Barnes v. Teva Pharmaceuticals, USA et al
Plaintiff: Rianne Barnes
Defendant: Teva Pharmaceuticals USA Inc, Teva Women's Health Inc, Duramed Pharmaceuticals Inc and Teva Women's Health LLC
Case Number: 1:2021cv01700
Filed: April 26, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Georgia
Office: Atlanta Office
Presiding Judge: Leigh Martin May
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury: Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 26, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 26, 2021 Civil Case Terminated. (tmf)
April 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER INITIAL CONFERENCE: The Court held its Initial Conference in this MDL on February 9, 2021. The below are the orders entered after discussion of these issues at that conference. 1. Leadership structure: After the Court discussed issues concerning the leadership structure with all parties, the Court ORDERED Plaintiffs and Defendants to each file their proposed consent motion and order as to their requested leadership structure and team within 7 days of the date of this order. 2. Future status conferences: The Court will hold status conferences once a month. The next six conferences will take place on the following dates at 10:00 am via zoom: Tuesday, March 9, 2021; Monday, April 12, 2021; Wednesday, May 12, 2021; Monday, June 14, 2021; Tuesday, July 13, 2021; Friday, August 20, 2021. The Court will send out the zoom links prior to the conferences. The parties will submit a proposed consent agenda 3 business days prior to the conference. The parties will also confer as to the format for presenting issues that require additional explanation. When these are necessary, they should also be filed 3 business days before the conference. 3. Stay of responsive pleading obligations: The Court continues the stay of responsive pleading obligations provided for in Section 6(b) of the Court's initial order. 4. Pending motions: The Court DENIES WITHOUT PREJUDICE all pending motions in the individual cases comprising the MDL. These cases are also ADMINISTRATIVELY CLOSED. These terminated motions will later be refiled in accordance with an upcoming Case Management Order. 5. Docketing: All parties are to docket future filings only in the MDL case. The case caption should indicate whether any filing applies to all cases or list the individual cases to which it should apply. 6. Electronic service: The Court ORDERS all attorneys participating in the MDL proceeding to register with the Court's CM/ECF system. Because all attorneys will then receive electronic copies of documents filed in the MDL, the Court ORDERS that electronic service of documents via the Court's CM/ECF system satisfies the obligation of service. Hereafter, unless otherwise ordered, neither the clerk's office nor counsel for the parties shall be obligated to provide service copies of any filings or related orders by U.S. Mail or any other means to attorneys who have not registered with the Court's CM/ECF system. An attorney who is not participating in the MDL and does not want to receive CM/ECF notifications may file a motion to withdraw or a certificate of consent to withdraw in accordance with Local Rule 83.1(E). 7. Initial disclosures: The Court GRANTS the parties' joint request for the Court to excuse the parties from Rule 26(f) initial disclosures; except as to the ParaGard New Drug Application (NDA) that was transferred on or about November 10, 2005, to Duramed Pharmaceuticals, Inc., and produced by TWH, Inc., to plaintiff in the Estrada case. 8. Case management and initial orders: The parties are ORDERED to confer as to proposed orders for the list found herein. See order for further specifics and instructions. Signed by Judge Leigh Martin May on 2/10/2021.(tmf)
April 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ELEVENTH AMENDMENT TO GENERAL ORDER 20-01 RE: COURT OPERATIONS UNDER THE EXIGENT CIRCUMSTANCES CREATED BY COVID-19 AND RELATED CORONAVIRUS. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 3/09/21. (aar)
April 26, 2021 Filing 9 Case transferred in from District of California Northern; Case Number 4:21-cv-02246. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
April 26, 2021 Case electronically transferred to Judge Leigh Martin May, NDGA, pursuant to MDL transfer order (MDL 2974). (jlmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/26/2021) [Transferred from California Northern on 4/26/2021.]
April 26, 2021 Filing 8 MDL CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO 16) MDL 2974: Transferring case to the U.S. District Court, Northern District of Georgia (Atlanta). Signed by The Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation, on 04/26/2021 (jlmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/26/2021) [Transferred from California Northern on 4/26/2021.]
April 16, 2021 Filing 7 Summons Issued as to Duramed Pharmaceuticals, Inc.. (anjS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/16/2021) [Transferred from California Northern on 4/26/2021.]
April 16, 2021 Filing 6 Proposed Summons. (Plesset, Levi) (Filed on 4/16/2021) [Transferred from California Northern on 4/26/2021.]
April 15, 2021 Filing 5 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Rianne Barnes.. (Plesset, Levi) (Filed on 4/15/2021) [Transferred from California Northern on 4/26/2021.]
April 8, 2021 #Electronic filing error. Missing case number. REMINDER- Please ensure that all documents filed have the case number 4:21-cv-2246-KAW. No further action is n ecessary.Re: #1 Complaint, filed by Rianne Barnes (anjS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/8/2021) [Transferred from California Northern on 4/26/2021.]
April 8, 2021 Filing 4 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 6/29/2021. Initial Case Management Conference set for 7/6/2021 01:30 PM in Oakland, - To be determined. (anjS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/8/2021) [Transferred from California Northern on 4/26/2021.]
April 8, 2021 #Electronic filing error. ERRORS found on Summons, Defendants names must match names on the complaint exactly.This filing will not be processed by the clerks office. Please re-file in its entirety. Re: #2 Proposed Summons filed by Rianne Barnes (anjS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/8/2021) [Transferred from California Northern on 4/26/2021.]
April 7, 2021 Filing 3 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 4/21/2021. (mbcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/7/2021) [Transferred from California Northern on 4/26/2021.]
April 7, 2021 Filing 2 Proposed Summons. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons)(Plesset, Levi) (Filed on 4/7/2021) [Transferred from California Northern on 4/26/2021.]
April 7, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand0971-15773329 against All Defendants. Filed by Rianne Barnes. (Filing Fee Paid $402.00 Receipt Number 0971-15773329) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Plesset, Levi) (Filed on 4/7/2021) Modified on 4/7/2021 (mbcS, COURT STAFF). Modified on 4/8/2021 (anjS, COURT STAFF). [Transferred from California Northern on 4/26/2021.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Barnes v. Teva Pharmaceuticals, USA et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Teva Pharmaceuticals USA Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Teva Women's Health Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Duramed Pharmaceuticals Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Teva Women's Health LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rianne Barnes
Represented By: Levi Plesset
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?