Sixth District of the African Methodist Episcopal Church et al v. Kemp et al
Plaintiff: Georgia Muslim Voter Project, Latino Community Fund of Georgia, Women Watch Afrika, Sixth District of the African Methodist Episcopal Church, Delta Sigma Theta Sorority, Inc., Georgia Adapt, Southern Christian Leadership Conference, The Arc of the United States and Georgia Advocacy Office
Defendant: Wandy Taylor, Tim McFalls, Rocky Raffle, Bibb County Board of Elections, John Mangano, Ann Cushman, Samuel E. Tillman, Santiago Marquez, Susan Motter, Colin Mcrae, Hunaid Qadir, Darlene Johnson, Henry Ficklin, Clarke County Board of Election and Voter Registration, Brian Kemp, Alice O'Lenick, Gala Sheats, Marianne Heimes, Fulton County Registration and Elections Board, Charlotte Sosebee, Richard L. Barron, Jon Pannell, Bibb County Board of Registrars, Tom Smiley, Nancy L. Gay, Sherry T. Barnes, Phil Daniell, Ken Cochran, Lynn Ledford, Willa Jean Fambrough, Rinda Wilson, Columbia County Board of Registrars, Bob Finnegan, Malinda Hodge, Carol Wesley, Veronica Seals, David Worley, Columbia County Board of Elections, Dele L. Smith, Janine Eveler, Lynn Bailey, Kathleen D. Ruth, Antan Lang, Randolph Slay, Georgia State Elections Board, Terence Dicks, Baoky N. Vu, Aaron V. Johnson, Thomas J. Mahoney, Diane Givens, Gwinnett County Board of Registrations and Elections, Vernetta K. Nuriddin, Dorothy F. Hall, Ann Till, Daryl O. Wilson, Jr., George Awuku, David Kennedy, Anh Le, Alex Wan, Rebecca Sullivan, Adam Shirley, Clayton County Board of Elections and Registration, Herbert Spangler, Marcia Brown, Larry Wiggins, Cobb County Board of Elections and Registration, Patricia Pullar, Chatham County Board of Registrars, Richmond County Board of Elections, Matthew Mashburn, DeKalb County Board of Registrations and Elections, Anthony Lewis, Chatham County Board of Elections, Brad Raffensperger, Craig Lutz, Hall County Board of Elections and Registration, Shauna Dozier, Fred Aiken, Lori Wurtz, Cassandra Powell, Wanda Duffie, Wanda Andrews, Mike Kaplan, Pat Gartland, Jeanetta R. Watson, Jessica M. Brooks, Stephen W. Day, Mark Wingate, William L. Norse, Kelvin Williams and Georgia State Election Board
Intervenor Defendant: Republican National Committee, National Republican Senatorial Committee, National Republican Congressional Committee and Georgia Republican Party, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2021cv01284
Filed: March 29, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: J P Boulee
Referring Judge: Eleanor L Ross
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Voting
Cause of Action: 52:10301
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 26, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 26, 2021 Opinion or Order ORDER: The parties' Consent Motion Regarding Defendants' Answer or Response to Plaintiffs' #82 Amended Complaint is GRANTED. Defendants Brian Kemp, Brad Raffensperger, Rebecca Sullivan, David Worley, Matthew Mashburn and Anh Le's #74 Motion to Dismiss is DENIED as moot in light of Plaintiffs' #83 May 24, 2021 Amended Complaint. Further, the County Defendants shall answer or otherwise respond to the Amended Complaint within twenty days of May 24, 2021, or by June 14, 2021, whichever is later. Signed by Judge J. P. Boulee on 5/26/21. (bnw)
May 25, 2021 Filing 84 NOTICE of Appearance by Jordan Bell on behalf of Columbia County Board of Elections, Columbia County Board of Registrars, Ann Cushman, Wanda Duffie, Nancy L. Gay, Larry Wiggins (Bell, Jordan)
May 24, 2021 Filing 83 First AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by Delta Sigma Theta Sorority, Inc., Latino Community Fund of Georgia, Women Watch Afrika, Sixth District of the African Methodist Episcopal Church, Georgia Muslim Voter Project.(Garabadu, Rahul) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form.
May 24, 2021 Opinion or Order ORDER granting #79 #80 #81 Applications for Admission Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Judge J. P. Boulee on 5/24/21. If the applicant does not have CM/ECF access in the Northern District of Georgia already, they must request access at http://pacer.gov. If they have electronically filed in this district in a previous case, please omit this step.(bnw)
May 21, 2021 Filing 82 Consent MOTION Regarding Defendants Answer or Response to Plaintiffs Amended Complaint by Delta Sigma Theta Sorority, Inc., Georgia Muslim Voter Project, Latino Community Fund of Georgia, Sixth District of the African Methodist Episcopal Church, Women Watch Afrika. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Garabadu, Rahul)
May 21, 2021 APPROVAL by Clerks Office re: #81 APPLICATION for Admission of H. Christopher Bartolomucci Pro Hac Vice.. Attorney H. Christopher Bartolomucci added appearing on behalf of Brian Kemp, Anh Le, Matthew Mashburn, Brad Raffensperger, Rebecca Sullivan, David Worley (nmb)
May 21, 2021 APPROVAL by Clerks Office re: #80 APPLICATION for Admission of Erik Jaffe Pro Hac Vice. Attorney Erik Scott Jaffe added appearing on behalf of Brian Kemp, Anh Le, Matthew Mashburn, Brad Raffensperger, Rebecca Sullivan, David Worley (cdg)
May 21, 2021 APPROVAL by Clerks Office re: #79 APPLICATION for Admission of Gene C. Schaerr Pro Hac Vice. Attorney Gene C. Schaerr added appearing on behalf of Brian Kemp, Anh Le, Matthew Mashburn, Brad Raffensperger, Rebecca Sullivan, David Worley (cdg)
May 18, 2021 Filing 81 APPLICATION for Admission of H. Christopher Bartolomucci Pro Hac Vice.by Brian Kemp, Anh Le, Matthew Mashburn, Brad Raffensperger, Rebecca Sullivan, David Worley. (Tyson, Bryan) Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse.
May 18, 2021 Filing 80 APPLICATION for Admission of Erik Jaffe Pro Hac Vice.by Brian Kemp, Anh Le, Matthew Mashburn, Brad Raffensperger, Rebecca Sullivan, David Worley. (Tyson, Bryan) Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse.
May 18, 2021 Filing 79 APPLICATION for Admission of Gene C. Schaerr Pro Hac Vice.by Brian Kemp, Anh Le, Matthew Mashburn, Brad Raffensperger, Rebecca Sullivan, David Worley. (Tyson, Bryan) Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse.
May 17, 2021 RETURN of #78 APPLICATION for Admission of H. Christopher Bartolomucci Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-10971346). to attorney for correction re: Parties being represented. (cdg)
May 17, 2021 RETURN of #77 APPLICATION for Admission of Erik Jaffe Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-10971343). to attorney for correction re: Parties being represented. (cdg)
May 17, 2021 RETURN of #76 APPLICATION for Admission of Gene C. Schaerr Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-10971334). to attorney for correction re: Parties being represented. (cdg)
May 12, 2021 Filing 78 APPLICATION for Admission of H. Christopher Bartolomucci Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-10971346).by Brian Kemp, Anh Le, Matthew Mashburn, Brad Raffensperger, Rebecca Sullivan, David Worley. (Tyson, Bryan) Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse.
May 12, 2021 Filing 77 APPLICATION for Admission of Erik Jaffe Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-10971343).by Brian Kemp, Anh Le, Matthew Mashburn, Brad Raffensperger, Rebecca Sullivan, David Worley. (Tyson, Bryan) Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse.
