Asian Americans Advancing Justice-Atlanta v. Raffensperger et al
Plaintiff: Asian Americans Advancing Justice-Atlanta, Thuy Hang Tran, Thao Tran, Anjali Enjeti-Sydow, Nora Aquino, Steven J Paik and Deepum Patel
Defendant: Anh Lee, Brad Raffensperger, Rebecca Sullivan, David Worley, Matthew Mashburn, Patricia Pullar, Lynn Ledford, Baoky N. Vu, Carla Radzikinas, George Awuku, Diane Givens, Matthew Blender, Gwinnett County Board of Registrations and Elections, Forsyth County Board of Voter Registrations and Elections, DeKalb County Board of Registrations and Elections, Samuel E. Tillman, Dorothy F. Hall, Vernetta K. Nuriddin, John Mangano, Mandi B Smith, Fulton County Registration and Elections Board, Joel Natt, Susan Motter, Stephen W. Day, Aaron V. Johnson, Barbara Luth, Carol Wesley, Darlene Johnson, Cobb County Board of Elections and Registration, Santiago Marquez, Alice O'Lenick, Dele L. Smith, Shauna Dozier, Janine Eveler, Mark Wingate, Clayton County Board of Elections and Registration, Kathleen D. Ruth, Richard L. Barron, Fred Aiken, Darryl O. Wilson, Jr., Wandy Taylor, Erica Hamilton, Pat Gartland, Anthony Lewis, Alex Wan, Jessica M. Brooks, Randy Ingram and Phil Daniell
Intervenor Defendant: Georgia Republican Party, Inc., National Republican Senatorial Committee, National Republican Congressional Committee and Republican National Committee
Case Number: 1:2021cv01333
Filed: April 1, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: J P Boulee
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Voting
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 1, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 1, 2021 Filing 35 Consent MOTION to Substitute Party Kelvin Williams for Lynn Ledfordby Nora Aquino, Asian Americans Advancing Justice-Atlanta, Anjali Enjeti-Sydow, Steven J Paik, Deepum Patel, Thao Tran, Thuy Hang Tran. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Nguyen, Phi)
May 28, 2021 APPROVAL by Clerks Office re: #34 APPLICATION for Admission of H. Christopher Bartolomucci Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-10997531). Attorney H. Christopher Bartolomucci added appearing on behalf of Anh Lee, Matthew Mashburn, Brad Raffensperger, Rebecca Sullivan, David Worley (cdg)
May 28, 2021 Opinion or Order ORDER granting #33 #34 Applications for Admission Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Judge J. P. Boulee on 5/28/21. If the applicant does not have CM/ECF access in the Northern District of Georgia already, they must request access at http://pacer.gov. If they have electronically filed in this district in a previous case, please omit this step.(bnw)
May 28, 2021 APPROVAL by Clerks Office re: #33 APPLICATION for Admission of Gene C. Schaerr Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-10997482). Attorney Gene C. Schaerr added appearing on behalf of Anh Lee, Matthew Mashburn, Brad Raffensperger, Rebecca Sullivan, David Worley (cdg)
May 25, 2021 Filing 34 APPLICATION for Admission of H. Christopher Bartolomucci Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-10997531).by Anh Lee, Matthew Mashburn, Brad Raffensperger, Rebecca Sullivan, David Worley. (Tyson, Bryan) Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse.
May 25, 2021 Filing 33 APPLICATION for Admission of Gene C. Schaerr Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-10997482).by Anh Lee, Matthew Mashburn, Brad Raffensperger, Rebecca Sullivan, David Worley. (Tyson, Bryan) Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse.
