Rodney v. Wint
Petitioner: Janine Rodney
Respondent: Rollin Wint
Case Number: 1:2021cv01945
Filed: May 7, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: William M Ray
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 11601
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 24, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 24, 2021 Filing 32 RESPONSE re #23 First MOTION for Attorney Fees filed by Rollin Wint. (Wilkerson, Chelsea)
June 22, 2021 Filing 31 NOTICE TO COUNSEL OF RECORD for Rollin Wint regarding RECLAMATION AND DISPOSITION OF UNCLAIMED Documentary EXHIBITS pursuant to Local Rule 79.1D. Re: #29 Exhibits. (cmd)
June 22, 2021 Filing 30 NOTICE TO COUNSEL OF RECORD for Janine Rodney regarding RECLAMATION AND DISPOSITION OF UNCLAIMED Documentary EXHIBITS pursuant to Local Rule 79.1D. Re: #28 Exhibits. (cmd)
June 22, 2021 Filing 29 EXHIBIT (Respondent's Exhibit 1) admitted and retained at the #22 Evidentiary Hearing has been received from Courtroom Deputy and placed in the custody of the Records Clerks. (Attachments: #1 Respondent's Exhibit 1)(cmd)
June 22, 2021 Filing 28 EXHIBITS (Petitioner's Exhibits 1-8) admitted and retained at the #22 Evidentiary Hearing have been received from Courtroom Deputy and placed in the custody of the Records Clerks. (Attachments: #1 Petitioner's Ex. 1, #2 Petitioner's Ex. 2, #3 Petitioner's Ex. 3, #4 Petitioner's Ex. 4, #5 Petitioner's Ex. 5, #6 Petitioner's Ex. 6, #7 Petitioner's Ex. 7, #8 Petitioner's Ex. 8)(cmd)
June 16, 2021 Filing 27 CLERK'S JUDGMENT in favor of Petitioner against Respondent. (cmd)--Please refer to http://www.ca11.uscourts.gov to obtain an appeals jurisdiction checklist--
June 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER: The Court GRANTS Petitioner's Verified Petition for Return of Child Under the Hague Convention [Doc. #1 ]; A.R.W. shall be RETURNED to Jamaica; A.R.W. shall not be removed from the Northern District of Georgia pending her return to Jamaica; and Respondent shall accompany and return A.R.W to Petitioner in Jamaica not later than 6:00 P.M. on Thursday, June 24, 2021. Signed by Judge William M. Ray, II on 6/16/2021. (cmd)
June 16, 2021 Civil Case Terminated. (cmd)
June 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER: The Court notes that the Plaintiff has filed her Motion for Attorney Fees [Doc #23 ] and hereby ORDERS that the Defendant file his response to the Motion for Attorney Fees within TEN (10) days from the date of this Order. Signed by Judge William M. Ray, II on 6/14/2021. (cmd)
June 14, 2021 Filing 24 PROPOSED ORDER re: #23 First MOTION for Attorney Fees . (Lovett, Mitchell)
June 14, 2021 Filing 23 First MOTION for Attorney Fees by Janine Rodney. (Lovett, Mitchell)
June 11, 2021 Filing 22 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge William M. Ray, II: Evidentiary Hearing held on 6/11/2021. Janine Rodney, Rollin Wint and Vanessa Sullivan testified. Petitioner's Exhibits 1-8 and Respondent's Exhibit 1 retained to be forwarded to the Clerk's Office. The Court finds the proper venue and jurisdiction is in Jamaica. Parties are directed to negotiate A.R.W.'s return to Jamaica at Mr. Wint's expense. Plaintiff's counsel are to submit a proposed order by Monday, June 14. If parties cannot agree to the terms of the return, each side can submit a proposal to the Court by Monday, June 14. Parties can also address the issue of attorneys fees via letter brief.(Court Reporter Andy Ashley)(jkl)
June 10, 2021 Filing 21 NOTICE of Appearance by Chelsea K. Wilkerson on behalf of Rollin Wint (Wilkerson, Chelsea)
June 10, 2021 Filing 20 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Rollin Wint.(Wilkerson, Chelsea)
June 10, 2021 Filing 19 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Rollin Wint.(Wilkerson, Chelsea)
June 10, 2021 Filing 18 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Rollin Wint.(Wilkerson, Chelsea)