May 12, 2021 Filing 76 APPLICATION for Admission of Gene C. Schaerr Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-10971334).by Brian Kemp, Anh Le, Matthew Mashburn, Brad Raffensperger, Rebecca Sullivan, David Worley. (Tyson, Bryan) Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse.
May 12, 2021 Filing 75 NOTICE of Appearance by Charlene S McGowan on behalf of Brian Kemp, Anh Le, Matthew Mashburn, Brad Raffensperger, Rebecca Sullivan, David Worley (McGowan, Charlene)
May 12, 2021 Submission of #38 MOTION to Intervene , to District Judge J. P. Boulee. (ddm)
May 10, 2021 Filing 74 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Complaint with Brief In Support by Brian Kemp, Anh Le, Matthew Mashburn, Brad Raffensperger, Rebecca Sullivan, David Worley. (Attachments: #1 Brief in Support of Motion to Dismiss, #2 Exhibit A - SB 202 As Passed)(Tyson, Bryan)
May 10, 2021 Opinion or Order ORDER: For good cause shown, the Court GRANTS the parties' #70 Amended Consent Motion for Extension of Time. The County Defendants' response to Plaintiffs' Complaint is due by May 24, 2021. Signed by Judge J. P. Boulee on 5/10/21. (bnw)
May 3, 2021 Filing 73 REPLY to Response to Motion re #38 MOTION to Intervene filed by Georgia Republican Party, Inc., National Republican Congressional Committee, National Republican Senatorial Committee, Republican National Committee. (Norris, Cameron)
April 29, 2021 Filing 72 NOTICE of Appearance by Arash A. Sabzevari on behalf of Clayton County Board of Elections and Registration, Shauna Dozier, Diane Givens, Dorothy F. Hall, Darlene Johnson, Patricia Pullar, Carol Wesley (Sabzevari, Arash)
April 29, 2021 Filing 71 NOTICE of Appearance by Jack Reynolds Hancock on behalf of Clayton County Board of Elections and Registration, Shauna Dozier, Diane Givens, Dorothy F. Hall, Darlene Johnson, Patricia Pullar, Carol Wesley (Hancock, Jack)
April 29, 2021 Opinion or Order ORDER granting #69 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Judge J. P. Boulee on 4/29/21. If the applicant does not have CM/ECF access in the Northern District of Georgia already, they must request access at http://pacer.gov. If they have electronically filed in this district in a previous case, please omit this step.(bnw)
April 29, 2021 Filing 70 Amended MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint,, on behalf of all County Defendants by Fred Aiken, Wanda Andrews, George Awuku, Lynn Bailey, Sherry T. Barnes, Richard L. Barron, Bibb County Board of Elections, Bibb County Board of Registrars, Jessica M. Brooks, Marcia Brown, Chatham County Board of Elections, Chatham County Board of Registrars, Clarke County Board of Election and Voter Registration, Clayton County Board of Elections and Registration, Cobb County Board of Elections and Registration, Ken Cochran, Columbia County Board of Elections, Columbia County Board of Registrars, Ann Cushman, Phil Daniell, Stephen W. Day, DeKalb County Board of Registrations and Elections, Terence Dicks, Shauna Dozier, Wanda Duffie, Janine Eveler, Willa Jean Fambrough, Henry Ficklin, Bob Finnegan, Fulton County Registration and Elections Board, Pat Gartland, Nancy L. Gay, Diane Givens, Gwinnett County Board of Registrations and Elections, Dorothy F. Hall, Hall County Board of Elections and Registration, Marianne Heimes, Malinda Hodge, Aaron V. Johnson, Darlene Johnson, Mike Kaplan, David Kennedy, Antan Lang, Lynn Ledford, Anthony Lewis, Craig Lutz, Thomas J. Mahoney, John Mangano, Santiago Marquez, Tim McFalls, Colin Mcrae, Susan Motter, William L. Norse, Vernetta K. Nuriddin, Alice O'Lenick, Jon Pannell, Cassandra Powell, Patricia Pullar, Hunaid Qadir, Rocky Raffle, Richmond County Board of Elections, Kathleen D. Ruth, Veronica Seals, Gala Sheats, Adam Shirley, Randolph Slay, Tom Smiley, Dele L. Smith, Charlotte Sosebee, Herbert Spangler, Wandy Taylor, Ann Till, Samuel E. Tillman, Baoky N. Vu, Alex Wan, Jeanetta R. Watson, Carol Wesley, Larry Wiggins, Daryl O. Wilson, Jr, Rinda Wilson, Mark Wingate, Lori Wurtz. (White, Daniel)
April 29, 2021 APPROVAL by Clerks Office re: #69 APPLICATION for Admission of Brian Dimmick Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-10932122). Attorney Brian Lawrence Dimmick added appearing on behalf of Delta Sigma Theta Sorority, Inc., Sixth District of the African Methodist Episcopal Church (cdg)
April 27, 2021 Opinion or Order ORDER: For good cause shown, the Court GRANTS the parties' #59 Consent Motion to extend the time to respond to Plaintiffs' Complaint. The Cobb County Defendants' response to Plaintiffs' Complaint is due by May 24, 2021. Signed by Judge J. P. Boulee on 4/27/21. (bnw)
April 27, 2021 Opinion or Order ORDER: For good cause shown, the Court GRANTS the parties' #56 Consent Motion to extend the time to respond to Plaintiffs' Complaint. The Hall County Defendants' response to Plaintiffs' Complaint is due by May 10, 2021. Signed by Judge J. P. Boulee on 4/27/21. (bnw)
April 27, 2021 Filing 69 APPLICATION for Admission of Brian Dimmick Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-10932122).by Delta Sigma Theta Sorority, Inc., Sixth District of the African Methodist Episcopal Church. (Garabadu, Rahul) Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse.
April 27, 2021 Opinion or Order ORDER granting #19 #27 #30 Applications for Admission Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Judge J. P. Boulee on 4/27/21. If the applicant does not have CM/ECF access in the Northern District of Georgia already, they must request access at http://pacer.gov. If they have electronically filed in this district in a previous case, please omit this step.(bnw)
April 27, 2021 Filing 68 NOTICE of Appearance by Rachel Nicole Mack on behalf of Lynn Bailey, Sherry T. Barnes, Marcia Brown, Terence Dicks, Bob Finnegan, Tim McFalls, Richmond County Board of Elections (Mack, Rachel)
April 26, 2021 Filing 67 RESPONSE in Opposition re #38 MOTION to Intervene filed by Georgia Muslim Voter Project, Latino Community Fund of Georgia, Women Watch Afrika. (Sieff, Adam)
April 26, 2021 Filing 66 NOTICE of Appearance by Thomas L. Cathey on behalf of Columbia County Board of Elections, Columbia County Board of Registrars, Ann Cushman, Wanda Duffie, Nancy L. Gay, Larry Wiggins (Cathey, Thomas)
April 26, 2021 Filing 65 NOTICE of Appearance by Gregory C. Sowell on behalf of Willa Jean Fambrough, Hunaid Qadir, Ann Till, Rocky Raffel, Adam Shirley, Charlotte Sosebee. (Sowell, Gregory) Modified on 4/26/2021 to edit entry (ddm).
