Dobbs v. Nationstar Mortgage, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Bruce Dobbs
Defendant: Albertelli Law Group, The Bank of New York Mellon as Trustee for Mastr Trust 2005-8 and Nationstar Mortgage, LLC doing business as "Mr. Cooper"
Case Number: 1:2021cv01796
Filed: April 30, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: Regina D Cannon
Referring Judge: Leigh Martin May
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28:1444
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 26, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 26, 2021 Submission of #8 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM , #7 MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages , #6 MOTION to Stay Pretrial Deadlines and Discovery, to Magistrate Judge Regina D Cannon. (tmf)
May 25, 2021 Submission of #3 First MOTION to Dismiss , #4 First MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM , to Magistrate Judge Regina D Cannon. (tmf)
May 17, 2021 Clerks Notation re #5 Certificate of Interested Persons. Read and approved by LMM. (bnp)
May 7, 2021 Filing 8 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM with Brief In Support by Nationstar Mortgage, LLC, The Bank of New York Mellon as Trustee for Mastr Trust 2005-8. (Attachments: #1 Brief)(Rhadans, Allison)
May 7, 2021 Filing 7 MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages by Nationstar Mortgage, LLC, The Bank of New York Mellon as Trustee for Mastr Trust 2005-8. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Rhadans, Allison)
May 7, 2021 Filing 6 MOTION to Stay Pretrial Deadlines and Discovery with Brief In Support by Nationstar Mortgage, LLC, The Bank of New York Mellon as Trustee for Mastr Trust 2005-8. (Attachments: #1 Brief, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Rhadans, Allison)
May 7, 2021 Filing 5 Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement by Nationstar Mortgage, LLC, The Bank of New York Mellon as Trustee for Mastr Trust 2005-8 identifying Corporate Parent Mr. Cooper Group Inc. for Nationstar Mortgage, LLC; Corporate Parent The Bank of New York Mellon Corporation for The Bank of New York Mellon as Trustee for Mastr Trust 2005-8. (Rhadans, Allison)
May 6, 2021 Filing 4 First MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM with Brief In Support by Albertelli Law Group. (Attachments: #1 Brief)(Sims, Cory)
May 6, 2021 Filing 3 First MOTION to Dismiss by Albertelli Law Group. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Sims, Cory)
April 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ELEVENTH AMENDMENT TO GENERAL ORDER 20-01 RE: COURT OPERATIONS UNDER THE EXIGENT CIRCUMSTANCES CREATED BY COVID-19 AND RELATED CORONAVIRUS. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 3/9/2021. (tmf)
April 30, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL with COMPLAINT filed by The Bank of New York Mellon as Trustee for Mastr Trust 2005-8, Nationstar Mortgage, LLC. (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number AGANDC-10940419) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(tmf) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form.
April 30, 2021 Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Bruce Dobbs re #2 Order. (tmf)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Dobbs v. Nationstar Mortgage, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Albertelli Law Group
Represented By: Cory Patrick Sims
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Bank of New York Mellon as Trustee for Mastr Trust 2005-8
Represented By: Jarrod Sean Mendel
Represented By: Allison Giardina Rhadans
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nationstar Mortgage, LLC doing business as "Mr. Cooper"
Represented By: Jarrod Sean Mendel
Represented By: Allison Giardina Rhadans
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bruce Dobbs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?