June 10, 2021 NOTICE OF VIDEO PROCEEDING : Final Hearing set for 6/11/2021 at 09:30 AM in ATLA Courtroom 1705 before Judge William M. Ray, II. ****LINK FOR WITNESSES TO TESTIFY VIA VTC FROM COURTROOM****Join ZoomGov Meetinghttps://ganduscourts.zoomgov.com/j/1606601659Meeting ID: 160 660 1659Passcode: 1705One tap mobile+16692545252,,1606601659#,,,,*1705# US (San Jose)+16468287666,,1606601659#,,,,*1705# US (New York)Dial by your location+1 669 254 5252 US (San Jose)+1 646 828 7666 US (New York)+1 669 216 1590 US (San Jose)+1 551 285 1373 USMeeting ID: 160 660 1659Passcode: 1705Find your local number: https://ganduscourts.zoomgov.com/u/aix17NIO5Join by SIP1606601659@sip.zoomgov.comJoin by H.323161.199.138.10 (US West)161.199.136.10 (US East)Meeting ID: 160 660 1659Passcode: 1705You must follow the instructions of the Court for remote proceedings available #here. The procedure for filing documentary exhibits admitted during the proceeding is available #here. Photographing, recording, or broadcasting of any judicial proceedings, including proceedings held by video teleconferencing or telephone conferencing, is strictly and absolutely prohibited. (cmd)
June 9, 2021 Filing 17 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE for Discovery Responses by Janine Rodney.(Lovett, Mitchell)
June 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER GRANTING #15 Motion for Remote Testimony for Witnesses. Because Petitioner's witnesses live in Jamaica and will be unable to obtain a Visa by the time of the Final Hearing, these witnesses may testify by Zoom video-teleconference for the June 11, 2021 hearing. Signed by Judge William M. Ray, II on 6/9/2021. (cmd)
June 8, 2021 Filing 15 First MOTION for Remote Testimony for Witnesses by Janine Rodney. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Shewmaker, Patricia) Modified on 6/9/2021 to edit motion relief selection. (cmd)
June 4, 2021 Filing 14 ANSWER to #1 COMPLAINT by Rollin Wint. Discovery ends on 11/1/2021.(Wilkerson, Chelsea) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov to obtain Pretrial Instructions.
June 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER GRANTING #11 Motion for Remote Testimony. The Court holds that, because Petitioner is not a U.S. citizen, has been denied a request for an extended Visa, and would be unable to obtain a Visa by the time of the Final Hearing, Petitioner may testify by Zoom video-teleconference for the June 11, 2021 hearing. Signed by Judge William M. Ray, II on 6/3/2021. (cmd)
June 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER: It is ORDERED that Respondent, Rollin Wint, is prohibited from removing the child, A.R.W., from the jurisdiction of this Court pending the hearing on the merits of the Verified Petition. It is ORDERED that the Superior Court of Clayton County, Georgia, is enjoined from proceeding with the legitimation action or making any custody decision during the pendency of this Return of Child action. Signed by Judge William M. Ray, II on 6/3/2021. (cmd)
June 3, 2021 Filing 11 MOTION for Remote Testimony Janine Rodney. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Shewmaker, Patricia) Modified on 6/4/2021 to edit motion relief selection and text. (cmd)
June 2, 2021 Filing 10 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE P's ROGS and N2P to R by Janine Rodney.(Shewmaker, Patricia)
May 28, 2021 Filing 9 PROPOSED ORDER re: #3 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order . (Lovett, Mitchell) Modified on 6/1/2021 to edit docket relationship and text. (cmd)
