Greenberg v. The Devereux Foundation, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Cody Greenberg
Defendant: Gwendolyn B. Skinner, Fredrick Woolin, John/Jane Doe Nos. 1-3 and The Devereux Foundation, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2021cv00800
Filed: February 25, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: Mark H Cohen
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Med. Malpractice
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 12, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 12, 2021 Filing 23 RESPONSE in Opposition re #22 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by John/Jane Doe Nos. 1-3, Gwendolyn B. Skinner, The Devereux Foundation, Inc.. (Friedlander, Matthew)
March 29, 2021 Filing 22 MOTION to Remand to State Court by Cody Greenberg. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Declaration of David German - with exhibits, #2 Exhibit 2 - Declaration of Omar Qureshi - with exhibits, #3 Exhibit 3 - Declaration of Naveen Ramachandrappa - with exhibits)(Ramachandrappa, Naveen)
March 25, 2021 Clerks Notation re #19 Certificate of Interested Persons reviewed by MHC.(lwb)
March 24, 2021 Filing 21 JOINT PRELIMINARY REPORT AND DISCOVERY PLAN filed by Cody Greenberg. (Ramachandrappa, Naveen)
March 24, 2021 Filing 20 REPLY to Response to Motion re #5 MOTION for Service by Publication as to FREDRICK WOOLIN filed by Cody Greenberg. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit March 4, 2021 Affidavit of Cody Greenberg, #2 Text of Proposed Order [Proposed] Order for Service by Publication, #3 Text of Proposed Order [Proposed] Notice of Publication)(Phillips, Kara)
March 22, 2021 Filing 19 Amended Certificate of Interested Persons by Cody Greenberg. (Ramachandrappa, Naveen)
March 18, 2021 Clerks Notation re #16 Certificate of Interested Persons, and #17 Certificate of Interested Persons reviewed by MHC. (lwb)
March 17, 2021 Submission of #8 Order to Show Cause and #14 Response to Order to Show Cause, to District Judge Mark H. Cohen. (jpa)
March 12, 2021 Filing 18 Certificate of Interested Persons by Cody Greenberg. (Ramachandrappa, Naveen)
March 11, 2021 Filing 17 Amended Certificate of Interested Persons by John/Jane Doe Nos. 1-3, Gwendolyn B. Skinner, The Devereux Foundation, Inc.. (Friedlander, Matthew)
March 11, 2021 Filing 16 Certificate of Interested Persons by John/Jane Doe Nos. 1-3, Gwendolyn B. Skinner, The Devereux Foundation, Inc.. (Friedlander, Matthew)
March 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ELEVENTH AMENDMENT TO GENERAL ORDER 20-01 RE: COURT OPERATIONS UNDER THE EXIGENT CIRCUMSTANCES CREATED BY COVID-19 AND RELATED CORONAVIRUS. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 03/09/2021 (dgs) (ADI)
March 8, 2021 Filing 14 RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by defendants re: #8 Order to Show Cause. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - First Amended Complaint in McGee Action, #2 Exhibit B - Excerpt of the First Consolidated Pretrial Order of the parties in the McGee action, #3 Exhibit C - Excerpt of Plaintiff's closing argument in the McGee Action, #4 Exhibit D - Punitive Damages verdict in McGee action, #5 Exhibit E - Plaintiffs brief opposing application of punitive damages cap in McGee Action, #6 Exhibit F - State Court Case Information Form, #7 Exhibit G - Declaration of Matthew D. Friedlander, #8 Exhibit H - Plaintiffs brief in support of attorney fees in McGee Action)(Friedlander, Matthew) Modified on 3/9/2021 to add filers (jpa).
