Grissom v. The Govt. of China et al
Plaintiff: Nathan LaRon Grissom
Defendant: The Govt. of China, GEO Correction and U S Govt. Congress a Senate Legislature and Judicial under The U S Treasury Dept.
Case Number: 1:2021cv00450
Filed: January 27, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: Justin S Anand
Referring Judge: Eleanor L Ross
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 26, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 26, 2021 Submission of #4 Order and #6 Mail Returned to Magistrate Judge Justin S. Anand. (jpk)
March 25, 2021 Filing 7 Mail Returned as Undeliverable. Mail sent to Nathan LaRon Grissom re #5 Notice (Other). Return to Sender. Attempted - Not known. Unable to Forward. (tcc)
March 16, 2021 Filing 6 Mail Returned as Undeliverable. Mail sent to Nathan LaRon Grissom re #4 Order to Show Cause (jpa)
March 11, 2021 Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Nathan LaRon Grissom re #5 Notice (Other). (jpk)
March 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ELEVENTH AMENDMENT TO GENERAL ORDER 20-01 RE: COURT OPERATIONS UNDER THE EXIGENT CIRCUMSTANCES CREATED BY COVID-19 AND RELATED CORONAVIRUS. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 03/09/2021 (adg) (ADI)
March 8, 2021 Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Nathan LaRon Grissom re #4 Order. (jpk)
March 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER: Plaintiff is ORDERED to SHOW CAUSE within fourteen (14) days of the date of this Order why the Court should not dismiss this case for failure to obey a lawful order of the Court. Signed by Magistrate Judge Justin S. Anand on 3/8/2021. (jpk)
March 5, 2021 Submission of #3 Order to Magistrate Judge Justin S. Anand. (jpk)
January 29, 2021 Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Nathan LaRon Grissom re #3 Order, Affidavit and Authorization, and 28:1331 Forms. (jpk)
January 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER: The Clerk is ORDERED to RESTYLE this action as a Bivens action pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1331. IT IS ORDERED that Plaintiff must submit, within thirty (30) days of the date of this Order, the $402.00 full initial filing fee plus administrative fees, or a properly completed and executed financial affidavit seeking leave to proceed in forma pauperis that the Clerk will send him. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that, should Plaintiff decide to pursue his claim(s), he must, within thirty (30) days of the date this Order is entered, file an amended complaint using the form that the Clerk of Court will send him. The Clerk of the Court is DIRECTED to forward the appropriate financial affidavit and the proper civil action form to Plaintiff together with a copy of this Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Justin S. Anand on 1/29/2021. (Forms sent to party: Affidavit and Authorization; 28:1331 Forms) (jpk)
January 29, 2021 Submission of #1 Complaint for IFP and Frivolity determination, to Magistrate Judge Justin S. Anand. (eop)
January 29, 2021 Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Nathan LaRon Grissom re #2 Order. (eop)
January 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 TENTH AMENDMENT TO GENERAL ORDER 20-01 RE: COURT OPERATIONS UNDER THE EXIGENT CIRCUMSTANCES CREATED BY COVID-19 AND RELATED CORONAVIRUS. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 1/27/21. (eop)
January 27, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Nathan LaRon Grissom. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(eop) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Grissom v. The Govt. of China et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nathan LaRon Grissom
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Govt. of China
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GEO Correction
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U S Govt. Congress a Senate Legislature and Judicial under The U S Treasury Dept.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?