May 24, 2021 Opinion or Order ORDER: For good cause shown, the Court GRANTS the parties' #31 Consent Motion to extend time. The State Defendants' response to Plaintiffs' Amended Complaint is due by June 11, 2021. Signed by Judge J. P. Boulee on 5/24/21. (bnw)
May 12, 2021 Filing 32 NOTICE of Appearance by Charlene S McGowan on behalf of Anh Lee, Matthew Mashburn, Brad Raffensperger, Rebecca Sullivan, David Worley (McGowan, Charlene)
May 11, 2021 Submission of #20 MOTION to Intervene , to District Judge J. P. Boulee. (ddm)
May 7, 2021 Filing 31 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, by Anh Lee, Matthew Mashburn, Brad Raffensperger, Rebecca Sullivan, David Worley. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Tyson, Bryan)
May 7, 2021 Filing 30 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Matthew Mashburn, Rebecca Sullivan, Anh Lee, David Worley, Brad Raffensperger. (Tyson, Bryan)
May 3, 2021 Filing 29 REPLY to Response to Motion re #20 MOTION to Intervene filed by Georgia Republican Party, Inc., National Republican Congressional Committee, National Republican Senatorial Committee, Republican National Committee. (Norris, Cameron)
April 28, 2021 Filing 28 Electronic Summons Issued as to Fred Aiken, George Awuku, Richard L. Barron, Matthew Blender, Jessica M. Brooks, Phil Daniell, Stephen W. Day, Shauna Dozier, Janine Eveler, Pat Gartland, Diane Givens, Dorothy F. Hall, Erica Hamilton, Randy Ingram, Aaron V. Johnson, Darlene Johnson, Lynn Ledford, Anthony Lewis, Barbara Luth, John Mangano, Santiago Marquez, Susan Motter, Joel Natt, Vernetta K. Nuriddin, Alice O'Lenick, Patricia Pullar, Carla Radzikinas, Kathleen D. Ruth, Dele L. Smith, Mandi B Smith, Wandy Taylor, Samuel E. Tillman, Baoky N. Vu, Alex Wan, Carol Wesley, Darryl O. Wilson, Jr., Mark Wingate. (ddm)
April 27, 2021 Filing 27 First AMENDED COMPLAINT for Injunctive and Declaratory Relief against All Defendants filed by Asian Americans Advancing Justice-Atlanta, Steven J Paik, Thuy Hang Tran, Thao Tran, Deepum Patel, Nora Aquino, Anjali Enjeti-Sydow. (Attachments: #1 Summons for Aaron V. Johnson, #2 Summons for Alex Wan, #3 Summons for Alice O'Lenick, #4 Summons for Anthony Lewis, #5 Summons for Baoky N. Vu, #6 Summons for Barbara Luth, #7 Summons for Carla Radzikinas, #8 Summons for Carol Wesley, #9 Summons for Darlene Johnson, #10 Summons for Daryl O. Wilson Jr., #11 Summons for Dele L. Smith, #12 Summons for Diane Givens, #13 Summons for Dorothy F. Hall, #14 Summons for Erica Hamilton, #15 Summons for Fred Aiken, #16 Summons for George Awuku, #17 Summons for Janine Eveler, #18 Summons for Jessica M. Brooks, #19 Summons for Joel Natt, #20 Summons for John Mangano, #21 Summons for Kathleen D. Ruth, #22 Summons for Lynn Ledford, #23 Summons for Mandi Smith, #24 Summons for Mark Wingate, #25 Summons for Matthew Blender, #26 Summons for Pat Gartland, #27 Summons for Patricia Pullar, #28 Summons for Phil Daniell, #29 Summons for Randy Ingram, #30 Summons for Richard L. Barron, #31 Summons for Samuel E. Tillman, #32 Summons for Santiago Marquez, #33 Summons for Shauna Dozier, #34 Summons for Stephen W. Day, #35 Summons for Susan Motter, #36 Summons for Vernetta K. Nuriddin, #37 Summons for Wandy Taylor)(Nguyen, Phi) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form.