April 26, 2021 Opinion or Order ORDER granting #57 #58 Applications for Admission Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Judge J. P. Boulee on 4/26/21. If the applicant does not have CM/ECF access in the Northern District of Georgia already, they must request access at http://pacer.gov. If they have electronically filed in this district in a previous case, please omit this step.(bnw)
April 26, 2021 Filing 64 NOTICE of Appearance by Melanie Felicia Wilson on behalf of George Awuku, Stephen W. Day, Gwinnett County Board of Registrations and Elections, Lynn Ledford, John Mangano, Santiago Marquez, Alice O'Lenick, Wandy Taylor (Wilson, Melanie)
April 26, 2021 Filing 63 NOTICE of Appearance by Kaye Woodard Burwell on behalf of Fulton County Registration and Elections Board (Burwell, Kaye)
April 26, 2021 Filing 62 NOTICE of Appearance by David R. Lowman on behalf of Fulton County Registration and Elections Board (Lowman, David)
April 26, 2021 APPROVAL by Clerks Office re: #58 APPLICATION for Admission of Susan Mizner Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-10921503). Attorney Susan Mizner added appearing on behalf of Delta Sigma Theta Sorority, Inc., Sixth District of the African Methodist Episcopal Church (cdg)
April 26, 2021 Filing 61 NOTICE of Appearance by Cheryl Ringer on behalf of Fulton County Registration and Elections Board (Ringer, Cheryl)
April 26, 2021 Filing 60 NOTICE of Appearance by Ralph Jonathan Hart on behalf of Chatham County Board of Elections (Hart, Ralph)
April 26, 2021 APPROVAL by Clerks Office re: #57 APPLICATION for Admission of Ihaab Syed Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-10920459). Attorney Ihaab Syed added appearing on behalf of Delta Sigma Theta Sorority, Inc., Sixth District of the African Methodist Episcopal Church (cdg)
April 23, 2021 Filing 59 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint,, on behalf of all County Defendants by Fred Aiken, Jessica M. Brooks, Cobb County Board of Elections and Registration, Phil Daniell, Janine Eveler, Pat Gartland, Daryl O. Wilson, Jr. (White, Daniel)
April 22, 2021 Opinion or Order ORDER granting #52 #53 Applications for Admission Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Judge J. P. Boulee on 4/22/21. If the applicant does not have CM/ECF access in the Northern District of Georgia already, they must request access at http://pacer.gov. If they have electronically filed in this district in a previous case, please omit this step.(bnw)
April 22, 2021 APPROVAL by Clerks Office re: #53 APPLICATION for Admission of Cameron Thomas Norris Pro Hac Vice.. Attorney Tyler R. Green added appearing on behalf of Georgia Republican Party, Inc., National Republican Congressional Committee, National Republican Senatorial Committee, Republican National Committee (nmb)
April 22, 2021 APPROVAL by Clerks Office re: #52 APPLICATION for Admission of Tyler R. Green Pro Hac Vice.. Attorney Tyler R. Green added appearing on behalf of Georgia Republican Party, Inc., National Republican Congressional Committee, National Republican Senatorial Committee, Republican National Committee (nmb)
April 22, 2021 Filing 58 APPLICATION for Admission of Susan Mizner Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-10921503).by Delta Sigma Theta Sorority, Inc., Sixth District of the African Methodist Episcopal Church. (Garabadu, Rahul) Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse.
April 22, 2021 Filing 57 APPLICATION for Admission of Ihaab Syed Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-10920459).by Delta Sigma Theta Sorority, Inc., Sixth District of the African Methodist Episcopal Church. (Garabadu, Rahul) Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse.
April 21, 2021 Filing 56 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint,, by Ken Cochran, Hall County Board of Elections and Registration, David Kennedy, Craig Lutz, Gala Sheats, Tom Smiley, Lori Wurtz. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Wilborn, Eric)
April 21, 2021 Filing 55 NOTICE of Appearance by Eric P. Wilborn on behalf of Ken Cochran, Hall County Board of Elections and Registration, David Kennedy, Craig Lutz, Gala Sheats, Tom Smiley, Lori Wurtz (Wilborn, Eric)
April 21, 2021 Filing 54 NOTICE of Appearance byM. Van Stephens, II on behalf of Ken Cochran, Hall County Board of Elections and Registration, David Kennedy, Craig Lutz, Gala Sheats, Tom Smiley, Lori Wurtz (Wilborn, Eric) Modified on 4/22/2021 to edit text (rlb).
April 21, 2021 RETURN of #43 APPLICATION for Admission of Cameron Thomas Norris Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-10903454). to attorney for correction. Incorrect local counsel bar number. (nmb)
April 21, 2021 RETURN of #42 APPLICATION for Admission of Tyler R. Green Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-10903436). to attorney for correction. Incorrect local counsel bar number. (nmb)
April 20, 2021 Filing 53 APPLICATION for Admission of Cameron Thomas Norris Pro Hac Vice.by Georgia Republican Party, Inc., National Republican Congressional Committee, National Republican Senatorial Committee, Republican National Committee. (Carver, William) Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse.
April 20, 2021 Filing 52 APPLICATION for Admission of Tyler R. Green Pro Hac Vice.by Georgia Republican Party, Inc., National Republican Congressional Committee, National Republican Senatorial Committee, Republican National Committee. (Carver, William) Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse.
April 16, 2021 Opinion or Order ORDER granting #45 #46 #47 #48 #49 #50 #51 Applications for Admission Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Judge J. P. Boulee on 4/16/21. If the applicant does not have CM/ECF access in the Northern District of Georgia already, they must request access at http://pacer.gov. If they have electronically filed in this district in a previous case, please omit this step.(bnw)
April 16, 2021 APPROVAL by Clerks Office re: #49 AMENDED APPLICATION for Admission of Stephanie Lin Pro Hac Vice. Attorney Stephanie Lin added appearing on behalf of Delta Sigma Theta Sorority, Inc., Kathleen D. Ruth, Sixth District of the African Methodist Episcopal Church (cdg)
April 16, 2021 APPROVAL by Clerks Office re: #48 AMENDED APPLICATION for Admission of Nana Wilberforce Pro Hac Vice. Attorney Nana Wilberforce added appearing on behalf of Delta Sigma Theta Sorority, Inc., Sixth District of the African Methodist Episcopal Church and Delta Sigma Theta Sorority, Inc., (cdg) Modified on 4/16/2021 to add party (cdg).
April 16, 2021 APPROVAL by Clerks Office re: #50 AMENDED APPLICATION for Admission of Tania Faransso Pro Hac Vice. Attorney Tania Christine Faransso added appearing on behalf of Sixth District of the African Methodist Episcopal Church and Delta Sigma Theta Sorority, Inc., (cdg) Modified on 4/16/2021 to add party(cdg).
April 16, 2021 DOCKETED IN ERROR * APPROVAL by Clerks Office re: #27 AMENDED APPLICATION for Admission of Sophia Lin Lakin Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-10875790). Attorney Stephanie Lin added appearing on behalf of Sixth District of the African Methodist Episcopal Church and Delta Sigma Theta Sorority, Inc., (cdg) Modified on 4/16/2021 add docket text of error (cdg).
April 16, 2021 APPROVAL by Clerks Office re: #47 AMENDED APPLICATION for Admission of Ilya Feldsherov Pro Hac Vice. Attorney Ilya Feldsherov added appearing on behalf of Sixth District of the African Methodist Episcopal Church and Delta Sigma Theta Sorority, Inc., (cdg) Modified on 4/16/2021 to add party(cdg).
April 16, 2021 APPROVAL by Clerks Office re: #46 AMENDED APPLICATION for Admission of George P. Varghese Pro Hac Vice. Attorney George P. Varghese added appearing on behalf of Sixth District of the African Methodist Episcopal Church and Delta Sigma Theta Sorority, Inc., (cdg) Modified on 4/16/2021 to add party (cdg).
April 16, 2021 APPROVAL by Clerks Office re: #45 AMENDED APPLICATION for Admission of Debo P. Adegbile Pro Hac Vice., Attorney Debo P. Adegbile added appearing on behalf of Sixth District of the African Methodist and Delta Sigma Theta Sorority, Inc.,Episcopal Church (cdg) Modified on 4/16/2021 to add party(cdg).
