Eagle Mountain View, LLC et al v. United States of America
Petitioner: English Mountain View, LLC, Eagle Mountain View, LLC and Carver Mountain Reserve, LLC
Respondent: United States of America
Intervenor: Kerry Mock
Case Number: 1:2021cv01097
Filed: March 17, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: Amy Totenberg
Nature of Suit: Tax Suits: IRS-Third Party
Cause of Action: 26 U.S.C. ยง 7609
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 15, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 15, 2021 Filing 7 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time Respond to Amended Petition by United States of America. (Coulson, Christopher)
May 15, 2021 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Christopher Justin Coulson on behalf of United States of America (Coulson, Christopher)
April 8, 2021 Filing 5 AMENDED PETITION against United States of America filed by English Mountain View, LLC, Eagle Mountain View, LLC, Carver Mountain Reserve, LLC, Kerry Mock. (Attachments: #1 Brief Memorandum in Support of Amended Petition, #2 Exhibit 1 - 3/19/2021 Summonses, #3 Exhibit 2 - RAR Eagle Mountain, #4 Exhibit 3 - RAR English Mountain, #5 Exhibit 4 - RAR Carver Mountain)(Carter, Jason) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form.
April 8, 2021 Submission of #3 MOTION to Intervene In Petition Of Eagle Mountain View, LLC, English Mountain View, LLC And Carver Mountain Reserve, LLC To Quash IRS Summonses Or, In The Alternative, To Examine IRS Officials, to District Judge Amy Totenberg. (rlb)
March 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 STANDING ORDER: GUIDELINES TO PARTIES AND COUNSEL PROCEEDING BEFORE THE HONORABLE AMY TOTENBERG. You are required to sign and file a Certificate of Compliance in a format consistent with the Certificate of Compliance attached hereto. To request to file material under seal, the Parties should follow the mechanism described in Section II(J) of Appendix H to the Court's Local Civil Rules. Signed by Judge Amy Totenberg on 3/22/21. (rlb)
March 18, 2021 Filing 3 MOTION to Intervene In Petition Of Eagle Mountain View, LLC, English Mountain View, LLC And Carver Mountain Reserve, LLC To Quash IRS Summonses Or, In The Alternative, To Examine IRS Officials with Brief In Support by Kerry Mock. (Carter, Jason)
March 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ELEVENTH AMENDMENT TO GENERAL ORDER 20-01 RE: COURT OPERATIONS UNDER THE EXIGENT CIRCUMSTANCES CREATED BY COVID-19 AND RELATED CORONAVIRUS. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 3/9/2021. (eop)
March 17, 2021 Filing 1 PETITION to Quash IRS Summons or, in the alternative, to Examine IRS Agent Yan Shu Zhao filed by English Mountain View, LLC, Eagle Mountain View, LLC and Carver Mountain Reserve, LLC.. (Filing fee $402.00, receipt number AGANDC-10834560) (Attachments: #1 Brief, #2 Exhibit -A -Summons, #3 Exhibit -B -Skalski Declaration, #4 Exhibit -1 to Decl. -Notices of Audit, #5 Exhibit -2 -to Decl. -IRS Close Out Letter, #6 Exhibit -3 to Decl. -IRDs Carver, #7 Exhibit -4 -to Decl.-IRDs Eagle Mtn, #8 Exhibit -5 -to Decl. -IRDs English, #9 Exhibit -6 to Decl. -Letter to IRS, #10 Exhibit -7 to Decl. -Ltr to IRS, #11 Exhibit -8 to Decl. -Ltr to IRS)(eop) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form. (Additional attachment(s) added on 3/18/2021: #12 Exhibit -9-to Decl. -2019 Appraisals, #13 Exhibit -10 to Decl. -Extension Timelines, #14 Exhibit -11 to Decl. Letters, #15 Exhibit -12 to Decl. -IRS Penalty Memos, #16 Exhibit -13, #17 Exhibit -14) (eop). (Additional attachment(s) added on 3/18/2021: #18 Exhibit -15, #19 Exhibit -16, #20 Exhibit -17, #21 Exhibit -18 to Decl. -Penalty Checklists, #22 Exhibit -C - Eagle Conservation Easement, #23 Exhibit -D -Carver Conservation Easement, #24 Exhibit -E -English Quitclaim Deed, #25 Exhibit -F -Written Acknowledgment, #26 Civil Cover Sheet) (eop). Modified text on 3/18/2021 (eop).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Eagle Mountain View, LLC et al v. United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: United States of America
Represented By: Christopher Justin Coulson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: English Mountain View, LLC
Represented By: Jason James Carter
Represented By: Amanda Bradley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Eagle Mountain View, LLC
Represented By: Jason James Carter
Represented By: Amanda Bradley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Carver Mountain Reserve, LLC
Represented By: Jason James Carter
Represented By: Amanda Bradley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor: Kerry Mock
Represented By: Amanda Bradley
Represented By: Jason James Carter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?