Patel v. The United States et al
Plaintiff: The Excellent Raj Patel
Defendant: The United States, The President of the United States, The Honorable Joe R. Biden, The Honorable Donald J. Trump, The State of Indiana, The State of Georgia, Brownsburg Police Department, Emory University, University of Notre Dame Du Lac, Brownsburg Community School Corporation, Ajay Nair, Veronica Syretia Root Martinez, Mark McKenna, Amy Spanopoulos, Jake Baska and Ascension St. Vincent Stress Center
Case Number: 1:2021cv03376
Filed: August 18, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: Michael L Brown
Nature of Suit: Racketeer/Corrupt Organization
Cause of Action: 18 U.S.C. ยง 1961
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 5, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER denying as moot #2 Motion for Joinder ; denying as moot #9 Motion for Joinder; denying as moot #13 Motion for Leave to file by e-mail ; granting #15 Plaintiff's Motion to Dismiss without prejudice. The Clerk is Directed to Close this case. Signed by Judge Michael L. Brown on 10/5/2021. (dob)
October 5, 2021 Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Raj Patel re #16 Order. (dob)
October 5, 2021 Civil Case Terminated. (dob)
September 30, 2021 Filing 15 MOTION to Withdraw Pro Se Complaint by Raj Patel. (jpa)
September 17, 2021 Submission of #13 MOTION for Leave to file by E-Mail, to District Judge Michael L. Brown. (jpa)
September 16, 2021 Filing 14 FOURTH AMENDED COMPLAINT against Ascension St. Vincent Stress Center, Jake Baska, Joe R. Biden, Brownsburg Community School Corporation, Brownsburg Police Department, Emory University, Mark McKenna, Ajay Nair, Veronica Syretia Root Martinez, Amy Spanopoulos, The President of the United States, The State of Georgia, The State of Indiana, The United States, Donald J. Trump, University of Notre Dame Du Lac filed by Raj Patel.(jpa) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form.
September 16, 2021 Submission of #9 MOTION for Joinder, to District Judge Michael L. Brown. (jpa)
September 8, 2021 Submission of #2 MOTION to Add Party, to District Judge Michael L. Brown. (dob)
August 30, 2021 Filing 13 MOTION for Leave to file by E-Mail by Raj Patel. (jpa)
August 27, 2021 Filing 12 Third AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by Raj Patel.(dob) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form. Modified on 8/30/2021 to edit date of filing (dob).
August 27, 2021 Filing 11 DUPLICATE FILING NOTICE Of Filing Amendments to the #10 Amended Complaint by Raj Patel. (jpa) Modified on 8/30/2021 (jpa).
August 27, 2021 Filing 10 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by Raj Patel.(dob) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form.
August 27, 2021 Filing 9 MOTION for Joinder by Raj Patel. (dob)
August 27, 2021 Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Raj Patel re #8 Standing Order. (bgt)
August 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 STANDING ORDER regarding civil litigation. Signed by Judge Michael L. Brown on 8/26/2021. (dgs) (ADI)
August 25, 2021 Filing 7 NOTICE Of Filing Civil Cover Sheet by Raj Patel (jpa)
August 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 STANDING ORDER regarding civil litigation. Signed by Judge Michael L. Brown on 1/11/2021. (jpk)
August 23, 2021 Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Raj Patel re #6 Order. (jpk)
August 20, 2021 Filing 5 COMPLAINT filed by Raj Patel. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(jpa) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form.
August 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER GRANTING #1 Application for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. He shall be allowed to proceed with this action without prepayment of filing fees, docket costs, or USMS Service fees. However, it is further ORDERED that service of process shall not issue at the present time, and the Clerk shall submit this file to the assigned District Judge for a frivolity determination. Signed by Magistrate Judge Russell G. Vineyard on 8/20/21. (jpa)
August 20, 2021 Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Raj Patel re #4 Order on Application for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. (jpa)
August 20, 2021 Submission of #5 Complaint for frivolity determination to District Judge Michael L. Brown. (jpa)
August 19, 2021 Filing 3 NOTICE Of Filing Amendments to by Raj Patel re #5 Complaint. (jpa) Modified on 8/20/2021 (jpa).
August 19, 2021 Filing 2 MOTION for Joinder of Party by Raj Patel. (jpa)
August 19, 2021 Submission of #1 APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed in Forma Pauperis, to Magistrate Judge Russell G. Vineyard. (eop)
August 18, 2021 Filing 1 APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed in Forma Pauperis by Raj Patel. (Attachments: #1 Complaint, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(eop)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Patel v. The United States et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: The Excellent Raj Patel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The United States
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The President of the United States
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Honorable Joe R. Biden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Honorable Donald J. Trump
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The State of Indiana
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The State of Georgia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brownsburg Police Department
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Emory University
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: University of Notre Dame Du Lac
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brownsburg Community School Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ajay Nair
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Veronica Syretia Root Martinez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mark McKenna
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amy Spanopoulos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jake Baska
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ascension St. Vincent Stress Center
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?