April 16, 2021 APPROVAL by Clerks Office re: #51 AMENDED APPLICATION for Admission of Webb Lyons Pro Hac Vice. Attorney Webb Lyons added appearing on behalf of Sixth District of the African Methodist Episcopal Church and Delta Sigma Theta Sorority, Inc., (cdg) Modified on 4/16/2021 to add party(cdg).
April 16, 2021 Filing 51 APPLICATION for Admission of Webb Lyons Pro Hac Vice.by Delta Sigma Theta Sorority, Inc., Sixth District of the African Methodist Episcopal Church. (Garabadu, Rahul) Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse.
April 16, 2021 Filing 50 APPLICATION for Admission of Tania Faransso Pro Hac Vice.by Delta Sigma Theta Sorority, Inc., Sixth District of the African Methodist Episcopal Church. (Garabadu, Rahul) Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse.
April 16, 2021 Filing 49 APPLICATION for Admission of Stephanie Lin Pro Hac Vice.by Delta Sigma Theta Sorority, Inc., Sixth District of the African Methodist Episcopal Church. (Garabadu, Rahul) Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse.
April 16, 2021 Filing 48 APPLICATION for Admission of Nana Wilberforce Pro Hac Vice.by Delta Sigma Theta Sorority, Inc., Sixth District of the African Methodist Episcopal Church. (Garabadu, Rahul) Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse.
April 16, 2021 Filing 47 APPLICATION for Admission of Ilya Feldsherov Pro Hac Vice.by Delta Sigma Theta Sorority, Inc., Sixth District of the African Methodist Episcopal Church. (Garabadu, Rahul) Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse.
April 16, 2021 Filing 46 APPLICATION for Admission of George P. Varghese Pro Hac Vice.by Delta Sigma Theta Sorority, Inc., Sixth District of the African Methodist Episcopal Church. (Garabadu, Rahul) Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse.
April 16, 2021 Filing 45 APPLICATION for Admission of Debo P. Adegbile Pro Hac Vice.by Delta Sigma Theta Sorority, Inc., Sixth District of the African Methodist Episcopal Church. (Garabadu, Rahul) Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse.
April 16, 2021 Filing 44 NOTICE of Appearance by Bennett Davis Bryan on behalf of DeKalb County Board of Registrations and Elections, Anthony Lewis, Susan Motter, Dele Lowman Smith, Samuel Tillman, Baoky N. Vu (Bryan, Bennett) Modified on 4/16/2021 to edit filers (ddm).
April 15, 2021 Filing 43 APPLICATION for Admission of Cameron Thomas Norris Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-10903454).by Georgia Republican Party, Inc., National Republican Congressional Committee, National Republican Senatorial Committee, Republican National Committee. (Carver, William) Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse.
April 15, 2021 Filing 42 APPLICATION for Admission of Tyler R. Green Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-10903436).by Georgia Republican Party, Inc., National Republican Congressional Committee, National Republican Senatorial Committee, Republican National Committee. (Carver, William) Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse.
April 15, 2021 Opinion or Order ORDER granting #36 Motion to Rename Local Counsel. The Court defers to the Clerk's Office for further direction. Signed by Judge J. P. Boulee on 4/15/21. (bnw)
April 14, 2021 Filing 41 NOTICE of Appearance by Daniel Walter White on behalf of Fred Aiken, Jessica M. Brooks, Cobb County Board of Elections and Registration, Phil Daniell, Janine Eveler, Pat Gartland, Daryl O. Wilson, Jr (White, Daniel)
April 14, 2021 Filing 40 NOTICE of Appearance by Irene B. Vander Els on behalf of DeKalb County Board of Registrations and Elections, Anthony Lewis, Susan Motter, Dele L. Smith, Samuel E. Tillman, Baoky N. Vu (Vander Els, Irene)
April 13, 2021 Opinion or Order ORDER granting #35 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. HEREBY ORDERED that: (1) Attorneys Nancy G. Abudu and Pichaya Poy Winichakul (collectively, SPLC), as well as Attorneys Adam S. Sieff, David M. Gossett, Courtney T. DeThomas, Kate Kennedy, Matthew Jedreski, and Grace Thompson (collectively, Davis Wright Tremaine LLP) are no longer counsel for the Sixth District of the African Methodist Episcopal Church and Delta Sigma Theta Sorority, Inc. (2) Attorneys Sean J. Young and Rahul Garabadu (collectively, ACLU of Georgia); Attorneys Sophia Lin Lakin, Theresa J. Lee, and Dale E. Ho (collectively, ACLU); Attorneys Leah C. Aden and John S. Cusick (collectively, LDF); and Attorneys Debo P. Adegbile, Ilya Feldsherov, George P. Varghese, Stephanie Lin, Tania Faransso, Webb Lyons, and Nana Wilberforce (collectively, Wilmer Cutler Pickering Hale and Dorr LLP) are no longer counsel for the Georgia Muslim Voter Project, Women Watch Afrika, and the Latino Community Fund of Georgia. Signed by Judge J. P. Boulee on 4/13/21. (bnw)
April 13, 2021 Filing 39 Notice for Leave of Absence for the following date(s): 5/24/21, 5/25/21, 5/26/21, 5/27/21, 5/28/21, 7/22/21, 7/23/21, 9/27/21, 9/28/21, 9/29/21, 9/30/21, 10/1/21, by Bryan P. Tyson. (Tyson, Bryan)
April 12, 2021 Filing 38 MOTION to Intervene with Brief In Support by Republican National Committee, National Republican Senatorial Committee, National Republican Congressional Committee, Georgia Republican Party, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support of Motion to Intervene, #2 Proposed Answer)(Carver, William)
April 12, 2021 Filing 37 NOTICE of Appearance by William H. Noland on behalf of Bibb County Board of Elections, Bibb County Board of Registrars, Henry Ficklin, Mike Kaplan, Cassandra Powell, Veronica Seals, Herbert Spangler, Jeanetta R. Watson, Rinda Wilson (Noland, William)
April 9, 2021 Opinion or Order ORDER:For good cause shown, the Court GRANTS the parties' #34 Consent Motion to Extend the Time for State Defendants to Respond to Plaintiffs' Complaint. The State Defendants' response to Plaintiffs' Complaint is due by May 10, 2021. Signed by Judge J. P. Boulee on 4/9/21. (bnw)
April 9, 2021 Filing 36 MOTION to Rename Local Counsel by Delta Sigma Theta Sorority, Inc., Sixth District of the African Methodist Episcopal Church. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex.A - Amended PHV Applications, #2 Exhibit Text of Proposed Order)(Garabadu, Rahul)
April 9, 2021 Filing 35 MOTION to Withdraw Rahul Garabadu as Attorneyby Delta Sigma Theta Sorority, Inc., Sixth District of the African Methodist Episcopal Church. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Text of Proposed Order)(Garabadu, Rahul)
April 9, 2021 APPROVAL by Clerks Office re: #30 APPLICATION for Admission of Dale E. Ho Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-10881011).. Attorney Dale E. Ho added appearing on behalf of Delta Sigma Theta Sorority, Inc., Georgia Muslim Voter Project, Latino Community Fund of Georgia, Sixth District of the African Methodist Episcopal Church, Women Watch Afrika (nmb)
April 9, 2021 APPROVAL by Clerks Office re: #30 APPLICATION for Admission of Dale E. Ho Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-10881011). Attorney Dale E. Ho added appearing on behalf of Delta Sigma Theta Sorority, Inc., Sixth District of the African Methodist Episcopal Church (cdg)
April 8, 2021 APPROVAL by Clerks Office re: #27 APPLICATION for Admission of Sophia Lin Lakin Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-10875790).. Attorney Sophia Lin Lakin added appearing on behalf of Delta Sigma Theta Sorority, Inc., Georgia Muslim Voter Project, Latino Community Fund of Georgia, Sixth District of the African Methodist Episcopal Church, Women Watch Afrika (nmb)
April 7, 2021 Filing 34 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint,, by Brian Kemp, Anh Le, Matthew Mashburn, Brad Raffensperger, Rebecca Sullivan, David Worley. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Tyson, Bryan)
April 7, 2021 Filing 33 NOTICE of Appearance by Loree Anne Paradise on behalf of Brian Kemp, Anh Le, Matthew Mashburn, Brad Raffensperger, Rebecca Sullivan, David Worley (Paradise, Loree Anne)
April 7, 2021 Filing 32 NOTICE of Appearance by Bryan Francis Jacoutot on behalf of Brian Kemp, Anh Le, Matthew Mashburn, Brad Raffensperger, Rebecca Sullivan, David Worley (Jacoutot, Bryan)
April 7, 2021 Filing 31 NOTICE of Appearance by Bryan P. Tyson on behalf of Brian Kemp, Anh Le, Matthew Mashburn, Brad Raffensperger, Rebecca Sullivan, David Worley (Tyson, Bryan)
