Bultsma v. CTCA Physicians Group of Georgia, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Paul Bultsma and Paula Bultsma
Defendant: Amina Navqi, M.D., Felicia Slaton, P. A., Southeastern Regional Medical Center, LLC, CTCA Physicians Group of Georgia, Inc. doing business as Cancer Treatment Centers of America, CTCA Atlanta, Kevin T. Watkins, Amina Naqvi, M.D., CTCA Physicians Group of Georgia, Inc. doing business as Cancer Treatment Centers of America, (CTCA) Atlanta and Kevin T. Watkins, M.D.
Case Number: 1:2021cv01074
Filed: March 16, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: William M Ray
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Med. Malpractice
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1446
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 12, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER DISMISSING FEWER THAN ALL PARTIES. The #24 Consent Motion is GRANTED, and Defendants Amina Naqvi, M.D., Felicia Slaton, P.A., and Kevin T. Watkins, M.D. are hereby DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE from the above-styled civil action. This case shall remain pending against the remaining Defendants. Signed by Judge William M. Ray, II on 5/12/2021. (cmd)
May 7, 2021 Filing 24 Consent MOTION to Dismiss (Consent Motion to Dismiss Fewer Than All Parties, Including Defendants Amina Naqvi, M.D., Felicia Slaton, P.A. and Kevin T. Watkins, M.D.) by Felicia Slaton, PA, Kevin T. Watkins, M.D.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Exhibit A - Proposed Order)(Allen, Meredith)
May 6, 2021 Filing 23 RESPONSE re #20 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM (Defendants' Partial Motion To Dismiss Counts Six and Seven of Plaintiff's Amended Complaint) filed by Paula Bultsma. (Neal, Joseph)
April 29, 2021 Filing 22 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge William M. Ray, II: Motion Hearing held on 4/29/2021 re #5 MOTION to Remand to State Court. Videoconference hearing held on Plaintiff's Motion to Remand [ECF #5 ]. The Court heard from both parties. The Court will DEFER ruling through May 9, 2021. If the Court has not heard from the parties by that date regarding the status of settlement, a ruling will be issued. (Court Reporter Wynette Blathers)(cmd)
April 26, 2021 Filing 21 ANSWER to #18 Amended Complaint by Amina Naqvi, M.D..(Marschalk, Barbara) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov to obtain Pretrial Instructions.
April 23, 2021 Filing 20 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM (Defendants' Partial Motion To Dismiss Counts Six and Seven of Plaintiff's Amended Complaint) by CTCA Physicians Group of Georgia, Inc., Felicia Slaton, PA, Southeastern Regional Medical Center, LLC, Kevin T. Watkins, M.D.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Affidavit of Custodian of Records)(Allen, Meredith)
April 20, 2021 Submission of #5 MOTION to Remand to State Court to District Judge William M. Ray, II. (cmd)
April 19, 2021 Filing 19 NOTICE OF HEARING re: #5 MOTION to Remand to State Court. Motion Hearing set for 4/29/2021 at 01:30 PM via Zoom before Judge William M. Ray, II. Connection Instructions: Link: https://ganduscourts.zoomgov.com/j/1605508165; Meeting ID: 160 550 8165; Passcode: 1705; Phone audio option: +1 646 828 7666. (cmd)
April 12, 2021 Filing 18 AMENDED COMPLAINT to Correct Two Inadvertent Misnomers of Parties against All Defendants with Jury Demand filed by Paul Bultsma.(Crawford, David) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form.
April 8, 2021 Filing 17 Certificate of Interested Persons by Amina Navqi, MD. (Marschalk, Barbara)
April 8, 2021 Filing 16 ANSWER to #1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL with Jury Demand by Amina Navqi, MD. Discovery ends on 9/7/2021.(Marschalk, Barbara) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov to obtain Pretrial Instructions.
