v. Robinson et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Les Robinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Martha Robinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Siara Livingston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?