April 7, 2021 Opinion or Order ORDER granting #26 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Judge J. P. Boulee on 4/7/21. If the applicant does not have CM/ECF access in the Northern District of Georgia already, they must request access at http://pacer.gov. If they have electronically filed in this district in a previous case, please omit this step.(bnw)
April 7, 2021 APPROVAL by Clerks Office re: #26 APPLICATION for Admission of Theresa J. Lee Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-10875743).. Attorney Theresa J. Lee added appearing on behalf of Delta Sigma Theta Sorority, Inc., Georgia Muslim Voter Project, Latino Community Fund of Georgia, Sixth District of the African Methodist Episcopal Church, Women Watch Afrika (nmb)
April 6, 2021 Opinion or Order ORDER granting #15 #20 #22 #23 Applications for Admission Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Judge J. P. Boulee on 4/6/21. If the applicant does not have CM/ECF access in the Northern District of Georgia already, they must request access at http://pacer.gov. If they have electronically filed in this district in a previous case, please omit this step.(bnw)
April 6, 2021 RETURN of #16 APPLICATION for Admission of Nana Wilberforce Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-10869607). to attorney for correction regarding courts. (nmb)
April 6, 2021 APPROVAL by Clerks Office re: #20 APPLICATION for Admission of Grace Thompson Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-10869622).. Attorney Grace Thompson added appearing on behalf of Delta Sigma Theta Sorority, Inc., Georgia Muslim Voter Project, Latino Community Fund of Georgia, Sixth District of the African Methodist Episcopal Church, Women Watch Afrika (nmb)
April 6, 2021 APPROVAL by Clerks Office re: #15 APPLICATION for Admission of Kate Kennedy Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-10869602).. Attorney Kate Kennedy added appearing on behalf of Delta Sigma Theta Sorority, Inc., Georgia Muslim Voter Project, Latino Community Fund of Georgia, Sixth District of the African Methodist Episcopal Church, Women Watch Afrika (nmb)
April 6, 2021 APPROVAL by Clerks Office re: #23 APPLICATION for Admission of Matt Jedreski Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-10871299).. Attorney Matt Jedreski added appearing on behalf of Delta Sigma Theta Sorority, Inc., Georgia Muslim Voter Project, Latino Community Fund of Georgia, Sixth District of the African Methodist Episcopal Church, Women Watch Afrika (nmb)
April 6, 2021 APPROVAL by Clerks Office re: #22 APPLICATION for Admission of Courtney Turco DeThomas Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-10871261).. Attorney Courtney Turco DeThomas added appearing on behalf of Delta Sigma Theta Sorority, Inc., Georgia Muslim Voter Project, Latino Community Fund of Georgia, Sixth District of the African Methodist Episcopal Church, Women Watch Afrika (nmb)
April 6, 2021 Filing 30 APPLICATION for Admission of Dale E. Ho Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-10881011).by Delta Sigma Theta Sorority, Inc., Sixth District of the African Methodist Episcopal Church. (Garabadu, Rahul) Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse.
April 6, 2021 APPROVAL by Clerks Office re: #19 APPLICATION for Admission of Webb Lyons Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-10869615).. Attorney Webb Lyons added appearing on behalf of Delta Sigma Theta Sorority, Inc., Georgia Muslim Voter Project, Latino Community Fund of Georgia, Sixth District of the African Methodist Episcopal Church, Women Watch Afrika (nmb)
April 6, 2021 Opinion or Order ORDER granting #13 #14 #17 #18 Applications for Admission Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Judge J. P. Boulee on 4/6/21. If the applicant does not have CM/ECF access in the Northern District of Georgia already, they must request access at http://pacer.gov. If they have electronically filed in this district in a previous case, please omit this step.(bnw)
April 6, 2021 APPROVAL by Clerks Office re: #18 APPLICATION for Admission of Tania Faransso Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-10869613).. Attorney Tania Christine Faransso added appearing on behalf of Delta Sigma Theta Sorority, Inc., Georgia Muslim Voter Project, Latino Community Fund of Georgia, Sixth District of the African Methodist Episcopal Church, Women Watch Afrika (nmb)
April 6, 2021 APPROVAL by Clerks Office re: #17 APPLICATION for Admission of Stephanie Lin Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-10869610).. Attorney Stephanie Lin added appearing on behalf of Delta Sigma Theta Sorority, Inc., Georgia Muslim Voter Project, Latino Community Fund of Georgia, Sixth District of the African Methodist Episcopal Church, Women Watch Afrika (nmb)
April 6, 2021 APPROVAL by Clerks Office re: #14 APPLICATION for Admission of Ilya Feldsherov Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-10869600).. Attorney Ilya Feldsherov added appearing on behalf of Delta Sigma Theta Sorority, Inc., Georgia Muslim Voter Project, Latino Community Fund of Georgia, Sixth District of the African Methodist Episcopal Church, Women Watch Afrika (nmb)
April 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 29 STANDING ORDER REGARDING CIVIL LITIGATION. Signed by Judge J. P. Boulee on 4/5/21. (bnw)
April 5, 2021 APPROVAL by Clerks Office re: #13 APPLICATION for Admission of David Morris Gossett Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-10869596).. Attorney David Morris Gossett added appearing on behalf of Delta Sigma Theta Sorority, Inc., Georgia Muslim Voter Project, Latino Community Fund of Georgia, Sixth District of the African Methodist Episcopal Church, Women Watch Afrika (nmb)
April 5, 2021 Opinion or Order ORDER granting #8 #9 #10 #11 #12 Applications for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Admission Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Judge J. P. Boulee on 4/5/21. If the applicant does not have CM/ECF access in the Northern District of Georgia already, they must request access at http://pacer.gov. If they have electronically filed in this district in a previous case, please omit this step.(bnw)
April 5, 2021 APPROVAL by Clerks Office re: #12 APPLICATION for Admission of George P. Varghese Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-10869594).. Attorney George P. Varghese added appearing on behalf of Delta Sigma Theta Sorority, Inc., Georgia Muslim Voter Project, Latino Community Fund of Georgia, Sixth District of the African Methodist Episcopal Church, Women Watch Afrika (nmb)
April 5, 2021 APPROVAL by Clerks Office re: #11 APPLICATION for Admission of John Cusick Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-10869593).. Attorney John Cusick added appearing on behalf of Delta Sigma Theta Sorority, Inc., Georgia Muslim Voter Project, Latino Community Fund of Georgia, Sixth District of the African Methodist Episcopal Church, Women Watch Afrika (nmb)
April 5, 2021 APPROVAL by Clerks Office re: #10 APPLICATION for Admission of Leah Aden Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-10869591).. Attorney Leah C. Aden added appearing on behalf of Delta Sigma Theta Sorority, Inc., Georgia Muslim Voter Project, Latino Community Fund of Georgia, Sixth District of the African Methodist Episcopal Church, Women Watch Afrika (nmb)
April 5, 2021 APPROVAL by Clerks Office re: #9 APPLICATION for Admission of Debo P. Adegbile Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-10869588).. Attorney Debo P. Adegbile added appearing on behalf of Delta Sigma Theta Sorority, Inc., Georgia Muslim Voter Project, Latino Community Fund of Georgia, Sixth District of the African Methodist Episcopal Church, Women Watch Afrika (nmb)
April 5, 2021 APPROVAL by Clerks Office re: #8 APPLICATION for Admission of Adam S. Sieff Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-10869581).. Attorney Adam Sieff added appearing on behalf of Delta Sigma Theta Sorority, Inc., Georgia Muslim Voter Project, Latino Community Fund of Georgia, Sixth District of the African Methodist Episcopal Church, Women Watch Afrika (nmb)
April 5, 2021 Filing 28 NOTICE of Appearance by Sean Young on behalf of Delta Sigma Theta Sorority, Inc., Sixth District of the African Methodist Episcopal Church (Young, Sean)
April 2, 2021 Filing 27 APPLICATION for Admission of Sophia Lin Lakin Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-10875790).by Delta Sigma Theta Sorority, Inc., Sixth District of the African Methodist Episcopal Church. (Garabadu, Rahul) Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse.
