IAP Design-Build, LLC v. Windamir Development, Inc.
Plaintiff: IAP Design-Build, LLC
Defendant: Windamir Development, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2021cv01871
Filed: May 5, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: J P Boulee
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Arbitration
Cause of Action: 09 U.S.C. ยง 09
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 24, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 24, 2021 Submission of #8 MOTION to Vacate Arbitration Award, to District Judge J. P. Boulee. (bdb)
June 23, 2021 Filing 12 REPLY BRIEF re #8 MOTION to Vacate Arbitration Award filed by Windamir Development, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(King, David)
June 11, 2021 Submission of #1 Petition for Arbitration to District Judge J. P. Boulee. (rjc)
June 9, 2021 Filing 11 RESPONSE in Opposition re #8 MOTION to Vacate Arbitration Award filed by IAP Design-Build, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Interim Order)(Woods, Rebecca)
June 9, 2021 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Rebecca Woods on behalf of IAP Design-Build, LLC (Woods, Rebecca)
May 26, 2021 Filing 9 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Windamir Development, Inc..(King, David)
May 26, 2021 Filing 8 MOTION to Vacate Arbitration Award with Brief In Support by Windamir Development, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10)(King, David)
May 26, 2021 Filing 7 ANSWER to Petition for Arbitration by Windamir Development, Inc..(King, David) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov to obtain Pretrial Instructions.
May 24, 2021 Clerks Notation re #5 Certificate of Interested Persons APPROVED by JPB. (bnw)
May 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 STANDING ORDER REGARDING CIVIL LITIGATION. Signed by Judge J. P. Boulee on 5/18/21. (bnw)
May 14, 2021 Filing 5 Certificate of Interested Persons by IAP Design-Build, LLC. (Poole, Todd)
May 13, 2021 Filing 4 Request for Leave of Absence for the following date(s): 7/16/21, 7/19/21-7/23/21, 7/26/21-7/30/21, 9/20/21-9/24/21, 11/22/21-11/24/21, by Todd J. Poole. (Poole, Todd)
May 7, 2021 Filing 3 Return of Service Executed by IAP Design-Build, LLC. Windamir Development, Inc. served on 5/6/2021, answer due 5/27/2021. (Poole, Todd) Modified on 5/7/2021 to edit dates (ddm).
May 5, 2021 Filing 2 Electronic Summons Issued as to Windamir Development, Inc. (ddm)
May 5, 2021 Filing 1 PETITION to Confirm Arbitration Award filed by IAP Design-Build, LLC. (Filing fee $402, receipt number AGANDC-10952988) (Attachments: #1 Memo in Support, #2 Declaration in Support, #3 Exh. A to Declaration, #4 Exh. B to Declaration, #5 Civil Cover Sheet)(ddm) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: IAP Design-Build, LLC v. Windamir Development, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: IAP Design-Build, LLC
Represented By: Todd J. Poole
Represented By: Rebecca Woods
Represented By: Robert Mark Hoyland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Windamir Development, Inc.
Represented By: David Charles King
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?