Little v. Eagle Railcar Services Gordon, Georgia, LLC
Plaintiff: Dustin Little
Defendant: Eagle Railcar Services Gordon, Georgia, LLC
Case Number: 1:2021cv03473
Filed: August 24, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: Alan J Baverman
Referring Judge: Thomas W Thrash
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Employment
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 12101
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 22, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 22, 2021 Filing 28 NOTICE by Dustin Little of Intent to Issue Updated Subpoena to Rescar Companies (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Subpoena to Rescar Companies (Inc.))(Wilson Clark, Ashley)
October 21, 2021 Filing 27 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Eagle Railcar Services Gordon, Georgia, LLC.(Dean, Randal)
October 19, 2021 Filing 26 NOTICE by Dustin Little of Intent to Issue Subpoena (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Subpoena to Rescar Companies (Inc.))(Wilson Clark, Ashley)
October 18, 2021 Filing 25 Initial Disclosures by Dustin Little.(Wilson Clark, Ashley)
October 18, 2021 Filing 24 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE Defendant's Certificate of Written Discovery - Initial Disclosures by Eagle Railcar Services Gordon, Georgia, LLC.(Dean, Randal)
October 18, 2021 Filing 23 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE serving Plaintiff's First Requests for Production of Documents to Defendant by Dustin Little.(Wilson Clark, Ashley)
October 18, 2021 Filing 22 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE serving Plaintiff's First Interrogatories to Defendant by Dustin Little.(Wilson Clark, Ashley)
October 18, 2021 Filing 21 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE serving Plaintiff's First Requests for Admissions to Defendant by Dustin Little.(Wilson Clark, Ashley)
October 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 20 SCHEDULING ORDER: re #13 Joint Preliminary Report and Discovery Plan. Signed by Magistrate Judge Alan J. Baverman on 10/13/2021. (ah)
October 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER re #16 Leave of Absence. It is HEREBY ORDERED that the requested leave of absence is permitted for the period of Monday, October 4, 2021 through Friday, November 12, 2021, for his paternity leave. Signed by Magistrate Judge Alan J. Baverman on 10/12/2021. (ah)
October 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER granting #17 Motion for Leave of Absence. Signed by Magistrate Judge Alan J. Baverman on 10/12/2021. (ah)
October 7, 2021 Filing 17 MOTION for Leave of Absence by Rachel Berlin Benjamin for the period of October 11, 2021 through and including January 3, 2022 by Dustin Little. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Benjamin, Rachel)
October 6, 2021 Filing 16 Petition for Leave of Absence for the following date(s): 10/4, 10/5, 10/6, 10/7, 10/8, 10/11, 10/12, 10/13, 10/14, 10/15, 10/18, 10/19, 10/20, 10/21, 10/22, 10/25, 10/26, 10/27, 10/28, 10/29, 11/1, 11/2, 11/3, 11/4, 11/5, 11/8, 11/9, 11/10, 11/11, 11/12, 2021, by Andrew Ready Tate. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Tate, Andrew)
October 5, 2021 Filing 15 NOTICE of Appearance by Ashley Elizabeth Wilson Clark on behalf of Dustin Little (Wilson Clark, Ashley)
October 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER granting #12 Motion for Leave to File Matters Under Seal. The Clerk of the Court is DIRECTED to seal the document entitled Defendant's Amended Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement. Signed by Magistrate Judge Alan J. Baverman on 10/5/21. (rlh)
October 5, 2021 Clerks Notation re #11 First Amended Certificate of Interested Persons. Reviewed and approved by Chief Magistrate Judge Alan J. Baverman on 10/05/2021. (cmb)
October 4, 2021 Filing 13 JOINT PRELIMINARY REPORT AND DISCOVERY PLAN filed by Dustin Little. (Benjamin, Rachel)
October 1, 2021 Filing 12 MOTION for Leave to File Matters Under Seal re: #11 Notice of Filing Defendant's Amended Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement by Eagle Railcar Services Gordon, Georgia, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Dean, Randal)
October 1, 2021 Filing 11 SEALED NOTICE Of Filing Defendant's First Amended Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement by Eagle Railcar Services Gordon, Georgia, LLC (Dean, Randal) Modified on 10/5/2021 (rlh).
