Hoover et al v. Strategic Capital Partners, LLC et al
Plaintiff: C. Jackson Hoover, Edward William Spratt, Heather Greiner, Matthew S. Greiner, Samuel Agnew, Sandi Douget and Ronald Hebert
Defendant: Georgia-Alabama Land Trust, Inc., James Freeman, Bridge Capital Associates, Inc., Morris Manning & Martin, LLP, Atlantic Coast Conservancy, Inc., Thomas F. Wingard, Strategic Capital Partners, LLC, Robert D. Keller, Credo Financial Services, LLC, Timothy Pollock, Martin H. Van Sant, Bennett Thrasher, LLC, Ricky B. Novak, Claud Clark, III, John R. Langford, AquaFusion, Inc., Van Sant and Wingard, LLC, Jon R. Langford, CPA, PC, Clark-Davis, PC, Georgia Land Trust, Inc., Oxygen Financial, Inc., Nelson Mullins Riley & Scarborough LLC, Cherry Bekaert LLP F/K/A, Bryan Cave Leighton Paisner LLP, Conexus CPA Group, LLC, Triangle Land Conservancy, Foothills Land Conservancy, Inc.., Private Client Law Group, PC, Aaron Kowan, Jason Cordon, Sean Honeywell, Bryan Cave LLP, Mccalip & Company, Inc., Dantin Financial, LLC, Chris A. Dantin and Frazier & Deeter, L.L.C.
Case Number: 1:2021cv01299
Filed: March 30, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: Steven D Grimberg
Nature of Suit: Racketeer/Corrupt Organization
Cause of Action: 18 U.S.C. ยง 1961
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 8, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 8, 2022 Filing 267 APPLICATION for Admission of Graham Ross Pulvere Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-11576322).by Georgia-Alabama Land Trust, Inc.. (Wise, Kyler) Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse.
February 7, 2022 Filing 266 Request for Leave of Absence for the following date(s): April 4-8, 2022, by John Clay deMoulpied. (deMoulpied, John)
February 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 265 ORDER granting #264 Motion for Extension of Time. Defendants' deadline to file a response to Plaintiffs' Motion to Exclude or Disregard Extrinsic Evidence #263 is extended to 02/28/2022. Signed by Judge Steven D. Grimberg on 02/04/2022. (jkb)
February 3, 2022 Filing 264 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time re: #263 MOTION to Exclude or Disregard Extrinsic Evidence by Defendants by Bryan Cave Leighton Paisner LLP. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Schroeder, Eric)
January 28, 2022 Filing 263 MOTION to Exclude or Disregard Extrinsic Evidence with Brief In Support by Samuel Agnew, Sandi Douget, Heather Greiner, Matthew S. Greiner, Ronald Hebert, C. Jackson Hoover, Edward William Spratt. (Deary, David)
January 28, 2022 Filing 262 RESPONSE in Opposition re #191 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM of Kowan and Private Client Law Group filed by Samuel Agnew, Sandi Douget, Heather Greiner, Matthew S. Greiner, Ronald Hebert, C. Jackson Hoover, Edward William Spratt. (Deary, David)
January 28, 2022 Filing 261 RESPONSE in Opposition re #194 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM of Credo Financial Services filed by Samuel Agnew, Sandi Douget, Heather Greiner, Matthew S. Greiner, Ronald Hebert, C. Jackson Hoover, Edward William Spratt. (Deary, David)
January 28, 2022 Filing 260 RESPONSE in Opposition re #187 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM of Bryan Cave Leighton Paisner filed by Samuel Agnew, Sandi Douget, Heather Greiner, Matthew S. Greiner, Ronald Hebert, C. Jackson Hoover, Edward William Spratt. (Deary, David)
January 28, 2022 Filing 259 RESPONSE re #180 Response in Support of Motion Response to aquaFusion Motion to Dismiss filed by Samuel Agnew, Sandi Douget, Heather Greiner, Matthew S. Greiner, Ronald Hebert, C. Jackson Hoover, Edward William Spratt. (Deary, David)
January 28, 2022 Filing 258 RESPONSE re #184 Response in Support of Motion Response to Morris, Manning & Martin and Pollock's Motion to Dismiss filed by Samuel Agnew, Sandi Douget, Heather Greiner, Matthew S. Greiner, Ronald Hebert, C. Jackson Hoover, Edward William Spratt. (Deary, David)
January 28, 2022 Filing 257 RESPONSE in Opposition re #206 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM Corrected Response to Nelson Mullins Motion to Dismiss filed by Samuel Agnew, Sandi Douget, Heather Greiner, Matthew S. Greiner, Ronald Hebert, C. Jackson Hoover, Edward William Spratt. (Deary, David)
January 28, 2022 Filing 256 NOTICE of Appearance by Rebecca Lunceford Kolb on behalf of Chris A. Dantin, Dantin Financial, LLC (Kolb, Rebecca)
January 27, 2022 Filing 255 RESPONSE in Opposition re #193 MOTION to Dismiss of Van Sant and Wingard filed by Samuel Agnew, Sandi Douget, Heather Greiner, Matthew S. Greiner, Ronald Hebert, C. Jackson Hoover, Edward William Spratt. (Deary, David)
January 27, 2022 Filing 254 RESPONSE in Opposition re #192 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM of Defendant Sean Honeywill filed by Samuel Agnew, Sandi Douget, Heather Greiner, Matthew S. Greiner, Ronald Hebert, C. Jackson Hoover, Edward William Spratt. (Deary, David)
January 27, 2022 Filing 253 RESPONSE re #197 Response in Support of Motion Response to Oxygen Financial Motion to Dismiss filed by Samuel Agnew, Sandi Douget, Heather Greiner, Matthew S. Greiner, Ronald Hebert, C. Jackson Hoover, Edward William Spratt. (Deary, David)
January 27, 2022 Filing 252 RESPONSE re #198 Response in Support of Motion Response to Def. Clark~Davis and Claud Clark III's Motion to Dismiss filed by Samuel Agnew, Sandi Douget, Heather Greiner, Matthew S. Greiner, Ronald Hebert, C. Jackson Hoover, Edward William Spratt. (Deary, David)
January 27, 2022 Filing 251 RESPONSE re #201 Response in Support of Motion Response to Defendant Bridge Capital Associates Motion to Dismiss filed by Samuel Agnew, Sandi Douget, Heather Greiner, Matthew S. Greiner, Ronald Hebert, C. Jackson Hoover, Edward William Spratt. (Deary, David)
January 27, 2022 Filing 250 RESPONSE in Opposition re #206 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM of Nelson Mullins filed by Samuel Agnew, Sandi Douget, Heather Greiner, Matthew S. Greiner, Ronald Hebert, C. Jackson Hoover, Edward William Spratt. (Deary, David)
January 27, 2022 Filing 249 NOTICE by Jon R. Langford, CPA, PC, John R. Langford Notice of Firm Change & Contact Information (Sprinkle, Shannon)
January 27, 2022 Filing 248 RESPONSE in Opposition re #199 MOTION to Dismiss of Georgia-Alabama Land Trust filed by Samuel Agnew, Sandi Douget, Heather Greiner, Matthew S. Greiner, Ronald Hebert, C. Jackson Hoover, Edward William Spratt. (Deary, David)
January 27, 2022 Filing 247 RESPONSE in Opposition re #203 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM of Foothills Land Conservancy filed by Samuel Agnew, Sandi Douget, Heather Greiner, Matthew S. Greiner, Ronald Hebert, C. Jackson Hoover, Edward William Spratt. (Deary, David)
January 27, 2022 Filing 246 RESPONSE in Opposition re #207 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' First Amended Complaint of Atlantic Coast Conservancy and Dr. Robert Keller filed by Samuel Agnew, Sandi Douget, Heather Greiner, Matthew S. Greiner, Ronald Hebert, C. Jackson Hoover, Edward William Spratt. (Deary, David)
January 27, 2022 Filing 245 RESPONSE re #200 Response in Support of Motion, Response to Strategic Motion to Dismiss filed by Samuel Agnew, Sandi Douget, Heather Greiner, Matthew S. Greiner, Ronald Hebert, C. Jackson Hoover, Edward William Spratt. (Deary, David)
January 26, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 244 ORDER granting #243 Motion for Extension of Time. Plaintiff's deadline to file a response to Bennett Thrasher, LLC, Jon R. Langford, CPA, PC, Jon R. Langford, and Frazier & Deeter, LLC's Motions to Dismiss is extended through and including February 11, 2022. Defendants' deadline to file its reply is extended through and including March 14, 2022. Signed by Judge Steven D. Grimberg on January 26, 2022. (ash)
January 25, 2022 Filing 243 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time To File Response to Bennett Thrasher, LLC, Jon R. Langford, CPA, PC, Jon R. Langford, and Frazier & Deeter, LLC's Motions to Dismiss by Samuel Agnew, Sandi Douget, Heather Greiner, Matthew S. Greiner, Ronald Hebert, C. Jackson Hoover, Edward William Spratt. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Sloan, Jeven)
January 25, 2022 Filing 242 NOTICE by Frazier & Deeter, L.L.C. Notice of Law Firm Change and Contact Information (Kingma, Johannes)
January 21, 2022 Filing 241 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal of Defendant Triangle Land Conservancy filed by Samuel Agnew, Sandi Douget, Heather Greiner, Matthew S. Greiner, Ronald Hebert, C. Jackson Hoover, Edward William Spratt (Simpson, Tyler)
January 21, 2022 Filing 240 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal of Defendant McCalip & Company, Inc. filed by Samuel Agnew, Sandi Douget, Heather Greiner, Matthew S. Greiner, Ronald Hebert, C. Jackson Hoover, Edward William Spratt (Simpson, Tyler)
January 21, 2022 Clerk's Entry of Dismissal APPROVING #240 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P.41(a)(1)(A)(i) Defendant McCalip & Company, Inc. without prejudice ONLY. (jkb)
January 21, 2022 Clerk's Entry of Dismissal APPROVING #241 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P.41(a)(1)(A)(i) Triangle Land Conservancy without prejudice ONLY. (jkb)
January 19, 2022 Filing 239 Notice for Leave of Absence for the following date(s): 04/21/2022-04/29/2022, 07/04/2022-07/15/2022, 12/22/2022-01/02/2023, by Donald Brown. (Brown, Donald) Modified on 1/19/2022 to edit text(jkb).
