Livsey v. Smith
Plaintiff: Leonard Livsey
Defendant: Donald Smith
Case Number: 1:2021cv00416
Filed: January 27, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: Walter E Johnson
Referring Judge: Steve C Jones
Nature of Suit: Rent Lease & Ejectment
Cause of Action: 15:1692
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 8, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 8, 2021 Filing 8 Mail Returned as Undeliverable. RTS. Mail sent to Leonard Livsey re #6 Order on Final Report and Recommendation. (bdb)
February 22, 2021 Remanded to Magistrate Court of Fulton County (accepted on 2/19/2021) re #6 Order (jpk)
February 19, 2021 Filing 7 Remanded to Magistrate Court of Fulton County (submitted) re #6 Order (jpk)
February 19, 2021 Civil Case Terminated. (jpk)
February 19, 2021 Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Leonard Livsey and Donald Smith re #6 Order. (jpk)
February 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER adopting #4 Final Report and Recommendation. This civil action is hereby REMANDED to the Magistrate Court of Fulton County, Georgia. Signed by Judge Steve C. Jones on 2/18/2021. (jpk)
February 17, 2021 Submission of the #4 FINAL REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION to District Judge Steve C. Jones. (aaq)
January 28, 2021 Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Leonard Livsey and Donald Smith re #4 ORDER AND FINAL REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION and #5 Order for Service of Order and final Report and Recommendation. (klb)
January 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER for Service of #4 Order and Final Report and Recommendation, by Magistrate Judge Walter E. Johnson. Each party may file written objections to the Report & Recommendation within 14 days of service. If no objections are filed, the Report & Recommendation may be adopted as the opinion and order of the District Court. Signed by Magistrate Judge Walter E. Johnson on 1/28/21. (klb)
January 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER AND FINAL REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION re #3 Notice of Removal, filed by Donald Smith. The undersigned GRANTS the Application to Proceed in District Court without Prepaying Fees or Costs #1 for the limited purpose of remand, and RECOMMENDS this case be REMANDED to the Magistrate Court of Fulton County, Georgia. The Clerk is DIRECTED to terminate the reference to the undersigned Magistrate Judge. Signed by Magistrate Judge Walter E. Johnson on 1/28/21. (klb)
January 28, 2021 Filing 3 NOTICE OF REMOVAL filed by Donald Smith. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(klb) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form.
January 28, 2021 Opinion or Order ORDER granting #1 Application for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis for the limited purpose of remand (found in text of Order and Final Report & Recommendation).. Signed by Magistrate Judge Walter E. Johnson on 1/28/21. (klb)
January 27, 2021 Submission of #1 APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed in Forma Pauperis, to Magistrate Judge Walter E. Johnson. (eop)
January 27, 2021 Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Leonard Livsey and Donald Smith re #2 Order. (eop)
January 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 TENTH AMENDMENT TO GENERAL ORDER 20-01 RE: COURT OPERATIONS UNDER THE EXIGENT CIRCUMSTANCES CREATED BY COVID-19 AND RELATED CORONAVIRUS. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 1/27/21. (eop)
January 27, 2021 Filing 1 APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed in Forma Pauperis by Donald Smith. (Attachments: #1 Petition for Removal, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(eop)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Livsey v. Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Donald Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Leonard Livsey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?