September 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting Stephen Kyle Voss's #7 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 9/22/2021. If the applicant does not have CM/ECF access in the Northern District of Georgia already, they must request access at http://pacer.gov. If they have electronically filed in this district in a previous case, please omit this step.(ah)
September 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting Randal Lewis Dean's #6 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 9/22/2021. If the applicant does not have CM/ECF access in the Northern District of Georgia already, they must request access at http://pacer.gov. If they have electronically filed in this district in a previous case, please omit this step.(ah)
September 22, 2021 MINUTE ORDER re: [Doc. 5] Defendant's Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Eagle Railcar Services - Gordon, Georgia, LLC. It is hereby ORDERED that if JM Texas Companies, LLC includes any members, Defendant Eagle Railcar Services Gordon, Georgia, LLCs CIP should be amended to identify each member within ten (10) days. As the sole parent of Eagle Railcar Services Gordon, Georgia, LLC, the members of JM Texas Companies, LLC have a financial interest... or other interest in the outcome of the litigation, LR 3.3A(2), NDGa, and the Court also cannot evaluate the need for disqualification or recusal without such information. Note that, pursuant to LR 3.3A(3), NDGa, Defendants may file such information in camera or under seal if necessary. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Alan J. Baverman on 09/22/2021. (cmb)
September 21, 2021 APPROVAL by Clerks Office re: #6 APPLICATION for Admission of Randall Lewis Dean Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-11263610).. Attorney Randal Lewis Dean added appearing on behalf of Eagle Railcar Services Gordon, Georgia, LLC (nmb)
September 21, 2021 APPROVAL by Clerks Office re: #7 APPLICATION for Admission of Stephen Kyle Voss Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-11263654).. Attorney Stephen Kyle Voss added appearing on behalf of Eagle Railcar Services Gordon, Georgia, LLC (nmb)
September 21, 2021 Clerks Notation re #8 Certificate of Interested Persons. Approved by Judge Thrash. (jeh)
September 20, 2021 Clerks Notation re: #8 Certificate of Interested Persons. Reviewed and approved by Chief Magistrate Judge Alan J. Baverman on 09/20/2021. (cmb)
September 17, 2021 Filing 8 Certificate of Interested Persons by Dustin Little. (Tate, Andrew)
September 17, 2021 Clerks Notation re #5 Certificate of Interested Persons. Approved by Judge Thrash. (jeh)
September 16, 2021 Filing 7 APPLICATION for Admission of Stephen Kyle Voss Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-11263654).by Eagle Railcar Services Gordon, Georgia, LLC. (Mooney, Stephen) Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse.
September 16, 2021 Filing 6 APPLICATION for Admission of Randall Lewis Dean Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-11263610).by Eagle Railcar Services Gordon, Georgia, LLC. (Mooney, Stephen) Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse.
September 16, 2021 Filing 5 Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement by Eagle Railcar Services Gordon, Georgia, LLC identifying Corporate Parent JM Texas Companies, LLC for Eagle Railcar Services Gordon, Georgia, LLC. (Mooney, Stephen)
September 16, 2021 Filing 4 Defendant's ANSWER to #1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand by Eagle Railcar Services Gordon, Georgia, LLC. Discovery ends on 2/14/2022.(Mooney, Stephen) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov to obtain Pretrial Instructions.
August 31, 2021 Filing 3 Return of Service Executed by Dustin Little. Eagle Railcar Services Gordon, Georgia, LLC served on 8/27/2021, answer due 9/17/2021. (Benjamin, Rachel)
August 24, 2021 Filing 2 Electronic Summons Issued as to Eagle Railcar Services Gordon, Georgia, LLC. (ah)
August 24, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand filed by Dustin Little (Filing fee $402, receipt number AGANDC-11208306). (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(ah) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Little v. Eagle Railcar Services Gordon, Georgia, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dustin Little
Represented By: Andrew Ready Tate
Represented By: Rachel Berlin Benjamin
Represented By: Ashley Elizabeth Wilson Clark
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eagle Railcar Services Gordon, Georgia, LLC
Represented By: Randal Lewis Dean
Represented By: Stephen Kyle Voss
Represented By: Stephen W. Mooney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?