January 14, 2022 Filing 238 NOTICE by Atlantic Coast Conservancy, Inc., Robert Keller of Withdrawal of Steven Vickery as one of their Counsel (Vickery, Steven)
January 12, 2022 Filing 237 RESPONSE in Opposition re #168 Joint MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Defendants filed by Samuel Agnew, Sandi Douget, Heather Greiner, Matthew Greiner, Ronald Hebert, C. Hoover, Edward Spratt. (Simpson, Tyler)
December 23, 2021 Submission of #234 MOTION to Dismiss, to District Judge Steven D. Grimberg. (ash)
December 22, 2021 Filing 236 NOTICE of Appearance by Brian Spielman on behalf of Claud Clark, III, Clark-Davis, PC (Spielman, Brian)
December 13, 2021 Filing 235 Notice for Leave of Absence for the following date(s): 1/17/22-1/21/22, 1/24/22-1/28/22, 2/14/22-2/18/22, 4/4/22-4/8/22, 6/20/22-6/24/22, 6/27/22-7/1/22, by Robert C. Khayat, Jr. (Khayat, Robert)
December 1, 2021 Filing 234 MOTION to Dismiss with Brief In Support by Chris A. Dantin, Dantin Financial, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Brief Dantin Defendants Memorandum of Law in Support of Their Motion to Dismiss First Amended Complaint, #2 Exhibit A)(Chally, Jonathan)
November 30, 2021 Submission of #230 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM , to District Judge Steven D. Grimberg. (jkb)
November 22, 2021 Submission of #194 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM , #187 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM , #179 MOTION for Joinder , #186 MOTION to Dismiss the First Amended Complaint, #207 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' First Amended Complaint, #206 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM , #192 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM , #203 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM , #193 MOTION to Dismiss , #199 MOTION to Dismiss , #191 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM , #181 MOTION to Dismiss , #188 MOTION to Dismiss to District Judge Steven D. Grimberg. (dmb)
November 17, 2021 Submission of #168 Joint MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Defendants, to District Judge Steven D. Grimberg. (jkb)
November 11, 2021 Filing 233 NOTICE by Atlantic Coast Conservancy, Inc., Robert D. Keller re. Change of Address of Counsel (Delaney, Colin)
November 9, 2021 Filing 232 Certificate of Interested Persons by Bennett Thrasher, LLC. (Cashbaugh, Travis)
November 9, 2021 Filing 231 CERTIFICATE of Compliance for Triangle Land Conservancy (Masterson, Ronald)
November 8, 2021 Filing 230 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM with Brief In Support by Bennett Thrasher, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion to Dismiss, #2 Decl. of Jeffrey Eischeid, #3 Ex. A to Eischeid Decl., #4 Ex. B to Eischeid Decl.)(Cashbaugh, Travis)
November 8, 2021 Filing 229 Request for Leave of Absence for the following date(s): 11/19/21-11/23/21, 2/10/22-2/21/22, by Shannon McKenzie Sprinkle. (Sprinkle, Shannon)
November 5, 2021 Filing 228 Certificate of Interested Persons by Claud Clark, III, Clark-Davis, PC. (Khayat, Robert)
November 5, 2021 Filing 227 CERTIFICATE of Compliance re #4 Order (Chally, Jonathan)
November 5, 2021 Filing 226 CERTIFICATE of Compliance (Crochet, Gregory)
November 3, 2021 Filing 225 CERTIFICATE of Compliance re #4 Order (White, William)
November 3, 2021 Filing 224 CERTIFICATE of Compliance re #4 Order (Brown, Donald)
November 3, 2021 Filing 223 CERTIFICATE of Compliance re #4 Order (Rose, Joseph)
November 3, 2021 Filing 222 CERTIFICATE of Compliance re #4 Order (Rosen, Kevin)
November 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 221 ORDER granting #195 Motion for Extension of Time for Defendant Foothills Land Conservancy to supplement its individual Motion to Dismiss in response to Plaintiffs' First Amended Complaint. Defendant Foothills Land Conservancys Motion to Dismiss brief, as currently set by this Court's August 16, 2021 Scheduling Order, is extended by one (1) day. Signed by Judge Steven D. Grimberg on 11/03/2021. (jkb)
November 3, 2021 Filing 220 CERTIFICATE of Compliance re #4 Order (Nowicki, Daniel)
November 3, 2021 Filing 219 CERTIFICATE of Compliance (Breithaupt, Eric)
November 3, 2021 Filing 218 Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement by James Freeman, Ricky B. Novak, Strategic Capital Partners, LLC identifying Corporate Parent Strategic Investment Holdings Group, LLC for Strategic Capital Partners, LLC. (Balser, David)
November 2, 2021 Filing 217 Certificate of Interested Person and Corporate Disclosure Statement by Martin H. Van Sant, Van Sant and Wingard, LLC, Thomas F. Wingard.(Fisher, Eric) Modified on 11/3/2021 to edit text(jkb).
November 2, 2021 Filing 216 CERTIFICATE of Compliance re #4 Order (Koelz, Andrew)
November 2, 2021 Filing 215 CERTIFICATE of Compliance re #4 Order (Taylor, Eric)
November 2, 2021 Filing 214 CERTIFICATE of Compliance of Standing Order Docket 4 (Shelton, Martin)
November 2, 2021 Filing 213 Certificate of Interested Persons by Morris Manning & Martin, LLP, Timothy Pollock. (Rains, John)
November 2, 2021 Filing 212 Certificate of Interested Persons by Nelson Mullins Riley & Scarborough LLC. (Lamberth, James)
November 2, 2021 Filing 211 Certificate of Interested Persons by Oxygen Financial, Inc.. (McBryan, Louis)
November 2, 2021 Filing 210 CERTIFICATE of Compliance re #4 Order (McBryan, Louis)
November 2, 2021 Filing 209 NOTICE Of Filing SIGNED DECLARATION OF WILLIAM C. CLABOUGH, SR., TO SUPPLEMENT by Foothills Land Conservancy, Inc.. re #203 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM (Brown, Donald)
November 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 208 ORDER granting #177 Motion for Extension of Time for Defendant Bennett Thrasher, LLP to file its Motion to Dismiss in response to Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint. It is ORDERED that the time in which to file Defendant Bennett Thrasher LLP's motion to dismiss brief, as currently set by this Courts August 16, 2021 Scheduling Order, is extended by one (1) week. It is further ORDERED that the time in which to file Plaintiffs' opposition briefs to Bennett Thrasher LLP's motion to dismiss, as currently set by this Courts August 16, 2021 Scheduling Order, is extended by one (1) week. Signed by Judge Steven D. Grimberg on 11/01/2021. (jkb)
November 1, 2021 Filing 207 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' First Amended Complaint with Brief In Support by Atlantic Coast Conservancy, Inc., Robert D. Keller. (Attachments: #1 Brief Brief in Support of Atlantic Coast Conservancy, Inc. and Dr. Keller's Motion to Dismiss, #2 Exhibit Declaration of Dr. Robert D. Keller, #3 Exhibit Keller Declaration Ex. A - Deed of Conservation Easement with DeSoto Holdings, LLC, #4 Exhibit Keller Declaration Ex. B - Baseline Document Report for DeSoto Holdings, LLC, #5 Exhibit Keller Declaration Ex. C - IRS Form 8283 for DeSoto Holdings, LLC, #6 Exhibit Keller Declaration Ex. D - Letter to DeSoto Holdings, LLC dated Dec. 29, 2016, #7 Exhibit Keller Declaration Ex. E - Letter to DeSoto Holdings, LLC dated April 13, 2017, #8 Exhibit Keller Declaration Ex. F - Letter to DeSoto Holdings, LLC dated April 13, 2017, #9 Exhibit Keller Declaration Ex. G - Deed of Conservation Easement with Bear Creek LH Holdings, LLC, #10 Exhibit Keller Declaration Ex. H - Baseline Document Report for Bear Creek LH Holdings, LLC, #11 Exhibit Keller Declaration Ex. I - IRS Form 8283 for Bear Creek LH Holdings, LLC, #12 Exhibit Keller Declaration Ex. J - Letter to Bear Creek LH Holdings, LLC dated Dec. 30, 2016, #13 Exhibit Keller Declaration Ex. K - Letter to Bear Creek LH Holdings, LLC dated Jan. 26, 2017, #14 Exhibit Keller Declaration Ex. L - Letter to Bear Creek LH Holdings, LLC dated Jan. 26, 2017)(Vickery, Steven)
November 1, 2021 Filing 206 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM with Brief In Support by Nelson Mullins Riley & Scarborough LLC. (Attachments: #1 Brief Memorandum in Support of Motion to Dismiss, #2 Exhibit Declaration of Kasia Hebda with Exhibit)(Lamberth, James)
November 1, 2021 Filing 205 Certificate of Interested Persons by Atlantic Coast Conservancy, Inc., Robert D. Keller. (Vickery, Steven)
November 1, 2021 Filing 204 Certificate of Interested Persons by Foothills Land Conservancy, Inc... (Brown, Donald)
November 1, 2021 Filing 203 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM with Brief In Support by Foothills Land Conservancy, Inc... (Brown, Donald)
November 1, 2021 Filing 202 Certificate of Interested Persons by Bridge Capital Associates, Inc.. (Wolper, Alan)
November 1, 2021 Filing 201 RESPONSE in Support re #168 Joint MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Defendants filed by Bridge Capital Associates, Inc.. (Wolper, Alan)
