Unwired Asset Management LLC v. Twilio Inc.
Plaintiff: Unwired Asset Management LLC
Defendant: Twilio Inc.
Case Number: 1:2021cv01275
Filed: March 29, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: Mark H Cohen
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 28:1338
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 18, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 18, 2021 Filing 14 AO Form 120 forwarded to Commissioner. (tmf)
May 18, 2021 Civil Case Terminated. (tmf)
May 18, 2021 Clerk's Entry of Dismissal APPROVING #13 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P.41(a)(1)(A)(i) (tmf)
May 17, 2021 Filing 13 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal filed by Unwired Asset Management LLC (Burt, Jacqueline)
May 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER granting #11 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer; Twilio Inc.'s Answer due 6/5/2021. Signed by Judge Mark H. Cohen on 5/12/21. (jpa)
May 11, 2021 Filing 11 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, by Unwired Asset Management LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Burt, Jacqueline)
April 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting #9 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. It is ORDERED that the time for which Defendant Twilio Inc. has to respond to the Complaint in this action shall be extended to May 24, 2021. Signed by Judge Mark H. Cohen on 4/15/2021. (jpk)
April 14, 2021 Filing 9 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time for Defendant to Respond to Complaint by Unwired Asset Management LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Burt, Jacqueline) Modified on 4/15/2021 to change event type (rlb).
April 7, 2021 Filing 8 Return of Service Executed by Unwired Asset Management LLC. Twilio Inc. served on 4/2/2021, answer due 4/23/2021. (Burt, Jacqueline)
April 5, 2021 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting #7 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Richard Charles Weinblatt by CRD at the direction of the Court. Approved by Judge Mark H. Cohen on April 5, 2021. If the applicant does not have CM/ECF access in the Northern District of Georgia already, they must request access at http://pacer.gov. If they have electronically filed in this district in a previous case, please omit this step.(lwb)
April 5, 2021 APPROVAL by Clerks Office re: #7 APPLICATION for Admission of Richard Charles Weinblatt Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-10871123).. Attorney Richard Charles Weinblatt added appearing on behalf of Unwired Asset Management LLC (cdg)
April 1, 2021 Filing 7 APPLICATION for Admission of Richard Charles Weinblatt Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-10871123).by Unwired Asset Management LLC. (Burt, Jacqueline) Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse.
March 31, 2021 Clerks Notation re #4 Corporate Disclosure Statement reviewed by MHC. (lwb)
March 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 STANDING ORDER REGARDING CIVIL LITIGATION. Signed by Judge Mark H. Cohen on 3/30/2021. (rjs)
March 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ELEVENTH AMENDMENT TO GENERAL ORDER 20-01 RE: COURT OPERATIONS UNDER THE EXIGENT CIRCUMSTANCES CREATED BY COVID-19 AND RELATED CORONA VIRUS. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 3/9/2021. (eop)
March 29, 2021 Filing 4 Corporate Disclosure Statement by by Unwired Asset Management LLC.(eop)
March 29, 2021 Filing 3 AO Form 120 forwarded to Commissioner. (eop)
March 29, 2021 Filing 2 Electronic Summons Issued as to Twilio Inc.. (eop)
March 29, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand filed by Unwired Asset Management LLC. (Filing fee $402.00, receipt number AGANDC-10861683) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit -A - 756 Patent, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(eop) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Unwired Asset Management LLC v. Twilio Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Twilio Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Unwired Asset Management LLC
Represented By: Richard Charles Weinblatt
Represented By: Jacqueline Knapp Burt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?