Lu v. Hawkins et al
Plaintiff: Zhitao Lu
Defendant: Tanesha Hawkins, Rashad Hawkins and The Housing Authority of Fulton County
Case Number: 1:2021cv00545
Filed: February 5, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: Charles A Pannell
Referring Judge: Catherine M Salinas
Nature of Suit: Rent Lease & Ejectment
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 2, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 2, 2021 Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Rashad Hawkins, Tanesha Hawkins re #6 Order on Final Report and Recommendation, #7 Letter. (tcc)
March 2, 2021 Filing 7 Certified copy of #6 Order e-filed with the Clerk of Court, Magistrate Court of Fulton County. (tcc) (Additional attachment(s) added on 3/2/2021: #1 Envelope Receipt) (tcc).
March 2, 2021 Civil Case Terminated. (tcc)
March 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER - The #4 Final Report and Recommendation ADOPTED as the order and opinion of this court, and this action is remanded to the Magistrate Court of Fulton County, Georgia for lack of subject matter jurisdiction. Signed by Judge Charles A. Pannell, Jr. on 3/2/2021. (tcc)
March 1, 2021 Submission of #4 FINAL REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION re #3 Notice of Removal, filed by Rashad Hawkins, Tanesha Hawkins, to District Judge Charles A. Pannell Jr. (rlb)
February 8, 2021 Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Rashad Hawkins, Tanesha Hawkins re #4 FINAL REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION, #5 Order for Service of Report and Recommendation. (tcc)
February 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER for Service of #4 Final Report and Recommendation by Magistrate Judge Catherine M. Salinas. Each party may file written objections to the Report & Recommendation within 14 days of service. If no objections are filed, the Report & Recommendation may be adopted as the opinion and order of the District Court. Signed by Magistrate Judge Catherine M. Salinas on 2/8/2021. (tcc)
February 8, 2021 Opinion or Order (contained w/in #4 Final R&R) ORDER DENYING #1 Application for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by Magistrate Judge Catherine M. Salinas on 2/8/2021. (tcc)
February 8, 2021 Filing 4 FINAL REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION RECOMMENDING that this action be REMANDED to the Magistrate Court of Fulton County, Georgia for lack of subject matter jurisdiction. Signed by Magistrate Judge Catherine M. Salinas on 2/8/2021. (tcc)
February 8, 2021 Filing 3 NOTICE OF REMOVAL with COMPLAINT filed by Tanesha Hawkins, Rashad Hawkins. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(tcc) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form.
February 5, 2021 Submission of #1 APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed in Forma Pauperis, to Magistrate Judge Catherine M. Salinas. (eop)
February 5, 2021 Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Rashad Hawkins and Tanesha Hawkins re #2 Order. (eop) Modified text on 2/5/2021 (eop).
February 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 TENTH AMENDMENT TO GENERAL ORDER 20-01 RE: COURT OPERATIONS UNDER THE EXIGENT CIRCUMSTANCES CREATED BY COVID-19 AND RELATED CORONAVIRUS. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 1/27/21. (eop)
February 5, 2021 Filing 1 APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed in Forma Pauperis by Rashad Hawkins. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Removal, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(eop)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lu v. Hawkins et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tanesha Hawkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rashad Hawkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Housing Authority of Fulton County
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Zhitao Lu
Represented By: Amelia Terry Phillips
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?