November 1, 2021 Filing 200 RESPONSE in Support re #168 Joint MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Defendants Strategic Capital Partners, LLC, Ricky Novak, and James Freeman's Memorandum of Law in Support of Their Motion to Dismiss First Amended Complaint filed by James Freeman, Ricky B. Novak, Strategic Capital Partners, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Balser, David)
November 1, 2021 Filing 199 MOTION to Dismiss by Georgia-Alabama Land Trust, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Debra Pitt, #2 Tax Court Order)(Wise, Kyler)
November 1, 2021 Filing 198 RESPONSE in Support re #168 Joint MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Defendants filed by Claud Clark, III, Clark-Davis, PC. (Khayat, Robert)
November 1, 2021 Filing 197 RESPONSE in Support re #168 Joint MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Defendants filed by Oxygen Financial, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Declaration of Cristina Briboneria)(McBryan, Louis)
November 1, 2021 Filing 196 Certificate of Interested Persons by Credo Financial Services, LLC. (Little, Samuel)
November 1, 2021 Filing 195 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time File Supplemental Materials by Foothills Land Conservancy, Inc... (Brown, Donald)
November 1, 2021 Filing 194 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM with Brief In Support by Credo Financial Services, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Brief memorandum in support mtn dismiss)(Little, Samuel)
November 1, 2021 Filing 193 MOTION to Dismiss with Brief In Support by Martin H. Van Sant, Van Sant and Wingard, LLC, Thomas F. Wingard. (Fisher, Eric)
November 1, 2021 Filing 192 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM with Brief In Support by Sean Honeywell. (Attachments: #1 Brief)(Mast, Christine)
November 1, 2021 Filing 191 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM with Brief In Support by Aaron Kowan, Private Client Law Group, PC. (Attachments: #1 Brief, #2 Exhibit - Declaration of Aaron Kowan with Exhibit A (Email and Due Diligence Report))(Mast, Christine)
November 1, 2021 Filing 190 Certificate of Interested Persons by Triangle Land Conservancy. (Shelton, Martin)
November 1, 2021 Filing 189 Certificate of Interested Persons by Aaron Kowan, Private Client Law Group, PC, Sean Honeywell. (Mast, Christine)
November 1, 2021 Filing 188 MOTION to Dismiss with Brief In Support by Triangle Land Conservancy. (Attachments: #1 Brief, #2 Affidavit Affidavit of S. Sweitzer)(Shelton, Martin)
November 1, 2021 Filing 187 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM with Brief In Support by Bryan Cave Leighton Paisner LLP. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Law in Support, #2 Decl. of E. P. Schroeder + Exhibits)(Schroeder, Eric)
November 1, 2021 Filing 186 MOTION to Dismiss the First Amended Complaint with Brief In Support by Frazier & Deeter, L.L.C.. (Attachments: #1 Brief Brief in Support of Motion to Dismiss the First Amended Complaint, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 1 - Declaration of Gary Dyal)(deMoulpied, John)
November 1, 2021 Filing 185 Certificate of Interested Persons by Frazier & Deeter, L.L.C.. (deMoulpied, John)
November 1, 2021 Filing 184 RESPONSE in Support re #168 Joint MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Defendants filed by Morris Manning & Martin, LLP, Timothy Pollock. (Rains, John)
November 1, 2021 Filing 183 NOTICE Of Filing Missing Exhibit by Mccalip & Company, Inc. re #179 MOTION for Joinder (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit B-invoice)(Breithaupt, Eric)
November 1, 2021 Filing 182 Certificate of Interested Persons by Jon R. Langford, CPA, PC, John R. Langford. (Sprinkle, Shannon)
November 1, 2021 Filing 181 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint with Brief In Support by Jon R. Langford, CPA, PC, John R. Langford. (Attachments: #1 Brief in Support of Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's first Amended Complaint, #2 Exhibit 1 - June 30,2020 Turtle River Tax Court Order)(Sprinkle, Shannon) Modified on 11/1/2021 to edit text (jkb).
November 1, 2021 Filing 180 RESPONSE in Support re #168 Joint MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Defendants filed by AquaFusion, Inc.. (Crochet, Gregory)
November 1, 2021 Filing 179 MOTION for Joinder with Brief In Support by Mccalip & Company, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Brief Memorandum of Law in Support of Joint Motion to Dismiss, #2 Appendix Appendix "A" Setting for the Allegations of the FAC directed to McCalip, #3 Affidavit Declaration of Jerry McCalip, #4 Exhibit Exhibit A-Aggregate Resources Report)(Breithaupt, Eric)
November 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 178 ORDER granting #174 Motion for Extension of Time. The Dantin Defendants will further respond to the First Amended Class Action Complaint by December 1, 2021. Dantin Financial, LLC will notify Plaintiff's counsel and the court whether it joins in the 10/18/2021 Joint Motion to Dismiss First Amended Complaint. Chris A. Dantin and Dantin Financial, LLC will assert any defenses unique to those defendants, as the Court's 09/16/2021 order would otherwise require to be filed by 11/01/2021. Plaintiff's will respond to the Dantin Defendants' 12/01/2021 filing by 2/28/2022. The Dantin Defendants will submit a rely brief regarding their motion to dismiss by 03/28/2022. Signed by Judge Steven D. Grimberg on 10/29/2021. (jkb)
October 31, 2021 Filing 177 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Plaintiffs' Complaint by Bennett Thrasher, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Cashbaugh, Travis)
October 29, 2021 Filing 176 NOTICE of Appearance by Andrew Stephen Koelz on behalf of Cherry Bekaert LLP F/K/A (Koelz, Andrew)
October 29, 2021 Filing 175 NOTICE of Appearance by Eric Jon Taylor on behalf of Cherry Bekaert LLP F/K/A (Taylor, Eric)
October 28, 2021 Filing 174 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time To Submit Briefs Regarding Dantin Defendants' Motions To Dismiss with Brief In Support by Chris A. Dantin, Dantin Financial, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Chally, Jonathan)
October 26, 2021 Filing 173 Certificate of Interested Persons by Bryan Cave Leighton Paisner LLP. (Schroeder, Eric)
October 26, 2021 Filing 172 Corporate Disclosure Statement by AquaFusion, Inc..(Crochet, Gregory)
October 22, 2021 Opinion or Order ORDER granting #169 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Michael Carter Palmintier. Approved by Judge Steven D. Grimberg on October 22, 2021. If the applicant does not have CM/ECF access in the Northern District of Georgia already, they must request access at http://pacer.gov. If they have electronically filed in this district in a previous case, please omit this step.(ash)
October 21, 2021 Filing 171 NOTICE of Appearance by Ronald Scott Masterson on behalf of Triangle Land Conservancy (Masterson, Ronald)
October 21, 2021 APPROVAL by Clerks Office re: #169 APPLICATION for Admission of Michael Carter Palmintier Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-11337703).. Attorney Michael Carter Palmintier added appearing on behalf of Chris A. Dantin, Dantin Financial, LLC (nmb)
October 20, 2021 Filing 170 NOTICE of Appearance by Martin A Shelton on behalf of Triangle Land Conservancy (Shelton, Martin)
October 19, 2021 Filing 169 APPLICATION for Admission of Michael Carter Palmintier Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-11337703).by Chris A. Dantin, Dantin Financial, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Chally, Jonathan) Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse.
October 18, 2021 Filing 168 Joint MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Defendants with Brief In Support by Bryan Cave Leighton Paisner LLP. (Attachments: #1 Joint Memorandum of Law in Support of Defendants' Motion to Dismiss First Amended Complaint, #2 Decl. of B. M. Underwood + Exhibits)(Schroeder, Eric)
October 15, 2021 Filing 167 NOTICE of Appearance by Kyler Lee Wise on behalf of Georgia-Alabama Land Trust, Inc. (Wise, Kyler)
October 14, 2021 Filing 166 NOTICE of Appearance by Jonathan R. Chally on behalf of Chris A. Dantin, Dantin Financial, LLC (Chally, Jonathan)
September 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 165 ORDER adopting #161 Consent Motion for Scheduling Order. Defendant McCalip & Company, Inc., shall adopt and adhere to the deadlines set forth in the August 16, 2021 Scheduling Order issued by this Court. Signed by Judge Steven D. Grimberg on 09/17/2021. (jkb) Modified on 9/27/2021 to edit text (jkb).
