Salus 33 Peachtree Place LLC v. Olmos
Plaintiff: Salus 33 Peachtree Place LLC doing business as Nine 15 Midtown
Defendant: Krystal Olmos
Case Number: 1:2021cv00436
Filed: January 28, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: Eleanor L Ross
Referring Judge: Linda T Walker
Nature of Suit: Rent Lease & Ejectment
Cause of Action: 15:1692
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 16, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 16, 2021 Filing 9 Mail Returned as Undeliverable. Mail sent to Salus33Peacht reePlaceLLC re #7 Order on Final Report and Recommendation (tmf)
March 5, 2021 Remanded to Magistrate Court of Fulton County (accepted on 3/5/2021) re #7 Order. (jpk)
March 4, 2021 Filing 8 Remanded to Magistrate Court of Fulton County (submitted) re #7 Order. (jpk)
March 4, 2021 Civil Case Terminated. (jpk)
March 4, 2021 Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Krystal Olmos and Salus 33 Peachtree Place LLC re #7 Order. (jpk)
March 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER adopting #4 Final Report and Recommendation. The Court REMANDS this action to the Magistrate Court of Fulton County, Georgia. Signed by Judge Eleanor L. Ross on 3/4/2021. (jpk)
March 1, 2021 Submission of #4 FINAL REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION on the #3 Notice of Removal to District Judge Eleanor L. Ross. (jpk)
February 11, 2021 Clerk's Certificate of Mailing to Krystal Olmos and Salus 33 Peachtree Place LLC as to Krystal Olmos and Salus 33 Peachtree Place LLC regarding #6 Order. (mlb)
February 11, 2021 Filing 6 NOTICE FROM THE COURT: INSTRUCTIONS FOR CIVIL CASES ASSIGNED TO THE HONORABLE ELEANOR L. ROSS. (mlb)
February 10, 2021 Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Krystal Olmos and Salus 33 Peachtree Place LLC re #4 FINAL REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION and #5 Order. (jpk)
February 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER for Service of #4 Final Report and Recommendation. Each party may file written objections to the Report & Recommendation within 14 days of service. If no objections are filed, the Report & Recommendation may be adopted as the opinion and order of the District Court. Signed by Magistrate Judge Linda T. Walker on 2/10/2021. (jpk)
February 10, 2021 Opinion or Order ORDER GRANTING In Forma Pauperis. Defendant's #1 Application for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis is GRANTED. Ruled on by Magistrate Judge Linda T. Walker on 2/10/2021 within the #4 R&R. (jpk)
February 10, 2021 Filing 4 FINAL REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION on the #3 Notice of Removal. The Court RECOMMENDS that this action be REMANDED pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1447(c) to the Magistrate Court of Fulton County. As this is a final Report and Recommendation and there are no other matters pending before the Court, the Clerk is directed to terminate the reference to the undersigned. Signed by Magistrate Judge Linda T. Walker on 2/10/2021. (jpk)
February 10, 2021 Filing 3 NOTICE OF REMOVAL with COMPLAINT filed by Krystal Olmos. (jpk) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form.
January 28, 2021 Submission of #1 APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed in Forma Pauperis, to Magistrate Judge Linda T. Walker. (eop)
January 28, 2021 Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Krystal Olmos re #2 Order. (eop)
January 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 TENTH AMENDMENT TO GENERAL ORDER 20-01 RE: COURT OPERATIONS UNDER THE EXIGENT CIRCUMSTANCES CREATED BY COVID-19 AND RELATED CORONAVIRUS. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 1/27/21. (eop)
January 28, 2021 Filing 1 APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed in Forma Pauperis by Krystal Olmos. (Attachments: #1 Petition for Removal, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(eop)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Salus 33 Peachtree Place LLC v. Olmos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Salus 33 Peachtree Place LLC doing business as Nine 15 Midtown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Krystal Olmos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?