Rivers v. Mainstreet Renewal, LLC
Plaintiff: Shamane Lynette Rivers
Defendant: Mainstreet Renewal, LLC
Case Number: 1:2021cv00506
Filed: February 2, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: Mark H Cohen
Referring Judge: Linda T Walker
Nature of Suit: Rent Lease & Ejectment
Cause of Action: 15:1692
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 16, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 16, 2021 Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Shamane Lynette Rivers re #7 Order on Final Report and Recommendation, #8 Clerk's Judgment. (cmd)
March 16, 2021 Filing 8 CLERK'S JUDGMENT dismissing this action. (cmd)--Please refer to http://www.ca11.uscourts.gov to obtain an appeals jurisdiction checklist--
March 16, 2021 Civil Case Terminated. (cmd)
March 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER: The Court APPROVES AND ADOPTS the #4 Final Report and Recommendation as the judgment of the Court. Plaintiff's Complaint is DISMISSED as frivolous pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915(e)(2)(B)(i). Signed by Judge Mark H. Cohen on 3/16/2021. (cmd)
March 10, 2021 Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Shamane Lynette Rivers re #6 Notice (Other). (jpa)
March 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ELEVENTH AMENDMENT TO GENERAL ORDER 20-01 RE: COURT OPERATIONS UNDER THE EXIGENT CIRCUMSTANCES CREATED BY COVID-19 AND RELATED CORONAVIRUS. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 03/09/2021 (adg) (ADI)
March 10, 2021 Submission of #4 FINAL REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION, to District Judge Mark H. Cohen. (jpa)
February 17, 2021 Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Shamane Lynette Rivers re #4 FINAL REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION, #5 Order for Service of Report and Recommendation and NEF of order granting ifp (jpa)
February 17, 2021 Filing 3 COMPLAINT filed by Shamane Lynette Rivers. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(jpa) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form.
February 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER for Service of #4 Final Report and Recommendation by Magistrate Judge Linda T. Walker. Each party may file written objections to the Report & Recommendation within 14 days of service. If no objections are filed, the Report & Recommendation may be adopted as the opinion and order of the District Court. Signed by Magistrate Judge Linda T. Walker on 2/16/21. (jpa)
February 16, 2021 Opinion or Order (Found in #4 R&R) ORDER granting #1 Application for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by Magistrate Judge Linda T. Walker on 2/16/21. (jpa)
February 16, 2021 Filing 4 FINAL REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION re #3 Complaint RECOMMENDING that this action be DISMISSED pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915(e)(2)(B)(i). Signed by Magistrate Judge Linda T. Walker on 2/16/21. (jpa)
February 3, 2021 Submission of #1 APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed in Forma Pauperis, to Magistrate Judge Linda T. Walker. (eop)
February 3, 2021 Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Mainstreet Renewal, LLC and Shamane Lynette Rivers re #2 Order. (eop)
February 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 TENTH AMENDMENT TO GENERAL ORDER 20-01 RE: COURT OPERATIONS UNDER THE EXIGENT CIRCUMSTANCES CREATED BY COVID-19 AND RELATED CORONAVIRUS. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 1/27/21. (eop)
February 2, 2021 Filing 1 APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed in Forma Pauperis by Shamane Lynette Rivers. (Attachments: #1 Complaint, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(eop)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rivers v. Mainstreet Renewal, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mainstreet Renewal, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shamane Lynette Rivers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?