September 16, 2021 Filing 164 Notice for Leave of Absence for the following date(s): October 7, 8, 11, 12, 28 & 29, 2021 and November 1, 2021, by Samuel Fenn Little, Jr. (Little, Samuel)
September 16, 2021 Filing 163 Certification of Consent to Substitution of Counsel. Shannon McKenzie Sprinkle replacing attorney John M Malutinok. (Sprinkle, Shannon)
September 15, 2021 Filing 162 PROPOSED ORDER Order on Consent Motion Regarding Scheduling Order on Briefing on Motions to Dismiss re: #161 Consent MOTION Regarding Scheduling Order on Briefing on Motions to Dismiss #137 Scheduling Order, . (Breithaupt, Eric)
September 15, 2021 Filing 161 Consent MOTION Regarding Scheduling Order on Briefing on Motions to Dismiss #137 Scheduling Order, by Mccalip & Company, Inc.. (Breithaupt, Eric)
September 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 160 ORDER Adopting #155 Consent Motion . Defendant Foothills Land Conservancy, Inc., shall adopt and adhere to the deadlines set forth in the August 16, 2021, Scheduling Order issued by this Court. Signed by Judge Steven D. Grimberg on 09/10/2021. (jkb) Modified on 9/13/2021 to edit text(jkb).
September 10, 2021 Filing 159 STIPULATION by Plaintiff and Defendant regarding Scheduling Order by Triangle Land Conservancy. (Shelton, Martin)
September 10, 2021 Filing 158 Notice for Leave of Absence for the following date(s): October 9, 2021-October 18, 2021, December 22, 2021-December 31, 2021, by Donald Brown. (Brown, Donald)
September 9, 2021 Filing 157 NOTICE of Appearance by William Dowdy White on behalf of Foothills Land Conservancy, Inc.. (White, William)
September 9, 2021 Filing 156 NOTICE of Appearance by Donald Brown on behalf of Foothills Land Conservancy, Inc.. (Brown, Donald)
September 9, 2021 Filing 155 Consent MOTION Scheduling Order on Briefing on Motions to Dismiss #152 Return of Service Executed, #137 Scheduling Order, by Foothills Land Conservancy, Inc... (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Brown, Donald)
September 7, 2021 Filing 154 Notice for Leave of Absence for the following date(s): 10/4, 10/5, 10/18-10/26, and 12/7-12/10/2021, by Christine L. Mast. (Mast, Christine)
September 1, 2021 Filing 153 Corporate Disclosure Statement identifying Other Affiliate Jerry McCalip for Mccalip & Company, Inc. by Mccalip & Company, Inc..(Breithaupt, Eric)
August 31, 2021 Filing 152 Return of Service Executed by C. Jackson Hoover, Sandi Douget, Matthew S. Greiner, Ronald Hebert, Heather Greiner, Samuel Agnew, Edward William Spratt. Foothills Land Conservancy, Inc.. served on 8/26/2021, answer due 9/16/2021. (Simpson, Tyler)
August 31, 2021 Opinion or Order ORDER granting #148 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Joseph Richard Rose. Approved by Judge Steven D. Grimberg on August 31, 2021. If the applicant does not have CM/ECF access in the Northern District of Georgia already, they must request access at http://pacer.gov. If they have electronically filed in this district in a previous case, please omit this step.(ash)
August 31, 2021 Opinion or Order ORDER granting #149 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Kevin Stuart Rosen. Approved by Judge Steven D. Grimberg on August 31, 2021. If the applicant does not have CM/ECF access in the Northern District of Georgia already, they must request access at http://pacer.gov. If they have electronically filed in this district in a previous case, please omit this step.(ash)
August 31, 2021 Opinion or Order ORDER granting #147 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Daniel Stanley Nowicki. Approved by Judge Steven D. Grimberg on August 31, 2021. If the applicant does not have CM/ECF access in the Northern District of Georgia already, they must request access at http://pacer.gov. If they have electronically filed in this district in a previous case, please omit this step.(ash)
August 30, 2021 Filing 151 NOTICE of Appearance by Eric Joseph Breithaupt on behalf of Mccalip & Company, Inc. (Breithaupt, Eric)
August 26, 2021 APPROVAL by Clerks Office re: #148 APPLICATION for Admission of Joseph Richard Rose Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-11204969).. Attorney Joseph R. Rose added appearing on behalf of Bryan Cave Leighton Paisner LLP (nmb)
August 26, 2021 APPROVAL by Clerks Office re: #147 APPLICATION for Admission of Daniel Stanley Nowicki Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-11204925).. Attorney Daniel Stanley Nowicki added appearing on behalf of Bryan Cave Leighton Paisner LLP (nmb)
August 26, 2021 APPROVAL by Clerks Office re: #149 APPLICATION for Admission of Kevin Stuart Rosen Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-11204987).. Attorney Kevin Stuart Rosen added appearing on behalf of Bryan Cave Leighton Paisner LLP (nmb)
August 24, 2021 Filing 150 Certification of Consent to Substitution of Counsel. Louis G. McBryan replacing attorney Keely Collins. (McBryan, Louis)
August 23, 2021 Filing 149 APPLICATION for Admission of Kevin Stuart Rosen Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-11204987).by Bryan Cave Leighton Paisner LLP. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Schroeder, Eric) Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse.
August 23, 2021 Filing 148 APPLICATION for Admission of Joseph Richard Rose Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-11204969).by Bryan Cave Leighton Paisner LLP. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Schroeder, Eric) Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse.
August 23, 2021 Filing 147 APPLICATION for Admission of Daniel Stanley Nowicki Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-11204925).by Bryan Cave Leighton Paisner LLP. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Schroeder, Eric) Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse.
August 20, 2021 Filing 146 CERTIFICATE of Compliance re #4 Order (Underwood, Brian)
August 20, 2021 Filing 145 CERTIFICATE of Compliance re #4 Order (Schroeder, Eric)
August 20, 2021 Filing 144 CERTIFICATE of Compliance re #4 Order Standing Order Regarding Civil Litigation (Wolper, Alan)
August 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 143 ORDER granting #135 Motion to Dismiss terminating Jason Cordon. Signed by Judge Steven D. Grimberg on 08/19/2021. (jkb)
August 19, 2021 Filing 142 CERTIFICATE of Compliance re #4 Order Standing Order Regarding Civil Litigation (Wieseman, Joseph)
August 19, 2021 Filing 141 NOTICE of Appearance by Joseph Hall Wieseman on behalf of Aaron Kowan, Private Client Law Group, PC, Sean Honeywell (Wieseman, Joseph)
August 19, 2021 Filing 140 CERTIFICATE of Compliance re #4 Order Standing Order Regarding Civil Litigation (Mast, Christine)
August 19, 2021 Filing 139 NOTICE of Appearance by Christine L. Mast on behalf of Aaron Kowan, Private Client Law Group, PC, Sean Honeywell (Mast, Christine)
August 17, 2021 Filing 138 NOTICE of Appearance by Brian McKinley Underwood, Jr on behalf of Bryan Cave Leighton Paisner LLP (Underwood, Brian)
August 17, 2021 Filing 136 NOTICE of Appearance by Eric Schroeder on behalf of Bryan Cave Leighton Paisner LLP (Schroeder, Eric)
August 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 137 SCHEDULING ORDER REGARDING BRIEFING ON MOTIONS TO DISMISS: This briefing schedule shall apply to all Defendants that have been served or that have agreed to waive service on or before August 20, 2021. Signed by Judge Steven D. Grimberg on 08/16/2021. (jkb)
August 16, 2021 Filing 135 Joint MOTION to Dismiss Claims Without Prejudice and to Drop Jason K. Cordon by Samuel Agnew, Sandi Douget, Heather Greiner, Matthew S. Greiner, Ronald Hebert, C. Jackson Hoover, Edward William Spratt. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Simpson, Tyler)
August 13, 2021 Filing 134 Return of Service Executed by C. Jackson Hoover, Sandi Douget, Matthew S. Greiner, Ronald Hebert, Heather Greiner, Samuel Agnew, Edward William Spratt. Chris A. Dantin served on 8/11/2021, answer due 9/1/2021. (Simpson, Tyler)
August 13, 2021 Filing 133 Consent MOTION for Order - Scheduling Order by Morris Manning & Martin, LLP, Timothy Pollock. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Proposed Scheduling Order Order)(Rains, John)
August 13, 2021 Filing 132 Return of Service Executed by C. Jackson Hoover, Sandi Douget, Matthew S. Greiner, Ronald Hebert, Heather Greiner, Samuel Agnew, Edward William Spratt. Mccalip & Company, Inc. served on 8/11/2021, answer due 9/1/2021. (Simpson, Tyler)