April 27, 2021 Opinion or Order ORDER granting #14 Applications for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Adam Lauridsen. If the applicant does not have CM/ECF access in the Northern District of Georgia already, they must request access at http://pacer.gov. If they have electronically filed in this district in a previous case, please omit this step. Signed by Judge J. P. Boulee on 4/27/21. (bnw)
April 23, 2021 Filing 26 RESPONSE in Opposition re #20 MOTION to Intervene filed by Asian Americans Advancing Justice-Atlanta. (Nguyen, Phi)
April 23, 2021 APPROVAL by Clerks Office re: #25 APPLICATION for Admission of Cameron Thomas Norris Pro Hac Vice.. Attorney Cameron T. Norris added appearing on behalf of Georgia Republican Party, Inc., National Republican Congressional Committee, National Republican Senatorial Committee, Republican National Committee (nmb)
April 23, 2021 APPROVAL by Clerks Office re: #24 APPLICATION for Admission of Tyler R. Green Pro Hac Vice.. Attorney Tyler R. Green added appearing on behalf of Georgia Republican Party, Inc., National Republican Congressional Committee, National Republican Senatorial Committee, Republican National Committee (nmb)
April 20, 2021 Filing 25 APPLICATION for Admission of Cameron Thomas Norris Pro Hac Vice.by Georgia Republican Party, Inc., National Republican Congressional Committee, National Republican Senatorial Committee, Republican National Committee. (Carver, William) Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse.
April 20, 2021 Filing 24 APPLICATION for Admission of Tyler R. Green Pro Hac Vice.by Georgia Republican Party, Inc., National Republican Congressional Committee, National Republican Senatorial Committee, Republican National Committee. (Carver, William) Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse.
April 20, 2021 RETURN of #22 APPLICATION for Admission of Tyler R. Green Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number BGANDC-10903190). to attorney for correction regarding incorrect local counsel bar number. (nmb)
April 20, 2021 RETURN of #23 APPLICATION for Admission of Cameron Thomas Norris Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-10903470). to attorney for correction regarding incorrect local counsel bar number. (nmb)
April 15, 2021 Filing 23 APPLICATION for Admission of Cameron Thomas Norris Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-10903470).by Georgia Republican Party, Inc., National Republican Congressional Committee, National Republican Senatorial Committee, Republican National Committee. (Carver, William) Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse.
April 15, 2021 Filing 22 APPLICATION for Admission of Tyler R. Green Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number BGANDC-10903190).by Georgia Republican Party, Inc., National Republican Congressional Committee, National Republican Senatorial Committee, Republican National Committee. (Carver, William) Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse.
April 13, 2021 Filing 21 Notice for Leave of Absence for the following date(s): 5/24/21, 5/25/21, 5/26/21, 5/27/21, 5/28/21, 7/22/21, 7/23/21, 9/27/21, 9/28/21, 9/29/21, 9/30/21, 10/1/21, by Bryan P. Tyson. (Tyson, Bryan)
April 13, 2021 Opinion or Order ORDER granting #9 #11 #12 #13 #15 #16 Applications for Admission Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Judge J. P. Boulee on 4/13/21. If the applicant does not have CM/ECF access in the Northern District of Georgia already, they must request access at http://pacer.gov. If they have electronically filed in this district in a previous case, please omit this step.(bnw)
April 9, 2021 Filing 20 MOTION to Intervene with Brief In Support by Republican National Committee, National Republican Senatorial Committee, National Republican Congressional Committee, Georgia Republican Party, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support of Motion to Intervene, #2 Proposed Answer)(Carver, William)