May 28, 2021 Filing 8 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge William M. Ray, II: Motion Hearing held on 5/28/2021 re #3 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order. Counsel appeared via zoom for a hearing on petitioner's #3 motion for temporary restraining order. After hearing argument from counsel, the court GRANTED the motion. Written order to follow. The court directed the respondent to file its answer on or before June 4, 2021 and the petitioner shall have until June 8, 2021 to file any response to the answer. The court further directed the petitioner to file a revised proposed order by end of day on May 28, 2021. The final hearing on the merits of the verified petition is SCHEDULED for June 11, 2021 at 9:30 am in the courtroom. (Court Reporter Penny Coudriet)(cmd)
May 28, 2021 Filing 7 NOTICE OF FINAL HEARING: Final Hearing set for 6/11/2021 at 09:30 AM in ATLA Courtroom 1705 before Judge William M. Ray, II. All parties and attorneys must be present for hearing; however, the Court will consider for good cause allowing the Plaintiff to participate and testify via ZOOM VIDEO from her home in Jamaica. (cmd)
May 24, 2021 Filing 6 NOTICE OF VIDEO PROCEEDING re: #3 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order. Motion Hearing set for 5/28/2021 at 10:00 AM before Judge William M. Ray, II on Zoom. Connection Instructions will be sent separately from the docket. Plaintiff shall notify Defendant of the hearing as well as the Zoom Information so that the Defendant can participate.(cmd)
May 24, 2021 Filing 5 PROPOSED ORDER re: #3 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order. (Shewmaker, Patricia) Modified on 5/25/2021 to edit text. (cmd)
May 24, 2021 ZOOM INSTRUCTIONS re #6 Notice of Video/Telephone Proceeding: https://ganduscourts.zoomgov.com/j/1619334713 Meeting ID: 161 933 4713 Passcode: 1705 +1 646 828 7666 (jkl)
May 14, 2021 Filing 4 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Petition, Summons, Civil Cover Sheet, Motion for Temporary Restraining and Order , as to Rollin Wint. (Shewmaker, Patricia)
May 12, 2021 NOTICE OF CANCELLATION of Motion Hearing set for 5/13/2021 at 01:30 PM via Zoom before Judge William M. Ray II. (jkl)
May 11, 2021 NOTICE OF VIDEO PROCEEDING re: #3 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order. Motion Hearing set for 5/13/2021 at 01:30 PM via Zoom before Judge William M. Ray II. Connection Instructions: Link: https://ganduscourts.zoomgov.com/j/1600418984 Meeting ID: 160 041 8984 Passcode: 1705 Phone call-in: +1 646 828 7666 You must follow the instructions of the Court for remote proceedings available #here. The procedure for filing documentary exhibits admitted during the proceeding is available #here. Photographing, recording, or broadcasting of any judicial proceedings, including proceedings held by video teleconferencing or telephone conferencing, is strictly and absolutely prohibited. (jkl)
May 11, 2021 Submission of #3 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order to District Judge William M. Ray, II. (cmd)
May 10, 2021 Filing 3 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order IMMEDIATE HEARING REQUESTEDby Janine Rodney. (Shewmaker, Patricia)
May 7, 2021 Filing 2 Electronic Summons Issued as to Rollin Wint. (rvb)
May 7, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Janine Rodney. (Filing fee $402, receipt number AGANDC-10960323) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Convention on the Civil Aspects of International Child Abduction, #2 Exhibit Intenational Child Abduction Remedies Act, #3 Exhibit Petitioner's Intent, #4 Exhibit JCA Application, #5 Exhibit CPFSA Document, #6 Civil Cover Sheet)(rvb) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rodney v. Wint
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Janine Rodney
Represented By: Mitchell Edward Lovett
Represented By: Patricia D. Shewmaker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Rollin Wint
Represented By: Chelsea K. Wilkerson
Represented By: Genghis X Shakhan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?