August 10, 2021 Filing 131 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by C. Jackson Hoover, Sandi Douget, Matthew S. Greiner, Ronald Hebert, Heather Greiner, Samuel Agnew, Edward William Spratt. Sean Honeywell waiver mailed on 7/12/2021, answer due 9/10/2021. (Simpson, Tyler)
August 10, 2021 Filing 130 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by C. Jackson Hoover, Sandi Douget, Matthew S. Greiner, Ronald Hebert, Heather Greiner, Samuel Agnew, Edward William Spratt. Aaron Kowan waiver mailed on 7/12/2021, answer due 9/10/2021. (Simpson, Tyler)
August 10, 2021 Filing 129 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by C. Jackson Hoover, Sandi Douget, Matthew S. Greiner, Ronald Hebert, Heather Greiner, Samuel Agnew, Edward William Spratt. Private Client Law Group, PC waiver mailed on 7/12/2021, answer due 9/10/2021. (Simpson, Tyler)
August 6, 2021 Filing 128 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by C. Jackson Hoover, Sandi Douget, Matthew S. Greiner, Ronald Hebert, Heather Greiner, Samuel Agnew, Edward William Spratt. Cherry Bekaert LLP F/K/A waiver mailed on 7/12/2021, answer due 9/10/2021. (Simpson, Tyler)
August 6, 2021 Filing 127 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by C. Jackson Hoover, Sandi Douget, Matthew S. Greiner, Ronald Hebert, Heather Greiner, Samuel Agnew, Edward William Spratt. Frazier & Deeter, L.L.C. waiver mailed on 7/12/2021, answer due 9/10/2021. (Simpson, Tyler)
August 5, 2021 Filing 126 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by C. Jackson Hoover, Sandi Douget, Matthew S. Greiner, Ronald Hebert, Heather Greiner, Samuel Agnew, Edward William Spratt. Bryan Cave Leighton Paisner LLP waiver mailed on 7/6/2021, answer due 9/7/2021. (Simpson, Tyler)
July 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 125 SCHEDULING ORDER: Ordered, the time set by the previous Scheduling Order #116 for the parties to propose a schedule and plan for briefing the Defendants' anticipated Motions to Dismiss the First Amended Class Action Complaint is hereby extended to and through August 13,2021. Signed by Judge Steven D. Grimberg on 07/30/2021. (jkb)
July 29, 2021 Filing 124 Consent MOTION for Order [Scheduling Order] by Morris Manning & Martin, LLP. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Rains, John)
July 29, 2021 Filing 123 CERTIFICATE of Compliance re #4 Order (Cashbaugh, Travis)
July 29, 2021 Filing 122 CERTIFICATE of Compliance re Court's Standing Order (Maine, Dana)
July 29, 2021 Filing 121 CERTIFICATE of Compliance (Kingma, Johannes)
July 29, 2021 Filing 120 NOTICE of Appearance by Johannes Stuart Kingma on behalf of Frazier & Deeter, L.L.C. (Kingma, Johannes)
July 29, 2021 Filing 119 CERTIFICATE of Compliance (deMoulpied, John)
July 29, 2021 Filing 118 NOTICE of Appearance by John Clay deMoulpied on behalf of Frazier & Deeter, L.L.C. (deMoulpied, John)
July 26, 2021 Filing 117 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by C. Jackson Hoover, Sandi Douget, Matthew S. Greiner, Ronald Hebert, Heather Greiner, Samuel Agnew, Edward William Spratt. Triangle Land Conservancy waiver mailed on 7/12/2021, answer due 9/10/2021. (Simpson, Tyler)
July 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 116 SCHEDULING ORDER granting #114 Consent Motion for Scheduling Order. The time set by the previous Scheduling Order #91 for the parties to propose a schedule and plan for briefing the Defendants' anticipated Motions to Dismiss the First Amended Class Action Complaint is hereby extended to and through July 30, 2021. Signed by Judge Steven D. Grimberg on 07/09/2021. (bdb)
July 9, 2021 Filing 115 Electronic Summons Issued as to Cherry Bekaert LLP F/K/A. (jkb)
July 8, 2021 Filing 114 Consent MOTION for Order - Consent Motion for Scheduling Order by Morris Manning & Martin, LLP. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Proposed Order)(Rains, John)
July 7, 2021 Filing 113 Electronic Summons Issued as to Aaron Kowan, Bryan Cave Leighton Paisner LLP, Chris A. Dantin, Dantin Financial, LLC, Foothills Land Conservancy, Inc.., Frazier & Deeter, L.L.C., Jason Cordon, Mccalip & Company, Inc., Private Client Law Group, PC, Sean Honeywell, Triangle Land Conservancy. (Attachments: #1 Summons Dantin, #2 Summons Cordon, #3 Summons Dantin Financial, #4 Summons Foothills Land, #5 Summons Frazier & Deeter, #6 Summons Honeywill, #7 Summons Kowan, #8 Summons McCalip & Company, #9 Summons Private Client Law, #10 Summons Triangle Land)(jkb)
June 30, 2021 Filing 112 PROPOSED SUMMONS filed by Samuel Agnew, Sandi Douget, Heather Greiner, Matthew S. Greiner, Ronald Hebert, C. Jackson Hoover, Edward William Spratt (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons, #5 Summons, #6 Summons, #7 Summons, #8 Summons, #9 Summons, #10 Summons, #11 Summons)(Sloan, Jeven)
June 30, 2021 Filing 111 NOTICE of Appearance by Travis Martin Cashbaugh on behalf of Bennett Thrasher, LLC (Cashbaugh, Travis)
June 30, 2021 Filing 110 NOTICE of Appearance by Dana Kristin Maine on behalf of Bennett Thrasher, LLC (Maine, Dana)
June 29, 2021 Opinion or Order ORDER granting #106 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Judge Steven D. Grimberg on 6/29/2021. If the applicant does not have CM/ECF access in the Northern District of Georgia already, they must request access at http://pacer.gov. If they have electronically filed in this district in a previous case, please omit this step.(kmj)
June 29, 2021 Notification of Docket Correction re #109 FIRST AMENDED CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT file date is 06/25/21. (aaq)
June 28, 2021 APPROVAL by Clerks Office re: #106 APPLICATION for Admission of Timothy S. Baird Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-11055575). Attorney Timothy S. Baird added appearing on behalf of AquaFusion, Inc. (cdg)
June 25, 2021 Filing 109 FIRST AMENDED CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT against All Defendants with Jury Demand filed by C. Jackson Hoover, Sandi Douget, Matthew S. Greiner, Ronald Hebert, Heather Greiner, Samuel Agnew, Edward William Spratt.(jkb) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form. Modified on 6/29/2021 to correct file date (aaq).
June 25, 2021 Filing 108 ---DOCUMENT FILED IN ERROR: Correctly refiled at entry #109 --- First AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants with Jury Demand filed by C. Jackson Hoover, Heather Greiner, Edward William Spratt, Matthew S. Greiner, Samuel Agnew, Sandi Douget, Ronald Hebert.(Sloan, Jeven) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form. Modified on 6/29/2021 to edit text (aaq).
June 21, 2021 Filing 107 NOTICE of Appearance by Alan Mitchell Wolper on behalf of Bridge Capital Associates, Inc. (Wolper, Alan)
June 21, 2021 Filing 106 APPLICATION for Admission of Timothy S. Baird Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-11055575).by AquaFusion, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Crochet, Gregory) Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse.
June 17, 2021 Filing 105 CERTIFICATE of Compliance (Fisher, Eric)
June 17, 2021 Filing 104 CERTIFICATE of Compliance (Crochet, Gregory)
June 17, 2021 Filing 103 NOTICE of Appearance by Gregory R. Crochet on behalf of AquaFusion, Inc. (Crochet, Gregory)
June 15, 2021 Filing 102 CERTIFICATE of Compliance (Miles, Jeffrey)
June 15, 2021 Filing 101 NOTICE of Appearance by Jeffrey Miles on behalf of James Freeman, Ricky B. Novak, Strategic Capital Partners, LLC (Miles, Jeffrey)
June 15, 2021 Filing 100 CERTIFICATE of Compliance (Pritchard, Billie)
June 15, 2021 Filing 99 NOTICE of Appearance by Billie Barker Pritchard on behalf of James Freeman, Ricky B. Novak, Strategic Capital Partners, LLC (Pritchard, Billie)
June 15, 2021 Filing 98 CERTIFICATE of Compliance (Pratt, James)
June 15, 2021 Filing 97 NOTICE of Appearance by James Andrew Pratt on behalf of James Freeman, Ricky B. Novak, Strategic Capital Partners, LLC (Pratt, James)
June 15, 2021 Filing 96 CERTIFICATE of Compliance (Balser, David)
June 15, 2021 Filing 95 NOTICE of Appearance by David Lewis Balser on behalf of James Freeman, Ricky B. Novak, Strategic Capital Partners, LLC (Balser, David)
June 14, 2021 Filing 94 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by C. Jackson Hoover, Heather Greiner, Edward William Spratt, Matthew S. Greiner. Bridge Capital Associates, Inc. waiver mailed on 6/11/2021, answer due 8/10/2021. (Simpson, Tyler)
