Johnson v. Carter's Retail, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Cheriese D. Johnson
Defendant: Carter's Retail, Inc. and Carter's, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2021cv03461
Filed: August 23, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: Regina D Cannon
Referring Judge: Steven D Grimberg
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Employment
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 12101 et seq. Americans with Disabilities Act of 1990
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 14, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 14, 2022 Filing 25 NOTICE of Appearance by Curtis J. Martin, II on behalf of Cheriese D. Johnson (Martin, Curtis)
February 10, 2022 Filing 24 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Discovery Material by Carter's Retail, Inc., Carter's, Inc..(Robinson, Mitchell)
February 7, 2022 Notification of Docket Correction re #23 Scheduling Order. Scheduling Order docketed in incorrect case. Correct scheduling Order at #21 . (ceo)
February 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ---DOCUMENT FILED IN ERROR, FILED IN INCORRECT CASE---SCHEDULING ORDER: re: #19 Joint Preliminary Report and Discovery Plan Discovery ends on 5/10/2022. Motions due by 6/9/2022. Proposed Pretrial Order due by 6/16/2022. Amendments to the pleadings submitted LATER THAN THIRTY (30)DAYS after the date of this Order will not be accepted for filing except with opposing party consent or good cause shown. Signed by Magistrate Judge Regina D Cannon on 02/04/2022. (jkb) Modified to reflect entry docketed in error on 2/7/2022 (ceo).
February 2, 2022 Filing 22 Certificate of Interested Persons by Carter's Retail, Inc., Carter's, Inc.. (Robinson, Mitchell)
February 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 21 SCHEDULING ORDER: re: #19 Joint Preliminary Report and Discovery Plan Discovery ends on 6/3/2022. Motions due by 7/5/2022. Amendments to the pleadings submitted LATER THAN THIRTY DAYS after the date of this Order will not be accepted for filing except with opposing party consent or good cause shown. The Clerk is DIRECTED to re- submit this action to the undersigned by 07/13/2022, if the parties have not filed a motion for summary judgment or proposed Consolidated Pretrial Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Regina D Cannon on 02/02/2022. (jkb)
February 1, 2022 Filing 20 Certificate of Interested Persons by Cheriese D. Johnson. (Register, Eric)
February 1, 2022 Filing 19 JOINT PRELIMINARY REPORT AND DISCOVERY PLAN filed by Carter's Retail, Inc., Carter's, Inc.. (Robinson, Mitchell)
January 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER: Counsel for the parties are hereby ORDERED to conduct an early planning conference as required by Rule 26(f) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 16.1, and to file a Joint Preliminary Report and Discovery Plan within fourteen days from the date of this Order. The parties are further ORDERED to file their respective CIPs within fourteen days from the date of this Order Signed by Magistrate Judge Regina D Cannon on 01/18/2022. (jkb)
December 13, 2021 Filing 17 Guidelines for Discovery and Motion Practice Signed by Magistrate Judge Regina D Cannon on 12/13/2021. (jkb)
December 10, 2021 Filing 16 Defendants' ANSWER to #1 COMPLAINT by Carter's Retail, Inc., Carter's, Inc.. Discovery ends on 5/9/2022.(Robinson, Mitchell) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov to obtain Pretrial Instructions.
December 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER granting #14 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer, Carter's Retail, Inc. Answer due 12/10/2021; Carter's, Inc. Answer due 12/10/2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Regina D Cannon on 12/8/2021. (dmb)
December 7, 2021 Filing 14 MOTION for Extension of Time to Move, Plead or Otherwise Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint re: #1 Complaint, by Carter's Retail, Inc., Carter's, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Robinson, Mitchell) Modified event on 12/8/2021 (dmb).
November 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER granting #12 Motion for Extension of Time. Defendants shall respond to Plaintiff's Complaint on or before December 7, 2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Regina D Cannon on 11/29/2021. (jkb)
November 24, 2021 Filing 12 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Move, Plead or Otherwise Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint re: #1 Complaint, by Carter's Retail, Inc., Carter's, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Proposed Order)(Robinson, Mitchell)
November 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting #10 Motion for Extension of Time. Defendants shall respond to Plaintiff's Complaint on or before November 24, 2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Regina D Cannon on 11/17/2021. (jkb)
November 16, 2021 Filing 10 MOTION for Extension of Time to Move, Plead or Otherwise Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint re: #1 Complaint, by Carter's Retail, Inc., Carter's, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Letter Confirming Extension Request, #2 Exhibit B - Proposed Order)(Robinson, Mitchell)
November 16, 2021 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Mitchell Robinson on behalf of Carter's Retail, Inc., Carter's, Inc. (Robinson, Mitchell)
November 16, 2021 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Eric Leroy Barnum on behalf of Carter's Retail, Inc., Carter's, Inc. (Barnum, Eric)
November 9, 2021 Filing 7 Return of Service Executed by Cheriese D. Johnson. Carter's, Inc. served on 10/20/2021, answer due 11/10/2021. (Register, Eric) Modified on 11/9/2021 (jkb).
November 9, 2021 Filing 6 Return of Service Executed by Cheriese D. Johnson. Carter's Retail, Inc. served on 10/20/2021, answer due 11/10/2021. (Register, Eric) Modified on 11/9/2021 (jkb).
October 19, 2021 Filing 5 Electronic Summons Issued as to Carter's Retail, Inc., Carter's, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Summons Carter's, Inc.)(jkb)
October 18, 2021 Filing 4 PROPOSED SUMMONS filed by Cheriese D. Johnson to Carter's Inc. (Register, Eric)
October 18, 2021 Filing 3 PROPOSED SUMMONS filed by Cheriese D. Johnson (Register, Eric)
August 25, 2021 Filing 2 NOTICE Of Filing by Cheriese D. Johnson Re-submitted Civil Cover Sheet (Register, Eric)
August 23, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand filed by Cheriese D. Johnson. (Filing fee $402, receipt number AGANDC-11206326) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Charge of Discrimination, #2 Exhibit Notice of Right to Sue, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(jkb) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Johnson v. Carter's Retail, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cheriese D. Johnson
Represented By: Eric Louis Register
Represented By: Curtis J. Martin, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carter's Retail, Inc.
Represented By: Eric Leroy Barnum
Represented By: Mitchell Robinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carter's, Inc.
Represented By: Eric Leroy Barnum
Represented By: Mitchell Robinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?