Asskia v. Nelson et al
Plaintiff: Kwame A. Asskia
Defendant: Evereth Stanton, Delores Harris, Dr. Joe Nelson, Dr. Carey Wright, Rosemary Aultman, John Taylor, Clarksdale Municipal School District School Board and West Bolivar Consolidated School District Board
Case Number: 1:2021cv02567
Filed: June 24, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: Michael L Brown
Nature of Suit: Racketeer/Corrupt Organization
Cause of Action: 18 U.S.C. ยง 1961
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 22, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER granting #7 Motion to Stay. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED, ADJUDGED, AND DECREED that should any issues remain following the Court's ruling on Defendants' Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint: a) The parties' obligation to participate in a Local Rule 26(f) conference be stayed until sixteen(16) days after Defendants' deadline, if any, to file an Answer; b)The parties' obligation to serve initial disclosures be stayed until thirty (30 )days after Defendants' deadline, if any, to file an Answer; and c) The parties' obligation to file a joint preliminary report and discovery plan be stayed until thirty (30) days after Defendants' deadline, if any, to file an Answer; and a) The parties' obligation to participate in discovery be stayed until thirty (30) days after Defendants' deadline, if any, to file an Answer. Signed by Judge Michael L. Brown on 8/20/2021. (tmf)
August 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Kwame A. Asskia re #16 Order on Motion to Stay,,,. (tmf)
August 18, 2021 Opinion or Order APPROVAL by Clerks Office re: #14 APPLICATION for Admission of Randall Elliott Day, III Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number BGANDC-11177093).. Attorney Randall Elliott Day, III added appearing on behalf of Rosemary Aultman, Clarksdale Municipal School District School Board, Delores Harris, Joe Nelson, Evereth Stanton, John Taylor, West Bolivar Consolidated School District Board, Carey Wright (nmb)
August 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Submission of #10 MOTION to Dismiss or in the Alternative, Motion for More Definite StatementMOTION for More Definite Statement, to District Judge Michael L. Brown. (tmf)
August 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 15 RESPONSE in Opposition re #11 MOTION for Clerks Entry of Default filed by Clarksdale Municipal School District School Board, Delores Harris, Joe Nelson, West Bolivar Consolidated School District , John Taylor, and Evereth Stanton. (McBride, Grant) Modified on 8/12/2021 to edit filers to match filed pleading (tmf).
August 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 14 APPLICATION for Admission of Randall Elliott Day, III Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number BGANDC-11177093).by Evereth Stanton, John Taylor, West Bolivar Consolidated School District Board. (Friduss, Phillip) Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse.
August 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Submission of #7 MOTION to Stay , #9 MOTION to Dismiss MOTION for More Definite Statement, to District Judge Michael L. Brown. (tmf)
August 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 NOTICE Of Filing Amended Civil Cover Sheet by Kwame A. Asskia (tmf)
August 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 RESPONSE in Opposition re #5 MOTION for Default Judgment filed by Clarksdale Municipal School District School Board, Delores Harris, Joe Nelson, Evereth Stanton, John Taylor, West Bolivar Consolidated School District Board. (McBride, Grant)
August 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 MOTION for Clerks Entry of Default by Kwame A. Asskia. (tmf)
July 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 MOTION to Dismiss, MOTION for More Definite Statement with Brief In Support by Evereth Stanton, John Taylor, West Bolivar Consolidated School District Board. (Friduss, Phillip) . Adde dMOTION for More Definite Statement on 7/29/2021 and edited filers (tmf).
July 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 MOTION to Dismiss , MOTION for More Definite Statement with Brief In Support by Delores Harris, Joe Nelson, Clarksdale Municipal School District School Board. (McBride, Grant) . Added MOTION for More Definite Statement on 7/22/2021 and edited filers to match those referenced in filed pleading (tmf).
July 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 Certificate of Interested Persons by Delores Harris, Joe Nelson, Clarksdale Municipal School District School Board . (McBride, Grant) Modified on 7/22/2021 to edit filers(tmf).
July 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 MOTION to Stay by Delores Harris, Joe Nelson, Clarksdale Municipal School District School Board . (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Granting Motion to Stay)(McBride, Grant) Modified on 7/22/2021 to edit filers to match those referenced in filed pleading(tmf).
July 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 DOCUMENT FILED IN ERROR filed correctly at doc #9 MOTION to Dismiss, MOTION for More Definite Statement with Brief In Support by Delores Harris, Joe Nelson, Clarksdale Municipal School District School Board. (McBride, Grant) . Added MOTION for More Definite Statement on 7/22/2021 and edited filers to match referenced in filed pleading (tmf). Modified on 7/22/2021 to add red text per attorney request (jpk).
July 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Notification of Docket Correction re #9 MOTION to Dismiss, MOTION for More Definite Statement with Brief In Support by Delores Harris, Joe Nelson, Clarksdale Municipal School District School Board. (McBride, Grant). Added MOTION for More Definite Statement on 7/22/2021 and edited filers to match those referenced in filed pleading (tmf).
July 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 (construed by clerk) MOTION for Default Judgment by Kwame A. Asskia. (tmf)
June 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Return of Service Executed by Kwame A. Asskia. All defendants served on 6/28/2021; answers due 7/19/2021. (jpa)
June 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 STANDING ORDER regarding civil litigation. Signed by Judge Michael L. Brown on 1/11/2021. (bgt)
June 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Kwame A. Asskia re #3 Standing Order. (bgt)
June 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Rosemary Aultman, Delores Harris, Joe Nelson, Evereth Stanton, John Taylor, Carey Wright. (Attachments: #1 Summons Aultman, #2 Summons Harris, #3 Summons Stanton, #4 Summons Taylor, #5 Summons Wright)(ceo)
June 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Kwame A. Asskia (Filing fee $402, receipt number GAN100130943) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet with receipt) (ceo) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Asskia v. Nelson et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Evereth Stanton
Represented By: Randall Elliott Day, III
Represented By: Phillip Edward Friduss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Delores Harris
Represented By: Randall Elliott Day, III
Represented By: Grant McBride
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dr. Joe Nelson
Represented By: Randall Elliott Day, III
Represented By: Grant McBride
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dr. Carey Wright
Represented By: Randall Elliott Day, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rosemary Aultman
Represented By: Randall Elliott Day, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Taylor
Represented By: Randall Elliott Day, III
Represented By: Phillip Edward Friduss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Clarksdale Municipal School District School Board
Represented By: Randall Elliott Day, III
Represented By: Grant McBride
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: West Bolivar Consolidated School District Board
Represented By: Randall Elliott Day, III
Represented By: Phillip Edward Friduss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kwame A. Asskia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?