June 9, 2021 Filing 93 Return of Service Executed by C. Jackson Hoover, Heather Greiner, Edward William Spratt, Matthew S. Greiner. Georgia-Alabama Land Trust, Inc. served on 6/7/2021, answer due 6/28/2021. (Sloan, Jeven)
June 4, 2021 Filing 92 NOTICE of Appearance by Eric S. Fisher on behalf of Martin H. Van Sant, Van Sant and Wingard, LLC, Thomas F. Wingard (Fisher, Eric)
June 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 91 ORDER granting #89 Motion for Order. Plaintiffs shall file their First Amended Complaint on or before June 25, 2021. No Defendant is required to respond in any kind to the original Complaint #1 . All discovery is stayed until the resolution of every forthcoming Motion to Dismiss the First Amended Complaint or until the Court otherwise directs. On or before July 9, 2021, the parties shall propose a schedule and plan for briefing the Defendants' anticipated Motions to Dismiss the First Amended Complaint. If agreement to a consent proposal is not reached, the parties shall file competing motions and proposed scheduling orders on or before July 9, 2021. No response of any kind to the First Amended Complaint shall be required except as ordered by the Court. Signed by Judge Steven D. Grimberg on 06/02/2021. (jkb)
June 1, 2021 Filing 90 NOTICE of Appearance by Keely Collins on behalf of Oxygen Financial, Inc. (Collins, Keely)
May 28, 2021 Filing 89 Consent MOTION for Order (Scheduling Order) by Morris Manning & Martin, LLP, Timothy Pollock. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A- Proposed Scheduling Order)(Rains, John)
May 25, 2021 Filing 88 CERTIFICATE of Compliance re #4 Order (Khayat, Robert)
May 24, 2021 Filing 87 CERTIFICATE of Compliance (Sprinkle, Shannon)
May 24, 2021 Filing 86 NOTICE of Appearance by Shannon McKenzie Sprinkle on behalf of Jon R. Langford, CPA, PC, John R. Langford (Sprinkle, Shannon)
May 23, 2021 Filing 85 NOTICE of Appearance by Robert C. Khayat, Jr on behalf of Claud Clark, III, Clark-Davis, PC (Khayat, Robert)
May 21, 2021 Filing 84 CERTIFICATE of Compliance re #4 Order (Malutinok, John)
May 21, 2021 Filing 83 CERTIFICATE of Compliance re #4 Order (Hebda, Katarzyna)
May 21, 2021 Filing 82 NOTICE of Appearance by Katarzyna Anna Hebda on behalf of Nelson Mullins Riley & Scarborough LLC (Hebda, Katarzyna)
May 21, 2021 Filing 81 CERTIFICATE of Compliance re #4 Order (Lamberth, James)
May 21, 2021 Filing 80 NOTICE of Appearance by James Andrew Lamberth on behalf of Nelson Mullins Riley & Scarborough LLC (Lamberth, James)
May 20, 2021 Filing 79 Notice for Leave of Absence for the following date(s): 6/18/21-7/2/21, by Robert C. Khayat, Jr. (Khayat, Robert)
May 17, 2021 Filing 78 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by C. Jackson Hoover, Heather Greiner, Edward William Spratt, Matthew S. Greiner. Credo Financial Services, LLC waiver mailed on 5/7/2021, answer due 7/6/2021. (Simpson, Tyler)
May 15, 2021 Filing 77 CERTIFICATE of Compliance (Little, Samuel)
May 15, 2021 Filing 76 NOTICE of Appearance by Samuel Fenn Little, Jr on behalf of Credo Financial Services, LLC (Little, Samuel)
May 11, 2021 Filing 75 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by C. Jackson Hoover, Heather Greiner, Edward William Spratt, Matthew S. Greiner. Bennett Thrasher, LLC waiver mailed on 4/7/2021, answer due 6/7/2021. (Simpson, Tyler)
May 5, 2021 Filing 74 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by C. Jackson Hoover, Heather Greiner, Edward William Spratt, Matthew S. Greiner. John R. Langford waiver mailed on 5/4/2021, answer due 7/6/2021. (Simpson, Tyler)
May 5, 2021 Filing 73 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by C. Jackson Hoover, Heather Greiner, Edward William Spratt, Matthew S. Greiner. Jon R. Langford, CPA, PC waiver mailed on 5/4/2021, answer due 7/6/2021. (Simpson, Tyler)
May 5, 2021 Filing 72 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by C. Jackson Hoover, Heather Greiner, Edward William Spratt, Matthew S. Greiner. Oxygen Financial, Inc. waiver mailed on 4/8/2021, answer due 6/7/2021. (Simpson, Tyler)
May 5, 2021 Filing 71 NOTICE of Appearance by John M Malutinok on behalf of Jon R. Langford, CPA, PC, John R. Langford (Malutinok, John)
May 5, 2021 Filing 70 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by C. Jackson Hoover, Heather Greiner, Edward William Spratt, Matthew S. Greiner. Claud Clark, III waiver mailed on 4/8/2021, answer due 6/7/2021. (Simpson, Tyler)
May 5, 2021 Filing 69 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by C. Jackson Hoover, Heather Greiner, Edward William Spratt, Matthew S. Greiner. Clark-Davis, PC waiver mailed on 4/8/2021, answer due 6/7/2021. (Simpson, Tyler)
May 5, 2021 Filing 68 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by C. Jackson Hoover, Heather Greiner, Edward William Spratt, Matthew S. Greiner. Thomas F. Wingard waiver mailed on 4/8/2021, answer due 6/7/2021. (Simpson, Tyler)
May 5, 2021 Filing 67 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by C. Jackson Hoover, Heather Greiner, Edward William Spratt, Matthew S. Greiner. Martin H. Van Sant waiver mailed on 4/8/2021, answer due 6/7/2021. (Simpson, Tyler)
May 5, 2021 Filing 66 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by C. Jackson Hoover, Heather Greiner, Edward William Spratt, Matthew S. Greiner. Van Sant and Wingard, LLC waiver mailed on 4/8/2021, answer due 6/7/2021. (Simpson, Tyler)
May 4, 2021 Filing 65 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by C. Jackson Hoover, Heather Greiner, Edward William Spratt, Matthew S. Greiner. Nelson Mullins Riley & Scarborough LLC waiver mailed on 4/8/2021, answer due 6/7/2021. (Simpson, Tyler)
May 3, 2021 Filing 64 CERTIFICATE of Compliance re #4 Order (Bell, Jason)
April 30, 2021 Filing 63 CERTIFICATE of Compliance (Peterson, Jennifer)
April 30, 2021 Filing 62 NOTICE of Appearance by Jennifer Peterson on behalf of Morris Manning & Martin, LLP, Timothy Pollock (Peterson, Jennifer)
April 30, 2021 Filing 61 CERTIFICATE of Compliance (Rains, John)
April 30, 2021 Filing 60 NOTICE of Appearance by John H. Rains, IV on behalf of Morris Manning & Martin, LLP, Timothy Pollock (Rains, John)
April 30, 2021 Filing 59 CERTIFICATE of Compliance (Floyd, John)
April 30, 2021 Filing 58 NOTICE of Appearance by John Earl Floyd on behalf of Morris Manning & Martin, LLP, Timothy Pollock (Floyd, John)
April 29, 2021 Filing 57 CERTIFICATE of Compliance re #4 Order (Clarke, Matthew)
April 29, 2021 Filing 56 CERTIFICATE of Compliance re #4 Order (Rollins, Anthony)
April 29, 2021 Filing 55 CERTIFICATE of Compliance re #4 Order (Smith, Gregory)
April 29, 2021 Filing 54 CERTIFICATE of Compliance re #4 Order (Delaney, Colin)
April 29, 2021 Filing 53 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by C. Jackson Hoover, Heather Greiner, Edward William Spratt, Matthew S. Greiner. Timothy Pollock waiver mailed on 4/7/2021, answer due 6/7/2021. (Simpson, Tyler)
April 29, 2021 Filing 52 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by C. Jackson Hoover, Heather Greiner, Edward William Spratt, Matthew S. Greiner. Morris Manning & Martin, LLP waiver mailed on 4/7/2021, answer due 6/7/2021. (Simpson, Tyler)
April 23, 2021 Filing 51 NOTICE of Appearance by Steven Anthony Vickery on behalf of Atlantic Coast Conservancy, Inc., Robert D. Keller (Vickery, Steven)
April 23, 2021 Filing 50 NOTICE of Appearance by Anthony Joseph Rollins on behalf of Atlantic Coast Conservancy, Inc., Robert D. Keller (Rollins, Anthony)
April 23, 2021 Filing 49 NOTICE of Appearance by Gregory Keith Smith on behalf of Atlantic Coast Conservancy, Inc., Robert D. Keller (Smith, Gregory)
April 23, 2021 Filing 48 NOTICE of Appearance by Jason S. Bell on behalf of Atlantic Coast Conservancy, Inc., Robert D. Keller (Bell, Jason)
April 23, 2021 Filing 47 NOTICE of Appearance by Colin Dang Delaney on behalf of Atlantic Coast Conservancy, Inc., Robert D. Keller (Delaney, Colin)
April 22, 2021 Filing 46 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by C. Jackson Hoover, Heather Greiner, Edward William Spratt, Matthew S. Greiner. Robert D. Keller waiver mailed on 4/7/2021, answer due 6/7/2021. (Simpson, Tyler)
April 22, 2021 Filing 45 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by C. Jackson Hoover, Heather Greiner, Edward William Spratt, Matthew S. Greiner. Atlantic Coast Conservancy, Inc. waiver mailed on 4/7/2021, answer due 6/7/2021. (Simpson, Tyler)
