Windsor et al v. City Info Experts, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Ryan Windsor, CWISS Holdings, LP and Alcatraz Media, Inc.
Defendant: City Info Experts, LLC and Charles Thomas Schmidt
Case Number: 1:2021cv03434
Filed: August 20, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: Leigh Martin May
Nature of Suit: Racketeer/Corrupt Organization
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 13, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 13, 2021 Filing 23 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of First Continuing Interrogatories to City Info Experts, LLC; First Request for Production of Documents to City Info Experts, LLC; First Continuing Interrogatories to Charles Thomas Schmidt; and First Request for Production of Documents to Charles Thomas Schmidt by Alcatraz Media, Inc., CWISS Holdings, LP, Ryan Windsor.(Mullman, Samuel)
October 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER - The Defendants' Motion To Strike, Motion to Set Aside Clerk's Entry of Default, and Motion to Grant Leave to File Out of Time Answer Allowing Defendants' Answer and Motion to Dismiss #10 is GRANTED. The Clerk is DIRECTED to open default against both Defendants and strike Dkt. No. #7 . Signed by Judge Leigh Martin May on 10/12/2021. (tcc)
October 12, 2021 Filing 21 SUR-REPLY re #6 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction filed by Alcatraz Media, Inc., CWISS Holdings, LP, Ryan Windsor. (tcc)
October 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER GRANTING #19 Motion for Leave to File Sur-Reply Brief. The Clerk is DIRECTED to docket Plaintiffs' Sur-Reply in Opposition to Defendant Charles Thomas Schmidt's Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction [Dkt. 19-1]. Signed by Judge Leigh Martin May on 10/12/2021. (tcc)
October 8, 2021 Submission of #10 Motion to Strike MOTION to Set Aside Clerk's Default MOTION for Leave to File Out of Time Answer, to District Judge Leigh Martin May. (rjc)
October 6, 2021 Filing 19 MOTION for Leave to File Sur-Reply by Alcatraz Media, Inc., CWISS Holdings, LP, Ryan Windsor re #17 Reply to Response to Motion, (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Sur-Reply in Opposition to Defendant Charles Thomas Schmidt's Motion to Dismiss For Lack of Personal Jurisdiction)(Mullman, Samuel) Modified on 10/7/2021 to change filing event to MOTION and edit text. (cmd)
October 6, 2021 Submission of #6 MOTION to Dismiss to District Judge Leigh Martin May. (rjc)
September 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER granting #13 Motion to Strike. The Clerk is DIRECTED to STRIKE Defendants' Reply Brief. Dkt. No. #12 . Signed by Judge Leigh Martin May on 9/30/2021. (rjc)
September 30, 2021 Filing 17 REPLY to Response to Motion re #6 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction and Objection to Declarations of Rryan and Barbara Windsor filed by Charles Thomas Schmidt. (Attachments: #1 Supplement Supplemental Declaration of C. Thomas Schmidt)(Leak, Joe)
September 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 16 SCHEDULING ORDER: re: #15 Joint Preliminary Report and Discovery Plan. Initial Disclosures - The Initial Disclosures are due within 30 days after the Court rules on the Motion to Set Aside Default. Discovery Period - The parties shall have four months for discovery. Discovery will begin on the date the Court rules on the Motion to Set Aside Default. Signed by Judge Leigh Martin May on 9/28/2021. (rjc)
September 28, 2021 Submission of #7 MOTION to Set Aside Default to District Judge Leigh Martin May. (rjc)
September 27, 2021 Filing 15 JOINT PRELIMINARY REPORT AND DISCOVERY PLAN filed by Alcatraz Media, Inc., CWISS Holdings, LP, Ryan Windsor. (Mullman, Samuel)
September 22, 2021 Filing 14 RESPONSE in Opposition re #10 Motion to Strike MOTION to Set Aside Clerk's Default MOTION for Leave to File Out of Time Answer filed by Alcatraz Media, Inc., CWISS Holdings, LP, Ryan Windsor. (Mullman, Samuel)
September 20, 2021 Filing 13 MOTION to Strike #12 Reply to Response to Motion by City Info Experts, LLC, Charles Thomas Schmidt. (Leak, Joe)
September 17, 2021 Filing 12 STRICKEN PER ORDER AT DOC. #18 REPLY to Response to Motion re #7 MOTION to Set Aside Default by Clerk filed by City Info Experts, LLC, Charles Thomas Schmidt. (Leak, Joe) Modified on 9/30/2021 (rjc).