April 9, 2021 APPROVAL by Clerks Office re: #14 APPLICATION for Admission of R. Adam Lauridsen Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-10879880).. Attorney R. Adam Lauridsen added appearing on behalf of Asian Americans Advancing Justice-Atlanta (nmb)
April 9, 2021 APPROVAL by Clerks Office re: #15 APPLICATION for Admission of Candice Mai Khanh Nguyen Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-10879882).. Attorney Candice Mai Khanh Nguyen added appearing on behalf of Asian Americans Advancing Justice-Atlanta (nmb)
April 9, 2021 APPROVAL by Clerks Office re: #13 APPLICATION for Admission of Leo L. Lam Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-10879879).. Attorney Leo L. Lam added appearing on behalf of Asian Americans Advancing Justice-Atlanta (nmb)
April 9, 2021 APPROVAL by Clerks Office re: #11 APPLICATION for Admission of Niyati Shah Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-10879870).. Attorney Niyati Shah added appearing on behalf of Asian Americans Advancing Justice-Atlanta (nmb)
April 9, 2021 APPROVAL by Clerks Office re: #16 APPLICATION for Admission of Terry Ao Minnis Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-10882719).. Attorney Terry Ao Minnis added appearing on behalf of Asian Americans Advancing Justice-Atlanta (nmb)
April 8, 2021 APPROVAL by Clerks Office re: #9 APPLICATION for Admission of Eileen Jean Ma Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-10877215).. Attorney Eileen Jean Ma added appearing on behalf of Asian Americans Advancing Justice-Atlanta (nmb)
April 8, 2021 APPROVAL by Clerks Office re: #12 APPLICATION for Admission of Connie Sung Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-10879878).. Attorney Connie P. Sung added appearing on behalf of Asian Americans Advancing Justice-Atlanta (nmb)
April 7, 2021 Filing 19 NOTICE of Appearance by Loree Anne Paradise on behalf of Anh Lee, Matthew Mashburn, Brad Raffensperger, Rebecca Sullivan, David Worley (Paradise, Loree Anne)
April 7, 2021 Filing 18 NOTICE of Appearance by Bryan Francis Jacoutot on behalf of Anh Lee, Matthew Mashburn, Brad Raffensperger, Rebecca Sullivan, David Worley (Jacoutot, Bryan)
April 7, 2021 Filing 17 NOTICE of Appearance by Bryan P. Tyson on behalf of Anh Lee, Matthew Mashburn, Brad Raffensperger, Rebecca Sullivan, David Worley (Tyson, Bryan)
April 6, 2021 Filing 16 APPLICATION for Admission of Terry Ao Minnis Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-10882719).by Asian Americans Advancing Justice-Atlanta. (Nguyen, Phi) Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse.
April 5, 2021 Filing 15 APPLICATION for Admission of Candice Mai Khanh Nguyen Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-10879882).by Asian Americans Advancing Justice-Atlanta. (Nguyen, Phi) Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse.
April 5, 2021 Filing 14 APPLICATION for Admission of R. Adam Lauridsen Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-10879880).by Asian Americans Advancing Justice-Atlanta. (Nguyen, Phi) Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse.
April 5, 2021 Filing 13 APPLICATION for Admission of Leo L. Lam Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-10879879).by Asian Americans Advancing Justice-Atlanta. (Nguyen, Phi) Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse.
April 5, 2021 Filing 12 APPLICATION for Admission of Connie Sung Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-10879878).by Asian Americans Advancing Justice-Atlanta. (Nguyen, Phi) Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse.
April 5, 2021 Filing 11 APPLICATION for Admission of Niyati Shah Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-10879870).by Asian Americans Advancing Justice-Atlanta. (Nguyen, Phi) Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse.
April 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 STANDING ORDER REGARDING CIVIL LITIGATION. Signed by Judge J. P. Boulee on 4/5/21. (bnw)
April 5, 2021 Filing 9 APPLICATION for Admission of Eileen Jean Ma Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-10877215).by Asian Americans Advancing Justice-Atlanta. (Nguyen, Phi) Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse.