April 15, 2021 Filing 44 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by C. Jackson Hoover, Heather Greiner, Edward William Spratt, Matthew S. Greiner. AquaFusion, Inc. waiver mailed on 4/8/2021, answer due 6/7/2021. (Simpson, Tyler)
April 14, 2021 Opinion or Order ORDER granting #26 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice of William Ralph Canada, Jr. Approved by Judge Steven D. Grimberg on April 14, 2021. If the applicant does not have CM/ECF access in the Northern District of Georgia already, they must request access at http://pacer.gov. If they have electronically filed in this district in a previous case, please omit this step.(ash)
April 14, 2021 Opinion or Order ORDER granting #3 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice of David R. Deary. Approved by Judge Steven D. Grimberg on April 14, 2021. If the applicant does not have CM/ECF access in the Northern District of Georgia already, they must request access at http://pacer.gov. If they have electronically filed in this district in a previous case, please omit this step.(ash)
April 14, 2021 Opinion or Order ORDER granting #27 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Wilson Edward Wray, Jr. Approved by Judge Steven D. Grimberg on April 14, 2021. If the applicant does not have CM/ECF access in the Northern District of Georgia already, they must request access at http://pacer.gov. If they have electronically filed in this district in a previous case, please omit this step.(ash)
April 14, 2021 Opinion or Order ORDER granting #29 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice of John William McKenzie. Approved by Judge Steven D. Grimberg on April 14, 2021. If the applicant does not have CM/ECF access in the Northern District of Georgia already, they must request access at http://pacer.gov. If they have electronically filed in this district in a previous case, please omit this step.(ash)
April 14, 2021 Opinion or Order ORDER granting #28 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Tyler McLean Simpson. Approved by Judge Steven D. Grimberg on April 14, 2021. If the applicant does not have CM/ECF access in the Northern District of Georgia already, they must request access at http://pacer.gov. If they have electronically filed in this district in a previous case, please omit this step.(ash)
April 14, 2021 Opinion or Order ORDER granting #30 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Donna Lee. Approved by Judge Steven D. Grimberg on April 14, 2021. If the applicant does not have CM/ECF access in the Northern District of Georgia already, they must request access at http://pacer.gov. If they have electronically filed in this district in a previous case, please omit this step.(ash)
April 13, 2021 Filing 43 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by C. Jackson Hoover, Heather Greiner, Edward William Spratt, Matthew S. Greiner. Ricky B. Novak waiver mailed on 4/6/2021, answer due 6/7/2021. (Simpson, Tyler)
April 13, 2021 Filing 42 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by C. Jackson Hoover, Heather Greiner, Edward William Spratt, Matthew S. Greiner. James Freeman waiver mailed on 4/6/2021, answer due 6/7/2021. (Simpson, Tyler)
April 13, 2021 Filing 41 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by C. Jackson Hoover, Heather Greiner, Edward William Spratt, Matthew S. Greiner. Strategic Capital Partners, LLC waiver mailed on 4/6/2021, answer due 6/7/2021. (Simpson, Tyler)
April 9, 2021 Filing 40 CERTIFICATE of Compliance for Jeven R. Sloan (Sloan, Jeven)
April 9, 2021 Filing 39 CERTIFICATE of Compliance for Tyler M. Simpson (Simpson, Tyler)
April 9, 2021 Filing 38 CERTIFICATE of Compliance for Donna Lee (Lee, Donna)
April 9, 2021 Filing 37 CERTIFICATE of Compliance for John W. McKenzie (McKenzie, John)
April 9, 2021 Filing 36 CERTIFICATE of Compliance for Wilson E. Wray, Jr. (Wray, Wilson)
April 9, 2021 Filing 35 CERTIFICATE of Compliance for W. Ralph Canada, Jr. (Canada, William)
April 9, 2021 Filing 34 CERTIFICATE of Compliance for David R. Deary (Deary, David)
April 8, 2021 APPROVAL by Clerks Office re: #27 APPLICATION for Admission of Wilson Edward Wray, Jr. Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-10878085).. Attorney Wilson Edward Wray, Jr. added appearing on behalf of Heather Greiner, Matthew S. Greiner, C. Jackson Hoover, Edward William Spratt (nmb)
April 8, 2021 APPROVAL by Clerks Office re: #26 APPLICATION for Admission of William Ralph Canada, Jr. Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-10878064).. Attorney William Ralph Canada, Jr. added appearing on behalf of Heather Greiner, Matthew S. Greiner, C. Jackson Hoover, Edward William Spratt (nmb)
April 8, 2021 APPROVAL by Clerks Office re: #28 APPLICATION for Admission of Tyler McLean Simpson Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-10878104).. Attorney Tyler McLean Simpson added appearing on behalf of Heather Greiner, Matthew S. Greiner, C. Jackson Hoover, Edward William Spratt (nmb)
April 8, 2021 APPROVAL by Clerks Office re: #30 APPLICATION for Admission of Donna Lee Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-10878693).. Attorney Donna Lee added appearing on behalf of Heather Greiner, Matthew S. Greiner, C. Jackson Hoover, Edward William Spratt (nmb)
April 8, 2021 APPROVAL by Clerks Office re: #29 APPLICATION for Admission of John William McKenzie Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-10878664).. Attorney Edward Jon Rappaport added appearing on behalf of Heather Greiner, Matthew S. Greiner, C. Jackson Hoover, Edward William Spratt (nmb)
April 6, 2021 APPROVAL by Clerks Office re: #3 APPLICATION for Admission of David R. Deary Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-10871928). Attorney David R. Deary added appearing on behalf of Heather Greiner, Matthew S. Greiner, C. Jackson Hoover, Edward William Spratt (cdg)
April 5, 2021 Filing 33 Electronic Summons Issued as to Credo Financial Services, LLC, James Freeman, Georgia-Alabama Land Trust, Inc., Jon R. Langford, CPA, PC, John R. Langford, Martin H. Van Sant, Van Sant and Wingard, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Summons Freeman, #2 Summons Georgia - Alabama, #3 Summons Langford CPA, #4 Summons Langford, #5 Summons Van Sant and Wingard LLC, #6 Summons Van Sant)(jkb)
April 5, 2021 Filing 32 Electronic Summons Issued as to AquaFusion, Inc., Atlantic Coast Conservancy, Inc., Bennett Thrasher, LLC, Bridge Capital Associates, Inc., Claud Clark, III, Clark-Davis, PC, Thomas F. Wingard. (Attachments: #1 Summons Aquafusion, #2 Summons Atlantic, #3 Summons Bennett, #4 Summons Bridge Capital, #5 Summons Clark -Davis, #6 Summons Claud Clark)(jkb)
April 5, 2021 Filing 31 Electronic Summons Issued as to Robert D. Keller, Morris Manning & Martin, LLP, Nelson Mullins Riley & Scarborough LLC, Ricky B. Novak, Oxygen Financial, Inc., Timothy Pollock, Strategic Capital Partners, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Summons Morris, Manning and Martin, #2 Summons Nelson, #3 Summons Novak, #4 Summons Oxygen, #5 Summons Pollock, #6 Summons Strategic)(jkb)
April 5, 2021 Filing 30 APPLICATION for Admission of Donna Lee Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-10878693).by Heather Greiner, Matthew S. Greiner, C. Jackson Hoover, Edward William Spratt. (Rappaport, Edward) Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse.
April 5, 2021 Filing 29 APPLICATION for Admission of John William McKenzie Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-10878664).by Heather Greiner, Matthew S. Greiner, C. Jackson Hoover, Edward William Spratt. (Rappaport, Edward) Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse.
April 5, 2021 Filing 28 APPLICATION for Admission of Tyler McLean Simpson Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-10878104).by Heather Greiner, Matthew S. Greiner, C. Jackson Hoover, Edward William Spratt. (Rappaport, Edward) Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse.
April 5, 2021 Filing 27 APPLICATION for Admission of Wilson Edward Wray, Jr. Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-10878085).by Heather Greiner, Matthew S. Greiner, C. Jackson Hoover, Edward William Spratt. (Rappaport, Edward) Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse.
April 5, 2021 Filing 26 APPLICATION for Admission of William Ralph Canada, Jr. Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-10878064).by Heather Greiner, Matthew S. Greiner, C. Jackson Hoover, Edward William Spratt. (Rappaport, Edward) Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse.
