Mercury Insurance Company of Georgia v. Edouard et al
Plaintiff: Mercury Insurance Company of Georgia
Defendant: Myriam Edouard, Masnick Fortunat, C.F. and I.M.
Case Number: 1:2021cv03166
Filed: August 5, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: Michael L Brown
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2201
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 23, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER granting #16 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #5 Amended Complaint, #1 Complaint. Mercury Insurance Company of Georgia Answer due 10/25/2021. Signed by Judge Michael L. Brown on 9/24/2021. (dob)
September 22, 2021 Filing 16 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer on behalf of I.M. by Mercury Insurance Company of Georgia. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Watson, Lewis)
September 16, 2021 Filing 15 MOTION for Extension of Time to procure an attorney by C.F., Myriam Edouard, Masnick Fortunat. (jpa)
September 10, 2021 Filing 14 Return of Service Executed by Mercury Insurance Company of Georgia. I.M. served on 9/2/2021, answer due 9/23/2021. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Return of Service on I.M. through her GAL, Alejandro Macias)(Watson, Lewis)
September 10, 2021 Filing 13 Return of Service Executed by Mercury Insurance Company of Georgia. Myriam Edouard served on 8/27/2021, answer due 9/17/2021. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Proof of Service on Myriam Edouard)(Watson, Lewis)
September 10, 2021 Filing 12 Return of Service Executed by Mercury Insurance Company of Georgia. Masnick Fortunat served on 8/27/2021, answer due 9/17/2021. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Proof of Service on Masnick Fortunat)(Watson, Lewis)
September 10, 2021 Filing 11 Return of Service Executed by Mercury Insurance Company of Georgia. C.F. served on 8/27/2021, answer due 9/17/2021. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Proof of Service on C.F., a minor, through her GAL)(Watson, Lewis)
August 26, 2021 Filing 10 Electronic Summons Issued as to I.M. (jpa) (Additional attachment(s) added on 8/26/2021: #1 Corrected Main Document) (jpa).
August 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 STANDING ORDER regarding civil litigation. Signed by Judge Michael L. Brown on 8/26/2021. (dgs) (ADI)
August 25, 2021 Filing 8 PROPOSED SUMMONS filed by Mercury Insurance Company of Georgia to I.M. a minor by and through her Guardian Ad Litem Alejandro Macias (Watson, Lewis)
August 20, 2021 Filing 7 PROPOSED SUMMONS filed by Mercury Insurance Company of Georgia (Watson, Lewis)
August 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 STANDING ORDER regarding civil litigation. Signed by Judge Michael L. Brown on 1/11/2021. (bgt)
August 5, 2021 Filing 5 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by Mercury Insurance Company of Georgia. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Certified Policy, #2 Exhibit B - Second Amended Complaint, #3 Summons to CF via Masnick Fortunat, #4 Summons to Masnick Fortunat, #5 Summons to Myrian Edouard, #6 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet)(Watson, Lewis) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form.
August 5, 2021 Filing 4 Electronic Summons Issued as to C.F.. (eop)
August 5, 2021 Filing 3 Electronic Summons Issued as to Masnick Fortunat. (eop)
August 5, 2021 Filing 2 Electronic Summons Issued as to Myriam Edouard. (eop)
August 5, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Mercury Insurance Company of Georgia. (Filing fee $402.00, receipt number AGANDC-11161722) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit -A -Certified Policy, #2 Exhibit -B -First Amended Complaint, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(eop) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mercury Insurance Company of Georgia v. Edouard et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mercury Insurance Company of Georgia
Represented By: Lewis Andrew Watson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Myriam Edouard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Masnick Fortunat
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C.F.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: I.M.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?