April 2, 2021 Filing 26 APPLICATION for Admission of Theresa J. Lee Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-10875743).by Delta Sigma Theta Sorority, Inc., Sixth District of the African Methodist Episcopal Church. (Garabadu, Rahul) Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse.
April 1, 2021 Filing 25 NOTICE of Appearance by Rahul Garabadu on behalf of Delta Sigma Theta Sorority, Inc., Sixth District of the African Methodist Episcopal Church (Garabadu, Rahul)
April 1, 2021 Filing 24 Electronic Summons Issued as to Wanda Andrews, Bibb County Board of Elections, Bibb County Board of Registrars, Chatham County Board of Elections, Chatham County Board of Registrars, Clarke County Board of Election and Voter Registration, Clayton County Board of Elections and Registration, Cobb County Board of Elections and Registration, Columbia County Board of Elections, Columbia County Board of Registrars, Ann Cushman, DeKalb County Board of Registrations and Elections, Wanda Duffie, Willa Jean Fambrough, Nancy L. Gay, Hall County Board of Elections and Registration, Marianne Heimes, Malinda Hodge, Antan Lang, Thomas J. Mahoney, Colin Mcrae, William L. Norse, Jon Pannell, Hunaid Qadir, Rocky Raffle, Richmond County Board of Elections, Veronica Seals, Adam Shirley, Randolph Slay, Charlotte Sosebee, Ann Till, Larry Wiggins. (ddm)
April 1, 2021 Filing 23 APPLICATION for Admission of Matt Jedreski Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-10871299).by Sixth District of the African Methodist Episcopal Church. (Abudu, Nancy) Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse.
April 1, 2021 Filing 22 APPLICATION for Admission of Courtney Turco DeThomas Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-10871261).by Sixth District of the African Methodist Episcopal Church. (Abudu, Nancy) Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse.
March 31, 2021 Filing 21 PROPOSED SUMMONS filed by Delta Sigma Theta Sorority, Inc., Georgia Muslim Voter Project, Latino Community Fund of Georgia, Sixth District of the African Methodist Episcopal Church, Women Watch Afrika (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons, #5 Summons, #6 Summons, #7 Summons, #8 Summons, #9 Summons, #10 Summons, #11 Summons, #12 Summons, #13 Summons, #14 Summons, #15 Summons, #16 Summons, #17 Summons, #18 Summons, #19 Summons, #20 Summons, #21 Summons, #22 Summons, #23 Summons, #24 Summons, #25 Summons, #26 Summons, #27 Summons, #28 Summons, #29 Summons, #30 Summons, #31 Summons)(Winichakul, Pichaya)
March 31, 2021 Filing 20 APPLICATION for Admission of Grace Thompson Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-10869622).by Sixth District of the African Methodist Episcopal Church. (Winichakul, Pichaya) Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse.
March 31, 2021 Filing 19 APPLICATION for Admission of Webb Lyons Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-10869615).by Sixth District of the African Methodist Episcopal Church. (Abudu, Nancy) Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse.
March 31, 2021 Filing 18 APPLICATION for Admission of Tania Faransso Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-10869613).by Sixth District of the African Methodist Episcopal Church. (Abudu, Nancy) Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse.
March 31, 2021 Filing 17 APPLICATION for Admission of Stephanie Lin Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-10869610).by Sixth District of the African Methodist Episcopal Church. (Abudu, Nancy) Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse.
March 31, 2021 Filing 16 APPLICATION for Admission of Nana Wilberforce Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-10869607).by Sixth District of the African Methodist Episcopal Church. (Abudu, Nancy) Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse.
March 31, 2021 Filing 15 APPLICATION for Admission of Kate Kennedy Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-10869602).by Sixth District of the African Methodist Episcopal Church. (Abudu, Nancy) Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse.
March 31, 2021 Filing 14 APPLICATION for Admission of Ilya Feldsherov Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-10869600).by Sixth District of the African Methodist Episcopal Church. (Abudu, Nancy) Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse.
March 31, 2021 Filing 13 APPLICATION for Admission of David Morris Gossett Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-10869596).by Sixth District of the African Methodist Episcopal Church. (Abudu, Nancy) Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse.
March 31, 2021 Filing 12 APPLICATION for Admission of George P. Varghese Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-10869594).by Sixth District of the African Methodist Episcopal Church. (Abudu, Nancy) Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse.
March 31, 2021 Filing 11 APPLICATION for Admission of John Cusick Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-10869593).by Sixth District of the African Methodist Episcopal Church. (Abudu, Nancy) Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse.
March 31, 2021 Filing 10 APPLICATION for Admission of Leah Aden Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-10869591).by Sixth District of the African Methodist Episcopal Church. (Abudu, Nancy) Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse.
March 31, 2021 Filing 9 APPLICATION for Admission of Debo P. Adegbile Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-10869588).by Sixth District of the African Methodist Episcopal Church. (Abudu, Nancy) Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse.
March 31, 2021 Filing 8 APPLICATION for Admission of Adam S. Sieff Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-10869581).by Sixth District of the African Methodist Episcopal Church. (Abudu, Nancy) Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse.