April 2, 2021 Filing 8 Certificate of Interested Persons by Asian Americans Advancing Justice-Atlanta. (Li, Hillary)
April 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ELEVENTH AMENDMENT TO GENERAL ORDER 20-01 RE: COURT OPERATIONS UNDER THE EXIGENT CIRCUMSTANCES CREATED BY COVID-19 AND RELATED CORONA VIRUS. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 3/9/2021. (eop)
April 2, 2021 Filing 6 Electronic Summons Issued as to Anh Lee. (eop)
April 2, 2021 Filing 5 Electronic Summons Issued as to Matthew Mashburn. (eop)
April 2, 2021 Filing 4 Electronic Summons Issued as to David Worley. (eop)
April 2, 2021 Filing 3 Electronic Summons Issued as to Rebecca Sullivan. (eop)
April 2, 2021 Filing 2 Electronic Summons Issued as to Brad Raffensperger. (eop)
April 1, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Asian Americans Advancing Justice-Atlanta. (Filing fee $402.00, receipt number AGANDC-10872967) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(eop) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Asian Americans Advancing Justice-Atlanta v. Raffensperger et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anh Lee
Represented By: H. Christopher Bartolomucci
Represented By: Bryan Francis Jacoutot
Represented By: Bryan P. Tyson
Represented By: Gene C. Schaerr
Represented By: Charlene S McGowan
Represented By: Loree Anne Paradise
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brad Raffensperger
Represented By: H. Christopher Bartolomucci
Represented By: Bryan Francis Jacoutot
Represented By: Bryan P. Tyson
Represented By: Gene C. Schaerr
Represented By: Charlene S McGowan
Represented By: Loree Anne Paradise
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rebecca Sullivan
Represented By: H. Christopher Bartolomucci
Represented By: Bryan Francis Jacoutot
Represented By: Bryan P. Tyson
Represented By: Gene C. Schaerr
Represented By: Charlene S McGowan
Represented By: Loree Anne Paradise
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Worley
Represented By: H. Christopher Bartolomucci
Represented By: Bryan Francis Jacoutot
Represented By: Bryan P. Tyson
Represented By: Gene C. Schaerr
Represented By: Charlene S McGowan
Represented By: Loree Anne Paradise
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Matthew Mashburn
Represented By: H. Christopher Bartolomucci
Represented By: Bryan Francis Jacoutot
Represented By: Bryan P. Tyson
Represented By: Gene C. Schaerr
Represented By: Charlene S McGowan
Represented By: Loree Anne Paradise
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Patricia Pullar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lynn Ledford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Baoky N. Vu
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carla Radzikinas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: George Awuku
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Diane Givens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Matthew Blender
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gwinnett County Board of Registrations and Elections
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Forsyth County Board of Voter Registrations and Elections
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DeKalb County Board of Registrations and Elections
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Samuel E. Tillman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dorothy F. Hall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Vernetta K. Nuriddin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Mangano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mandi B Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fulton County Registration and Elections Board
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joel Natt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Susan Motter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stephen W. Day
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Aaron V. Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Barbara Luth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carol Wesley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Darlene Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cobb County Board of Elections and Registration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Santiago Marquez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alice O'Lenick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dele L. Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shauna Dozier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Janine Eveler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mark Wingate
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Clayton County Board of Elections and Registration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kathleen D. Ruth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richard L. Barron
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fred Aiken
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Darryl O. Wilson, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wandy Taylor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Erica Hamilton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pat Gartland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anthony Lewis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alex Wan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jessica M. Brooks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Randy Ingram
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Phil Daniell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Asian Americans Advancing Justice-Atlanta
Represented By: Hillary Li
Represented By: Niyati Shah
Represented By: Phi Nguyen
Represented By: R. Adam Lauridsen
Represented By: Eileen Jean Ma
Represented By: Terry Ao Minnis
Represented By: Candice Mai Khanh Nguyen
Represented By: Leo L. Lam
Represented By: Connie P. Sung
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Thuy Hang Tran
Represented By: Phi Nguyen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Thao Tran
Represented By: Phi Nguyen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anjali Enjeti-Sydow
Represented By: Phi Nguyen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nora Aquino
Represented By: Phi Nguyen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Steven J Paik
Represented By: Phi Nguyen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Deepum Patel
Represented By: Phi Nguyen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor defendant: Georgia Republican Party, Inc.
Represented By: William Dowdy White
Represented By: William Bradley Carver
Represented By: Cameron T. Norris
Represented By: Tyler R. Green
Represented By: John E. Hall, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor defendant: National Republican Senatorial Committee
Represented By: William Dowdy White
Represented By: William Bradley Carver
Represented By: Cameron T. Norris
Represented By: Tyler R. Green
Represented By: John E. Hall, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor defendant: National Republican Congressional Committee
Represented By: William Dowdy White
Represented By: William Bradley Carver
Represented By: Cameron T. Norris
Represented By: Tyler R. Green
Represented By: John E. Hall, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor defendant: Republican National Committee
Represented By: William Dowdy White
Represented By: William Bradley Carver
Represented By: Cameron T. Norris
Represented By: Tyler R. Green
Represented By: John E. Hall, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?