ELLIS v. DOE
Plaintiff: WILLIAM L ELLIS, SR
Defendant: Edward Norton, DR WAYNE LEE WARREN, John Doe, PHILIP HAUN and DR MARK ROSING
Case Number: 1:2021cv02289
Filed: June 3, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: Eleanor L Ross
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Med. Malpractice
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 3, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 3, 2021 Submission of #17 Motion for Clerk's entry of default judgment, to District Judge Eleanor L. Ross. (aar)
June 3, 2021 Filing 19 Case transferred in from District of Georgia Middle; Case Number 4:20-cv-00290. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
June 2, 2021 Case Electronically Transferred Out - District Transfer to Northern District of Georgia. All documents, including a certified copy of the docket sheet and pleading were transferred electronically. **The Notice of Electronic Filing serves as certification for these transferred documents.**Case Transfer Acknowledgment deadline 6/16/2021. (esl) [Transferred from Georgia Middle on 6/3/2021.]
June 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER OF TRANSFER transferring proceedings to the U.S. District Court for the Northern District of Georgia - Atlanta Division. R&R #14 adopted. Ordered by US DISTRICT JUDGE CLAY D LAND on 6/2/2021. (esl) [Transferred from Georgia Middle on 6/3/2021.]
June 2, 2021 Plaintiffs Request for CLERK'S ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to JOHN DOE, PHILIP HAUN, EDWARD NORTON, MARK ROSING, WAYNE LEE WARREN is DECLINED. (esl) [Transferred from Georgia Middle on 6/3/2021.]
June 1, 2021 Filing 17 Application to Clerk for Entry of Default against JOHN DOE, PHILIP HAUN, EDWARD NORTON, MARK ROSING, WAYNE LEE WARREN. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(esl) [Transferred from Georgia Middle on 6/3/2021.]
May 13, 2021 Filing 16 NOTICE of Protection Order by WILLIAM L ELLIS, SR (Attachments: #1 health care documents, #2 Envelope)(esl) [Transferred from Georgia Middle on 6/3/2021.]
April 27, 2021 Filing 15 AFFIDAVIT by WILLIAM L ELLIS, SR (Attachments: #1 various documents that accompanied affidavit, #2 Envelope)(esl) [Transferred from Georgia Middle on 6/3/2021.]
April 12, 2021 Filing 14 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION re #12 Recast Complaint/Petition, filed by WILLIAM L ELLIS, SR. Ordered by US MAGISTRATE JUDGE STEPHEN HYLES on 4-12-21. (jdl) [Transferred from Georgia Middle on 6/3/2021.]
April 9, 2021 Filing 13 This is a text only entry; no document issued. ORDER withdrawing #11 Order to Show Cause. The actual Recast Complaint, ECF No. 12, was received today. Ordered by US MAGISTRATE JUDGE STEPHEN HYLES on 4-9-21. (jdl) [Transferred from Georgia Middle on 6/3/2021.]
April 9, 2021 Filing 12 RECAST #1 Complaint against MARK ROSING, PHILIP HAUN, EDWARD NORTON, WAYNE LEE WARREN by WILLIAM L ELLIS, SR (Attachments: #1 notice of mail error, #2 Affidavit, #3 witness list, #4 medical notes, #5 cover page, #6 Envelope)(esl) [Transferred from Georgia Middle on 6/3/2021.]
April 8, 2021 Filing 11 ***WITHDRAWN*** Order to Show Cause. Ordered by US MAGISTRATE JUDGE STEPHEN HYLES on 4-8-21. (jdl) Modified on 4/13/2021 (esl). [Transferred from Georgia Middle on 6/3/2021.]
April 7, 2021 Filing 10 RECAST #1 Complaint against JOHN DOE by WILLIAM L ELLIS, SR (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(esl) [Transferred from Georgia Middle on 6/3/2021.]
March 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER to Recast Complaint. Ordered by US MAGISTRATE JUDGE STEPHEN HYLES on 3-5-21. (jdl) [Transferred from Georgia Middle on 6/3/2021.]
March 1, 2021 Filing 8 This is a text only entry; no document issued. ORDER granting #6 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Ordered by US MAGISTRATE JUDGE STEPHEN HYLES on 3-1-21. (jdl) [Transferred from Georgia Middle on 6/3/2021.]
March 1, 2021 Filing 7 AFFIDAVIT of Sharon Wisdom (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(esl) [Transferred from Georgia Middle on 6/3/2021.]
March 1, 2021 Filing 6 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis Filed by WILLIAM L ELLIS, SR. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of William Ellis, Sr., #2 Envelope). Motion referred to STEPHEN HYLES.(esl) [Transferred from Georgia Middle on 6/3/2021.]
February 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER to pay filing fee or submit motion to proceed IFP. The Clerk is directed to send Plaintiff the appropriate forms. Ordered by US MAGISTRATE JUDGE STEPHEN HYLES on 2-19-21. (jdl) [Transferred from Georgia Middle on 6/3/2021.]
February 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge US MAGISTRATE JUDGE STEPHEN HYLES issued at the direction of the Court. (esl) [Transferred from Georgia Middle on 6/3/2021.]
February 18, 2021 Filing 3 AFFIDAVIT in Support re #1 Complaint by WILLIAM L ELLIS, SR. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit - Emory Police Report, #2 Envelope)(esl) [Transferred from Georgia Middle on 6/3/2021.]
December 18, 2020 Filing 2 MEMORANDUM in Support of #1 Complaint (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(esl) [Transferred from Georgia Middle on 6/3/2021.]
November 19, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against JOHN DOE filed by WILLIAM L ELLIS, SR (Attachments: #1 Exhibit supporting medical documents, #2 Envelope)(esl) Modified on 11/23/2020 (esl). [Transferred from Georgia Middle on 6/3/2021.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: ELLIS v. DOE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Edward Norton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DR WAYNE LEE WARREN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PHILIP HAUN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DR MARK ROSING
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: WILLIAM L ELLIS, SR
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?