April 5, 2021 Filing 25 PROPOSED SUMMONS filed by Heather Greiner, Matthew S. Greiner, C. Jackson Hoover, Edward William Spratt to Van Sant and Wingard, LLC (Sloan, Jeven)
April 5, 2021 Filing 24 PROPOSED SUMMONS filed by Heather Greiner, Matthew S. Greiner, C. Jackson Hoover, Edward William Spratt to Timothy Pollock (Sloan, Jeven)
April 5, 2021 Filing 23 PROPOSED SUMMONS filed by Heather Greiner, Matthew S. Greiner, C. Jackson Hoover, Edward William Spratt Thomas F. Wingard (Sloan, Jeven)
April 5, 2021 Filing 22 PROPOSED SUMMONS filed by Heather Greiner, Matthew S. Greiner, C. Jackson Hoover, Edward William Spratt to Strategic Capital Partners, LLC (Sloan, Jeven)
April 5, 2021 Filing 21 PROPOSED SUMMONS filed by Heather Greiner, Matthew S. Greiner, C. Jackson Hoover, Edward William Spratt Robert D. Keller (Sloan, Jeven)
April 5, 2021 Filing 20 PROPOSED SUMMONS filed by Heather Greiner, Matthew S. Greiner, C. Jackson Hoover, Edward William Spratt Ricky B. Novak (Sloan, Jeven)
April 5, 2021 Filing 19 PROPOSED SUMMONS filed by Heather Greiner, Matthew S. Greiner, C. Jackson Hoover, Edward William Spratt to Oxygen Financial, Inc. (Sloan, Jeven)
April 5, 2021 Filing 18 PROPOSED SUMMONS filed by Heather Greiner, Matthew S. Greiner, C. Jackson Hoover, Edward William Spratt to Nelson Mullins Riley & Scarborough (Sloan, Jeven)
April 5, 2021 Filing 17 PROPOSED SUMMONS filed by Heather Greiner, Matthew S. Greiner, C. Jackson Hoover, Edward William Spratt to Morris, Manning & Martin, LLP (Sloan, Jeven)
April 5, 2021 Filing 16 PROPOSED SUMMONS filed by Heather Greiner, Matthew S. Greiner, C. Jackson Hoover, Edward William Spratt to Martin H. Van Sant (Sloan, Jeven)
April 5, 2021 Filing 15 PROPOSED SUMMONS filed by Heather Greiner, Matthew S. Greiner, C. Jackson Hoover, Edward William Spratt to Jon R. Langford, CPA, P.C. (Sloan, Jeven)
April 5, 2021 Filing 14 PROPOSED SUMMONS filed by Heather Greiner, Matthew S. Greiner, C. Jackson Hoover, Edward William Spratt Jon R. Langford (Sloan, Jeven)
April 5, 2021 Filing 13 PROPOSED SUMMONS filed by Heather Greiner, Matthew S. Greiner, C. Jackson Hoover, Edward William Spratt to James Freeman (Sloan, Jeven)
April 5, 2021 Filing 12 PROPOSED SUMMONS filed by Heather Greiner, Matthew S. Greiner, C. Jackson Hoover, Edward William Spratt to Georgia-Alabama Land Trust, Inc. (Sloan, Jeven)
April 5, 2021 Filing 11 PROPOSED SUMMONS filed by Heather Greiner, Matthew S. Greiner, C. Jackson Hoover, Edward William Spratt to Credo Financial Services, LLC (Sloan, Jeven)
April 5, 2021 Filing 10 PROPOSED SUMMONS filed by Heather Greiner, Matthew S. Greiner, C. Jackson Hoover, Edward William Spratt to Claude Clark III (Sloan, Jeven)
April 5, 2021 Filing 9 PROPOSED SUMMONS filed by Heather Greiner, Matthew S. Greiner, C. Jackson Hoover, Edward William Spratt to Clark~Davis, P.C. (Sloan, Jeven)
April 5, 2021 Filing 8 PROPOSED SUMMONS filed by Heather Greiner, Matthew S. Greiner, C. Jackson Hoover, Edward William Spratt to Bridge Capital Associates, Inc. (Sloan, Jeven)
April 5, 2021 Filing 7 PROPOSED SUMMONS filed by Heather Greiner, Matthew S. Greiner, C. Jackson Hoover, Edward William Spratt (Sloan, Jeven)
April 5, 2021 Filing 6 PROPOSED SUMMONS filed by Heather Greiner, Matthew S. Greiner, C. Jackson Hoover, Edward William Spratt (Sloan, Jeven)
April 5, 2021 Filing 5 PROPOSED SUMMONS filed by Heather Greiner, Matthew S. Greiner, C. Jackson Hoover, Edward William Spratt (Sloan, Jeven)
April 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 STANDING ORDER Regarding Civil Litigation. Ordered by Judge Steven D. Grimberg on April 2, 2021. (ash)
April 1, 2021 Filing 3 APPLICATION for Admission of David R. Deary Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-10871928).by Heather Greiner, Matthew S. Greiner, C. Jackson Hoover, Edward William Spratt. (Rappaport, Edward) Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse.
April 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ELEVENTH AMENDMENT TO GENERAL ORDER 20-01 RE: COURT OPERATIONS UNDER THE EXIGENT CIRCUMSTANCES CREATED BY COVID-19 AND RELATED CORONA VIRUS. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 3/9/2021. (eop)
March 30, 2021 Filing 1 CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT with Jury Demand filed by C. Jackson Hoover, Heather Greiner, Edward William Spratt and Matthew S. Greiner. (Filing fee $402.00, receipt number AGANDC-10866185) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(eop) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hoover et al v. Strategic Capital Partners, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Georgia-Alabama Land Trust, Inc.
Represented By: Kyler Lee Wise
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James Freeman
Represented By: Billie Barker Pritchard
Represented By: David Lewis Balser
Represented By: James Andrew Pratt
Represented By: Jeffrey David Miles
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bridge Capital Associates, Inc.
Represented By: Alan Mitchell Wolper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Morris Manning & Martin, LLP
Represented By: Jennifer Peterson
Represented By: John H. Rains, IV
Represented By: John Earl Floyd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Atlantic Coast Conservancy, Inc.
Represented By: Anthony Joseph Rollins
Represented By: Steven Anthony Vickery
Represented By: Gregory Keith Smith
Represented By: Jason S. Bell
Represented By: Colin Dang Delaney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thomas F. Wingard
Represented By: Eric S. Fisher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Strategic Capital Partners, LLC
Represented By: Billie Barker Pritchard
Represented By: David Lewis Balser
Represented By: James Andrew Pratt
Represented By: Jeffrey David Miles
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert D. Keller
Represented By: Anthony Joseph Rollins
Represented By: Steven Anthony Vickery
Represented By: Gregory Keith Smith
Represented By: Jason S. Bell
Represented By: Colin Dang Delaney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Credo Financial Services, LLC
Represented By: Samuel Fenn Little, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Timothy Pollock
Represented By: Jennifer Peterson
Represented By: John H. Rains, IV
Represented By: John Earl Floyd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Martin H. Van Sant
Represented By: Eric S. Fisher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bennett Thrasher, LLC
Represented By: Dana Kristin Maine
Represented By: Travis Martin Cashbaugh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ricky B. Novak
Represented By: Billie Barker Pritchard
Represented By: David Lewis Balser
Represented By: James Andrew Pratt
Represented By: Jeffrey David Miles
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Claud Clark, III
Represented By: Robert C. Khayat, Jr.
Represented By: Brian Spielman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John R. Langford
Represented By: Shannon McKenzie Sprinkle
Represented By: John M Malutinok
Represented By: Daniel Millman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AquaFusion, Inc.
Represented By: Timothy S. Baird
Represented By: Gregory R. Crochet
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Van Sant and Wingard, LLC
Represented By: Eric S. Fisher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jon R. Langford, CPA, PC
Represented By: Shannon McKenzie Sprinkle
Represented By: John M Malutinok
Represented By: Daniel Millman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Clark-Davis, PC
Represented By: Robert C. Khayat, Jr.
Represented By: Brian Spielman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Georgia Land Trust, Inc.
Represented By: Kyler Lee Wise
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Oxygen Financial, Inc.
Represented By: Keely Collins
Represented By: Louis G. McBryan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nelson Mullins Riley & Scarborough LLC
Represented By: James Andrew Lamberth
Represented By: Katarzyna Anna Hebda
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cherry Bekaert LLP F/K/A
Represented By: Andrew Stephen Koelz
Represented By: Eric Jon Taylor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bryan Cave Leighton Paisner LLP
Represented By: Daniel Stanley Nowicki
Represented By: Joseph R. Rose
Represented By: Kevin Stuart Rosen
Represented By: Brian McKinley Underwood, Jr.
Represented By: Eric Schroeder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Conexus CPA Group, LLC
Represented By: Andrew Stephen Koelz
Represented By: Eric Jon Taylor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Triangle Land Conservancy
Represented By: Martin A Shelton
Represented By: Ronald Scott Masterson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Foothills Land Conservancy, Inc..
Represented By: Donald Brown
Represented By: William Dowdy White
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Private Client Law Group, PC
Represented By: Christine L. Mast
Represented By: Joseph Hall Wieseman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Aaron Kowan
Represented By: Christine L. Mast
Represented By: Joseph Hall Wieseman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jason Cordon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sean Honeywell
Represented By: Christine L. Mast
Represented By: Joseph Hall Wieseman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bryan Cave LLP
Represented By: Daniel Stanley Nowicki
Represented By: Joseph R. Rose
Represented By: Kevin Stuart Rosen
Represented By: Brian McKinley Underwood, Jr.
Represented By: Eric Schroeder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mccalip & Company, Inc.
Represented By: Eric Joseph Breithaupt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dantin Financial, LLC
Represented By: Michael Carter Palmintier
Represented By: Jonathan R. Chally
Represented By: Rebecca Lunceford Kolb
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chris A. Dantin
Represented By: Michael Carter Palmintier
Represented By: Jonathan R. Chally
Represented By: Rebecca Lunceford Kolb
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Frazier & Deeter, L.L.C.
Represented By: Johannes Stuart Kingma
Represented By: John Clay deMoulpied
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: C. Jackson Hoover
Represented By: Edward Jon Rappaport
Represented By: Donna Lee
Represented By: William Ralph Canada, Jr.
Represented By: Wilson Edward Wray, Jr.
Represented By: David R. Deary
Represented By: Tyler McLean Simpson
Represented By: John William McKenzie, III
Represented By: Jeven R. Sloan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Edward William Spratt
Represented By: Edward Jon Rappaport
Represented By: Donna Lee
Represented By: William Ralph Canada, Jr.
Represented By: Wilson Edward Wray, Jr.
Represented By: David R. Deary
Represented By: Tyler McLean Simpson
Represented By: John William McKenzie, III
Represented By: Jeven R. Sloan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Heather Greiner
Represented By: Edward Jon Rappaport
Represented By: Donna Lee
Represented By: William Ralph Canada, Jr.
Represented By: Wilson Edward Wray, Jr.
Represented By: David R. Deary
Represented By: Tyler McLean Simpson
Represented By: John William McKenzie, III
Represented By: Jeven R. Sloan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Matthew S. Greiner
Represented By: Edward Jon Rappaport
Represented By: Donna Lee
Represented By: William Ralph Canada, Jr.
Represented By: Wilson Edward Wray, Jr.
Represented By: David R. Deary
Represented By: Tyler McLean Simpson
Represented By: John William McKenzie, III
Represented By: Jeven R. Sloan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Samuel Agnew
Represented By: David R. Deary
Represented By: Tyler McLean Simpson
Represented By: Jeven R. Sloan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sandi Douget
Represented By: David R. Deary
Represented By: Tyler McLean Simpson
Represented By: Jeven R. Sloan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ronald Hebert
Represented By: David R. Deary
Represented By: Tyler McLean Simpson
Represented By: Jeven R. Sloan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?