March 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER GRANTING the #12 Motion to Stay. The Court STAYS any consideration of the pre-removal Motion to Dismiss and Greenberg's deadline to respond to such motion until such time as when the Court decides the jurisdictional questions regarding remand. If the Court later grants remand, then the parties will address further scheduling issues with the state court. And if the Court later denies remand, then the Court ORDERS that the Devereux Defendants shall re-file their Motion to Dismiss under federal pleading rules within twenty-one days from the order denying remand, and any farther briefing or argument shall proceed under this Court's Local Rules. Signed by Judge Mark H. Cohen on 3/4/21. (jpa)
March 4, 2021 Filing 12 Joint MOTION to Stay The Courts Consideration Of The Devereux Defendants Pre-Removal Motion To Dismiss And Plaintiff Greenbergs Deadline To Respond To Such Motion by Cody Greenberg. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Ex. A)(Ramachandrappa, Naveen)
March 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER GRANTING the #10 Motion for Extension of Time through 4/12/21 for Plaintiff to file his reply in support of #5 MOTION for Service by Publication as to FREDRICK WOOLIN. Signed by Judge Mark H. Cohen on 3/2/21. (jpa)
March 2, 2021 Filing 10 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time To File Reply Brief re: #5 MOTION for Service by Publication as to FREDRICK WOOLIN by Cody Greenberg. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Ramachandrappa, Naveen)
March 1, 2021 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Megan Elizabeth Cambre on behalf of Cody Greenberg (Cambre, Megan)
February 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER directing the Defendants TO SHOW CAUSE IN WRITING within 10 days why this case should not be remanded to the State Court of Cobb County. Signed by Judge Mark H. Cohen on 2/26/21. (jpa)
February 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 STANDING ORDER regarding civil litigation. Signed by Judge Mark H. Cohen on 2/26/21. (jpa)
February 26, 2021 Submission of #5 MOTION for Service by Publication as to FREDRICK WOOLIN, to District Judge Mark H. Cohen. (eop)
February 25, 2021 Filing 6 RESPONSE in Opposition re #5 MOTION for Service by Publication as to FREDRICK WOOLIN filed by Gwendolyn B. Skinner, The Devereux Foundation, Inc. and John/Jane Doe Nos. 1-3. (Filed in State Court and included with Notice of Removal) (eop)
February 25, 2021 Filing 5 MOTION for Service by Publication as to FREDRICK WOOLIN by Cody Greenberg. (Filed in State Court and included with Notice of Removal) (eop)
February 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 TENTH AMENDMENT TO GENERAL ORDER 20-01 RE: COURT OPERATIONS UNDER THE EXIGENT CIRCUMSTANCES CREATED BY COVID-19 AND RELATED CORONAVIRUS. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 1/27/21. (eop)
February 25, 2021 Filing 3 MOTION to Dismiss with Memorandum of Law in Support by Gwendolyn B. Skinner, The Devereux Foundation, Inc. and John/Jane Doe Nos. 1-3. (Filed in State Court and included with Notice of Removal) (eop)
February 25, 2021 Filing 2 ANSWER to #1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Gwendolyn B. Skinner and The Devereux Foundation, Inc. and John/Jane Doe Nos. 1-3. Discovery ends on 7/26/2021. (Filed in State Court andincluded with Notice of Removal)(eop) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov to obtain Pretrial Instructions. Modified text on 2/26/2021 (eop).
February 25, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL with COMPLAINT filed by The Devereux Foundation, Inc., Gwendolyn B. Skinner and John/Jane Doe Nos. 1-3. (Filing fee $ 402.00 receipt number AGANDC-10765104) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit -A, #2 Exhibit -B, #3 Exhibit -C, #4 Exhibit -D, #5 Exhibit -E, #6 Exhibit -F, #7 Exhibit -G, #8 Exhibit -H, #9 Exhibit -I, #10 Exhibit -J, #11 Exhibit -K, #12 Civil Cover Sheet)(eop) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Greenberg v. The Devereux Foundation, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gwendolyn B. Skinner
Represented By: Caroline Johnson Tanner
Represented By: Matthew D. Friedlander
Represented By: Laurie Webb Daniel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fredrick Woolin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John/Jane Doe Nos. 1-3
Represented By: Caroline Johnson Tanner
Represented By: Matthew D. Friedlander
Represented By: Laurie Webb Daniel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Devereux Foundation, Inc.
Represented By: Caroline Johnson Tanner
Represented By: Matthew D. Friedlander
Represented By: Laurie Webb Daniel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cody Greenberg
Represented By: Andrew Timothy Rogers
Represented By: Kara E. Phillips
Represented By: William Michael D'Antignac
Represented By: Gilbert H. Deitch
Represented By: Naveen Ramachandrappa
Represented By: Megan Elizabeth Cambre
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?