March 31, 2021 Filing 7 Electronic Summons Issued as to Fred Aiken, George Awuku, Lynn Bailey, Sherry T. Barnes, Richard L. Barron, Jessica M. Brooks, Marcia Brown, Ken Cochran, Phil Daniell, Stephen W. Day, DeKalb County Board of Registrations and Elections, Terence Dicks, Shauna Dozier, Janine Eveler, Henry Ficklin, Bob Finnegan, Fulton County Registration and Elections Board, Pat Gartland, Georgia State Elections Board, Diane Givens, Gwinnett County Board of Registrations and Elections, Dorothy F. Hall, Aaron V. Johnson, Darlene Johnson, Mike Kaplan, Brian Kemp, David Kennedy, Anh Le, Lynn Ledford, Anthony Lewis, Craig Lutz, John Mangano, Santiago Marquez, Matthew Mashburn, Tim McFalls, Susan Motter, Vernetta K. Nuriddin, Alice O'Lenick, Cassandra Powell, Patricia Pullar, Brad Raffensperger, Kathleen D. Ruth, Gala Sheats, Tom Smiley, Dele L. Smith, Herbert Spangler, Rebecca Sullivan, Wandy Taylor, Samuel E. Tillman, Baoky N. Vu, Alex Wan, Jeanetta R. Watson, Carol Wesley, Daryl O. Wilson, Jr., Rinda Wilson, Mark Wingate, David Worley, Lori Wurtz. (ddm)
March 31, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge J. P. Boulee for all further proceedings. Judge Eleanor L. Ross no longer assigned to case. NOTICE TO ALL COUNSEL OF RECORD: The Judge designation in the civil action number assigned to this case has been changed to 1:21-cv-1284-JPB. Please make note of this change in order to facilitate the docketing of pleadings in this case. Signed by Judge Eleanor L. Ross on 3/31/2021. (ddm)
March 30, 2021 Filing 5 PROPOSED SUMMONS filed by Delta Sigma Theta Sorority, Inc., Georgia Muslim Voter Project, Latino Community Fund of Georgia, Sixth District of the African Methodist Episcopal Church, Women Watch Afrika (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons, #5 Summons, #6 Summons, #7 Summons, #8 Summons, #9 Summons, #10 Summons, #11 Summons, #12 Summons, #13 Summons, #14 Summons, #15 Summons, #16 Summons, #17 Summons, #18 Summons, #19 Summons, #20 Summons, #21 Summons, #22 Summons, #23 Summons, #24 Summons, #25 Summons, #26 Summons, #27 Summons, #28 Summons, #29 Summons, #30 Summons, #31 Summons, #32 Summons, #33 Summons, #34 Summons, #35 Summons, #36 Summons, #37 Summons, #38 Summons, #39 Summons, #40 Summons, #41 Summons, #42 Summons, #43 Summons, #44 Summons, #45 Summons, #46 Summons, #47 Summons, #48 Summons, #49 Summons, #50 Summons, #51 Summons, #52 Summons, #53 Summons, #54 Summons, #55 Summons, #56 Summons, #57 Summons)(Winichakul, Pichaya)
March 30, 2021 Filing 4 Certificate of Interested Persons by Delta Sigma Theta Sorority, Inc., Georgia Muslim Voter Project, Latino Community Fund of Georgia, Sixth District of the African Methodist Episcopal Church, Women Watch Afrika. (Winichakul, Pichaya)
March 30, 2021 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Pichaya Poy Winichakul on behalf of Delta Sigma Theta Sorority, Inc., Georgia Muslim Voter Project, Latino Community Fund of Georgia, Sixth District of the African Methodist Episcopal Church, Women Watch Afrika (Winichakul, Pichaya)
March 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ELEVENTH AMENDMENT TO GENERAL ORDER 20-01 RE: COURT OPERATIONS UNDER THE EXIGENT CIRCUMSTANCES CREATED BY COVID-19 AND RELATED CORONAVIRUS. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 03/09/2021.(rvb)
March 29, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Delta Sigma Theta Sorority, Inc., Latino Community Fund of Georgia, Women Watch Afrika, Sixth District of the African Methodist Episcopal Church, Georgia Muslim Voter Project, (Filing fee $402, receipt number AGANDC-10862575) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(rvb) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sixth District of the African Methodist Episcopal Church et al v. Kemp et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wandy Taylor
Represented By: Melanie Felicia Wilson
Represented By: Tuwanda Rush Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tim McFalls
Represented By: Rachel Nicole Mack
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rocky Raffle
Represented By: Gregory C. Sowell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bibb County Board of Elections
Represented By: William H. Noland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Mangano
Represented By: Melanie Felicia Wilson
Represented By: Tuwanda Rush Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ann Cushman
Represented By: Thomas L. Cathey
Represented By: Jordan Bell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Samuel E. Tillman
Represented By: Bennett Davis Bryan
Represented By: Irene B. Vander Els
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Santiago Marquez
Represented By: Melanie Felicia Wilson
Represented By: Tuwanda Rush Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Susan Motter
Represented By: Bennett Davis Bryan
Represented By: Irene B. Vander Els
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Colin Mcrae
Represented By: Ralph Jonathan Hart
Represented By: Jennifer R. Davenport
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hunaid Qadir
Represented By: Gregory C. Sowell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Darlene Johnson
Represented By: Arash A. Sabzevari
Represented By: Jack Reynolds Hancock
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Henry Ficklin
Represented By: William H. Noland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Clarke County Board of Election and Voter Registration
Represented By: Gregory C. Sowell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brian Kemp
Represented By: H. Christopher Bartolomucci
Represented By: Bryan Francis Jacoutot
Represented By: Bryan P. Tyson
Represented By: Charlene S McGowan
Represented By: Loree Anne Paradise
Represented By: Erik Scott Jaffe
Represented By: Gene C. Schaerr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alice O'Lenick
Represented By: Melanie Felicia Wilson
Represented By: Tuwanda Rush Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gala Sheats
Represented By: Michael Van Stephens, II
Represented By: Eric P. Wilborn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marianne Heimes
Represented By: Ralph Jonathan Hart
Represented By: Jennifer R. Davenport
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fulton County Registration and Elections Board
Represented By: David R. Lowman
Represented By: Cheryl Ringer
Represented By: Kaye Woodard Burwell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Charlotte Sosebee
Represented By: Gregory C. Sowell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richard L. Barron
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jon Pannell
Represented By: Ralph Jonathan Hart
Represented By: Jennifer R. Davenport
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bibb County Board of Registrars
Represented By: William H. Noland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tom Smiley
Represented By: Michael Van Stephens, II
Represented By: Eric P. Wilborn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nancy L. Gay
Represented By: Thomas L. Cathey
Represented By: Jordan Bell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sherry T. Barnes
Represented By: Rachel Nicole Mack
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Phil Daniell
Represented By: Daniel Walter White
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ken Cochran
Represented By: Michael Van Stephens, II
Represented By: Eric P. Wilborn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lynn Ledford
Represented By: Melanie Felicia Wilson
Represented By: Tuwanda Rush Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Willa Jean Fambrough
Represented By: Gregory C. Sowell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rinda Wilson
Represented By: William H. Noland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Columbia County Board of Registrars
Represented By: Thomas L. Cathey
Represented By: Jordan Bell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bob Finnegan
Represented By: Rachel Nicole Mack
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Malinda Hodge
Represented By: Ralph Jonathan Hart
Represented By: Jennifer R. Davenport
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carol Wesley
Represented By: Arash A. Sabzevari
Represented By: Jack Reynolds Hancock
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Veronica Seals
Represented By: William H. Noland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Worley
Represented By: H. Christopher Bartolomucci
Represented By: Bryan Francis Jacoutot
Represented By: Bryan P. Tyson
Represented By: Charlene S McGowan
Represented By: Loree Anne Paradise
Represented By: Erik Scott Jaffe
Represented By: Gene C. Schaerr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Columbia County Board of Elections
Represented By: Thomas L. Cathey
Represented By: Jordan Bell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dele L. Smith
Represented By: Bennett Davis Bryan
Represented By: Irene B. Vander Els
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Janine Eveler
Represented By: Daniel Walter White
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lynn Bailey
Represented By: Rachel Nicole Mack
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kathleen D. Ruth
Represented By: Stephanie Lin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Antan Lang
Represented By: Ralph Jonathan Hart
Represented By: Jennifer R. Davenport
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Randolph Slay
Represented By: Ralph Jonathan Hart
Represented By: Jennifer R. Davenport
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Georgia State Elections Board
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Terence Dicks
Represented By: Rachel Nicole Mack
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Baoky N. Vu
Represented By: Bennett Davis Bryan
Represented By: Irene B. Vander Els
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Aaron V. Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thomas J. Mahoney
Represented By: Ralph Jonathan Hart
Represented By: Jennifer R. Davenport
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Diane Givens
Represented By: Arash A. Sabzevari
Represented By: Jack Reynolds Hancock
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gwinnett County Board of Registrations and Elections
Represented By: Melanie Felicia Wilson
Represented By: Tuwanda Rush Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Vernetta K. Nuriddin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dorothy F. Hall
Represented By: Arash A. Sabzevari
Represented By: Jack Reynolds Hancock
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ann Till
Represented By: Gregory C. Sowell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Daryl O. Wilson, Jr.