September 16, 2021 Filing 11 RESPONSE in Opposition re #6 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction of Charles Thomas Schmidt filed by Alcatraz Media, Inc., CWISS Holdings, LP, Ryan Windsor. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Declaration of Ryan Windsor, #2 Exhibit Declaration of Barbara Windsor)(Mullman, Samuel)
September 10, 2021 Filing 10 MOTION to Strike, MOTION to Set Aside Clerk's Entry of Default, and MOTION for Leave to File Out of Time Answer, by City Info Experts, LLC, Charles Thomas Schmidt. (Leak, Joe) . Added MOTION to Set Aside Default, MOTION for Leave to File, and edited text on 9/13/2021. (cmd)
September 6, 2021 Filing 9 Certificate of Interested Persons by Alcatraz Media, Inc., CWISS Holdings, LP, Ryan Windsor. (Mullman, Samuel)
September 3, 2021 Filing 8 RESPONSE in Opposition re #7 MOTION to Set Aside Default by Clerk filed by Alcatraz Media, Inc., CWISS Holdings, LP, Ryan Windsor. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Cobb County Litigation Complaint, #2 Exhibit Waiver of Service, #3 Exhibit Notice of Special Appearance, #4 Exhibit Counsel Email, #5 Exhibit Executed Waiver of Service)(Mullman, Samuel)
September 2, 2021 Filing 7 (STRICKEN PER #22 ORDER) MOTION to Set Aside Default by Clerk by City Info Experts, LLC, Charles Thomas Schmidt. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit "A" Declaration of C. Thomas Schmidt, #2 Exhibit "1" to Declaration of C. Thomas Schmidt)(Leak, Joe) Modified on 10/13/2021 (tcc).
September 2, 2021 Filing 6 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction by Charles Thomas Schmidt. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit "A" Declaration of C. Thomas Schmidt)(Leak, Joe)
September 2, 2021 Filing 5 ANSWER to #1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL with Jury Demand by City Info Experts, LLC, Charles Thomas Schmidt. Discovery ends on 1/31/2022.(Leak, Joe) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov to obtain Pretrial Instructions.
September 2, 2021 (DEFAULT OPENED PER #22 ORDER) Clerk's Entry of Default as to City Info Experts, LLC, Charles Thomas Schmidt. (cmd) Modified on 10/13/2021 (tcc).
September 1, 2021 Filing 4 First MOTION for Clerk's Entry of Default by Alcatraz Media, Inc., CWISS Holdings, LP, Ryan Windsor. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Declaration of Non-Military Service)(Mullman, Samuel) Modified on 9/2/2021 to edit text. (cmd)
August 31, 2021 Clerks Notation re #3 Certificate of Interested Persons. Read and approved by LMM. (bnp)
August 30, 2021 Filing 3 Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement by City Info Experts, LLC, Charles Thomas Schmidt. (Leak, Joe)
August 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 STANDING ORDER REGARDING CIVIL LITIGATION. Signed by Judge Leigh Martin May on 8/24/2021. (rjc)
August 20, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL with COMPLAINT filed by City Info Experts, LLC. (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number AGANDC-11202665) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Civil Cover Sheet)(tcc) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Windsor et al v. City Info Experts, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ryan Windsor
Represented By: Kelly O. Wallace
Represented By: Paul Frederick Wellborn, III
Represented By: Samuel Alexander Mullman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CWISS Holdings, LP
Represented By: Kelly O. Wallace
Represented By: Paul Frederick Wellborn, III
Represented By: Samuel Alexander Mullman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alcatraz Media, Inc.
Represented By: Kelly O. Wallace
Represented By: Paul Frederick Wellborn, III
Represented By: Samuel Alexander Mullman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City Info Experts, LLC
Represented By: Joe L Leak
Represented By: Michael Alan Holcomb
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Charles Thomas Schmidt
Represented By: Joe L Leak
Represented By: Michael Alan Holcomb
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?