Delta Medical Systems, Inc. v. DRE Health Corp. et al
Plaintiff: Delta Medical Systems, Inc.
Defendant: DRE Health Corp., Ahmed Isaac Bawany, DRE Health Corporation and Sacatelle Holdings, LLC
Case Number: 1:2021cv01687
Filed: April 23, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: William M Ray
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 1125
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 14, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 14, 2021 Filing 20 Amended MOTION to Dismiss with Brief In Support by Ahmed Isaac Bawany, DRE Health Corp., DRE Health Corporation, Sacatelle Holdings, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Brief in support of Amended Motion to Dismiss, #2 Declaration of A. Isaac Bawany, #3 Declaration of Kerry A. Barrett, #4 Declaration of Isaac Schwerd, #5 Text of Proposed Order)(Walsh, Ryan)
June 11, 2021 Filing 19 MOTION to Dismiss by Ahmed Isaac Bawany, DRE Health Corp., DRE Health Corporation, Sacatelle Holdings, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Brief in support of Motion to Dismiss, #2 Declaration of A. Isaac Bawany in support of Motion to Dismiss, #3 Declaration of Kerry A. Barrett in support of Motion to Dimiss, #4 Declaration of Isaac Schwerd in support of Motion to Dismiss, #5 Text of Proposed Order)(Walsh, Ryan)
June 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER GRANTING #17 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice as to Kerry A. Barrett. Signed by Judge William M. Ray, II on 6/1/2021. If the applicant does not have CM/ECF access in the Northern District of Georgia already, they must request access at http://pacer.gov. If they have electronically filed in this district in a previous case, please omit this step.(cmd)
June 1, 2021 Clerk's Certificate of Mailing to Kerry A. Barrett re #18 Order on Application for Admission PHV. (cmd)
May 27, 2021 APPROVAL by Clerks Office re: #17 APPLICATION for Admission of Kerry A. Barrett Pro Hac Vice. Attorney Kerry A. Barrett added appearing on behalf of Ahmed Isaac Bawany, DRE Health Corp., DRE Health Corporation, Sacatelle Holdings, LLC (cdg)
May 20, 2021 Filing 17 APPLICATION for Admission of Kerry A. Barrett Pro Hac Vice.by Ahmed Isaac Bawany, DRE Health Corp., DRE Health Corporation, Sacatelle Holdings, LLC. (Walsh, Ryan) Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse.
May 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER GRANTING #13 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice as to David Witcoff. Signed by Judge William M. Ray, II on 5/19/2021. If the applicant does not have CM/ECF access in the Northern District of Georgia already, they must request access at http://pacer.gov. If they have electronically filed in this district in a previous case, please omit this step.(cmd)
May 20, 2021 RETURN of #15 APPLICATION for Admission of Kerry A. Barrett Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-10984062). to attorney for correction re: see page 3 of application. (cdg)
May 20, 2021 APPROVAL by Clerks Office re: #13 APPLICATION for Admission of David L. Witcoff Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-10980877). Attorney David L. Witcoff added appearing on behalf of Ahmed Isaac Bawany, DRE Health Corp., DRE Health Corporation, Sacatelle Holdings, LLC (cdg)
May 18, 2021 Filing 15 APPLICATION for Admission of Kerry A. Barrett Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-10984062).by Ahmed Isaac Bawany, DRE Health Corp., DRE Health Corporation, Sacatelle Holdings, LLC. (Walsh, Ryan) Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse.
May 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER GRANTING #11 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond. The time for the Defendants in this action to answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint is hereby extended to and through Friday, June 11, 2021. Signed by Judge William M. Ray, II on 5/18/2021. (cmd)
May 17, 2021 Filing 13 APPLICATION for Admission of David L. Witcoff Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-10980877).by Ahmed Isaac Bawany, DRE Health Corp., DRE Health Corporation, Sacatelle Holdings, LLC. (Walsh, Ryan) Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse.
May 17, 2021 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Ryan K. Walsh on behalf of Ahmed Isaac Bawany, DRE Health Corp., DRE Health Corporation, Sacatelle Holdings, LLC (Walsh, Ryan)
May 17, 2021 Filing 11 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond by Ahmed Isaac Bawany, DRE Health Corp., DRE Health Corporation, Sacatelle Holdings, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Walsh, Ryan) Modified on 5/18/2021 to edit motion relief selected. (cmd)
May 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 STANDING ORDER REGARDING CIVIL LITIGATION. (See order for details) Signed by Judge William M. Ray, II on 05/05/2021. (bdb)
May 4, 2021 Filing 9 Return of Service Executed by Delta Medical Systems, Inc.. DRE Health Corp. served on 4/28/2021, answer due 5/19/2021. (Crosby, L.)
April 28, 2021 Filing 8 Return of Service Executed by Delta Medical Systems, Inc.. Sacatelle Holdings, LLC served on 4/28/2021, answer due 5/19/2021. (Crosby, L.)
April 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ELEVENTH AMENDMENT TO GENERAL ORDER 20-01 RE: COURT OPERATIONS UNDER THE EXIGENT CIRCUMSTANCES CREATED BY COVID-19 AND RELATED CORONA VIRUS. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 3/9/21. (eop)
April 26, 2021 Filing 6 Electronic Summons Issued as to Sacatelle Holdings, LLC. (eop)
April 26, 2021 Filing 5 Electronic Summons Issued as to DRE Health Corporation. (eop)
April 26, 2021 Filing 4 Electronic Summons Issued as to Ahmed Isaac Bawany. (eop)
April 26, 2021 Filing 3 Electronic Summons Issued as to DRE Health Corp.. (eop)
April 23, 2021 Filing 2 AO Form 120 forwarded to Commissioner. (eop)
April 23, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand filed by Delta Medical Systems, Inc.. (Filing fee $402.00, receipt number AGANDC-10925361) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit -A -Plaintiffs Trademark Registration, #2 Exhibit -B -Defendants Use of Trademark, #3 Exhibit -C -Defendants' Trademark Application, #4 Exhibit -D -Defendants Email to Plaintiff, #5 Exhibit -E -Plaintiffs Cease and Desist Letter to Sacatelle, #6 Exhibit -F -Plaintiff's Cease and Desist Letter to DRE Health, #7 Civil Cover Sheet)(eop) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form. Modified on 4/26/2021 to correct date filed (eop).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Delta Medical Systems, Inc. v. DRE Health Corp. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Delta Medical Systems, Inc.
Represented By: Dorian Bruce Kennedy
Represented By: L. Clint Crosby
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DRE Health Corp.
Represented By: David L. Witcoff
Represented By: Kerry A. Barrett
Represented By: Ryan K. Walsh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ahmed Isaac Bawany
Represented By: David L. Witcoff
Represented By: Kerry A. Barrett
Represented By: Ryan K. Walsh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DRE Health Corporation
Represented By: David L. Witcoff
Represented By: Kerry A. Barrett
Represented By: Ryan K. Walsh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sacatelle Holdings, LLC
Represented By: David L. Witcoff
Represented By: Kerry A. Barrett
Represented By: Ryan K. Walsh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?