Represented By: Daniel Walter White
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: George Awuku
Represented By: Melanie Felicia Wilson
Represented By: Tuwanda Rush Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Kennedy
Represented By: Michael Van Stephens, II
Represented By: Eric P. Wilborn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anh Le
Represented By: H. Christopher Bartolomucci
Represented By: Bryan Francis Jacoutot
Represented By: Bryan P. Tyson
Represented By: Charlene S McGowan
Represented By: Loree Anne Paradise
Represented By: Erik Scott Jaffe
Represented By: Gene C. Schaerr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alex Wan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rebecca Sullivan
Represented By: H. Christopher Bartolomucci
Represented By: Bryan Francis Jacoutot
Represented By: Bryan P. Tyson
Represented By: Charlene S McGowan
Represented By: Loree Anne Paradise
Represented By: Erik Scott Jaffe
Represented By: Gene C. Schaerr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Adam Shirley
Represented By: Gregory C. Sowell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Clayton County Board of Elections and Registration
Represented By: Arash A. Sabzevari
Represented By: Jack Reynolds Hancock
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Herbert Spangler
Represented By: William H. Noland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marcia Brown
Represented By: Rachel Nicole Mack
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Larry Wiggins
Represented By: Thomas L. Cathey
Represented By: Jordan Bell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cobb County Board of Elections and Registration
Represented By: Daniel Walter White
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Patricia Pullar
Represented By: Arash A. Sabzevari
Represented By: Jack Reynolds Hancock
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chatham County Board of Registrars
Represented By: Ralph Jonathan Hart
Represented By: Jennifer R. Davenport
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richmond County Board of Elections
Represented By: Rachel Nicole Mack
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Matthew Mashburn
Represented By: H. Christopher Bartolomucci
Represented By: Bryan Francis Jacoutot
Represented By: Bryan P. Tyson
Represented By: Charlene S McGowan
Represented By: Loree Anne Paradise
Represented By: Erik Scott Jaffe
Represented By: Gene C. Schaerr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DeKalb County Board of Registrations and Elections
Represented By: Irene B. Vander Els
Represented By: Bennett Davis Bryan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anthony Lewis
Represented By: Bennett Davis Bryan
Represented By: Irene B. Vander Els
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chatham County Board of Elections
Represented By: Jennifer R. Davenport
Represented By: Ralph Jonathan Hart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brad Raffensperger
Represented By: H. Christopher Bartolomucci
Represented By: Bryan Francis Jacoutot
Represented By: Bryan P. Tyson
Represented By: Charlene S McGowan
Represented By: Loree Anne Paradise
Represented By: Erik Scott Jaffe
Represented By: Gene C. Schaerr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Craig Lutz
Represented By: Michael Van Stephens, II
Represented By: Eric P. Wilborn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hall County Board of Elections and Registration
Represented By: Michael Van Stephens, II
Represented By: Eric P. Wilborn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shauna Dozier
Represented By: Arash A. Sabzevari
Represented By: Jack Reynolds Hancock
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fred Aiken
Represented By: Daniel Walter White
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lori Wurtz
Represented By: Eric P. Wilborn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cassandra Powell
Represented By: William H. Noland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wanda Duffie
Represented By: Thomas L. Cathey
Represented By: Jordan Bell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wanda Andrews
Represented By: Ralph Jonathan Hart
Represented By: Jennifer R. Davenport
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mike Kaplan
Represented By: William H. Noland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pat Gartland
Represented By: Daniel Walter White
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeanetta R. Watson
Represented By: William H. Noland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jessica M. Brooks
Represented By: Daniel Walter White
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stephen W. Day
Represented By: Melanie Felicia Wilson
Represented By: Tuwanda Rush Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mark Wingate
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William L. Norse
Represented By: Ralph Jonathan Hart
Represented By: Jennifer R. Davenport
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kelvin Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Georgia State Election Board
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Georgia Muslim Voter Project
Represented By: Rahul Garabadu
Represented By: Pichaya Poy Winichakul
Represented By: Nancy Gbana Abudu
Represented By: Sean Young
Represented By: Matthew R. Jedreski
Represented By: Courtney Turco DeThomas
Represented By: Adam Sieff
Represented By: Kate Kennedy
Represented By: Grace Katherine Thompson
Represented By: David Morris Gossett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Latino Community Fund of Georgia
Represented By: Rahul Garabadu
Represented By: Pichaya Poy Winichakul
Represented By: Nancy Gbana Abudu
Represented By: Sean Young
Represented By: Matthew R. Jedreski
Represented By: Courtney Turco DeThomas
Represented By: Adam Sieff
Represented By: Kate Kennedy
Represented By: Grace Katherine Thompson
Represented By: David Morris Gossett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Women Watch Afrika
Represented By: Rahul Garabadu
Represented By: Pichaya Poy Winichakul
Represented By: Nancy Gbana Abudu
Represented By: Sean Young
Represented By: Matthew R. Jedreski
Represented By: Courtney Turco DeThomas
Represented By: Adam Sieff
Represented By: Kate Kennedy
Represented By: Grace Katherine Thompson
Represented By: David Morris Gossett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sixth District of the African Methodist Episcopal Church
Represented By: Rahul Garabadu
Represented By: Pichaya Poy Winichakul
Represented By: Nancy Gbana Abudu
Represented By: Sean Young
Represented By: Leah C. Aden
Represented By: Nana Wilberforce
Represented By: John Spencer Cusick
Represented By: Ihaab Syed
Represented By: Debo P. Adegbile
Represented By: Susan Mizner
Represented By: Stephanie Lin
Represented By: Tania Christine Faransso
Represented By: Ilya Feldsherov
Represented By: George P. Varghese
Represented By: Brian Lawrence Dimmick
Represented By: Webb Lyons
Represented By: Theresa J. Lee
Represented By: Dale E. Ho
Represented By: Sophia Lin Lakin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Delta Sigma Theta Sorority, Inc.
Represented By: Rahul Garabadu
Represented By: Pichaya Poy Winichakul
Represented By: Nancy Gbana Abudu
Represented By: Sean Young
Represented By: Leah C. Aden
Represented By: Nana Wilberforce
Represented By: John Spencer Cusick
Represented By: Ihaab Syed
Represented By: Debo P. Adegbile
Represented By: Susan Mizner
Represented By: Stephanie Lin
Represented By: Tania Christine Faransso
Represented By: Ilya Feldsherov
Represented By: George P. Varghese
Represented By: Brian Lawrence Dimmick
Represented By: Webb Lyons
Represented By: Theresa J. Lee
Represented By: Dale E. Ho
Represented By: Sophia Lin Lakin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Georgia Adapt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Southern Christian Leadership Conference
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: The Arc of the United States
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Georgia Advocacy Office
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor defendant: Republican National Committee
Represented By: William Bradley Carver
Represented By: Cameron T. Norris
Represented By: Tyler R. Green
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor defendant: National Republican Senatorial Committee
Represented By: William Bradley Carver
Represented By: Cameron T. Norris
Represented By: Tyler R. Green
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor defendant: National Republican Congressional Committee
Represented By: William Bradley Carver
Represented By: Cameron T. Norris
Represented By: Tyler R. Green
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor defendant: Georgia Republican Party, Inc.
Represented By: William Bradley Carver
Represented By: Cameron T. Norris
Represented By: Tyler R. Green
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?