Khan et al v. Cryolife Inc et al
Plaintiff: Iftikhar Khan and Nazir Khan
Defendant: Hemosphere and Cryolife Inc
Case Number: 1:2021cv02291
Filed: June 1, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: Steve C Jones
Referring Judge: Thomas W Thrash
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 28:1338
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 15, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER directing that Plaintiffs immediately comply with Local Rule 3.4, NDGa and file a complete form AO Form 120 so that the Clerk may submit the form to the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. Plaintiffs shall return a completed form AO 120 on or before August 2, 2021. Signed by Judge Steve C. Jones on 7/15/2021. (ddm)
July 15, 2021 Submission of Notice of deficiency re AO Form 120 to pro se plaintiffs, to District Judge Steve C. Jones. (ddm)
July 15, 2021 Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Iftikhar Khan, Nazir Khan re #6 Order, AO 120 Form. (ddm)
June 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER denying #2 Plaintiffs' Motion for Permission for Electronic Case Filing. Signed by Judge Steve C. Jones on 6/22/2021. (ddm)
June 22, 2021 Submission of #2 MOTION Electronic Filing, to District Judge Steve C. Jones. (rsg)
June 22, 2021 Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Iftikhar Khan, Nazir Khan re #5 Order. (ddm)
June 14, 2021 Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Iftikhar Khan, Nazir Khan re NEF from AO Form 120 - Notice to Parties and AO 120 form. (ddm)
June 14, 2021 Notice of deficiency re AO Form 120. Plaintiff must complete and file AO Form 120. See LR 3.4 and LPR 1.4. Docket the form using the event AO 120, located in the Other Filings/Other Documents menu. (ddm)
June 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Steve C. Jones for all further proceedings. Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. no longer assigned to case. NOTICE TO ALL COUNSEL OF RECORD: The Judge designation in the civil action number assigned to this case has been changed to 1:21-cv-2291-SCJ. Please make note of this change in order to facilitate the docketing of pleadings in this case. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 6/7/2021. (ah)
June 7, 2021 Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Iftikhar Khan, Nazir Khan re #4 Order Reassigning Case. (ah)
June 3, 2021 Notice of deficiency re AO Form 120. Plaintiff must complete and file AO Form 120. See LR 3.4 and LPR 1.4. Docket the form using the event AO 120, located in the Other Filings/Other Documents menu. (eop)
June 2, 2021 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Cryolife Inc. (eop)
June 2, 2021 Filing 2 MOTION for Electronic Filing Access by Iftikhar Khan and Nazir Khan. (eop)
June 1, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand filed by Nazir Khan and Iftikhar Khan. (Filing fee $402.00, receipt number GAN100130339) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit -Receipt)(eop) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Khan et al v. Cryolife Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hemosphere
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cryolife Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Iftikhar Khan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nazir Khan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?