April 2, 2021 Filing 15 Notice for Leave of Absence for the following date(s): April 2, 2021 through April 12, 2021; June 18, 2021 through June 28, 2021; November 22, 2021 through November 29, 2021; and December 22, 2021 through December 27, 2021, by Barbara Anne Marschalk. (Marschalk, Barbara)
April 2, 2021 Filing 14 RESPONSE in Opposition re #5 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by CTCA Physicians Group of Georgia, Inc., Amina Navqi, MD, Felicia Slaton, PA, Southeastern Regional Medical Center, LLC, Kevin T. Watkins. (Allen, Meredith)
March 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 STANDING ORDER REGARDING CIVIL LITIGATION. Signed by Judge William M. Ray, II on 3/30/2021. (cmd)
March 25, 2021 Filing 12 ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF SERVICE Executed filed by Paul Bultsma. All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Affidavit of Service on First Defendant Amina Navqi, M.D., #2 Affidavit Affidavit of Service on Second Defendant CTCA Physicians Group of Georgia, Inc., #3 Affidavit Affidavit of Service on Third Defendant Southeastern Regional Medical Center, LLC, #4 Exhibit Acknowledgment of Service on Fourth Defendant Felicia Slaton, P.A., #5 Exhibit Acknowledgment of Service on Fifth Defendant Kevin T. Watkins, M.D.)(Crawford, David)
March 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting #10 Consent Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Defendants CTCA Physicians Group of Georgia, Inc., Felicia Slaton, PA, Southeastern Regional Medical Center, LLC, and Kevin T. Watkins deadline to answer, move, plead, defend, or otherwise respond to the Amended Complaint is hereby EXTENDED through and including April 23, 2021. Signed by Judge William M. Ray, II on 03/25/2021. (rvb)
March 25, 2021 Filing 10 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer to Plaintiff's Complaint by CTCA Physicians Group of Georgia, Inc., Felicia Slaton, PA, Southeastern Regional Medical Center, LLC, Kevin T. Watkins. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Allen, Meredith)
March 24, 2021 Filing 9 Letter from Clerk re: LR 83.1 Attorney Admission requirements sent to Joseph R. Neal, Jr.. Clerk to follow-up by 4/5/2021. (nmb)
March 24, 2021 Filing 8 Certificate of Interested Persons by Paul Bultsma. (Crawford, David)
March 23, 2021 Filing 7 Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement by CTCA Physicians Group of Georgia, Inc., Felicia Slaton, PA, Southeastern Regional Medical Center, LLC, Kevin T. Watkins identifying Corporate Parent Cancer Treatment Centers of America, Inc for CTCA Physicians Group of Georgia, Inc., Southeastern Regional Medical Center, LLC. (Allen, Meredith)
March 19, 2021 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Barbara Anne Marschalk on behalf of Amina Navqi, MD (Marschalk, Barbara)
March 19, 2021 Filing 5 MOTION to Remand to State Court with Brief In Support by Paul Bultsma. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Crawford, David)
March 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER GRANTING #3 Motion for Leave to Appear Under Local Rule 7.5. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Joseph R. Neal, Jr.'s Motion is hereby GRANTED to give Mr. Neal limited permission to appear, object and plead to the Defendants' Notice of Removal and on Plaintiff's Motion to Remand which are presently before the Court. Signed by Judge William M. Ray, II on 3/19/2021. (cmd)
March 18, 2021 Filing 3 MOTION for Leave to Appear as Co-Counsel Under Local Rule 7.5 by Paul Bultsma. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Crawford, David) Modified on 3/19/2021 to edit text. (cmd)
March 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ELEVENTH AMENDMENT TO GENERAL ORDER 20-01 RE: COURT OPERATIONS UNDER THE EXIGENT CIRCUMSTANCES CREATED BY COVID-19 AND RELATED CORONAVIRUS. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 3/9/2021. (eop)
March 16, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL with COMPLAINT filed by Southeastern Regional Medical Center, LLC, CTCA Physicians Group of Georgia, Inc. and Kevin T. Watkins. (Filing fee $ 402.00 receipt number AGANDC-10830112) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit -1 -Complaint, #2 Exhibit -2 -Georgia Sec. of State -CTCA Physicians Group of Georgia, #3 Exhibit -3 -Georgia Sec. of State Southeastern Regional Medical Center, #4 Civil Cover Sheet)(eop) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bultsma v. CTCA Physicians Group of Georgia, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amina Navqi, M.D.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Felicia Slaton, P. A.
Represented By: Keisha Oldacre Coleman
Represented By: Meredith Laughlin Allen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Southeastern Regional Medical Center, LLC
Represented By: Keisha Oldacre Coleman
Represented By: Meredith Laughlin Allen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CTCA Physicians Group of Georgia, Inc. doing business as Cancer Treatment Centers of America, CTCA Atlanta
Represented By: Keisha Oldacre Coleman
Represented By: Meredith Laughlin Allen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kevin T. Watkins
Represented By: Keisha Oldacre Coleman
Represented By: Meredith Laughlin Allen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amina Naqvi, M.D.
Represented By: Barbara Anne Marschalk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CTCA Physicians Group of Georgia, Inc. doing business as Cancer Treatment Centers of America, (CTCA) Atlanta
Represented By: Keisha Oldacre Coleman
Represented By: Meredith Laughlin Allen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kevin T. Watkins, M.D.
Represented By: Keisha Oldacre Coleman
Represented By: Meredith Laughlin Allen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Paul Bultsma
Represented By: Joseph R. Neal, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Paula Bultsma
Represented By: Joseph R. Neal, Jr.
Represented By: David Scott Crawford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?